Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case Title
DistrictDistrict of Minnesota
CityDMN
Case Number0:2014cv04927
Date Filed2014-12-04
Date Closed2015-12-17
JudgeJudge Susan Richard Nelson
PlaintiffPublic Record Media
Case DescriptionPublic Record Media submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Land Management for communications submitted by companies or their employees supporting a copper/sulfide mining proposal. The agency did not acknowledge Public Record Media's request and it filed an administrative appeal, which also went unanswered. Public Record Media then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of the Interior
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2014-12-041COMPLAINT against Department of Interior. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0864-4221921) Filed by Public Record Media. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Index, # 2 Exhibits A-E, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Haines, JT) Modified on 12/4/2014 (AKL). (Entered: 12/04/2014)
2014-12-042TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per Master List and referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 14cv4927 SRN/HB. (AKL) (Entered: 12/04/2014)
2014-12-043Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of the Interior. (AKL) (Entered: 12/04/2014)
2015-01-124ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. Department of the Interior. (Bryan, Lonnie) (Entered: 01/12/2015)
2015-02-125ORDER/NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 3/2/2015 09:00 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 632 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 2/12/15. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form)(KNK) (Entered: 02/12/2015)
2015-02-276REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by U.S. Department of the Interior. Jointly Signed by Public Record Media.(Bryan, Lonnie) (Entered: 02/27/2015)
2015-03-027Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/2/2015 - Discussion of pretrial deadlines and early settlement Pretrial Scheduling Order will be issued.The Court encouraged the parties to consider possibilities for resolving the matter. (KNK) (Entered: 03/05/2015)
2015-03-098PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 3/15/2015. Discovery due by 5/1/2015. Motions (non-disp) due 8/1/2015. Motions (disp) due by 9/1/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 3/9/2015. (KNK) (Entered: 03/09/2015)
2015-04-249STATUS REPORT Joint Report by Public Record Media and US Dept of Interior by Public Record Media. (Haines, JT) (Entered: 04/24/2015)
2015-04-2810Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer: Status Conference held on 4/28/2015. The Court will schedule a follow-up status conference for May 29, 2015 at 8:30 a.m. CDT. (lmb) (Entered: 04/28/2015)
2015-05-2911Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer: Status Conference held on 5/29/2015. The Court and counsel discussed the status of the case and progress by the various components of the Department of the Interior in searching for, collecting, reviewing, and producing documents responsive to Plaintiff's request. Good progress has been made. There will be some additional production from the Solicitors Office and from BLM. Counsel for the Government is following up to assure that those productions are on track and will be complete. The Court will schedule a follow-up status conference for Monday, June 29, 2015 at 8:30 a.m. CDT, to discuss the status of the document production, any disputes regarding withheld documents, and steps toward final resolution of the litigation. Counsel are encouraged to work diligently to finalize production in the interim and to notify the Court promptly if the case can be resolved before the June 29 call. Chambers will initiate the call. (KNK) (Entered: 05/29/2015)
2015-06-2912Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer: Status Conference held on 6/29/2015. (MMP) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
2015-07-2813NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for U.S. Department of the Interior. (Fuller, David) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
2015-08-2814Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer: Status Conference held on 8/28/2015. The Court and counsel discussed the Governments progress on completing the production of records responsive to Plaintiffs FOIA request, as well as the parties progress toward negotiation of a final resolution of the litigation. Progress was reported on both fronts, although additional ESI recently located in the BLM may raise additional claims to withhold certain documents under Exemptions 4 or 5. Assuming any issues relating to such withholding can be resolved, the Government will complete production, including declarations and Vaughn indices, within the next 3 weeks. Counsel will in parallel with those efforts continue to negotiate toward a settlement. The Court will hold a telephone status conference with counsel on September 25, 2015 at 8:30 a.m. CDT, at which time counsel will update the Court on the completion of discovery and progress in negotiations, and will advise the Court whether a Court-mediated settlement conference would be helpful in reaching final resolution. (KNK) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
2015-09-2515Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer: Status Conference held on 9/25/2015 by telephone - See minutes for details. (KNK) (Entered: 09/25/2015)
2015-10-2616Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer: Status Conference held by telephone on 10/26/2015. (lmb) (Entered: 10/27/2015)
2015-11-1817TEXT ONLY NOTICE DATE CHANGE: Due to a change in the Court's schedule, the date of the telephone status conference scheduled before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on November 30, 2015 at 8:30 a.m., is being changed. The telephone status conference will now be conducted by Judge Bowbeer on DECEMBER 1, 2015 at 8:30 a.m. CST. (JMK) (Entered: 11/18/2015)
2015-11-2518LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by U.S. Department of the Interior JOINTLY SIGNED BY PLAINTIFF . (Fuller, David) (Entered: 11/25/2015)
2015-12-0119Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer: Status Conference held on 12/1/2015. The Court and counsel discussed final steps to complete production and prepare a joint stipulation to resolve the lawsuit. The Government will produce all remaining documents and a declaration regarding search efforts by the BLM by the end of today. Plaintiff will notify the Government of any objections by Monday, December 7, 2015, or will notify the Government by that time if it needs additional time to complete review of recently produced documents. Plaintiff will update the Government about fees incurred to date by December 4, 2015. The parties will continue work on a joint stipulation and hope to resolve the lawsuit in its entirety by the end of 2015.The Court will hold a telephone conference with counsel to receive an update on the status of these efforts on December 18, 2015, at 8:30 a.m. Central Standard Time. Chambers will initiate the call. (KNK) (Entered: 12/01/2015)
2015-12-1720STIPULATION for Settlement by U.S. Department of the Interior. Jointly Signed by Public Record Media. (Fuller, David) (Entered: 12/17/2015)
2015-12-1721STIPULATION of Dismissal by U.S. Department of the Interior. Jointly Signed by Public Record Media. (Fuller, David) (Entered: 12/17/2015)
2015-12-1722DISMISSAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 12/17/2015. (SMD) (Entered: 12/17/2015)
2015-12-1723ORDER/NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF STATUS CONFERENCE: Pursuant to the Joint Stipulation of Settlement (ECF No. 20) and the Stipulation for Dismissal (ECF No. 21), the telephone status conference scheduled for December 18, 2015 at 8:30 a.m. has been cancelled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 12/17/2015. (KNK) (Entered: 12/17/2015)
2015-12-1724JUDGMENT (Attachments: # 1 Civil Notice - appeal)(AKL) (Entered: 12/17/2015)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff