Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleOLSEN v. US DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2014cv02143
Date Filed2014-12-17
Date Closed2015-09-21
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffKEN OLSEN
Case DescriptionKen Olsen, a journalist who writes about veterans affairs for the American Legion Magazine, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Veterans Affairs for records concerning the amounts of bonuses paid to VA executives from 2001-2014. The agency indicated that its records pertaining to executive bonuses went back only to 2009. Olsen filed an administrative appeal, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, he filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2014-12-171COMPLAINT against US DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-3939554) filed by KEN OLSEN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment to Complaint, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wolf, Douglas) (Entered: 12/17/2014)
2014-12-17Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (sth, ) (Entered: 12/18/2014)
2014-12-17SUMMONS Not Issued as to US DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (sth, ) (Entered: 12/18/2014)
2015-01-132REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE by KEN OLSEN filed by KEN OLSEN.(Wolf, Douglas) (Entered: 01/13/2015)
2015-01-143SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to US DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (jf, ) (Entered: 01/14/2015)
2015-02-234Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Interrante, John) (Entered: 02/23/2015)
2015-02-24MINUTE ORDER granting 4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's answer or other response is due on or before March 25, 2015. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/24/2015. (lcabj2) (Entered: 02/24/2015)
2015-02-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's answer or other response is now due by 3/25/2015. (jth) (Entered: 02/24/2015)
2015-03-255Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Interrante, John) (Entered: 03/25/2015)
2015-03-26MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall respond to the complaint on or before April 8, 2015. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 3/26/2015. (lcabj2) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
2015-03-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall respond to the complaint on or before 4/8/2015. (jth) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
2015-04-086Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Interrante, John) (Entered: 04/08/2015)
2015-04-09MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint on or before May 8, 2015, and it shall advise the Court by that same date of the status of its production of the remaining responsive information and include a schedule for rolling production moving forward. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/9/2015. (lcabj2) (Entered: 04/09/2015)
2015-04-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by 5/8/2015, and it shall advise the Court by that same date (5/8/2015) of the status of its production of the remaining responsive information and include a schedule for rolling production moving forward. (jth) (Entered: 04/09/2015)
2015-04-137MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Erik B. Ryberg, :Address- Post Office Box 541 Etna, CA 96027. Phone No. - (520) 7848665. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4054938. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by KEN OLSEN (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Wolf, Douglas) (Entered: 04/13/2015)
2015-04-15MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Motion for Leave of Erik B. Ryberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyer admitted, or at least one member of the lawyer's firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/15/15. (DMK) (Entered: 04/15/2015)
2015-05-088STATUS REPORT (Consent) by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Interrante, John) (Entered: 05/08/2015)
2015-05-089MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Interrante, John) (Entered: 05/08/2015)
2015-05-11MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before June 8, 2015. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/11/2015. (lcabj2) (Entered: 05/11/2015)
2015-05-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 6/8/2015. (zsm) (Entered: 05/11/2015)
2015-06-1510Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint and Status Report by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Interrante, John) (Entered: 06/15/2015)
2015-06-15MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. In light of 10 defendant's consent motion for an extension of time and the representations contained therein, it is ORDERED that defendant shall have until July 15, 2015 to answer the complaint in this case, and that by that date, the parties shall either file a stipulation of settlement and dismissal, or propose a schedule for further proceedings relating to plaintiff's fee demand. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/15/2015. (lcabj2) (Entered: 06/15/2015)
2015-06-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall have until 7/15/2015 to answer the complaint in this case, and that by that date, the parties shall either file a stipulation of settlement and dismissal, or propose a schedule for further proceedings relating to plaintiff's fee demand. (jth) (Entered: 06/15/2015)
2015-07-1511Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint and for parties to file stipulation of settlement and dismissal or schedule for further proceedings by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Interrante, John) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
2015-07-16MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. In light of 11 defendant's consent motion for an enlargement of time and the representations contained therein, it is ORDERED that defendant shall have until August 14, 2015 to answer the complaint in this case, and that by that date, the parties shall either file a stipulation of settlement and dismissal, or propose a schedule for further proceedings relating to plaintiff's fee demand. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/16/2015. (lcabj2) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
2015-07-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall have until 8/14/2015 to answer the complaint in this case, and that by that date, the parties shall either file a stipulation of settlement and dismissal, or propose a schedule for further proceedings relating to plaintiff's fee demand. (jth) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
2015-08-1412ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS.(Interrante, John) (Entered: 08/14/2015)
2015-08-17MINUTE ORDER. In light of 12 defendant's answer and the fact that the parties have not filed a stipulation of settlement and dismissal by the date set in the Court's Minute Order of July 16, 2015, it is ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and jointly propose a schedule for further proceedings relating to plaintiff's fee demand by August 21, 2015. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/17/2015. (lcabj2) (Entered: 08/17/2015)
2015-08-1713NOTICE of Settlement (Joint) by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (Interrante, John) (Entered: 08/17/2015)
2015-08-17MINUTE ORDER. In light of 13 the parties' joint notice of settlement, it is ORDERED that the deadline for a joint schedule set in the Court's Minute Order of August 17, 2015 is VACATED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall submit a stipulation of settlement and dismissal to the Court by September 16, 2015, or if the case has not been dismissed by that date, a joint report on the status of the settlement. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/17/2015. (lcabj2) (Entered: 08/17/2015)
2015-08-17Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties shall submit a stipulation of settlement and dismissal to the Court by 9/16/2015, or if the case has not been dismissed by that date, a joint report on the status of the settlement. (jth) (Entered: 08/17/2015)
2015-09-1614STIPULATION of Dismissal and Settlement (for Court approval) by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Interrante, John) (Entered: 09/16/2015)
2015-09-2115STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AND NOTICE OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/21/2015. (jth) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff