Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCORLEY v. HOLDER et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2014cv02157
Date Filed2014-12-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffROYCE CORLEY
Case DescriptionRoyce Corley submitted a FOIA request to the Justice Department for records concerning his conviction for sex trafficking. After hearing nothing further after six months, he filed an appeal. After hearing nothing further, Corley filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantERIC H. HOLDER, JR. Attorney General
DefendantPREET BHARARA United States Attorney
DefendantJAMES B. COMEY FBI Director
DefendantUNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [39]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2014-12-221COMPLAINT against PREET BHARARA, JAMES COMEY, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Filing fee $ 0.00) filed by ROY CORLEY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, ) (Entered: 12/23/2014)
2014-12-22SUMMONS (5) Issued as to PREET BHARARA, JAMES COMEY, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf, ) (Entered: 12/23/2014)
2014-12-222MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ROY CORLEY (jf, ) (Entered: 12/23/2014)
2014-12-223ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $25.61 from Prison Account of Royce Corley; further ordered, granting 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 12/19/2014. (see order for full detail) (jf, ) (Entered: 12/23/2014)
2014-12-224MOTION to Compel by ROY CORLEY (jf, ) (Entered: 12/23/2014)
2014-12-23NOTICE: 3 Order Was Mailed to DANBURY FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION and ROY CORLEY at court's address of record. (mac) (Entered: 12/23/2014)
2015-01-07SUMMONS (4) REISSUED as to PREET BHARARA, JAMES COMEY, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, and non-parties U.S. Attorney. (md, ) (Entered: 01/07/2015)
2015-01-125SUPPLEMENT to re 1 Complaint filed by ROYCE CORLEY. (jf, ) (Entered: 01/13/2015)
2015-02-206RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 02/13/2015. (jf, ) (Entered: 02/23/2015)
2015-03-097MOTION to Amend/Correct 3 Order Directing Prisoner Payment, by ROYCE CORLEY (jf, ) (Entered: 03/11/2015)
2015-04-01MINUTE ORDER denying 7 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Order assessing an initial partial filing fee pursuant to the Prison Litigation Reform Act ("PLRA"). The Court has no authority to reduce the amount assessed in accordance with the formula set out at 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b), which "calls for collection of the required monthly installments only if the amount in a prisoner's account exceeds $10." Pinson v. Samuels, 761 F.3d 1, 9 (D.C. Cir. 2014). Furthermore, the D.C. Circuit has concluded that the PLRA's fee requirements apply "on a per case basis." Id. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 4/1/15.(ah) (Entered: 04/01/2015)
2015-04-01NOTICE: Minute Order Filed on 4/1/15 mailed to ROYCE CORLEY at court's address of record. (mac) (Entered: 04/01/2015)
2015-04-068RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 02/13/2015. (jf, ) (Entered: 04/07/2015)
2015-04-079RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/25/2015. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/24/2015. (jf, ) (Entered: 04/08/2015)
2015-04-1410NOTICE of Appearance by Jodi T. George on behalf of All Defendants (George, Jodi) (Entered: 04/14/2015)
2015-04-2211MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (George, Jodi) (Entered: 04/22/2015)
2015-05-0712MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint and Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Vaughn Index by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR (George, Jodi) (Entered: 05/07/2015)
2015-05-0813RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JAMES COMEY served on 5/6/2015 (td, ) (Entered: 05/11/2015)
2015-05-1514Memorandum in opposition to re 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint and Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Vaughn Index filed by ROYCE CORLEY. (jf, ) (Entered: 05/18/2015)
2015-06-01MINUTE ORDER granting nunc pro tunc 11 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to respond to the complaint. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 6/1/15.(ah) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
2015-06-01MINUTE ORDER granting, over the plaintiff's objection, 12 Defendants' Motion for an Extension of Time to June 8, 2015, to respond to the complaint. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 6/1/15.(ah) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
2015-06-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 6/8/2015. (mac) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
2015-06-01NOTICE: Minute Orders Filed 6/1/15 mailed to ROYCE CORLEY at court's address of record. (mac) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
2015-06-0515Defendants' ANSWER to 1 Complaint by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(George, Jodi) (Entered: 06/05/2015)
2015-06-0516Memorandum in opposition to re 4 MOTION to Compel Vaughn Index filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(George, Jodi) (Entered: 06/05/2015)
2015-06-1517REPLY to opposition to re 4 MOTION to Compel filed by ROYCE CORLEY. (jf) (Entered: 06/17/2015)
2015-07-01MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of plaintiff's motion to compel a Vaughn index and defendants' opposition and proposed schedule, it is ORDERED that plaintiff's motion 4 is DENIED, and defendants' motion for summary judgment is due by July 17, 2015. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 7/1/15.(ah) (Entered: 07/01/2015)
2015-07-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 7/17/2015. (mac) (Entered: 07/01/2015)
2015-07-01NOTICE: Minute Order Filed 7/1/15 mailed to ROYCE CORLEY at court's address of record. (mac) (Entered: 07/01/2015)
2015-07-1718MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration Hardy, # 3 Declaration Sassok, # 4 Declaration Stone, # 5 Declaration Hodge, # 6 Statement of Facts)(George, Jodi) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
2015-07-2019Order advising the plaintiff to respond by August 31, 2015, to the defendant's motion for summary judgment or risk entry of judgment for the defendants on what will be treated as a conceded motion (see attached order for details). Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 7/20/15.(ah) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
2015-07-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff Response due by 8/31/2015 (mac) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
2015-07-22NOTICE: 19 Order mailed to ROYCE CORLEY at court's address of record. (mac) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
2015-08-2420Memorandum in opposition to re 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ROYCE CORLEY. (jf) (Entered: 08/25/2015)
2015-08-2421MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, MOTION for Leave to Discovery by ROYCE CORLEY (jf) . (Entered: 08/25/2015)
2015-08-3122MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, Plaintiff's Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, and Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Discovery by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (George, Jodi) (Entered: 08/31/2015)
2015-09-02MINUTE ORDER granting 22 Defendants' Motion for an Extension of Time to October 2, 2015, to file reply and opposition to plaintiff's motion. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/2/15.(ah) (Entered: 09/02/2015)
2015-09-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Reply due by 10/2/2015. (mac) (Entered: 09/02/2015)
2015-09-02NOTICE: Minute Order Filed on 9/2/2015 mailed to ROYCE CORLEY at courts' address of record. (mac) (Entered: 09/02/2015)
2015-09-2123NOTICE by ROYCE CORLEY (jf) (Entered: 09/25/2015)
2015-10-0224REPLY to opposition to motion re 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration David Hardy)(George, Jodi) (Entered: 10/02/2015)
2015-10-0225Memorandum in opposition to re 21 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment MOTION for Leave to Discovery filed by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration David Hardy)(George, Jodi) (Entered: 10/02/2015)
2015-10-0226NOTICE of Errata by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR re 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Errata declaration with exhibits and MSJ)(George, Jodi) (Entered: 10/02/2015)
2015-12-1127EXHIBIT 10 by ROYCE CORLEY. (jf) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
2015-12-2928NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Britney Berry on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney JODI GEORGE (Berry, Britney) (Entered: 12/29/2015)
2016-03-3029MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 18 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 21 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and for Leave to Take Discovery; directing Defendant to supplement the record by May 23, 2016, and to promptly file the FBI's Bates-numbered documents (see written opinion and order for details). Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/30/16.(ah) (Entered: 03/30/2016)
2016-03-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant to Supplement Record due by 5/23/2016. (mac) (Entered: 03/31/2016)
2016-04-1230EXHIBIT 11 by ROYCE CORLEY. "Leave to file GRANTED" signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 04/11/2016 (jf) (Entered: 04/12/2016)
2016-04-1331NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia K. McBride on behalf of All Defendants (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 04/13/2016)
2016-05-2332Vaughn Index EOUSA from DOJ. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Supplemental Vaughn, # 2 Appendix Bates pages)(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 05/23/2016)
2016-06-1633NOTICE by ROYCE CORLEY "Let this be filed as Notice" by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan (zrdj) (Entered: 06/17/2016)
2016-07-2234NOTICE by ROYCE CORLEY. "Let this be filed as a Notice" signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 07/21/2016 (jf) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
2016-08-0835Second MOTION for Summary Judgment by PREET BHARARA, JAMES B. COMEY, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Supplemental Stone Declaration)(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 08/08/2016)
2016-08-1136Order advising plaintiff to respond by September 26, 2016, to Defendants' Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment or risk entry of judgment for the defendants on what will be treated as a conceded motion (see written order for details). Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/11/16.(ah) (Entered: 08/11/2016)
2016-08-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff Response to Defendants' Renewed Motion For Summary Judgment due by 9/26/2016 (mac) (Entered: 08/11/2016)
2016-09-2937Memorandum in opposition to re 35 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ROYCE CORLEY. (jf) (Entered: 10/03/2016)
2016-09-2938MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, MOTION for Leave to Take Discovery by ROYCE CORLEY (jf) (Entered: 10/03/2016)
2017-03-30Minute Order staying case pending resolution of 35 Second Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/30/2017. (lcegs1) (Entered: 03/30/2017)
2017-03-30Case Stayed (mac) (Entered: 03/30/2017)
2017-11-1639MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER lifting stay; granting in part and denying in part 35 Defendant's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 38 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and for Discovery; directing Defendant to supplement the record by December 29, 2017 (see written opinion and order for details). Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 11/16/17.(ah) Modified event title on 11/17/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 11/16/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff