Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEOPOLD et al v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2014cv02198
Date Filed2014-12-24
Date Closed2016-05-02
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffJASON LEOPOLD
PlaintiffRYAN NOAH SHAPIRO
Case DescriptionJournalist Jason Leopold and researcher Ryan Shapiro submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning the investigation of allegations that the CIA had hacked into computers of the Senate Intelligence Committee. They asked for expedited processing and a fee waiver. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Leopold and Shapiro filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Public Interest Fee Waiver

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2014-12-241COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-3946801) filed by JASON LEOPOLD, RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons DOJ, # 3 Summons USAO)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/24/2014)
2014-12-242NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by JASON LEOPOLD, RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. Case related to Case No. 1:14-cv-1056(JEB). (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/24/2014)
2014-12-24Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (rd) (Entered: 12/29/2014)
2014-12-293SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form, # 2 Notice of Consent)(rd) (Entered: 12/29/2014)
2015-02-074RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/29/2015. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/28/2015.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/29/2015. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/07/2015)
2015-03-025ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Mei, Vesper) (Entered: 03/02/2015)
2015-03-02MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a proposed briefing schedule by March 11, 2015. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/2/14. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 03/02/2015)
2015-03-03Set/Reset Deadline: The parties shall meet, confer, and submit a proposed briefing schedule by 3/11/2015. (ad) (Entered: 03/03/2015)
2015-03-116Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Proposed Briefing Schedule by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mei, Vesper) (Entered: 03/11/2015)
2015-03-11MINUTE ORDER granting the parties' Joint 6 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court ORDERS that they shall submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before April 8, 2015. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/11/15. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 03/11/2015)
2015-03-11Set/Reset Deadline: The parties' shall submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before 4/8/2015. (ad) (Entered: 03/11/2015)
2015-04-087STATUS REPORT (Joint) by JASON LEOPOLD, RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/08/2015)
2015-04-09MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that a status conference shall be held on April 23, 2015, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 19. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/9/15. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 04/09/2015)
2015-04-09Set/Reset Hearing: A Status Conference is set for 4/23/2015, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 19, before Judge James E. Boasberg. (ad) (Entered: 04/09/2015)
2015-04-23MINUTE ORDER: As discussed at today's status conference, the following schedule shall govern further proceedings: 1) Defendant shall release any non-exempt information on or before January 29, 2016; 2) Defendant's opening brief shall be filed on or before March 11, 2016; 3) Plaintiffs' Opposition shall be filed on or before April 8, 2016; and 4) Defendant's Reply shall be filed on or before April 29, 2016. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/23/15. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 04/23/2015)
2015-04-23Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James E. Boasberg: Status Conference held on 4/23/2015. (Defendant shall release any non-exempt information on or before 1/29/2016; Defendant's opening brief shall be filed on or before 3/11/2016; Plaintiffs' Opposition shall be filed on or before 4/8/2016; and Defendant's Reply shall be filed on or before 4/29/2016. (Court Reporter Lisa Griffith). (kt) (Entered: 04/23/2015)
2015-06-308NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Amy E. Powell on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Vesper Mei (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
2016-01-279Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Processing of Documents by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 01/27/2016)
2016-01-27MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The Court ORDERS that Defendant shall complete production of responsive, nonexempt information subject to FOIA by no later than February 16, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 01/27/2016. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 01/27/2016)
2016-01-27Set/Reset Deadline: The Defendant shall complete production of responsive, nonexempt information subject to FOIA by no later than 2/16/2017. (ad) (Entered: 01/27/2016)
2016-02-1610Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Processing and Move for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 02/16/2016)
2016-02-16MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: 1) Defendant's unopposed 10 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED; 2) Defendant shall complete production of responsive, nonexempt information subject to FOIA on or before March 7, 2016; and 3) Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment on or before March 25, 2016. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/16/16. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 02/16/2016)
2016-02-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall complete production of responsive, nonexempt information subject to FOIA on or before 3/07/2016; and Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment on or before 3/25/2016. (ad) (Entered: 02/16/2016)
2016-03-1811Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Move for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 03/18/2016)
2016-03-21MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 11 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court ORDERS that Defendant shall file its Motion for Summary Judgment by no later than April 1, 2016. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 03/21/2016. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 03/21/2016)
2016-03-21Set/Reset Deadline: Defendant shall file its Motion for Summary Judgment by no later than 4/1/2016. (ad) (Entered: 03/21/2016)
2016-03-3112Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Move for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 03/31/2016)
2016-03-31MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court ORDERS that Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment by no later than April 6, 2016, and Plaintiffs shale file their Opposition by no later than April 27, 2016. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 03/31/2016. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 03/31/2016)
2016-03-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment by no later than 4/06/2016, and Plaintiffs shale file their Opposition by no later than 4/27/2016. (ad) (Entered: 03/31/2016)
2016-04-0613MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of V. Brinkmann and exhibits, # 2 Declaration of A. Shiner, # 3 Exhibits to Shiner Declaration, # 4 Declaration of P. Sprung, # 5 Exhibits to Sprung Declaration, # 6 Declaration of K. Kedian, # 7 Exhibits to Kedian Declaration, # 8 Declaration of D. Hardy)(Powell, Amy) (Entered: 04/07/2016)
2016-04-2714NOTICE by JASON LEOPOLD, RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO re 13 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/27/2016)
2016-04-28MINUTE ORDER: In light of Plaintiffs' 14 Notice, the Court ORDERS that by May 2, 2016, Plaintiffs shall file a further Notice with the Court indicating whether they (a) do not oppose Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment or (b) do oppose such Motion but do not intend to file an Opposition. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 04/28/2016. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 04/28/2016)
2016-04-28Set/Reset Deadline: By 5/02/2016, Plaintiffs shall file a further Notice with the Court indicating whether they (a) do not oppose Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment or (b) do oppose such Motion but do not intend to file an Opposition. (ad) (Entered: 04/28/2016)
2016-04-2915NOTICE by JASON LEOPOLD, RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO re Order, (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/29/2016)
2016-05-02MINUTE ORDER: Given Plaintiffs' 15 Notice that they do not oppose Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, the Court ORDERS that Defendant's 13 Motion is GRANTED, and Judgment is ENTERED in favor of Defendant. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 05/02/2016. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 05/02/2016)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff