Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEOPOLD v. DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2015cv00001
Date Filed2015-01-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffJASON LEOPOLD
Case DescriptionJournalist Jason Leopold submitted a FOIA request to the Office of Assets Control at the Department of Treasury for the first 25 pages of each license application since 2013 for a number of countries. He also requested a fee waiver. OFAC contacted Leopold and asked him to narrow the request to cover only North Korea, Iran, Yemen, Somalia and Syria and to further narrow the request as it pertained to Iran. Leopold agreed to narrow his request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, he filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF TREASURY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2015-01-011COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-3950934) filed by JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Attorney General, # 3 Summons US Attorney's Office, # 4 Summons Department of Treasury)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/01/2015)
2015-01-01Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (sth, ) (Entered: 01/05/2015)
2015-01-052SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(sth, ) (Entered: 01/05/2015)
2015-02-073RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/29/2015. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/28/2015.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/29/2015. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/07/2015)
2015-02-234RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY served on 2/19/2015 (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/23/2015)
2015-02-275ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Carmichael, Andrew) (Entered: 02/27/2015)
2015-03-07MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule should address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues and that contains a proposed schedule and order not later than 3/18/15. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/7/15. (DJS) Modified on 3/9/2015 (sm). (Entered: 03/07/2015)
2015-03-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 3/18/2015. (sm) (Entered: 03/09/2015)
2015-03-186STATUS REPORT (Joint) by DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carmichael, Andrew) (Entered: 03/18/2015)
2015-03-19MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 6 Joint Status Report, the parties must abide by the following schedule: Defendant must make its next production of documents by April 4, 2015 and make rolling productions every 45 days thereafter. Defendant must send out an average of at least 15 submitter notices regarding confidential business information per week for the period covered by each status report. The parties must file a joint status report every 90 (ninety) days. Within 28 days of the final production, the parties must file a joint status report explaining the status of the case and proposing a schedule to move forward. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/19/2015. (lctsc2) (Entered: 03/19/2015)
2015-06-177STATUS REPORT (Joint) by DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY. (Carmichael, Andrew) (Entered: 06/17/2015)
2015-09-158Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY. (Carmichael, Andrew) (Entered: 09/15/2015)
2015-09-169Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY. (Carmichael, Andrew) (Entered: 09/16/2015)
2015-12-1410Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY. (Carmichael, Andrew) (Entered: 12/14/2015)
2016-03-1411Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY. (Carmichael, Andrew) (Entered: 03/14/2016)
2016-06-1312Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY. (Carmichael, Andrew) (Entered: 06/13/2016)
2016-09-1213Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY. (Carmichael, Andrew) (Entered: 09/12/2016)
2016-12-1314Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY. (Carmichael, Andrew) (Entered: 12/13/2016)
2017-03-1315Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY. (Carmichael, Andrew) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff