Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLos Angeles Times Communications LLC et al v. United States Department of Defense
DistrictCentral District of California
CityWestern Division - Los Angeles
Case Number2:2015cv00319
Date Filed2015-01-15
Date Closed2015-07-17
JudgeJudge Dean D. Pregerson
PlaintiffLos Angeles Times Communications LLC
PlaintiffDavid Willman
Case DescriptionLos Angeles Times Reporter David Willman submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Defense Missile Defense Agency for records concerning incentives or bonuses paid to large defense contractors working on the Ground-based Midcourse Defense System between 2001 and 2014. DOD denied the request under Exemption 4 (confidential business information). Willman appealed, arguing DOD had released similar information in the past. The agency was unable to tell Willman when it would complete his appeal. He subsequently filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantUnited States Department of Defense
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Opinion/Order [24]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2015-01-151COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-15060164 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Los Angeles Times Communications LLC, David Willman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B to Complaint, # 3 Exhibit C to Complaint, # 4 Exhibit D to Complaint, # 5 Exhibit E to Complaint, # 6 Exhibit F to Complaint) (Attorney Karl Olson added to party Los Angeles Times Communications LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Karl Olson added to party David Willman(pty:pla))(Olson, Karl) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
2015-01-152CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Los Angeles Times Communications LLC, David Willman. (Olson, Karl) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
2015-01-153NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (et) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
2015-01-154NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
2015-01-155NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (et) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
2015-01-156NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Los Angeles Times Communications LLC, David Willman, (Olson, Karl) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
2015-01-157AMENDED NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Los Angeles Times Communications LLC, David Willman, identifying Oaktree Tribune L.P.. (Olson, Karl) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
2015-01-168Notice of Electronic Filing re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) 4 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties 7 , Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening 5 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties 6 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) 3 e-mailed to Attorney Susan S Brown at sbrown@rocklaw.cal.com bounced due to typo in email address. Primary e-mail address corrected. Notice of Electronic Filing resent addressed to sbrown@rocklawcal.com. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ir) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/16/2015)
2015-01-209MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Counsel are referred to the courts website for additional information. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC FILING REQUIREMENTS AND INSTRUCTIONS) (jc) (Entered: 01/23/2015)
2015-01-2710Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Plaintiffs Los Angeles Times Communications LLC, David Willman. (Olson, Karl) (Entered: 01/27/2015)
2015-01-291160 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 as to Defendant United States Department of Defense. (shb) (Entered: 01/29/2015)
2015-01-2912ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Scheduling Conference as follows: April 20, 2015 at 3:30 p.m. The parties are reminded of their obligations to disclose information and confer on a discovery plan not later than twenty-one (21) days prior to the scheduling conference and file a report with the Court entitled "Rule 26(f) Report", not later than fourteen (14) days after they confer as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Failure to comply may lead to the imposition of sanctions. (lom) (Entered: 01/29/2015)
2015-03-0513PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Los Angeles Times Communications LLC, David Willman, upon Defendant United States Department of Defense served on 1/29/2015, answer due 2/28/2015. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Genoveva Ortega. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Unknown. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Judith C. Gibson. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons returned. (Olson, Karl) (Entered: 03/05/2015)
2015-03-2614STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to United States Department of Defense answer now due 4/17/2015, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by DEFENDANT United States Department of Defense.(Attorney Ruth M Kwon added to party United States Department of Defense(pty:dft))(Kwon, Ruth) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
2015-04-0915JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Defendant United States Department of Defense.. (Kwon, Ruth) (Entered: 04/09/2015)
2015-04-1616MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dean D. Pregerson:COUNSEL ARE NOTIFIED, on the Court's own motion, the SCHEDULING CONFERENCE shall be heard on the original date of April 20, 2015 at the new time of 1:30 p.m. (lc) (Entered: 04/16/2015)
2015-04-1717ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by DEFENDANT United States Department of Defense.(Kwon, Ruth) (Entered: 04/17/2015)
2015-04-2018MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE RE: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge Dean D. Pregerson: The Court sets June 12, 2015 as the last day to file Cross Motions with Cross Oppositions due not later that June 26, 2015. The Court continues the SCHEDULING CONFERENCE to August 17, 2015 at 3:30 p.m.Court Reporter: none. (lc) (Entered: 04/22/2015)
2015-06-0119Joint STIPULATION for Settlement filed by DEFENDANT United States Department of Defense.(Kwon, Ruth) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
2015-06-0120STIPULATION to Continue Deadlines and Scheduling Conference Re: Stipulation for Settlement 19 filed by DEFENDANT United States Department of Defense. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kwon, Ruth) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
2015-06-0421ORDER GRANTING 90-DAY CONTINUANCE RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT 20 by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: The deadlines in this matter are continued for 90 days. The deadline for parties to file Cross Motions is now September 10, 2015, with Cross Oppositions due no later than September 24, 2015. The August 17, 2015 Scheduling Conference is vacated. (lc) (Entered: 06/04/2015)
2015-07-1622NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs Los Angeles Times Communications LLC, David Willman. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Olson, Karl) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
2015-07-1723Receipt of FULL SATISFACTION OF SETTLEMENT AMOUNTfiled by Defendant United States Department of Defense. (Kwon, Ruth) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
2015-07-1724ORDER DISMISSING CASE by Judge Dean D. Pregerson, re Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Action (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1)) 22 . THE COURT having been notified of settlement of this matter by counsel, THE COURT ORDERS that this action be, and hereby is, dismissed with prejudice. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (shb) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff