Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBAGWELL v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2015cv00531
Date Filed2015-04-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffRYAN BAGWELL
Case DescriptionRyan Bagwell, who runs the Penn State Sunshine Fund, submitted a request to the Executive Office for U.S. Attorneys at the Justice Department for records concerning the investigation of child abuse allegations at Penn State University. EOUSA denied Bagwell's request based on Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy) and Exemption 7(C) (invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records). Bagwell appealed EOUSA's decision to the Office of Information Policy. OIP remanded the request to EOUSA with instructions to process it. Bagwell contacted EOUSA on a number of occasions, but after receiving no further substantive response to his request, Bagwell filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Recovery of Costs

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [21]
Opinion/Order [71]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2015-04-081COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616069432) filed by RYAN BAGWELL. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(td, ) (Entered: 04/13/2015)
2015-04-08SUMMONS (3) Issued as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (td, ) (Entered: 04/13/2015)
2015-04-082MOTION for CM/ECF Password by RYAN BAGWELL (td, ) (Entered: 04/13/2015)
2015-04-14MINUTE ORDER granting 2 Motion for CM/ECF Password. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/14/2015. (tcr) (Entered: 04/14/2015)
2015-04-273RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/27/15., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/27/2015. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/27/2015.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 4/27/2015 (BAGWELL, RYAN) (Entered: 04/27/2015)
2015-05-154NOTICE of Appearance by Rhonda Lisa Campbell on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
2015-05-265Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 05/26/2015)
2015-05-29MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before June 28, 2015. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/29/2015. (lccrc1, ) (Entered: 05/29/2015)
2015-06-296ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
2015-06-30MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by July 14, 2015. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/30/2015. (lccrc1, ) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
2015-07-137Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule by RYAN BAGWELL (BAGWELL, RYAN) (Entered: 07/13/2015)
2015-07-15MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule; Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment on or before August 28, 2015. Plaintiff shall file his opposition/cross motion for summary judgment on or before October 13, 2015. Defendant shall file its opposition/reply brief on or before November 13, 2015. Plaintiff shall file his reply brief on or before December 13, 2015. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 7/15/2015. (tcr) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
2015-07-258NOTICE of Change of Address by RYAN BAGWELL (BAGWELL, RYAN) (Entered: 07/25/2015)
2015-08-139MOTION to Compel Creation of a Vaughn Index by RYAN BAGWELL (BAGWELL, RYAN) (Entered: 08/13/2015)
2015-08-1410NOTICE to the Court by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE re 9 MOTION to Compel Creation of a Vaughn Index (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 08/14/2015)
2015-08-1611REPLY to opposition to motion re 9 MOTION to Compel Creation of a Vaughn Index filed by RYAN BAGWELL. (BAGWELL, RYAN) (Entered: 08/16/2015)
2015-08-17MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff's 9 motion to compel the Department of Justice to produce a Vaughn index within ten days is hereby DENIED as premature.. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/17/2015. (tcr) (Entered: 08/17/2015)
2015-08-2812MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Declaration Jodi Matuszwski, # 4 Declaration Princina Stone, # 5 Exhibit Vaughn Index (Exhibit No. 1))(Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
2015-10-1313Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Response in Opposition to Def.'s Motion for Summary Judgment by RYAN BAGWELL (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Def. Motion for Summary Judgment and in support of Plaintiff's Cross-motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 2 Statement of Facts Plaintiff's Statement of Disputed Facts, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Plaintiff's Proposed Order, # 4 Exhibit Ex. A, # 5 Exhibit Ex. B, # 6 Exhibit Ex. C - USAO Subpoena, # 7 Exhibit Ex. D, # 8 Exhibit Ex. E - Remarks of Louis J. Freeh, # 9 Exhibit Ex. F - Request Letter, # 10 Exhibit Ex. G - Denial Letter, # 11 Exhibit Ex. H - Administrative Appeal Determination, # 12 Exhibit Ex. I - Declaration of Ryan Bagwell, # 13 Exhibit Ex. J - Partial Denial Letter)(BAGWELL, RYAN) (Entered: 10/13/2015)
2015-10-1314Memorandum in opposition to re 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by RYAN BAGWELL; (See docket entry no. 13 to view document) (td) (Entered: 10/14/2015)
2015-10-2315REPLY to opposition to motion re 12 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Response in Opposition to Def.'s Motion for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Campbell, Rhonda) Modified to add correct linkage on 10/26/2015 (td). (Entered: 10/23/2015)
2015-10-2616REPLY re 15 Reply to opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by RYAN BAGWELL. (BAGWELL, RYAN) (Entered: 10/26/2015)
2015-12-03MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that a telephonic motions hearing is set for Thursday, December 17, 2015 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Christopher R. Cooper. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/3/2015. (tcr) (Entered: 12/03/2015)
2015-12-17Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Christopher R. Cooper: Motion Hearing held on 12/17/2015 re Plaintiff's 13 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment,Defendant's 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment; Argument heard and this matter is taken under advisement (Court Reporter Lisa Moreira) (tcr) (Entered: 12/17/2015)
2015-12-1817MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 12 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and 13 Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/18/2015. (lccrc3) (Entered: 12/18/2015)
2016-01-2918MOTION to Continue Proceedings and Status Report by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 01/29/2016)
2016-02-03MINUTE ORDER: A Telephonic Status Conference is set for Thursday, February 11,2016 at 2:30 PM in chambers of Judge Christopher R. Cooper. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 2/3/2016. (tcr) (Entered: 02/03/2016)
2016-02-03Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 2/11/2016 at 2:30 PM in Chambers before Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (tcr) (Entered: 02/03/2016)
2016-02-11MINUTE ORDER granting in part 18 Defendant's Motion to Continue: It is hereby ORDERED that, no later than February 29, 2016, Defendant file a status report advising the Court of the progress of Defendant's search and review as well as the result of any conferral with Plaintiff. It is FURTHER ORDERED that, no later than February 29, 2016, Defendant submit a revised Vaughn Index as to the withholding of the 104 pages of records discussed in 12 , 13 the parties' motions for summary judgment, following the standard described in 17 the Court's Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 2/11/16. (lccrc3) (Entered: 02/11/2016)
2016-02-11Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Christopher R. Cooper: Telephonic Status Conference held and concluded on 2/11/2016. Court to issue order accordingly. (Court Reporter Lisa Moreira) (tcr) (Entered: 02/12/2016)
2016-02-2919MOTION to Stay re Order on Motion to Continue,, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit No. 1 (Supplemental Vaughn Index))(Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 02/29/2016)
2016-03-0120NOTICE of Change of Address by RYAN BAGWELL (BAGWELL, RYAN) (Entered: 03/01/2016)
2016-03-0321ORDER granting in part and denying without prejudice in part 12 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 13 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 19 Defendant's Motion to Stay; and setting a schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 3/3/2016. (lccrc3) (Entered: 03/03/2016)
2016-03-0822MOTION for Reconsideration re 21 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Stay,,, and Response to Defendant's Status Report by RYAN BAGWELL (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(BAGWELL, RYAN) (Entered: 03/08/2016)
2016-03-0823RESPONSE defendant's Status Report re 19 MOTION to Stay re Order on Motion to Continue,, filed by RYAN BAGWELL; (See docket Entry No. 22 to view document.) (td) (Entered: 03/08/2016)
2016-03-3124Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 03/31/2016)
2016-03-3125Supplemental STATUS REPORT by RYAN BAGWELL. (BAGWELL, RYAN) (Entered: 03/31/2016)
2016-04-0126ORDER denying 22 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/1/2016. (lccrc3) (Entered: 04/01/2016)
2016-05-3127Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 05/31/2016)
2016-05-3128First MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Pleading by RYAN BAGWELL (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - fee-waiver request, # 2 Exhibit B - EOUSA fee-demand letter, # 3 Exhibit C - first administrative appeal, # 4 Exhibit D - EOUSA denial of first fee-waiver request, # 5 Exhibit E - OIP response to first administrative appeal, # 6 Exhibit F - second fee-waiver request, # 7 Exhibit G - second fee-waiver denial, # 8 Exhibit H - second fee-waiver appeal)(BAGWELL, RYAN) (Entered: 05/31/2016)
2016-06-1629MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 28 First MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Pleading by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 06/16/2016)
2016-06-1630RESPONSE re 29 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 28 First MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Pleading filed by RYAN BAGWELL. (BAGWELL, RYAN) (Entered: 06/16/2016)
2016-06-17MINUTE ORDER granting 29 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant file any response to 28 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File no later than June 22, 2016. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/17/2016. (lccrc3) (Entered: 06/17/2016)
2016-06-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant to file any response to 28 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File no later than 6/22/2016. (kt) (Entered: 06/17/2016)
2016-06-2131MOTION for Order holding Defendant in Contempt of Court by RYAN BAGWELL (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(BAGWELL, RYAN) (Entered: 06/21/2016)
2016-06-2232RESPONSE re 28 First MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Pleading filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 06/22/2016)
2016-06-2433REPLY to opposition to motion re 28 First MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Pleading with exhibit filed by RYAN BAGWELL. (BAGWELL, RYAN) (Entered: 06/24/2016)
2016-08-0134Joint STATUS REPORT by RYAN BAGWELL. (BAGWELL, RYAN) (Entered: 08/01/2016)
2016-09-2035MOTION for Hearing (telephonic status conference) by RYAN BAGWELL (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Fee Demand Letter))(BAGWELL, RYAN) (Entered: 09/20/2016)
2016-09-23MINUTE ORDER granting 35 Motion for Hearing: A Hearing on all outstanding Motions is hereby set for October 6, 2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 27A. Plaintiff may appear via telephone. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 9/23/2016. (lccrc1) (Entered: 09/23/2016)
2016-09-23Set/Reset Hearings: Motions Hearing set for 10/6/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zlsj) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
2016-10-06MINUTE ORDER: Hearing held on pending motions before Judge Christopher R. Cooper on October 6, 2016. Plaintiff's Motion 28 for Leave to File Supplemental Pleading taken under advisement. Defendant is hereby ORDERED to file a Notice no later than October 13, 2016 indicating whether Defendant still intends to charge Plaintiff fees to process his request. Plaintiff's Motion 31 for Order Holding Defendant in Contempt of Court is hereby DENIED. Court Reporter Lisa Moreira. (zlsj) (Entered: 10/06/2016)
2016-10-1336NOTICE to the Court by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE re Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion for Order, Motion Hearing, Set Deadlines,,,, (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 10/13/2016)
2016-10-1437NOTICE of response to Defendant's Notice of Oct. 13, 2016 by RYAN BAGWELL (BAGWELL, RYAN) (Entered: 10/14/2016)
2016-10-19MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 28 Motion for Leave to File: In light of 36 Defendant's Notice that it will grant Plaintiff's request for a fee waiver, Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Pleadings is hereby DENIED AS MOOT without prejudice. In the event that the Defendant seeks to assess duplication fees, Mr. Bagwell may renew his motion. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall confer and file a joint proposed production schedule, including any objections and counter-proposals, no later than October 26, 2016. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/19/2016. (lccrc1) (Entered: 10/19/2016)
2016-10-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Discovery due by 10/26/2016. (zlsj) (Entered: 10/19/2016)
2016-10-2638Joint STATUS REPORT proposing a production schedule by RYAN BAGWELL. (BAGWELL, RYAN) (Entered: 10/26/2016)
2016-10-27MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 38 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant complete the production of all responsive, non-exempt records no later than May 1, 2017, absent leave of the Court. Defendant shall produce records on a monthly, rolling basis, beginning November 30, 2016. It is further ORDERED that the parties jointly file a further status report every 60 days, beginning December 30, 2016. It is further ORDERED that Defendant locate, review, and produce all responsive, non-exempt emails between Defendant and employees of Freeh, Sporkin & Sullivan, identified by e-mail addresses that contain "freehgroup.com," no later than November 30, 2016, unless good cause is shown why that production schedule is not feasible. The parties are encouraged to work together to narrow the scope of the review to the extent possible. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/27/2016. (lccrc1) (Entered: 10/27/2016)
2016-10-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Initial Disclosure due by 11/30/2016. Simplification of Issues due by 11/30/2016. Status Report due by 3/1/2017 Discovery due by 5/1/2017. (zlsj) (Entered: 10/27/2016)
2016-12-3039STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 12/30/2016)
2017-03-2840Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Report by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 03/28/2017)
2017-03-30MINUTE ORDER granting 40 Motion for Extension of Time: The parties shall file a joint status report no later than April 4, 2017. However, the parties are advised that, in accordance with the Court's October 27, 2016 Minute Order, joint status reports were to be filed every sixty days, beginning December 30, 2016. Accordingly, the previous deadline for the second status report was February 28, 2017, not March 31, 2017 as indicated in the Government's motion. Furthermore, as previously ordered, Defendant shall complete the production of all responsive, non-exempt records no later than May 1, 2017, and a third joint status report should also be filed on that date. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 3/30/2017. (lccrc1) (Entered: 03/30/2017)
2017-03-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/4/2017. Third Status Report due by 5/1/2017. (mac) (Entered: 03/30/2017)
2017-03-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/4/2017. Defendant shall complete the production of all responsive, non-exempt records no later than 5/1/2017, and a third Joint Status Report should also be filed on that date. (nbn) (Entered: 03/30/2017)
2017-04-0441Joint STATUS REPORT by RYAN BAGWELL. (BAGWELL, RYAN) (Entered: 04/04/2017)
2017-05-0142Joint STATUS REPORT by RYAN BAGWELL. (BAGWELL, RYAN) (Entered: 05/01/2017)
2017-05-0243NOTICE to the Court by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE re 42 Status Report (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 05/02/2017)
2017-05-0244MOTION for Briefing Schedule by RYAN BAGWELL (BAGWELL, RYAN) (Entered: 05/02/2017)
2017-05-0245RESPONSE re 44 MOTION for Briefing Schedule filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 05/02/2017)
2017-05-15VACATED PURSUANT TO ORDER FILED 7/19/2017.....MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that this case shall proceed according to the following schedule: Defendant shall submit a Declaration and Vaughn Index no later than June 30, 2017; Defendant shall file any motion for summary judgment no later than July 17, 2017; Plaintiff shall file any opposition or cross-motion for summary judgment no later than September 1, 2017; Defendant shall file a reply no later than October 1, 2017; Plaintiff shall file a reply no later than November 1, 2017. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/15/2017. (lccrc1) Modified on 7/20/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 05/15/2017)
2017-05-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Declaration and Vaughn Index due by 6/30/2017. Summary Judgment motions due by 7/17/2017. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/1/2017. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/1/2017. Plaintiff's Replies due by 11/1/2017. (lsj) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
2017-06-1646MOTION to Stay re Order on Motion for Briefing Schedule,, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration D. Brian Simpson, # 2 Declaration Princina Stone)(Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
2017-06-2247RESPONSE re 46 MOTION to Stay re Order on Motion for Briefing Schedule,, and Cross Motion for a Modified Briefing Schedule filed by RYAN BAGWELL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(BAGWELL, RYAN) (Entered: 06/22/2017)
2017-06-2248Cross MOTION for Modified Briefing Schedule by RYAN BAGWELL (td); (See docket entry no. 47 to view.) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
2017-06-2849MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Reply to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time and Cross Motion for a Modified Briefing Schedule by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 06/28/2017)
2017-07-06MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a telephonic status conference, regarding Defendant's 46 Motion to Stay and Plaintiff's 48 Cross-Motion for Modified Briefing Schedule, on July 17, 2017, at 10:00 AM. The Courtroom Deputy will be in touch with call-in information. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 7/6/2017. (lccrc1) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
2017-07-07Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 7/17/2017 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (lsj) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
2017-07-14MINUTE ORDER: The telephonic status conference currently scheduled for July 17, 2017, at 10:00 AM is hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 7/14/2017. (lccrc1) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
2017-07-17Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for re Defendant's 46 Motion to Stay and Plaintiff's 48 Cross-Motion for Modified Briefing Schedule on 7/18/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (lsj) (Entered: 07/17/2017)
2017-07-18Minute Entry for Telephone Conference held before Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 7/18/2017. Forthcoming Order. Court Reporter Lisa Moreira. (lsj) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
2017-07-1950ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the current briefing schedule in this case is VACATED, and that the case shall proceed according to the schedule set out in the accompanying Order. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff and Defendant are to meet and confer, and to file either joint or separate proposed schedules for the processing no later than August 1, 2017. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 7/19/2017. (lccrc1) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
2017-07-3151Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Production Schedules by RYAN BAGWELL (BAGWELL, RYAN) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
2017-08-02MINUTE ORDER granting 51 Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file either joint or separate proposed schedules for processing no later than August 15, 2017. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/2/2017. (lccrc1) (Entered: 08/02/2017)
2017-08-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Processing Schedule due by 8/15/2017 (lsj) (Entered: 08/02/2017)
2017-08-1552Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Production Schedule by RYAN BAGWELL (BAGWELL, RYAN) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
2017-08-1553MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
2017-08-1554NOTICE to the Court by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE re 50 Order on Motion to Stay,, Order on Motion to Modify,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to, (Attachments: # 1 Declaration B.Simpson (Supplemental), # 2 Exhibit 2 Letter from PA Office of Attorney General, # 3 Exhibit USAO-EDPA Vaughn Index, # 4 Declaration Stone (Supplemental), # 5 Exhibit EOUSA Vaughn Index)(Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
2017-08-1555SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3, # 2 Exhibit 4, # 3 Exhibit 5, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
2017-08-15MINUTE ORDER granting 53 Defendant's Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/15/2017. (lccrc1) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
2017-08-15MINUTE ORDER granting 52 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Production Schedules. The proposed schedules are due on or before September 1, 2017. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/15/2017. (lccrc1) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
2017-08-2456RESPONSE re 55 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) filed by RYAN BAGWELL. (BAGWELL, RYAN) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
2017-08-2957MOTION for Summary Judgment Renewed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 08/29/2017)
2017-09-0558STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 09/05/2017)
2017-09-0559STATUS REPORT and Proposed Production Schedule by RYAN BAGWELL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Plf letter regarding search terms))(BAGWELL, RYAN) (Entered: 09/05/2017)
2017-09-2560Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by RYAN BAGWELL (BAGWELL, RYAN) (Entered: 09/25/2017)
2017-10-04MINUTE ORDER granting 60 Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's Opposition or Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before October 26, 2017. Defendants reply in support is due on or before November 17, 2017. Plaintiffs reply in support of any cross-motion is due on or before December 7, 2017. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/4/2017. (lccrc1) (Entered: 10/04/2017)
2017-10-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/26/2017. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 11/17/2017. Plaintiff's Replies in Support due by 12/7/2017. (lsj) (Entered: 10/04/2017)
2017-10-2661Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by RYAN BAGWELL (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M (Annotated Vaughn Index), # 15 Exhibit N)(BAGWELL, RYAN) (Entered: 10/26/2017)
2017-10-2662Memorandum in opposition to re 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment Renewed filed by RYAN BAGWELL. (See Docket Entry 61 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
2017-11-1663Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 61 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 11/16/2017)
2017-11-17MINUTE ORDER granting 63 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's reply shall be due by December 5, 2017. No further extensions of this deadline will be granted. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/17/2017. (lccrc2) Modified on 11/17/2017 (zlsj). (Entered: 11/17/2017)
2017-11-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Reply due by 12/5/2017. (lsj) (Entered: 11/21/2017)
2017-12-0564REPLY to opposition to motion re 61 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 12/05/2017)
2018-01-0465SURREPLY to re 64 Reply to opposition to Motion filed by RYAN BAGWELL. (BAGWELL, RYAN) (Entered: 01/04/2018)
2018-02-07MINUTE ORDER directing the parties to appear for a hearing on their pending cross-motions 57 , 61 for summary judgment on February 21, 2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27A. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 2/7/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 02/07/2018)
2018-02-07Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 2/21/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (lsj) (Entered: 02/07/2018)
2018-02-0866MOTION to Modify Hearing to a telephonic hearing by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 02/08/2018)
2018-02-09NOTICE OF ERROR re 66 Motion to Modify; emailed to rhonda.campbell@usdoj.gov, cc'd 5 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Title on document does not match motion being filed; Please file an errata with a corrected title. (znmw, ) (Entered: 02/09/2018)
2018-02-1167ERRATA Motion to Convert Hearing to Telephonic Hearing by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE 66 MOTION to Modify Hearing to a telephonic hearing filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 02/11/2018)
2018-02-13MINUTE ORDER denying 66 Defendant's Motion to Modify Hearing to a Telephonic Hearing. The Court will deny Defendant's motion. Instead, the Court will vacate the current hearing set for February 21, 2018. The parties are instead directed to appear for a hearing on their pending cross-motions 57 , 61 for summary judgment on February 28, 2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 27A. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 2/13/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 02/13/2018)
2018-02-13Set/Reset Hearings: Motions Hearing set for 2/28/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (lsj) (Entered: 02/13/2018)
2018-02-28Minute Entry for Motion Hearing held before Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 2/28/2018. Oral arguments submitted on Plaintiff's Cross Motion 61 for Summary Judgment and Defendant's Motion 57 for Summary Judgment Renewed . Motions taken under advisement; forthcoming Order. Court Reporter Cathryn Jones. (lsj) (Entered: 02/28/2018)
2018-03-05MINUTE ORDER granting 55 Defendant's Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 3/5/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
2018-03-0568SEALED DOCUMENT (EXHBITS 3-5) filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. re Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-03-1469NOTICE to the Court by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE re Motion Hearing, (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
2018-03-2270ORDER granting in part and denying in part 57 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and 61 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, it is ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is granted in part and denied in part and that Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment is granted in part and denied in part. It is further ORDERED that the parties are to meet and confer regarding search terms for a further search of the U.S. Attorney's Office email system by April 5, 2018. If the parties cannot agree on search terms, they shall file proposed search terms by April 12, 2018. See full Order for details. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 3/22/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 03/22/2018)
2018-03-2271MEMORANDUM OPINION re 70 Order granting in part and denying in part Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 3/22/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 03/22/2018)
2018-03-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Attorney Meet and Confer by 4/5/2018. Tentative proposed search term due by 4/12/2018. (lsj) (Entered: 03/22/2018)
2018-03-23MINUTE ORDER: To aid in the Court's resolution of 58 , 59 the parties' September 5, 2017 joint status reports, the Court directs the defendant to file a status report by March 30, 2018 indicating the status of any production of the set of inadvertently non-produced records addressed in the September 2017 status reports. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 3/23/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
2018-03-3072STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 03/30/2018)
2018-04-04AMENDED MINUTE ORDER: The parties are to appear for a Telephone Conference set for 4/17/2018 at 2:00 PM in Chambers before Judge Christopher R. Cooper. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/4/18. (lsj) Modified on 4/4/2018 (zlsj). (Entered: 04/04/2018)
2018-04-1273STATUS REPORT and proposed search terms by RYAN BAGWELL. (BAGWELL, RYAN) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
2018-04-17Minute Entry for Telephone Conference held before Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/17/2018. Forthcoming Order. (Court Reporter: Lisa Moreira) (lsj) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
2018-04-17MINUTE ORDER: The parties are directed to file a joint status report by April 23, 2018 that addresses (1) the status of the parties' discussions regarding search terms for the remand email search and (2) a proposal for a rolling production schedule for the inadvertently overlooked records. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/17/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
2018-04-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/23/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff