Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGawker Media, LLC et al v. FBI et al
DistrictMiddle District of Florida
CityTampa
Case Number8:2015cv01202
Date Filed2015-05-19
Date Closed2016-02-01
JudgeJudge Susan C Bucklew
PlaintiffGawker Media, LLC
PlaintiffGregg D. Thomas
Case DescriptionGawker Media submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning a 2012 investigation into the creation and dissemination of a video purporting to show Hulk Hogan engaged in a sexual affair with Heather Clem, the wife of his best friend. The FBI refused to process the request without a privacy waiver. Gawker eventually sued Hogan to obtain a waiver and a court ultimately forced Hogan to comply. Gawker then re-opened its request with the FBI. The FBI, after indicating it had located nearly 1200 pages of records and several CDs with video material, denied Gawker Media's request under Exemption 7(A) (interference with ongoing investigation or proceeding). Gawker Media appealed and OIP upheld the FBI's denial. Gawker Media also submitted a FOIA request to the Executive Office for U.S. Attorneys for records about the investigation. EOUSA acknowledged receipt of the request, but failed to respond further. Gawker Media then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Exemption 7(A) - Interference with ongoing investigation, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFBI
DefendantExecutive Office of United States Attorneys
DefendantTerry Gene Bollea
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [44]
Opinion/Order [75]
Opinion/Order [76]
Opinion/Order [78]
Opinion/Order [96]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2015-05-191COMPLAINT against Executive Office of United States Attorneys, FBI (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number TPA-30261) filed by Gawker Media, LLC, Gregg D. Thomas. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LSS) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
2015-05-192SUMMONS issued as to Executive Office of United States Attorneys, FBI, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (LSS) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
2015-05-193NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Gawker Media, LLC, Gregg D. Thomas. Related case(s): yes (LSS) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
2015-05-204NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2 (MSS) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
2015-05-205MOTION for summary judgment by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Exhibit, # 22 Exhibit, # 23 Exhibit, # 24 Exhibit, # 25 Exhibit, # 26 Exhibit)(Thomas, Gregg) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
2015-05-206MOTION for leave to file under seal by All Plaintiffs. (Thomas, Gregg) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
2015-05-217NOTICE by Gawker Media, LLC, Gregg D. Thomas re 6 MOTION for leave to file under seal (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Thomas, Gregg) (Entered: 05/21/2015)
2015-05-228ORDER directing Plaintiffs to submit the confidential declaration of Gregg D. Thomas and the exhibits attached thereto to chambers for an in camera review. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 5/22/2015. (ALK) (Entered: 05/22/2015)
2015-05-229NOTICE to counsels Alia L. Smith and Patrick Kabat of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk). (BSN) (Entered: 05/22/2015)
2015-05-2710ORDER granting 6 Motion to Seal. The Clerk is directed to file the confidential declaration of Gregg D. Thomas and the exhibits attached thereto under seal. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 5/27/2015. (ALK) (Entered: 05/27/2015)
2015-05-27Sealed Document S-11. (BSN) (Entered: 05/27/2015)
2015-05-2812MOTION for Patrick Kabat to appear pro hac vice by Gregg D. Thomas. (Thomas, Gregg) (Entered: 05/28/2015)
2015-05-2813MOTION for Alia L. Smith to appear pro hac vice by Gregg D. Thomas. (Thomas, Gregg) (Entered: 05/28/2015)
2015-05-2814MOTION for Seth D. Berlin to appear pro hac vice by Gregg D. Thomas. (Thomas, Gregg) (Entered: 05/28/2015)
2015-05-28***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Seth Berlin, appearing on behalf of Gawker Media, LLC, Gregg D. Thomas (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA030398.) Related document: 14 MOTION for Seth D. Berlin to appear pro hac vice. (AG) (Entered: 05/29/2015)
2015-05-28***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Patrick Kabat, appearing on behalf of Gawker Media, LLC, Gregg D. Thomas (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA030398.) Related document: 12 MOTION for Patrick Kabat to appear pro hac vice. (AG) (Entered: 05/29/2015)
2015-05-28***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Alia Smith, appearing on behalf of Gawker Media, LLC, Gregg D. Thomas (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA030398.) Related document: 13 MOTION for Alia L. Smith to appear pro hac vice. (AG) (Entered: 05/29/2015)
2015-06-0115ENDORSED ORDER granting 12 motion to appear pro hac vice. Patrick Kabat is directed to sign up for CM/ECF, enter an email address in his CM/ECF account, and electronically file a notice of compliance with this Court's Order by July 1, 2015. The Clerk is directed not to send paper copies to him after sending this Order. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 6/1/2015. (ALK) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
2015-06-0116ENDORSED ORDER granting 13 motion to appear pro hac vice. Alia L. Smith is directed to sign up for CM/ECF, enter an email address in her CM/ECF account, and electronically file a notice of compliance with this Court's Order by July 1, 2015. The Clerk is directed not to send paper copies to her after sending this Order. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 6/1/2015. (ALK) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
2015-06-0117ENDORSED ORDER granting 14 motion to appear pro hac vice. Seth D. Berlin is directed to sign up for CM/ECF, enter an email address in his CM/ECF account, and electronically file a notice of compliance with this Court's Order by July 1, 2015. The Clerk is directed not to send paper copies to him after sending this Order. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 6/1/2015. (ALK) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
2015-06-0218NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 2.02 to register for a login and password for cmecf(signed by deputy clerk). (BSN) (Entered: 06/02/2015)
2015-06-0519NOTICE of compliance re 16 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice, 15 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice, 17 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice by Gawker Media, LLC, Gregg D. Thomas (Kabat, Patrick) (Entered: 06/05/2015)
2015-06-0820MOTION to Expedite Consideration and Vaughn Indexes, and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Gawker Media, LLC, Gregg D. Thomas. (Thomas, Gregg) (Entered: 06/08/2015)
2015-06-0821DECLARATION of Gregg D. Thomas re 20 MOTION to Expedite Consideration and Vaughn Indexes, and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Gawker Media, LLC, Gregg D. Thomas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Thomas, Gregg) Modified on 6/8/2015 Counsel to refile Exhibit 1. (BES). (Entered: 06/08/2015)
2015-06-0822NOTICE by Gregg D. Thomas re 21 Declaration (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Thomas, Gregg) (Entered: 06/08/2015)
2015-06-0823RESPONSE in Opposition re 5 MOTION for summary judgment filed by Executive Office of United States Attorneys, FBI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Stegeby, Erik) (Entered: 06/08/2015)
2015-06-1224MOTION for leave to file Motion and Memorandum of Law for Leave to File Short Reply Brief by Gawker Media, LLC, Gregg D. Thomas. (Thomas, Gregg) (Entered: 06/12/2015)
2015-06-1725ENDORSED ORDER granting 24 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief. Plaintiffs may file a Reply brief that is no longer than eight pages. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 6/17/2015. (ALK) (Entered: 06/17/2015)
2015-06-1726ENDORSED ORDER that the reply brief must be filed by 6/22/15. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 6/17/2015. (JD) (Entered: 06/17/2015)
2015-06-1727NOTICE of hearing on 5 MOTION for summary judgment , 20 MOTION to Expedite Consideration and Vaughn Indexes . Motion Hearing set for 6/24/2015 at 11:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge Susan C Bucklew. The Court has set aside one hour for this hearing.(JD) (Entered: 06/17/2015)
2015-06-1828MEMORANDUM in support re 5 Motion for summary judgment filed by Gawker Media, LLC, Gregg D. Thomas. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit)(Thomas, Gregg) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
2015-06-1929ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint by Executive Office of United States Attorneys, FBI.(Stegeby, Erik) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
2015-06-2430Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Susan C Bucklew: MOTION HEARING held on 6/24/2015 re 5 MOTION for summary judgment filed by Gawker Media, LLC, Gregg D. Thomas. Court Reporter: Melissa Pierson (MSS) (Entered: 06/24/2015)
2015-06-2431ORDER setting case deadlines and scheduling hearing for July 2, 2015 at 9:00a.m. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 6/24/2015. (ALK) (Entered: 06/24/2015)
2015-06-2432NOTICE of hearing: Hearing as described in 31 the Court's Order Setting Case Deadlines is set for 7/2/2015 at 09:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 10 B before Judge Susan C Bucklew. (ALK) (Entered: 06/24/2015)
2015-06-2533TRANSCRIPT of Motion hearing held on 6/24/2015 before Judge Susan C. Bucklew. Court Reporter/Transcriber Melissa Pierson,Telephone number (813) 301-5336. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter.. Redaction Request due 7/16/2015, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/27/2015, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/23/2015. (Pierson, Melissa) (Entered: 06/25/2015)
2015-06-2534NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Melissa Pierson. (Pierson, Melissa) (Entered: 06/25/2015)
2015-06-2635MOTION for Reconsideration re 31 Order by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Stegeby, Erik) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
2015-06-2936ORDER granting in part and denying in part 35 Motion for Reconsideration or in the Alternative, Motion for an Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 6/29/2015. (ALK) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
2015-06-3037NOTICE by Executive Office of United States Attorneys, FBI re 36 Order on Motion for Reconsideration (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of the FBI, # 2 Exhibit Declaration of the EOUSA)(Stegeby, Erik) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
2015-06-3038NOTICE by Executive Office of United States Attorneys, FBI re 36 Order on Motion for Reconsideration re Amended Vaughn Index of the FBI (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amended Vaughn Index of the FBI)(Stegeby, Erik) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
2015-06-3039MOTION to intervene and Memorandum of Law by Terry Gene Bollea. (Turkel, Kenneth) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Jenkins. (Entered: 06/30/2015)
2015-06-3040MOTION for protective order and Memorandum of Law by Terry Gene Bollea. (Turkel, Kenneth) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Jenkins. (Entered: 06/30/2015)
2015-06-3041COUNSEL NOTIFIED EXHIBIT IMAGE REMOVED, GETS SENT BY MAIL WITH CHECK TO CLERK'S OFFICE AND NOT DOCKETED ON PUBLIC DOCKET MOTION for Charles J. Harder to appear pro hac vice by Terry Gene Bollea. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Special Admission Atty Certification)(Turkel, Kenneth) Modified on 7/1/2015 (BSN). (Entered: 06/30/2015)
2015-07-0142NOTICE by Gawker Media, LLC, Gregg D. Thomas Plaintiff's Statement Regarding Defendant Agencies' Invocation of Newly-Claimed Exemptions (Thomas, Gregg) (Entered: 07/01/2015)
2015-07-0143DECLARATION of Alia L. Smith re 42 Notice (Other) by Gawker Media, LLC, Gregg D. Thomas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Thomas, Gregg) (Entered: 07/01/2015)
2015-07-0144ORDER granting 39 Bollea's Motion to Intervene; denying 40 Bollea's Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 7/1/2015. (ALK) (Entered: 07/01/2015)
2015-07-01***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Charles J. Harder, appearing on behalf of Terry Gene Bollea (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA030993.) Related document: 41 MOTION for Charles J. Harder to appear pro hac vice. (AG) (Entered: 07/02/2015)
2015-07-0245Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Susan C Bucklew: MOTION HEARING held on 7/2/2015 re 5 MOTION for summary judgment filed by Gawker Media, LLC, Gregg D. Thomas. Court Reporter: Lynann Nicely (AR) (Entered: 07/02/2015)
2015-07-0246ORDER regarding 7/2/2015 hearing and setting case deadlines. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 7/2/2015. (ALK) (Entered: 07/02/2015)
2015-07-0247ENDORSED ORDER granting 41 motion to appear pro hac vice. Charles J. Harder is directed to sign up for CM/ECF, enter an email address in his CM/ECF account, and electronically file a notice of compliance with this Court's Order by 8/3/2015. The Clerk is directed not to send paper copies to him after sending this Order. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 7/2/2015. (ALK) (Entered: 07/02/2015)
2015-07-0648TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 7/2/15 before Judge Bucklew. Court Reporter Lynann Nicely,Telephone number (813) 301-5252. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter.. Redaction Request due 7/27/2015, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/6/2015, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/5/2015. (LN) (Entered: 07/06/2015)
2015-07-0649NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Lynann Nicely. (LN) (Entered: 07/06/2015)
2015-07-1050NOTICE by Gawker Media, LLC, Gregg D. Thomas (JOINT NOTICE) (Thomas, Gregg) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
2015-07-1051NOTICE by Executive Office of United States Attorneys, FBI re 46 Order re Supplemental Production of Documents and Video Footage (Stegeby, Erik) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
2015-07-1052NOTICE of compliance re 47 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice by Terry Gene Bollea (Harder, Charles) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
2015-07-1353NOTICE of intent to request redaction by Charles J. Harder re 48 Transcript (Harder, Charles) (Entered: 07/13/2015)
2015-07-2454OBJECTION re 37 Notice (Other), 38 Notice (Other) to Defendant Agencies' FOIA Responses, Vaughn Indexes, and Declarations . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Thomas, Gregg) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
2015-07-2455DECLARATION of Gregg D. Thomas re 54 Objection by Gawker Media, LLC, Gregg D. Thomas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Exhibit, # 22 Exhibit, # 23 Exhibit, # 24 Exhibit, # 25 Exhibit, # 26 Exhibit, # 27 Exhibit, # 28 Exhibit, # 29 Exhibit, # 30 Exhibit, # 31 Exhibit, # 32 Exhibit, # 33 Exhibit, # 34 Exhibit)(Thomas, Gregg) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
2015-07-2456Unopposed MOTION for leave to file Confidential Declaration of Gregg D. Thomas, and Exhibits Attached Thereto, Under Seal and Request for Expedited Consideration by Gawker Media, LLC, Gregg D. Thomas. (Thomas, Gregg) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
2015-07-2457Unopposed MOTION for leave to file Manually File Audio/Visual Materials Referenced in the Declaration of Gregg D. Thomas by Gawker Media, LLC, Gregg D. Thomas. (Thomas, Gregg) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
2015-07-2858ORDER granting 56 Motion for Leave to File the Confidential Declaration of Gregg D. Thomas and exhibits attached thereto under seal; granting 57 Motion for Leave to Manually File audio/visual exhibits. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 7/28/2015. (ALK) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
2015-07-28Sealed Document S-59. (BSN) (Entered: 07/29/2015)
2015-07-2860NOTICE of Filing DVD in clerk's office by Gawker Media, LLC, Gregg D. Thomas re 58 Order on Motion for Leave to File. DVD sent to Judge Bucklew's chambers on 7/29/15. (BSN) (Entered: 07/29/2015)
2015-08-0761RESPONSE re 54 Objection to Defendants' Assertions of FOIA Exemptions filed by Executive Office of United States Attorneys, FBI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Stegeby, Erik) (Entered: 08/07/2015)
2015-08-1062MOTION for summary judgment by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Stegeby, Erik) (Entered: 08/10/2015)
2015-08-1463NOTICE by Gawker Media, LLC, Gregg D. Thomas Supplemental Joint Notice Regarding Scheduling and Request for Hearing (Thomas, Gregg) (Entered: 08/14/2015)
2015-08-2564COUNSEL NOTIFIED TO GO TO www.flmd.uscourts.gov website and do a change of address in CMECF NOTICE of change of address by Charles J. Harder (Harder, Charles) Modified on 8/26/2015 (BSN). (Entered: 08/25/2015)
2015-08-2865MEMORANDUM in opposition re 62 Motion for summary judgment filed by Gawker Media, LLC, Gregg D. Thomas. (Thomas, Gregg) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
2015-08-2866DECLARATION of Alia L. Smith re 65 Memorandum in opposition by Gawker Media, LLC, Gregg D. Thomas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Thomas, Gregg) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
2015-09-2867ORDER Setting Hearing: Hearing set for 10/29/2015 at 09:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge Susan C Bucklew. See Order for details and additional case deadlines. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 9/28/2015. (ALK) (Entered: 09/28/2015)
2015-10-1668Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Vaughn Index and Declaration by All Defendants. (Stegeby, Erik) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
2015-10-1969ENDORSED ORDER granting 68 Motion for Extension of Time to File Vaughn Index and Declaration. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 10/19/2015. (ALK) (Entered: 10/19/2015)
2015-10-2070NOTICE of supplemental authority re 67 Order Setting Hearing, 69 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Vaughn Index by Executive Office of United States Attorneys, FBI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amended Vaughn Index)(Stegeby, Erik) (Entered: 10/20/2015)
2015-10-2971Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Susan C Bucklew: MOTION HEARING held on 10/29/2015 re 62 MOTION for summary judgment filed by Executive Office of United States Attorneys, FBI. Court Reporter: Lynann Nicely (MSS) (Entered: 10/29/2015)
2015-10-3072ORDER directing the FBI and EOUSA to provide certain documents and declarations. See Order for details and deadlines. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 10/30/2015. (ALK) (Entered: 10/30/2015)
2015-11-0173TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 10/29/2015 before Judge Bucklew. Court Reporter Lynann Nicely,Telephone number (813) 301-5252. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 11/23/2015, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/2/2015, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/1/2016. (LN) (BSN). (Entered: 11/01/2015)
2015-11-0174NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Lynann Nicely. (LN) (Entered: 11/01/2015)
2015-11-0475ORDER granting in part, denying in part, and reserving ruling in part on 62 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 11/4/2015. (ALK) (Entered: 11/04/2015)
2015-11-0476ORDER denying as moot 5 Plaintiffs' Motion for summary judgment; denying 20 Motion to Expedite and finding as moot 20 Request for Vaughn Indexes. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 11/4/2015. (ALK) (Entered: 11/04/2015)
2015-11-0677NOTICE by Executive Office of United States Attorneys of Filing Amended Vaughn Index (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Stegeby, Erik) (Entered: 11/06/2015)
2015-11-1278ORDER granting in part and denying in part 62 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment based on FOIA exemptions (b)(5), (b)(7)(C), and (b)(3). Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 11/12/2015. (ALK) (Entered: 11/12/2015)
2015-11-1379DECLARATION of David M. Hardy by FBI. (Stegeby, Erik) (BSN). (Entered: 11/13/2015)
2015-11-1380NOTICE by Executive Office of United States Attorneys, FBI re 72 Order to File Additional Documents (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Second Amended Vauhn Index for EOUSA)(Stegeby, Erik) (Entered: 11/13/2015)
2015-11-1381DECLARATION of Tricia Francis re 72 Order by Executive Office of United States Attorneys, FBI. (Stegeby, Erik) (Entered: 11/13/2015)
2015-11-1682OBJECTION re 81 Declaration, 79 Declaration and Defendant Agencies' Non-Compliance and Expedited Motion for Immediate Compliance . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Thomas, Gregg) (Entered: 11/16/2015)
2015-11-1783ORDER directing Executive Office of United States Attorneys and FBI to respond to 82 Plaintiffs' Objections by 11/30/2015 and setting production deadline for FBI of 11/30/2015. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 11/17/2015. (ALK) (Entered: 11/17/2015)
2015-11-3084RESPONSE re 82 Objection to Defendant Agencies' Non-Compliance filed by Executive Office of United States Attorneys, FBI. (Stegeby, Erik) (Entered: 11/30/2015)
2015-12-0285NOTICE by Gawker Media, LLC, Gregg D. Thomas re 83 Order directing response to motion, 72 Order, 75 Order on motion for summary judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Thomas, Gregg) (Entered: 12/02/2015)
2015-12-0286ORDER directing Defendants to file a response by 12/4/2015 regarding Plaintiffs' Objections that complies with 83 the Court's 11/17/2015 Order. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 12/2/2015. (ALK) (Entered: 12/02/2015)
2015-12-0287ORDER directing Defendants to respond and/or produce documents by 12/4/2015 and setting hearing for 12/8/2015. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 12/2/2015. (ALK) (Entered: 12/02/2015)
2015-12-0288NOTICE of hearing re: 87 Order directing production and responses.Hearing set for 12/8/2015 at 10:30 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge Susan C Bucklew. (ALK) (Entered: 12/02/2015)
2015-12-0489NOTICE by Executive Office of United States Attorneys, FBI re 86 Order, 87 Order to Produce (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Stegeby, Erik) (Entered: 12/04/2015)
2015-12-0490RESPONSE re 85 Notice (Other) of Non-Compliance filed by Executive Office of United States Attorneys, FBI. (Stegeby, Erik) (Entered: 12/04/2015)
2015-12-0891Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Susan C Bucklew: MISCELLANEOUS HEARING held on 12/8/2015. Court Reporter: Scott N. Gamertsfelder (MSS) (Entered: 12/08/2015)
2015-12-0892ORAL MOTION to unseal the sealed portion of the hearing held in June 2015 by Plaintiffs. (MSS) (Entered: 12/08/2015)
2015-12-0893ENDORSED ORDER granting 92 Motion to unseal the seal portion of the hearing held on June 24, 2015. The Court reporter is directed and shall unseal the sealed hearing held June 24, 2015 for reason stated on the record. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 12/8/2015. (MSS) (Entered: 12/08/2015)
2015-12-0994TRANSCRIPT of Sealed portion of 6/24/15 hearing held on 6/24/2015 before Judge Susan C. Bucklew. Court Reporter/Transcriber Melissa Pierson,Telephone number (813) 301-5336. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter.. Redaction Request due 12/30/2015, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/11/2016, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/8/2016. (Pierson, Melissa) (Entered: 12/09/2015)
2015-12-0995NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Melissa Pierson. (Pierson, Melissa) (Entered: 12/09/2015)
2015-12-1496ORDER regarding Plaintiffs' Objections and Notices of Noncompliance and 12/8/2015 hearing. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 12/14/2015. (ALK) (Entered: 12/14/2015)
2015-12-2197TRANSCRIPT of Miscellaneous Hearing held on December 8, 2015 before Judge Susan C. Bucklew. Court Reporter/Transcriber Scott N. Gamertsfelder,Telephone number 813.301.5898. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 1/11/2016, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/21/2016, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/21/2016. (SNG) (Entered: 12/21/2015)
2015-12-2198NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Scott N. Gamertsfelder. 813.301.5898 (SNG) (Entered: 12/21/2015)
2016-01-1599STATUS report by Gawker Media, LLC, Gregg D. Thomas. (Thomas, Gregg) (Entered: 01/15/2016)
2016-01-15100NOTICE by Executive Office of United States Attorneys, FBI re 96 Order to Notify Court Regarding Attorneys' Fees (Stegeby, Erik) (Entered: 01/15/2016)
2016-01-19101RESPONSE re 100 Notice (Other) Defendants' "Status Report" filed by Gawker Media, LLC, Gregg D. Thomas. (Thomas, Gregg) (Entered: 01/19/2016)
2016-01-21102ORDER regarding attorneys fees issue. See Order for details and case deadlines. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 1/21/2016. (ALK) (Entered: 01/21/2016)
2016-01-25103RESPONSE re 102 Order filed by Gawker Media, LLC, Gregg D. Thomas. (Thomas, Gregg) (Entered: 01/25/2016)
2016-01-25104ENDORSED ORDER on the basis of 103 Plaintiffs' Response indicating that the case should not yet be administratively closed, Plaintiffs shall file a notice with the Court when the DVD viewing is complete so that the Court may administratively close the case. The January 29, 2016 deadline for submitting any additional briefing on the issue of entitlement to attorneys fees remains in place. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 1/25/2016. (ALK) (Entered: 01/25/2016)
2016-01-29105STATUS report by Gawker Media, LLC, Gregg D. Thomas. (Thomas, Gregg) (Entered: 01/29/2016)
2016-01-29106MOTION for Attorney Fees by Gawker Media, LLC, Gregg D. Thomas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit)(Thomas, Gregg) (Entered: 01/29/2016)
2016-01-29107STATUS report as Allowed by Court Regarding Defendants' Position on Attorneys' Fees by FBI, Executive Office of United States Attorneys. (Stegeby, Erik) (Entered: 01/29/2016)
2016-02-01108ENDORSED ORDER that on the basis of 105 Plaintiffs' status report indicating that this case may be administratively closed, this cause is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to the right of any party to re-open the action within sixty (60) days, upon good cause shown, or to submit a stipulated form of final judgment. The Clerk is directed to administratively close the case. The Court retains jurisdiction to decide the issue of attorneys fees. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 2/1/2016. (ALK) (Entered: 02/01/2016)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff