Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEOPOLD v. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2015cv00817
Date Filed2015-06-02
Date Closed2017-03-02
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffJASON LEOPOLD
Case DescriptionReporter Jason Leopold submitted a FOIA request to the Office of Antiboycott Compliance at the Department of Commerce for 31 categories of records. Leopold also asked for a fee waiver. The agency told Leopold that his request was too vague and he sent a narrowed request for 21 categories of records. He asked for a fee waiver for the second request as well. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Leopold filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2015-06-021COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4120637) filed by JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons Attorney General, # 7 Summons Department of Commerce, # 8 Summons US Attorney)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/02/2015)
2015-06-02Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (rd) (Entered: 06/03/2015)
2015-06-032SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form, # 2 Notice of Consent)(rd) (Entered: 06/03/2015)
2015-06-043RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/4/2015. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/4/2015.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/04/2015. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/04/2015)
2015-07-064ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE.(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 07/06/2015)
2015-07-10MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure, by 7/24/2015. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 07/10/2015. (lckbj1) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
2015-07-245STATUS REPORT and Production Schedule by DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
2015-08-06MINUTE ORDER. Based on the representations in the parties' 5 Joint Status Report and Production Schedule, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further status report concerning settlement status, which shall include a proposed schedule if litigation is going to be necessary, by 8/17/2015. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 08/06/2015. (lckbj1) (Entered: 08/06/2015)
2015-08-176STATUS REPORT (Joint) by JASON LEOPOLD. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/17/2015)
2015-08-28MINUTE ORDER. Based on the representations made in the parties' 6 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint report concerning settlement status, which shall include a proposed schedule if litigation is going to be necessary, by 10/9/2015. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 08/28/2015. (lckbj1) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
2015-10-097Joint STATUS REPORT by JASON LEOPOLD. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/09/2015)
2015-10-22MINUTE ORDER. Based on the representations made in the parties' 7 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further status report on or before 12/8/2015, which shall include a proposed schedule for further proceedings, if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/22/2015. (lckbj1) (Entered: 10/22/2015)
2015-12-088Joint STATUS REPORT by JASON LEOPOLD. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/08/2015)
2015-12-09MINUTE ORDER. Based on the representations made in the parties' 8 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further status report on or before 3/15/2016, which shall include a proposed schedule for further proceedings, if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 12/9/2015. (lckbj2) (Entered: 12/09/2015)
2015-12-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 3/15/2016 (gdf) (Entered: 12/10/2015)
2016-03-159Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 03/15/2016)
2016-03-16MINUTE ORDER. Based on the representations in the parties 9 Joint Status Report, it hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further status report on or before 3/29/2016, which shall contain a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 3/16/2016. (lckbj1) (Entered: 03/16/2016)
2016-03-1610ENTERED IN ERROR.....ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why this Court should not dismiss this case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by 4/6/2016. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 03/16/2016. (lckbj1) Modified on 3/16/2016 (ztnr). (Entered: 03/16/2016)
2016-03-16NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: 10 Order to Show Cause was entered in error as filed in the incorrect case.(ztnr) (Entered: 03/16/2016)
2016-03-2911Joint STATUS REPORT by JASON LEOPOLD. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/29/2016)
2016-04-05MINUTE ORDER. Based on the representations in the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before 4/19/2016, the parties shall file a further joint status report that shall contain a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 04/05/2016. (lckbj1) (Entered: 04/05/2016)
2016-04-2012Joint STATUS REPORT by JASON LEOPOLD. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/20/2016)
2016-04-20MINUTE ORDER. Based on the representations in the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before 6/16/2016, the parties shall file a further joint status report that shall contain a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 4/20/2016. (lckbj1) (Entered: 04/20/2016)
2016-06-1513Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File by DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
2016-06-16MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown, 13 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Status Report. It is hereby ORDERED that, on or before 7/17/2016, the parties shall file a joint status report updating the Court on the processing of documents in response to plaintiff's FOIA request, which shall contain a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 06/16/2016. (lckbj1) (Entered: 06/16/2016)
2016-07-0114GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Courts instructions for briefing motions. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 7/1/2016. (lckbj1) (Entered: 07/01/2016)
2016-07-1815STATUS REPORT by JASON LEOPOLD. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/18/2016)
2016-07-1916Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 07/19/2016)
2016-09-01MINUTE ORDER. Based on the representations in the parties' 16 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the following briefing schedule is set for this matter: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before 9/22/2016. Plaintiff's Consolidated Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Cross Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before 10/24/2016. Defendant's Consolidated Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before 11/26/2016. Plaintiff's Reply in Support of its Cross Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before 12/15/2016. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 09/01/2016. (lckbj1) (Entered: 09/01/2016)
2016-09-1917Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File by DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 09/19/2016)
2016-09-26MINUTE ORDER granting 17 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment, nunc pro tunc. It is hereby ORDERED that the briefing schedule in this matter is modified as follows: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before 10/19/2016. Plaintiff's Consolidated Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Cross Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before 11/21/2016. Defendant's Consolidated Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before 12/20/2016. Plaintiff's Reply in Support of its Cross Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before 1/20/2017. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 09/26/2016. (lckbj1) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
2016-09-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motions due by 11/21/2016. Response to Cross Motions due by 12/20/2016. Reply to Cross Motions due by 1/20/2017. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 11/21/2016. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/20/2016. (gdf) (Entered: 09/27/2016)
2016-10-1418Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File by DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 10/14/2016)
2016-10-25MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown, 18 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment, nunc pro tunc. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's motion for summary judgment is due on or before 10/27/2016. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the remaining briefing deadlines in this matter are unchanged. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/25/2016. (lckbj1) (Entered: 10/25/2016)
2016-10-2719MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 10/27/2016)
2016-11-2120Memorandum in opposition to re 19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/21/2016)
2016-11-2121Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by JASON LEOPOLD (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/21/2016)
2016-12-1222Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File by DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 12/12/2016)
2016-12-13MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown, 22 Unopposed Motion to Extend Reply and Opposition Due Date. It is hereby ORDERED that the briefing schedule in this matter is amended as follows: Defendant's consolidated reply in further support of its motion for summary judgment and opposition to Plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment is due on or before 1/27/2017; and Plaintiff's reply in further support of its cross-motion for summary judgment is due on or before 2/22/2017. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 12/13/2016. (lckbj1) Modified on 12/14/2016 to add text.(ztnr) (Entered: 12/13/2016)
2017-01-1223Joint MOTION to Stay by DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 01/12/2017)
2017-01-17MINUTE ORDER granting 23 Motion to Stay Briefing. It is hereby ORDERED that the deadlines for briefing summary judgment in this matter are VACATED, and that the parties shall file, on or before 2/24/2017, a joint status report, which shall contain a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 1/17/2017.(lckbj1) (Entered: 01/17/2017)
2017-02-2424Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 02/24/2017)
2017-02-27MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that, on or before March 10, 2017, the parties shall file either a stipulation of dismissal or a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on February 27, 2017. (lckbj2) (Entered: 02/27/2017)
2017-02-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Stipulation of Dismissal due by 3/10/2017. (zgdf) (Entered: 02/27/2017)
2017-03-0225STIPULATION of Dismissal and Settlement by JASON LEOPOLD. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/02/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff