Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePRISON LEGAL NEWS v. SAMUELS
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2015cv00823
Date Filed2015-06-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffPRISON LEGAL NEWS A Project of the Human Rights Defense Center
Case DescriptionPrison Legal News submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Prisons in 2008 for records about money spent by BOP settling lawsuits or claims from 2003-2008. After a good deal of back and forth, PLN filed another FOIA request to BOP in 2010 for the same records covering 2008-2010. In 2010, BOP disclosed 917 pages responsive to the 2008 request. It later released more records pertaining to the 2008 request, bringing the total up to 1,325. In 2013, PLN made a third FOIA request to BOP for the same records for the period of 2010 - 2013. After receiving no further records from the agency, PLN filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantCHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR. Director, Federal Bureau of Prisons
DefendantCHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR. Director, Federal Bureau of Prisons
TERMINATED: 02/24/2016
DefendantLORETTA LYNCH
TERMINATED: 06/03/2015
DefendantLORETTA E. LYNCH
TERMINATED: 06/03/2015
DefendantVINCENT H. COHEN
TERMINATED: 06/03/2015
DefendantVINCENT H. COHEN, JR.
TERMINATED: 06/03/2015
DefendantTHOMAS R. KANE Acting Director, Federal Bureau of Prisons
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2015-06-031COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief to Obtain Freedom of Information Act Information against CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4122476) filed by PRISON LEGAL NEWS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-M, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(London, Ronald) (Entered: 06/03/2015)
2015-06-032NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by PRISON LEGAL NEWS. Case related to (London, Ronald) (Entered: 06/03/2015)
2015-06-033Corporate Disclosure Statement by PRISON LEGAL NEWS. (London, Ronald) (Entered: 06/03/2015)
2015-06-034REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to Charles E. Samuels, Jr., Dir. Fed. Bureau of Prisons by PRISON LEGAL NEWS re 1 Complaint, filed by PRISON LEGAL NEWS. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by PRISON LEGAL NEWS. (Attachments: # 1 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for D.C.)(London, Ronald) (Entered: 06/03/2015)
2015-06-03Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (md) (Entered: 06/04/2015)
2015-06-055NOTICE of Corrected Summonses by PRISON LEGAL NEWS re 1 Complaint, (London, Ronald) (Entered: 06/05/2015)
2015-06-056SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (td) (Entered: 06/05/2015)
2015-06-237NOTICE of Appearance by Wyneva Johnson on behalf of CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR (Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
2015-06-238RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/16/15. (London, Ronald) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
2015-06-249MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Ashley L. Vulin, :Address- 1300 SW 5th Ave, Ste 2400, Portland, OR 97201. Phone No. - 503-778-5493. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4150049. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by PRISON LEGAL NEWS (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(London, Ronald) (Entered: 06/24/2015)
2015-06-29MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Having considered the plaintiff's Motion to Admit Ashley L. Vulin Pro Hac Vice, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under this Court's rules, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Ashley Lauren Vulin, 1300 SW 5th Avenue, Suite 2400, Portland, Oregon 97201, is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on June 29, 2015. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
2015-07-1010NOTICE of Appearance by Sabarish P. Neelakanta on behalf of PRISON LEGAL NEWS (Neelakanta, Sabarish) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
2015-07-1011NOTICE of Appearance by Lance T. Weber on behalf of PRISON LEGAL NEWS (Weber, Lance) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
2015-07-1312MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR (Attachments: # 1 Declaration (Declaration of Ronald L. Rodgers), # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 07/13/2015)
2015-07-14MINUTE ORDER. As the Defendant's Motion for Enlargement of Time 12 is opposed by the plaintiff, in part, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a Motion Hearing to determine the date by which the defendant shall respond to the Complaint at a time and date to be determined by the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 14, 2015. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 07/14/2015)
2015-07-17Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 8/4/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (mpt) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
2015-07-3013Consent MOTION to Continue Motion Hearing Scheduled For August 4, 2015 by CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 07/30/2015)
2015-07-31MINUTE ORDER denying 13 Motion to Continue. As it is apparent from the Defendant's Consent Motion to Continue Motion Hearing 13 that the parties have not reached a compromise regarding the relief sought in the Defendant's Motion for Enlargement of Time 12 , it is hereby ORDERED that the defendant's motion to continue the hearing scheduled for August 4, 2015, is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 31, 2015. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 07/31/2015)
2015-07-3114Consent MOTION to Continue Motion Hearing Scheduled For August 4, 2015 (Renewed) by CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 07/31/2015)
2015-08-03MINUTE ORDER granting 14 Motion to Continue. In light of the parties' consent, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the Defendant's Renewed Consent Motion to Continue Motion Hearing is GRANTED, and the hearing scheduled for August 4, 2015, is CONTINUED to a time and date to be determined by the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on August 3, 2015. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 08/03/2015)
2015-08-03Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing reset for 8/18/2015 11:30 AM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (mpt) (Entered: 08/03/2015)
2015-08-1415Joint MOTION to Continue August 18, 2015 Motion Hearing by CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 08/14/2015)
2015-08-1716ORDER granting in part and denying in part 12 Motion for Extension of Time to; granting in part and denying in part 15 Motion to Continue. In light of the representations set forth in the parties' Joint Motion to Continue August 18, 2015 Motion Hearing, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART, and the hearing scheduled for August 18, 2015 is VACATED. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a Joint Status Report with the Court by September 16, 2015, and additional Joint Status Reports every 45 days thereafter, informing the Court of the parties' progress in resolving this matter. It is further ORDERED that the Defendant's Motion for Enlargement of Time to respond to the Complaint is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART, and the Court shall set forth the date by which the defendant must respond to the Complaint once the parties indicate through a Joint Status Report that they are in a position to proceed with this litigation. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on August 17, 2015. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 08/17/2015)
2015-09-1617Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 09/16/2015)
2015-09-1718Joint STATUS REPORT by CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR. (Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 09/17/2015)
2015-09-21MINUTE ORDER granting 17 Motion for Extension of Time to File. In light of the parties' consent, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the Defendant's Consent Motion for One Day Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report 17 is GRANTED, and the Joint Status Report filed on September 17, 2015, shall be considered timely filed. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on September 21, 2015. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
2015-11-0219STATUS REPORT by CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 11/02/2015)
2015-12-1120STATUS REPORT by CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Clinton D Stroble)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 12/11/2015)
2016-02-2321Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 02/23/2016)
2016-03-0322Joint STATUS REPORT by THOMAS R. KANE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 03/03/2016)
2016-03-08MINUTE ORDER granting 21 Motion for Extension of Time to File. In light of the parties' consent, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the Joint Motion for an Enlargement of Time to file the most recent joint status report is GRANTED, and the status report filed on March 3, 2016, is deemed timely. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on March 8, 2016. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 03/08/2016)
2016-05-0623Joint STATUS REPORT by THOMAS R. KANE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 05/06/2016)
2016-07-1424Joint STATUS REPORT by THOMAS R. KANE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 07/14/2016)
2016-09-1625Joint STATUS REPORT by THOMAS R. KANE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 09/16/2016)
2016-09-19MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file an additional joint status report on or before November 16, 2016, updating the Court on the status of the defendant's productions of documents responsive to the plaintiff's FOIA request. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on September 19, 2016. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 09/19/2016)
2016-09-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/16/2016 (gdf) (Entered: 09/19/2016)
2016-11-2226Joint STATUS REPORT by THOMAS R. KANE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Ronald Rodgers)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
2016-11-22MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' Notice of Filing of Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file an additional joint status report on or before January 27, 2017, updating the Court on the status of the defendant's productions of documents responsive to the plaintiff's FOIA request. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on November 22, 2016. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
2016-11-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/27/2017 (hs) (Entered: 11/23/2016)
2016-12-2727NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to PRISON LEGAL NEWS. Attorney Lance T. Weber terminated. (Weber, Lance) (Entered: 12/27/2016)
2017-01-1928Joint STATUS REPORT by THOMAS R. KANE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 01/19/2017)
2017-01-20MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' Notice of Filing of Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file an additional joint status report on or before March 31, 2017, updating the Court on the status of the defendant's productions of documents responsive to the plaintiff's FOIA request. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on January 20, 2017. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 01/20/2017)
2017-01-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/31/2017 (hs) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
2017-03-3029Joint STATUS REPORT by THOMAS R. KANE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 03/30/2017)
2017-04-03MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' Notice of Filing of Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file an additional joint status report on or before June 16, 2017, updating the Court on the status of this case and providing the Court with a briefing schedule for future pleadings, if necessary, in this case. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 3, 2017. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 04/03/2017)
2017-04-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/16/2017 (hs) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
2017-06-1630Joint STATUS REPORT by THOMAS R. KANE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
2017-06-16MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' Notice of Filing of Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file an additional joint status report on or before August 30, 2017, updating the Court on the status of this case and providing the Court with a briefing schedule for future pleadings, if necessary, in this case. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on June 16, 2017. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
2017-06-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/30/2017. (hs) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-08-2931Joint STATUS REPORT by THOMAS R. KANE. (Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 08/29/2017)
2017-08-2932ERRATA by THOMAS R. KANE. (Attachments: # 1 Joint Status Report, # 2 Declaration Ronald l. Rodgers)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 08/29/2017)
2017-08-30MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' Notice of Filing of Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file an additional joint status report on or before November 30, 2017, updating the Court on the status of this case and providing the Court with a briefing schedule for future pleadings, if necessary, in this case. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on August 30, 2017. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
2017-08-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/30/2017 (hs) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff