Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleTAX ANALYSTS v. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2015cv00980
Date Filed2015-06-23
Date Closed2015-09-17
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffTAX ANALYSTS
Case DescriptionTax Analysts submitted a FOIA request to the IRS for records of bonus awards given to senior executive service or senior managers in the Office of Chief Counsel. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and indicated it could not complete its response within the statutory time limit. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Tax Analysts filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantINTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2015-06-231COMPLAINT against INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4147462) filed by TAX ANALYSTS.(Hitchcock, Cornish) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
2015-06-232NOTICE of CIVIL COVER SHEET by TAX ANALYSTS re 1 Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(Hitchcock, Cornish) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
2015-06-23Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (rd) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
2015-06-233SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form, # 2 Notice of Consent)(rd) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
2015-08-064RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE served on 7/27/2015, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/27/2015., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/31/2015. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/30/2015.) (Hitchcock, Cornish) (Entered: 08/06/2015)
2015-08-285NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Jeremy Hagerman on behalf of INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Hagerman, Richard) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
2015-08-286Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hagerman, Richard) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
2015-08-28MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before September 14, 2015. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/28/2015. (lcrc1) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
2015-08-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 9/14/2015, (tj) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
2015-09-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 9/14/2015, (tj) (Entered: 09/03/2015)
2015-09-147Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer through September 25, 2015, by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hagerman, Richard) (Entered: 09/14/2015)
2015-09-14MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Joint Motion for an Extension of Time to Answer: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before September 25, 2015. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/14/2015. (lcrc1) (Entered: 09/14/2015)
2015-09-178STIPULATION of Dismissal by TAX ANALYSTS. (Hitchcock, Cornish) (Entered: 09/17/2015)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff