Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEOPOLD et al v. NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2015cv00999
Date Filed2015-06-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffJASON LEOPOLD
PlaintiffALEXA O'BRIEN
Case DescriptionJournalists Jason Leopold and Alexia O'Brien submitted a total of 19 FOIA requests for records concerning Jacob Appelbaum, who is associated with Wikileaks. Leopold and O'Brien heard from several agencies concerning their requests, but for the most part, the agencies had not responded to the requests when Leopold and Appelbaum filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Washington, DC 20505
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2015-06-241COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4150588) filed by JASON LEOPOLD, ALEXA O'BRIEN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/24/2015)
2015-06-24Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. rd) (Entered: 06/25/2015)
2015-06-252SUMMONS (8) Issued Electronically as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form, # 2 Notice of Consent)(rd) (Entered: 06/25/2015)
2015-06-253RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 6/25/2015, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/25/2015. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/25/2015.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/25/2015. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/25/2015)
2015-07-234NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Douglas Levin on behalf of All Defendants (Levin, Scott) (Entered: 07/23/2015)
2015-07-235Joint MOTION to Stay by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY (Levin, Scott) (Entered: 07/23/2015)
2015-07-27MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Joint Motion to Stay. It is further ordered that (1) the matter is stayed until the filing of Plaintiffs' amended complaint; (2) upon the filing of Plaintiffs' amended complaint, the stay in this matter will be lifted; and (3) upon the filing of Plaintiffs' amended complaint, the parties will meet and confer and move the Court to set an agreed-to deadline, set at least thirty days after Plaintiffs file the amended complaint, for Defendants to file their response to the amended complaint. If Plaintiffs have not filed an amended complaint by August 12, 2015, the parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before August 14, 2015, addressing the status of Plaintiffs' exhaustion of administrative remedies and the continued need for a stay. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/27/2015. (lcapm1) (Entered: 07/27/2015)
2015-07-27Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Amended complaint due by 8/12/2015. Joint status report due by 8/14/2015. Case Stayed. (cdw) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
2015-08-096AMENDED COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE filed by ALEXA O'BRIEN, JASON LEOPOLD.(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/09/2015)
2015-08-147Joint MOTION for Scheduling Order by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Levin, Scott) (Entered: 08/14/2015)
2015-08-17MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Joint Motion for Scheduling Order. It is further ordered that Defendants shall file their response to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint on or before September 16, 2015. In addition, parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before October 2, 2015, which shall inform the court of the parties' efforts to clarify and narrow the scope of Plaintiffs' Freedom of Information Act requests. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/17/2015. (lcapm1) (Entered: 08/17/2015)
2015-08-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to amended complaint due by 9/16/2015. Joint Status Report due by 10/2/2015. (zmm) (Entered: 08/17/2015)
2015-09-168ANSWER to 6 Amended Complaint, by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. Related document: 6 Amended Complaint, filed by JASON LEOPOLD, ALEXA O'BRIEN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - NSA, # 2 Exhibit 2 - DHS-NPPD, # 3 Exhibit 3 - DHS-Privacy Office and Office of Policy, # 4 Exhibit 4 - DHS-S&T, # 5 Exhibit 5 - DHS-TSA, # 6 Exhibit 6 - DHS-OPS, # 7 Exhibit 7 - DHS-I&A, # 8 Exhibit 8 - DHS-Secret Service, # 9 Exhibit 9 - DHS-CBP, # 10 Exhibit 10 - DHS-ICE, # 11 Exhibit 11 - DHS-USCIS, # 12 Exhibit 12 - DOJ-FBI, # 13 Exhibit 13 - DOJ-Criminal Division, # 14 Exhibit 14 - DOJ-NSD, # 15 Exhibit 15 - DOD-Army, # 16 Exhibit 16 - DOD-DIA, # 17 Exhibit 17 - CIA, # 18 Exhibit 18 - DOS)(Levin, Scott) (Entered: 09/16/2015)
2015-09-219ORDER. Both an amended complaint and an answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report not later than October 5, 2015. Please see the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Amit P. Mehta on 09/21/2015. (lcapm1) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
2015-09-21Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 10/5/2015. (cdw) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
2015-10-0210Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Levin, Scott) (Entered: 10/02/2015)
2015-10-06MINUTE ORDER: As proposed in their Joint Status Report of October 2, 2015, the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before November 2, 2015. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/06/2015. (lcapm1) (Entered: 10/06/2015)
2015-10-06Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 11/2/2015. (cdw) (Entered: 10/07/2015)
2015-11-0211Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Levin, Scott) (Entered: 11/02/2015)
2015-11-03MINUTE ORDER: As proposed in their Joint Status Report of November 2, 2015, the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before December 2, 2015. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/03/2015. (lcapm1) (Entered: 11/03/2015)
2015-11-03Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 12/2/2015. (cdw) (Entered: 11/04/2015)
2015-12-0212Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Levin, Scott) (Entered: 12/02/2015)
2015-12-03MINUTE ORDER: As proposed in their Joint Status Report of December 2, 2015, the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before January 20, 2016. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/03/2015. (lcapm1) (Entered: 12/03/2015)
2015-12-03Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 1/20/2016. (cdw) (Entered: 12/03/2015)
2016-01-2013Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Levin, Scott) (Entered: 01/20/2016)
2016-01-2014ORDER setting production schedule, deadlines for monthly status reports, and a timeline in which parties should meet and confer and file a dispositive motions schedule. See attached Order for further details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 01/20/2016. (lcapm1) (Entered: 01/20/2016)
2016-01-2115NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Matthew Joseph Berns on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Scott D. Levin (Berns, Matthew) (Entered: 01/21/2016)
2016-04-2016Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Berns, Matthew) (Entered: 04/20/2016)
2016-07-2017Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Berns, Matthew) (Entered: 07/20/2016)
2016-10-1918Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Berns, Matthew) (Entered: 10/19/2016)
2017-01-1819Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Berns, Matthew) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
2017-04-1920Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Berns, Matthew) (Entered: 04/19/2017)
2017-07-1921Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Berns, Matthew) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
2017-10-1822Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Berns, Matthew) (Entered: 10/18/2017)
2018-01-09ENTERED IN ERROR.....MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, the following deadlines shall govern this matter: (1) Defendant shall produce at least the first 500 responsive pages to Plaintiffs on or before February 20, 2018; (2) Defendant shall disclose to Plaintiffs the estimated total number of potentially responsive pages as soon as feasible, but at least prior to March 6, 2018; and (3) the parties shall file another Joint Status Report, on or before March 6, 2018, that updates the court on their progress and proposes a production schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 01/09/2018. (lcapm1) Modified on 1/9/2018 (jf). (Entered: 01/09/2018)
2018-01-09NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Docket Entry re MINUTE ORDER filed on 01/9/2018, Upon consideration of the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, the following deadlines shall govern this matter: (1) Defendant shall produce at least the first 500 responsive pages to Plaintiffs on or before Feb ruary 20, 2018; (2) Defendant shall disclose to Plaintiffs the estimated total number of potentially responsive pages as soon as feasible, but at least prior to March 6, 2018; and (3) the parties shall file another Joint Status Report, on or before M arch 6, 2018, that updates the court on their progress and proposes a production schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 01/09/2018. (lcapm1) Modified on 1/9/2018 was entered in error and counsel was instructed to disregard and will be refiled in the correct case. (jf) (Entered: 01/09/2018)
2018-01-09ENTERED IN ERROR.........Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 3/6/2018. (zcdw) Modified on 1/10/2018 (zcdw). (Entered: 01/10/2018)
2018-01-1723Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Berns, Matthew) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
2018-02-0824NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Marcia Kay Sowles on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Matthew Berns (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 02/08/2018)
2018-04-1025Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 04/10/2018)
2018-07-1826Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar