Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGATSON v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DistrictDistrict of New Jersey
CityNewark
Case Number2:2015cv05068
Date Filed2015-07-01
Date Closed2017-08-31
JudgeJudge John Michael Vazquez
PlaintiffMR. TOKYO GATSON
Case DescriptionTokyo Gatson, a state prisoner, submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning himself. The agency referred to his request as being about the James Bond Gang and withheld records under Exemption 7(A) (ongoing investigation or proceeding). Gatson appealed the agency's denial which was upheld. He then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Exemption 7(A) - Interference with ongoing investigation, Litigation - Recovery of Costs

DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION FBI
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Opinion/Order [53]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2015-07-011Complaint Received. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Cover Letter, # 3 Application IFP, # 4 Proposed IFP Order, # 5 Envelope)(seb) (Entered: 07/06/2015)
2015-07-082ORDER that Plaintiffs application to proceed informa pauperis is hereby granted; that the Clerk of the Court shall file the Complaint without prepayment of the filing fee; that the Clerk of the Court shall issue a summons and the U.S. Marshals shall serve a copy of the complaint, summons, and this order upon the Defendant. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 7/8/15. (DD, ) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
2015-07-08COMPLAINT see document 1 against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION [IFP GRANTED], filed by TOKYO GATSON.(DD, ) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
2015-07-093CLERK'S LETTER: Transmittal of USM 285 Forms. (DD, ) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
2015-08-054SUMMONS ISSUED as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *MARIA F. GARCIA* (mfg) (Entered: 08/05/2015)
2015-08-195SUMMONS Returned Executed by TOKYO GATSON. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 8/7/2015, answer due 10/6/2015. (nr, ) (Entered: 08/25/2015)
2015-09-106Letter with attached proposed order for entry of default judgment by Mr. Tokyo Gatson (Service is incomplete and there is no request for entry of default) (nr, ) (Entered: 09/14/2015)
2015-09-177Letter from the FBI responding to plaintiff's request for default. (VASSALLO, KRISTIN) (Entered: 09/17/2015)
2015-09-218SUMMONS Returned Executed by TOKYO GATSON. U.S. Attorney served on 9/1/2015, answer due 11/2/2015. (nr, ) (Entered: 09/23/2015)
2015-09-289Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to defendant FBI. Attorney KRISTIN LYNN VASSALLO for FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION added. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(VASSALLO, KRISTIN) (Entered: 09/28/2015)
2015-09-29Clerk`s Text Order - The document 9 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/15/2015. (nr, ) (Entered: 09/29/2015)
2015-09-3010Certified Mail Receipt Returned of summons and complt. sent to F.B.I. on 9/22/2015 (nr, ) (Entered: 10/01/2015)
2015-10-0111Request for Default by TOKYO GATSON against Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Deft's have made an appearance) (nr, ) (Entered: 10/06/2015)
2015-10-1512ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(VASSALLO, KRISTIN) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
2015-10-2613LETTER ORDER - Setting an Initial Conference for 12/14/2015 at 11:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 10/26/2015. (mw, ) (Entered: 10/26/2015)
2015-11-2314Letter from the Government regarding Rule 16 conference and seeking a motion schedule. (VASSALLO, KRISTIN) (Entered: 11/23/2015)
2015-12-1415SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 1/15/2016. Motions due by 1/29/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 12/14/2015. (nr, ) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
2015-12-1616Letter from Tokyo Gatson in response to a letter/motion I received from the FBI regarding summary judgment motion (nr, ) (Entered: 12/23/2015)
2016-01-0417LETTER ORDER denying as moot pltf's request for various types of relief requested in his letter of 12/12/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 1/4/2016. (nr, ) (Entered: 01/04/2016)
2016-01-0618MOTION to Compel production of documents by TOKYO GATSON. (nr, ) (Entered: 01/13/2016)
2016-01-0619Letter from Toyko Gatson in response to the Government's letter brief(nr, ) (Entered: 01/13/2016)
2016-01-13Set/Reset Deadlines as to 18 MOTION to Compel. Motion set for 2/16/2016 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (nr, ) (Entered: 01/13/2016)
2016-01-1521SUMMONS Returned Executed on Officer Jonathan Sullivan c/o Bayonne Police Department, Internal Affairs by TOKYO GATSON. (Not a deft. in this action) (nr, ) (Entered: 01/20/2016)
2016-01-1920Letter from the FBI requesting an extension of time to file summary judgment motion. (VASSALLO, KRISTIN) (Entered: 01/19/2016)
2016-01-2222ORDER denying as moot pltf's 18 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 1/22/2016. (nr, ) (Entered: 01/22/2016)
2016-01-2523ORDER that deft's deadline to file a dispositive motion and it's Vaughn Index is 4/22/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 1/25/2016. (nr, ) (Entered: 01/25/2016)
2016-02-0424Letter from Mr. Toyko Gatson requesting that the Court deny the deft's request for an extension of time to submit a Vaughn Index (nr, ) (Entered: 02/04/2016)
2016-03-0125TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge John Michael Vazquez for all further proceedings. Judge Claire C. Cecchi no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 3/1/16. (ak, ) (Entered: 03/03/2016)
2016-04-2126Letter from the Government requesting permission to submit a summary judgment brief in excess of the page limits in Local Civil Rule 7.2. (VASSALLO, KRISTIN) (Entered: 04/21/2016)
2016-04-2227TEXT ORDER: Granting Government's letter request D.E.26 seeking leave to file a brief in excess of the page limit allowed under Local Civil Rule 7.2(d). So Ordered by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 4/22/16. (rg, ) (Entered: 04/22/2016)
2016-04-2228MOTION for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. Responses due by 5/2/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Notice to Pro Se Litigant Opposing Summary Judgment, # 2 Certificate of Service, # 3 Brief, # 4 Notice of Ex Parte In Camera Filing, # 5 Statement of Material Facts, # 6 Text of Proposed Order, # 7 Declaration of David Hardy, # 8 Exhibit Hardy Declaration Exhibits A-P)(VASSALLO, KRISTIN) (Entered: 04/22/2016)
2016-04-25Set/Reset Deadlines as to 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion set for 5/16/2016 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (nr, ) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
2016-05-0929MOTION for Continuance of Summary Judgment to Permit Discovery by TOKYO GATSON. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter)(seb) (Entered: 05/12/2016)
2016-05-12Set Deadlines as to 29 MOTION for Continuance of Summary Judgment to Permit Discovery. Motion set for 6/6/2016 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (seb) (Entered: 05/12/2016)
2016-05-1731MOTION for Summary Judgment by TOKYO GATSON. (Attachments: # 1 Brief)(nr, ) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
2016-05-2030RESPONSE to Motion filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION re 29 MOTION to Continue (VASSALLO, KRISTIN) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
2016-05-20Set/Reset Deadlines as to 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion set for 6/20/2016 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (nr, ) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
2016-05-2632Letter from Toyko Gatson requesting that the Court postpone making a decision on his motion for summary judgment and allow pltf. to submit certain motions regarding depositions (nr, ) (Entered: 06/02/2016)
2016-05-2633MOTION to take deposition of defts. by deposition upon written questions by TOKYO GATSON. (nr, ) (Entered: 06/02/2016)
2016-05-2634MOTION Tokyo Gatson taking deposition by videotape by TOKYO GATSON. (nr, ) (Entered: 06/02/2016)
2016-05-2635NOTICE to Take Deposition of Federal Bureau of Investigation and Mr David Hardy by TOKYO GATSON.(nr, ) (Entered: 06/02/2016)
2016-06-0336Letter from the FBI seeking permission to respond to plaintiff's four motions by July 22, 2016. (VASSALLO, KRISTIN) (Entered: 06/03/2016)
2016-06-03Set/Reset Deadlines as to 34 MOTION Tokyo Gatson, 33 MOTION to take deposition of defts. by deposition upon written questions. Motion set for 7/5/2016 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (nr, ) (Entered: 06/03/2016)
2016-06-0637ORDER granting the United States' request to extend the time to file a response to the four motions filed by Mr. Gatson to 7/22/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 6/6/2016. (nr, ) (Entered: 06/06/2016)
2016-06-1439Letter from Mr. Tokyo Gatson in opposition to deft's request for an extension of time to respond to Discovery (nr, ) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
2016-06-1638Letter from Tokyo Gatson re in opposition to deft's request for extension of time (nr, ) (Entered: 06/20/2016)
2016-07-2240BRIEF in Opposition filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION re 33 MOTION to take deposition of defts. by deposition upon written questions, 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 34 MOTION Tokyo Gatson (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Supplemental Declaration of David Hardy)(VASSALLO, KRISTIN) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
2016-08-1141Certification of Kristin Vassallo on behalf of FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (VASSALLO, KRISTIN) (Entered: 08/11/2016)
2016-10-0742LETTER ORDER Administratively terminating 28 Motion for Summary Judgment ; denying 29 Motion to Continue; Administratively terminating 31 Motion for Summary Judgment ; denying 33 Motion to take deposition of defts ; denying 34 Motion. Reinstating [Dkt. No. 28] and [Dkt. No. 31] as of the date of this Order; Plaintiff shall have until November 21, 2016 to file a response to Defendant's motion for summary judgment. Both motions shall be made returnable on December 5, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 10/6/16. (cm) (Entered: 10/07/2016)
2016-10-07Reset Deadlines as to 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion set for 12/5/2016 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (cm ) (Entered: 10/07/2016)
2016-10-2443Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Tokyo Gatson. (cm ) (Entered: 10/25/2016)
2016-11-0444LETTER ORDER that Pursuant to L. Civ. R. 10.1(a), Plaintiff Gatson shall file a notice indicating his change of address with the Clerk of the Court. Such notice shall be filed seven (7) days after receipt of this Order. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff Gatson, ID No. 65962-050, Federal Correction Institution, 501 Gary Hill Road, Edgefield, South Carolina, 29824. A copy of the October 6, 2016 Letter Order [Dkt. No. 42] shall be included in this mailing. Plaintiff shall have until December 5, 2016 to file a response to Defendant's motion for summary judgment. This motion shall be made returnable on December 19, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 11/4/16. (cm, ) (Entered: 11/07/2016)
2016-11-07Reset Deadlines as to 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion set for 12/19/2016 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (cm ) (Entered: 11/07/2016)
2016-12-0546Letter from Mr. Tokyo Gatson updating change of address. (seb) (Entered: 12/27/2016)
2016-12-1445Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 12/14/16. (cm ) (Entered: 12/15/2016)
2016-12-15CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please note the Discovery Confidentiality Order D.E. 45 filed by the Clerk's office on 12/14/16 was docketed in error. Please disregard. (cm ) (Entered: 12/15/2016)
2016-12-3047LETTER ORDER that Plaintiff shall file a response to Defendant's motion for summary judgment [Dkt. No. 28] no later than January 23, 2017. This motion shall be made returnable before the Honorable John Michael Vasquez, U.S.D.J., on February 6, 2016. If Plaintiff fails to file a timely response, Defendant's motion shall be considered unopposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 12/29/16. (sr, ) (Entered: 12/30/2016)
2017-03-1348Letter from Tokyo Gatson re 47 Order. (cm, ) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
2017-03-1749ORDER that the Court has not received any filings from the Plaintiff in opposition of the pending Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff shall resubmit his opposition to the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 3/17/17. (cm, ) (Entered: 03/17/2017)
2017-04-1750MEMORANDUM in Support filed by TOKYO GATSON re 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 cover letter, # 2 envelope)(cm, ) (Entered: 05/01/2017)
2017-05-0251Letter from the FBI regarding reply brief to summary judgment motion. (VASSALLO, KRISTIN) (Entered: 05/02/2017)
2017-05-0352ORDER permitting the Government to use their previous reply brief D.E. 40 as it's reply to Plaintiff's opposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 5/3/17. (cm, ) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
2017-08-3153OPINION. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 8/31/17. (cm, ) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
2017-08-3154ORDER granting Defendant's 28 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying Plaintiff's 31 Motion for Summary Judgment ***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 8/31/17. (cm, ) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff