Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePARKER v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSABILITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2015cv01070
Date Filed2015-07-08
Date Closed2017-08-16
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffLONNIE J. PARKER
Case DescriptionLonnie Parker submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice's Office of Professional Responsibility for records concerning any investigation or consideration of disciplinary action considered against former U.S. Assistant Attorney Lisa Gail Bridges Jackson for the unauthorized practice of law. OPR acknowledged receipt of the request and refused to confirm or deny the existence of records. Parker appealed the decision to the Office of Information Policy. After hearing nothing further pertaining to his appeal, Parker filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Determination - Glomar response, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSABILITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [33]
FOIA Project Annotation: After reviewing the redactions in camera, Judge James Boasberg has ruled that the Justice Department's Office of Professional Responsibility properly withheld personally-identifying information in records concerning the investigation of former AUSA Lesa Gail Bridges Jackson for continuing to practice law after her license was suspended under Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy) and Exemption 7(C) (invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records). Although he also found that OPR's referral of some records to EOUSA was proper, he agreed with Lonnie Parker that OPR was required to make a determination as to the applicability of EOUSA's exemption claims. Pursuant to news reports, Parker found out that Bridges Jackson had been investigated and dismissed as a result of not having a valid state license. He requested the investigation from EOUSA and OPR. EOUSA provided some records, but OPR initially issued a Glomar response neither confirming nor denying the existence of records. However, after OPR realized EOUSA had confirmed the existence of the investigation, it processed the records as well, locating 251 pages of potentially responsive records. OPR released 18 pages in full and withheld 20 pages in part and 149 pages in full under Exemption 5 (privileges) as well as the two privacy exemptions. OPR also referred 64 pages to EOUSA, the Justice Management Division, and the Office of Information Policy. Parker did not challenge the Exemption 5 claims, but did challenge the application of the privacy exemptions as well as the referral process. After his in camera review, Boasberg agreed with OPR that Bridges Jackson and other identified third parties had a privacy interest in the redacted information. He observed that "courts must distinguish between the public interest that can generally exist in a subject related to a FOIA request and the public interest that might or might not be served by disclosure of the specific records that are responsive to a given request. The key consideration is whether disclosure of the records at issue would serve an identified public interest and therefore warrant the overriding of personal privacy." Here, Boasberg was satisfied that the privacy interests outweighed any public interest in disclosure. Parker contended that OPR was responsible for ensuring that referred records were processed by the agency to which they were referred and that the referring agency had a legal obligation to review the exemption claims made by the agency to which the records were referred. Parker cited McGhee v. CIA, 697 F.2d 1095 (D.C. Cir. 1983), to support his position, but Boasberg noted that a more recent decision, Sussman v. U.S. Marshals Service, 494 F.3d 1106 (D.C. Cir. 2007), had clarified McGhee. He observed that "contrary to Parker's position, a component need not necessarily follow up on or independently review the disclosure decision of the component, agency, or office to which it referred the records for decision. Whether the referring agency retains a duty to act depends on whether the referral resulted in an improper withholding." Since EOUSA had withheld records, Boasberg indicated OPR had an obligation to review those claims. He pointed out that "OPR never provided a description of the specific legal bases for EOUSA's withholdings beyond the general citations to exemptions given in the form letter that accompanied EOUSA's production. The Vaughn Index supplied by OPR discusses the pages it withheld; it does not address EOUSA's withholdings. An agency, however, has the burden to establish that a claimed exemption applies."
Issues: Exemption 7(C) - Invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records, Search - Referral
Opinion/Order [47]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2015-07-081COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSABILITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4167445) filed by LONNIE J. PARKER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 07/08/2015)
2015-07-08Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (rd) (Entered: 07/08/2015)
2015-07-08SUMMONS Not Issued as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSABILITY (No summons submitted at the time of initial filing) (rd) (Entered: 07/08/2015)
2015-07-082REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE by LONNIE J. PARKER filed by LONNIE J. PARKER.(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 07/08/2015)
2015-07-093SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSABILITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (znmw) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
2015-07-284NOTICE of Appearance by Wyneva Johnson on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSABILITY (Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
2015-07-285Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSABILITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
2015-07-28MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. The Court ORDERS that Defendant shall file its response to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before September 17, 2015. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/28/15. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
2015-07-29Set/Reset Deadline: The Defendant shall file its response to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before 9/17/2015. (ad) (Entered: 07/29/2015)
2015-09-176MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSABILITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 09/17/2015)
2015-09-17MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by September 21, 2015. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/17/15. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 09/17/2015)
2015-09-18Set/Reset Deadline: Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 9/21/2015. (ad) (Entered: 09/18/2015)
2015-09-217WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED ON 11/02/2015.....MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSABILITY (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration (Declaration of Ginae Barnett), # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) Modified on 11/4/2015 (jf). (Entered: 09/21/2015)
2015-09-228ERRATA by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSABILITY 7 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSABILITY. (Attachments: # 1 (Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support), # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Declaration (Declaration of Ginae Barnett), # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
2015-09-289Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply AND FOR PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by LONNIE J. PARKER (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 09/28/2015)
2015-09-29MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court ORDERS that Plaintiff's combined Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed by October 14, 2015; Defendant DOJ OPR's combined Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Reply shall be filed by November 3, 2015; and Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed by November 20, 2015. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 09/29/2015. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 09/29/2015)
2015-09-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's combined Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed by 10/14/2015; Defendant DOJ OPR's combined Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Reply shall be filed by 11/03/2015; and Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed by 11/20/2015. (ad) (Entered: 09/30/2015)
2015-10-1410MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities by LONNIE J. PARKER (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration of Daniel J. Stotter and Exhibits A - C, # 3 Declaration of Dr. Lonnie J. Parker and Exhibits D - E, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 10/14/2015)
2015-10-1411RESPONSE re 7 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by LONNIE J. PARKER. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration of Daniel J. Stotter & Exhibits A - C, # 3 Declaration of Dr. Lonnie J. Parker & Exhibits D- E, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 10/14/2015)
2015-10-1412RESPONSE re 7 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Corrected) filed by LONNIE J. PARKER. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration of Daniel J. Stotter & Exhibits A - C, # 3 Declaration of Dr. Lonnie Parker & Exhibits D & E, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 10/14/2015)
2015-10-1413MOTION for Summary Judgment (Corrected) by LONNIE J. PARKER (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration of Daniel J. Stotter & Exhibits A - C, # 3 Declaration of Dr. Lonnie J. Parker & Exhibits D - E, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 10/14/2015)
2015-11-0314Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 7 MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSABILITY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Ginae Barnett, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 11/03/2015)
2015-11-03The Court ORDERS that: 1) Defendant's 14 Consent Motion is GRANTED; 2) By January 15, 2016, the parties shall file either a joint status report or a proposed briefing schedule; 3) Defendant's 7 Motion for Summary Judgment is WITHDRAWN; and 4) Plaintiff's 10 and 13 Motions are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as moot given Defendant's agreement to process the documents and withdraw its Glomar response. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/3/2015. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 11/03/2015)
2015-11-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report or Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 1/15/2016. (tg) (Entered: 11/04/2015)
2016-01-1515Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File their Joint Status Report by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSABILITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 01/15/2016)
2016-01-19MINUTE ORDER granting 15 Joint Motion for Enlargement of Time. The Court ORDERS that the parties shall file their Joint Status Report no later than February 10, 2016. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 01/19/2016. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 01/19/2016)
2016-01-19Set/Reset Deadline: The parties shall file their Joint Status Report no later than 2/10/2016. (ad) (Entered: 01/19/2016)
2016-02-0816NOTICE of Filing of Declaration of Ginae Barnett and Vaughn Index by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSABILITY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Ginae Barnett)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 02/08/2016)
2016-02-0817Vaughn Index from Defendant UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSABILITY. (See docket entry no. 16 to view document.) (ztd) (Entered: 02/09/2016)
2016-02-1018Joint STATUS REPORT & Proposed Briefing Schedule by LONNIE J. PARKER. (Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 02/10/2016)
2016-02-10MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' Joint 18 Proposed Briefing Schedule and ORDERS that Defendant shall file its Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by no later than April 1, 2016; Plaintiff shall file a combined Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition by no later than April 29, 2016; and Defendant shall files its Combined Reply and Opposition by no later than May 20, 2016. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 02/10/2016. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 02/10/2016)
2016-02-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall file its Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by no later than 4/01/2016; Plaintiff shall file a combined Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition by no later than 4/29/2016; and Defendant shall files its Combined Reply and Opposition by no later than 5/20/2016. (ad) (Entered: 02/10/2016)
2016-03-3019Consent MOTION for Briefing Schedule by LONNIE J. PARKER (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 03/30/2016)
2016-03-3020ERRATA (Corrected Proposed Order) by LONNIE J. PARKER 19 Consent MOTION for Briefing Schedule filed by LONNIE J. PARKER. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 03/30/2016)
2016-03-31NOTICE OF ERROR re 19 Motion for Briefing Schedule; emailed to dstotter@qwestoffice.net, cc'd 4 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Refile the Order only. It has the incorrect case number on it. Use the event under Notices,then select Notice of Proposed Order. (ztd, ) (Entered: 03/31/2016)
2016-03-3121ORDER granting 19 Consent Motion for Briefing Schedule by LONNIE J. PARKER. Defendant DOJ shall file its Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by no later than 4/15/2016; Plaintiff Parker shall file his combined Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant DOJ's Motion for Summary Judgment by no later than 5/13/2016; Defendant DOJ shall file its combined Reply In Support of Defendant's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition To Plaintiff's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment by no later than 6/03/2016. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/31/2016. (ad) (Entered: 03/31/2016)
2016-04-1422MOTION for Extension of Time to file Defendant's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSABILITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
2016-04-15MINUTE ORDER granting 22 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court ORDERS that Defendant shall file its Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by no later than April 18, 2016. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 04/15/2016. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
2016-04-15Set/Reset Deadline: The Defendant shall file its Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by no later than 4/18/2016. (ad) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
2016-04-1823MOTION for Summary Judgment (Renewed) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSABILITY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration (Revised Third Declaration of Ginae Barnett), # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
2016-05-3124Consent MOTION for Briefing Schedule - To Modify Briefing Schedule by LONNIE J. PARKER (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 05/31/2016)
2016-05-3125ERRATA Corrected Proposed Order on Consent Motion To Modify Briefing Schedule by LONNIE J. PARKER 24 Consent MOTION for Briefing Schedule - To Modify Briefing Schedule filed by LONNIE J. PARKER. (Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 05/31/2016)
2016-05-31MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's 24 Consent Motion to Modify Briefing Schedule. The Court ORDERS that Plaintiff shall file his combined Renewed Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition by no later than June 24, 2016; Defendant shall file its combined Reply and Opposition by no later than July 29, 2016; and Plaintiff shall file his Reply by no later than August 12, 2016. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 05/31/2016. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 05/31/2016)
2016-06-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff shall file his combined Renewed Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition by no later than 6/24/2016; Defendant shall file its combined Reply and Opposition by no later than 7/29/2016; and Plaintiff shall file his Reply by no later than 8/12/2016. (ad) (Entered: 06/01/2016)
2016-06-2426Renewed MOTION for Summary Judgment & Memorandum of Points & Authorities by LONNIE J. PARKER (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stotter, Daniel) Modified on 6/27/2016 (td). (Entered: 06/24/2016)
2016-06-2427Memorandum in opposition to re 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Renewed) filed by LONNIE J. PARKER. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 06/24/2016)
2016-07-2928Memorandum in opposition to re 26 MOTION for Summary Judgment & Memorandum of Points & Authorities filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSABILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration (Fourth Declaration of Ginae Barnett))(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
2016-07-2929REPLY to opposition to motion re 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Renewed) filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSABILITY. (Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
2016-08-1230REPLY to opposition to motion re 26 MOTION for Summary Judgment & Memorandum of Points & Authorities filed by LONNIE J. PARKER. (Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
2016-09-26MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that by September 28, 2016, Defendant shall produce for in camera review copies of documents designated as OPR-3, -4, -9, and -75. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 09/26/2016. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
2016-09-27Set/Reset Deadline: By 9/28/2016, Defendant shall produce for in camera review copies of documents designated as OPR-3, -4, -9, and -75. (ad) (Entered: 09/27/2016)
2016-09-2831NOTICE OF IN CAMERA REVIEW by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSABILITY re Order (Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 09/28/2016)
2016-10-1232ORDER: The Court ORDERS that Defendant's 23 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED as to all issues except the referral of documents to EOUSA. Plaintiff's 26 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. By October 26, 2016, Defendant shall provide a Vaughn Index for the records referred by OPR to EOUSA and withheld in part or in full. Unless Plaintiff indicates his satisfaction, Defendant shall renew its Motion for Summary Judgment by November 18, 2016. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/12/2016. (lcjeb3) Modified on 10/12/2016 to include the word "Order" within the entry (ad). (Entered: 10/12/2016)
2016-10-1233MEMORANDUM OPINION re 32 Order on Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/12/2016. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 10/12/2016)
2016-10-12Set/Reset Deadlines: By 10/26/2016, Defendant shall provide a Vaughn Index for the records referred by OPR to EOUSA and withheld in part or in full. Unless Plaintiff indicates his satisfaction, Defendant shall renew its Motion for Summary Judgment by 11/18/2016. (ad) (Entered: 10/12/2016)
2016-10-2634NOTICE of Filing Declaration and Vaughn Index from David Luczynski by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSABILITY re 32 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of David Luczynski)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 10/26/2016)
2016-12-06MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall file a joint status report by December 12, 2016. Such report shall indicate whether Plaintiff is challenging the Vaughn Index submitted on October 26, 2016. If so, the parties shall propose a briefing schedule; if not, Plaintiff shall show cause why the case should not be dismissed. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/6/16. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
2016-12-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/12/2016. (znbn) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
2016-12-0935Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSABILITY. (Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 12/09/2016)
2016-12-12MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to 35 Joint Status Report, (1) Defendant's motion for summary judgment shall be due on or before January 17, 2017, (2) Plaintiff's opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment shall be due on or before February 17, 2017, (3) Defendant's reply and cross-opposition shall be due on or before March 15, 2017, and (4) Plaintiff's cross-reply shall be due on or before March 29, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/12/16. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 12/12/2016)
2016-12-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 1/17/2017. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/17/2017. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/15/2017. Cross-replies due by 3/29/2017 (nbn) (Entered: 12/12/2016)
2017-01-1736Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file Defendant's Second Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSABILITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 01/17/2017)
2017-01-18MINUTE ORDER granting Consent 36 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court ORDERS that (1) Defendant's motion for summary judgment shall be due on or before January 19, 2017, (2) Plaintiff's opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment shall be due on or before February 22, 2017, (3) Defendant's reply and cross-opposition shall be due on or before March 22, 2017, and (4) Plaintiff's cross-reply shall be due on or before April 10, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/18/17. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
2017-01-1837Joint MOTION to Stay by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSABILITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
2017-01-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's motion for summary judgment shall be due on or before January 19, 2017, Plaintiff's opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment shall be due on or before February 22, 2017, Defendant's reply and cross-opposition shall be due on or before March 22, 2017, and Plaintiff's cross-reply shall be due on or before April 10, 2017. (nbn) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
2017-01-23MINUTE ORDER granting 37 Motion to Stay. The Court ORDERS that this case is STAYED until February 8, 2017. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before February 22, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/23/17. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
2017-01-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Case Stayed until 2/8/2017. Joint Status Report due by 2/22/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
2017-02-2238Joint STATUS REPORT & Proposed Briefing Schedule by LONNIE J. PARKER. (Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
2017-02-23MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the parties' 38 Joint Status Report, the Court ORDERS that: (1) Defendant shall file its renewed motion for summary judgment on or before March 15, 2017, (2) Plaintiff shall file his renewed cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to Defendant's motion on or before April 24, 2017, (3) Defendant shall file its reply and opposition to Plaintiff's cross-motion on or before June 2, 2017, and (4) Plaintiff shall file his reply on or before July 7, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/23/17. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
2017-02-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall file its renewed motion for summary judgment on or before March 15, 2017. Plaintiff shall file his renewed cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to Defendant's motion on or before April 24, 2017. Defendant shall file its reply and opposition to Plaintiff's cross-motion on or before June 2, 2017. Plaintiff shall file his reply on or before July 7, 2017. (nbn) (Entered: 02/24/2017)
2017-03-1039MOTION for Summary Judgment (Defendant's Second Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to The Court's October 12, 2016 Order) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSABILITY (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration (Declaration of David Luczynski), # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 03/10/2017)
2017-03-2940MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points & Authorities by LONNIE J. PARKER (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 03/29/2017)
2017-03-2941Memorandum in opposition to re 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Defendant's Second Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to The Court's October 12, 2016 Order) filed by LONNIE J. PARKER. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 03/29/2017)
2017-06-0242Memorandum in opposition to re 40 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points & Authorities filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSABILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration (Fifth Declaration of Ginae Barnett))(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
2017-06-0243REPLY to opposition to motion re 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Defendant's Second Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to The Court's October 12, 2016 Order) filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSABILITY. (Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
2017-07-0744REPLY to opposition to motion re 40 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points & Authorities filed by LONNIE J. PARKER. (Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
2017-07-20MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that, by July 24, 2017, the Government shall produce for in camera review a copy of the October 1999 draft letter from Paula J. Casey, referenced as an attachment to the May 26, 2000, letter from Casey. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/20/17. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
2017-07-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Government shall produce for in camera review due by 7/24/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
2017-07-2745NOTICE (Notice of Submission of Document for In Camera Review) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSABILITY re Order, (Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
2017-08-1646ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Defendant's 39 Motion for Summary Judgment and GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Plaintiff's 40 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court ORDERS that Defendant shall release portions of the Casey Letter attachment on or before August 30, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/16/17. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 08/16/2017)
2017-08-1647MEMORANDUM OPINION re 46 Order on Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/16/17. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 08/16/2017)
2017-08-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall release portions of the Casey Letter attachment on or before 8/30/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 08/16/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff