Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEOPOLD v. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2015cv01105
Date Filed2015-07-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffJASON LEOPOLD
Case DescriptionJournalist Jason Leopold submitted a FOIA request to the Defense Intelligence Agency for a report it prepared assessing the damage done by Edward Snowden's disclosures. DIA disclosed records, which referred to an interagency review task force. Leopold then requested records concerning the task force. He also asked for expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Leopold filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2015-07-131COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4173541) filed by JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/13/2015)
2015-07-132NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by JASON LEOPOLD. Case related to Case No. 1:14-cv-197-TSC. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/13/2015)
2015-07-13Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (md) (Entered: 07/14/2015)
2015-07-143SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 07/14/2015)
2015-08-214AMENDED COMPLAINT (First) against DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE filed by JASON LEOPOLD.(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/21/2015)
2015-09-025RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/21/2015. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/20/2015.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/21/2015. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/02/2015)
2015-10-026NOTICE of Appearance by Julia A. Berman on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Berman, Julia) (Entered: 10/02/2015)
2015-10-027Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 4 Amended Complaint Nunc Pro Tunc by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berman, Julia) (Entered: 10/02/2015)
2015-10-06MINUTE ORDER: Granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint not later than October 16, 2015. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/6/15. (DJS) (Entered: 10/06/2015)
2015-10-168ANSWER to 4 Amended Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. Related document: 4 Amended Complaint filed by JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Berman, Julia) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
2015-10-18MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule shall address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues and that contains a proposed schedule and order not later than 11/2/15. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/18/15. (DJS) (Entered: 10/18/2015)
2015-10-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 11/2/2015 (zsm) (Entered: 10/19/2015)
2015-11-029Joint STATUS REPORT by JASON LEOPOLD. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/02/2015)
2015-11-03MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the Joint Status Report filed by the parties 9 , it is hereby ordered that not later than January 6, 2016, the parties shall file a jointly proposed schedule and proposed order for moving forward with this action. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/3/15. (DJS) (Entered: 11/03/2015)
2015-11-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 1/6/2016 (zsm) (Entered: 11/03/2015)
2016-01-0610Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berman, Julia) (Entered: 01/06/2016)
2016-01-07MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the Joint Status Report filed by the parties 10 , it is hereby ordered that not later than May 13, 2016, the parties shall file a jointly proposed schedule and proposed order for moving forward with this action. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/7/16. (DJS) (Entered: 01/07/2016)
2016-01-07Set/Reset Deadlines: jointly proposed schedule and proposed order due by 5/13/2016. (tth) (Entered: 01/07/2016)
2016-05-1311Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berman, Julia) (Entered: 05/13/2016)
2016-05-16MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the Joint Status Report 11 filed by the parties, it is hereby ordered that the Defendant shall submit an interim status report on June 30, 2016 apprising the Court and the Plaintiff of the status of its review. Defendant shall complete its responsiveness review by August 31, 2016, and that the parties shall submit a joint status report and PROPOSED ORDER on August 31, 2016, following the completion of that review, proposing a schedule on which the Defendant will process the documents identified as responsive and produce non-exempt, responsive records to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/16/16. (DJS) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
2016-05-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 6/30/2016. Joint Status Report and Proposed Order due by 8/31/2016. (zsm) (Entered: 05/17/2016)
2016-06-3012STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Berman, Julia) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
2016-08-3113Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Berman, Julia) (Entered: 08/31/2016)
2016-09-03MINUTE ORDER: Not later than 9/7//16 the parties shall file a jointly proposed ORDER setting forth any agreements they have reached 13 regarding the proposed schedule for production of documents. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 9/3/16. (DJS) (Entered: 09/03/2016)
2016-09-0614Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Order regarding production schedule by JASON LEOPOLD (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/06/2016)
2016-09-07MINUTE ORDER: Granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Order. By 9/14/16 the parties shall file a jointly proposed ORDER setting forth any agreements they have reached regarding the proposed schedule for production of documents, along with a proposed date for the next Joint Status Report. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 9/7/16. (DJS) (Entered: 09/07/2016)
2016-09-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 9/14/2016 (zsm) (Entered: 09/07/2016)
2016-09-1415PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE submitted jointly with Plaintiff by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Berman, Julia) (Entered: 09/14/2016)
2016-09-15MINUTE ORDER: Defendant shall produce non-exempt, responsive records to the Plaintiff on a rolling basis, beginning on September 30, 2016, and continuing monthly. Defendant shall conclude its rolling productions by January 31, 2017, and that, if any records require substantially more time to process because they require processing by multiple offices, the Defendant shall notify the Plaintiff and shall seek additional time to complete that portion of the production if necessary. Defendant shall submit status reports on October 28, 2016 and December 30, 2016. In those reports, Defendant shall include page counts processed and the page counts released to the Plaintiff, as well as the Defendant's assessment, based on information available at that time, as to whether the Defendant anticipates being able to meet the January 31, 2017 deadline. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report (ALONG WITH A PROPOSED ORDER) on FEBURARY 14, 2017, apprising the Court of how they propose to move forward in this matter. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 9/15/16. (DJS) (Entered: 09/15/2016)
2016-09-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 10/28/2016. Additional Status Report due by 12/30/2016. Proposed Order and Joint Status Report due by 2/14/2017 (zsm) (Entered: 09/15/2016)
2016-10-2816STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Berman, Julia) (Entered: 10/28/2016)
2016-12-3017STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Berman, Julia) (Entered: 12/30/2016)
2017-01-3118Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Processing of Responsive Documents by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alesia F. Williams, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Berman, Julia) (Entered: 01/31/2017)
2017-02-01MINUTE ORDER: Granting 18 Consent Motion for Extension of Deadlines. Defendant shall continue to make monthly productions to Plaintiff of nonexempt responsive records. The parties shall submit a Joint Status Report on July 31, 2017, indicating whether Defendant has completed processing and production of nonexempt responsive records. The Joint Status Report shall include a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/1/17. (DJS) (Entered: 02/01/2017)
2017-02-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report and Proposed Order due by 7/31/2017. (tb) (Entered: 02/02/2017)
2017-07-3119Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berman, Julia) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
2017-08-01MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' Joint Status Report 19 , it is hereby ordered that that Defendant shall complete its production of non-exempt responsive documents not requiring outside consultation by August 31, 2017, and its production of any remaining non-exempt responsive documents by October 2, 2017. The parties shall confer following the final production and submit a joint status report to the Court on October 31, 2017, apprising the Court of whether further litigation in this matter will be necessary. If further litigation is necessary, the parties' joint status report shall include a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/1/17. (DJS) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
2017-08-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/31/2017. (tb) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff