Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBURKE v. EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2015cv01151
Date Filed2015-07-20
Date Closed2018-03-20
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffROBERT BURKE
Case DescriptionRobert Burke, a federal prisoner, submitted a number of FOIA requests to the Executive Office for U.S. Attorneys for records pertaining to his conviction in the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Burke alleged that many of the requests had gone unanswered and he finally filed suit, against several components of the Justice Department, as well as the IRS and the National Archives.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantEXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS Counts I thru XXIV & LVI
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION Counts XXV thru XXXXV
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS Counts XXXXVI thru IL
DefendantUNITED STATES MARSHAL SERVICE Counts L thru LII
DefendantINTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE Counts LIII thru LV
DefendantNATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORD ADMINISTRATION Maryland and Philadelphia
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [59]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2015-07-201COMPLAINT against EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, UNITED STATES MARSHAL SERVICE (Filing fee $ 0.00) filed by ROBERT B. BURKE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/22/2015) (intake1, ). (Entered: 07/21/2015)
2015-07-205SUMMONS (7) Issued as to EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, UNITED STATES MARSHAL SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf). Modified on 7/21/2015 (rd). (Entered: 07/21/2015)
2015-07-202MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ROBERT B. BURKE (jf) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
2015-07-203PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by ROBERT B. BURKE. (jf) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
2015-07-204ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $70.36 from Prison Account of Robert B. Burke; further ordered, granting 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 07/09/2015. (jf) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
2015-07-22NOTICE: 4 Order mailed to ROBERT B. BURKE at court's address of record. (mac) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
2015-07-286RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS served on 7/24/2015; FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 7/24/2015, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/24/2015., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/24/2015. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/23/2015.) (jf) (Entered: 07/29/2015)
2015-08-127RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to non-party William E. Bordley. (jf) (Entered: 08/13/2015)
2015-08-218NOTICE of Appearance by Marina Utgoff Braswell on behalf of EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, UNITED STATES MARSHAL SERVICE (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 08/21/2015)
2015-08-219MOTION for Extension of Time to to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, UNITED STATES MARSHAL SERVICE (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 08/21/2015)
2015-08-26MINUTE ORDER granting nunc pro tunc 9 Defendants' Motion for an Extension of Time to October 23, 2015, to respond to the complaint. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/26/15.(ah) (Entered: 08/26/2015)
2015-08-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 10/23/2015. (mac) (Entered: 08/27/2015)
2015-08-27NOTICE: Minute Order Filed 8/26/15 mailed to ROBERT BURKE at court's address of record. (mac) (Entered: 08/27/2015)
2015-10-2210MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the Complaint by EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, UNITED STATES MARSHAL SERVICE (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 10/22/2015)
2015-10-2611ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE.(Carter, Kieran) (Entered: 10/26/2015)
2015-10-2612NOTICE of Appearance by Kieran O'Neill Carter on behalf of INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Carter, Kieran) (Entered: 10/26/2015)
2015-11-02MINUTE ORDER granting upon good cause shown 10 Defendants' Motion for an Extension of Time to November 24, 2015, to respond to the complaint. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 11/2/15.(ah) (Entered: 11/02/2015)
2015-11-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 11/24/2015, (mac) (Entered: 11/02/2015)
2015-11-0513MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, by ROBERT BURKE (td) (Entered: 11/06/2015)
2015-11-0914MOTION for Extension of Time by ROBERT BURKE (jf) (Entered: 11/12/2015)
2015-11-2315RESPONSE re 13 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, filed by EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, UNITED STATES MARSHAL SERVICE. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 11/24/2015)
2015-11-2416MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint, as Amended by EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, UNITED STATES MARSHAL SERVICE (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 11/24/2015)
2015-11-2417RESPONSE re 11 Answer to Complaint filed by ROBERT BURKE. (jf) (Entered: 11/30/2015)
2015-12-01MINUTE ORDER granting as unopposed 13 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Complaint. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 12/1/5.(ah) (Entered: 12/01/2015)
2015-12-01MINUTE ORDER granting 16 Defendants' Motion for an Extension of Time to January 8, 2016, to respond to the complaint. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 12/1/15.(ah) (Entered: 12/01/2015)
2015-12-01MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 14 Plaintiff's Motion for an Extension of Time to respond to any prospective dispositive motion. As a pro se party, plaintiff will be advised when the time comes about responding to a dispositive motion, and he will be given a deadline for filing a response. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 12/1/15.(ah) (Entered: 12/01/2015)
2015-12-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 1/8/2016. (mac) (Entered: 12/01/2015)
2015-12-2118MOTION serve the National Archives and Record Administration with complaint by ROBERT BURKE (jf) (Entered: 12/23/2015)
2015-12-2819MOTION for Discovery by ROBERT BURKE (jf) (Entered: 12/30/2015)
2015-12-30Civil Filing fee paid in full re 4 ORDER (jf) (Entered: 12/30/2015)
2016-01-0620MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint, as Amended by EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, UNITED STATES MARSHAL SERVICE (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 01/06/2016)
2016-01-1421Memorandum in opposition to re 19 MOTION for Discovery filed by EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS. (Attachments: # 1 Jolly Declaration)(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 01/14/2016)
2016-02-1922MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to The Complaint, as Amended by EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, UNITED STATES MARSHAL SERVICE (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 02/19/2016)
2016-02-24MINUTE ORDER granting nunc pro tunc 20 Defendants' Motion for an Extension of Time to respond to the complaint. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 2/24/16.(ah) (Entered: 02/24/2016)
2016-02-24MINUTE ORDER granting nunc pro tunc 22 Defendants' Motion for an Extension of Time to March 30, 2016, to respond to the amended complaint. Based on counsel's representations, the Court anticipates that defendants' response will be a motion for summary judgment. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 2/24/16.(ah) (Entered: 02/24/2016)
2016-02-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 3/30/2016. (mac) (Entered: 02/24/2016)
2016-02-2423SUMMONS (1) Issued as to NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORD ADMINISTRATION. (College Park, Maryland Location) (md) (Entered: 02/24/2016)
2016-02-25MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 18 plaintiff's motion for issuance of summons, in light of Feb. 24, 2016 docket entry reflecting issuance of the summons. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 2/25/16.(ah) (Entered: 02/25/2016)
2016-02-2924SUMMONS Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORD ADMINISTRATION (Philadelphia Location). (md) (Entered: 02/29/2016)
2016-02-2925MOTION to Expedite Service of the Complaint by ROBERT BURKE (jf) (Entered: 03/02/2016)
2016-03-02MINUTE ORDER denying 25 Plaintiff's Motion to Expedite Service of NARA. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/2/16.(ah) (Entered: 03/02/2016)
2016-03-1426NOTICE of Change of Address by ROBERT BURKE. (md) (Entered: 03/15/2016)
2016-03-2427RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORD ADMINISTRATION served on 3/11/2016 (zrdj) (Entered: 03/25/2016)
2016-03-3028MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion Responding to the Complaint by EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORD ADMINISTRATION, UNITED STATES MARSHAL SERVICE (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 03/30/2016)
2016-03-31MINUTE ORDER granting 28 Defendants' Motion for a two-day Extension of Time to File a dispositive motion. Defendants shall file their motion on April 1, 2016. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/31/16.(ah) (Entered: 03/31/2016)
2016-03-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Dispositive Motion due by 4/1/2016. (mac) (Entered: 03/31/2016)
2016-04-0129MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion by EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORD ADMINISTRATION, UNITED STATES MARSHAL SERVICE (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 04/01/2016)
2016-04-04MINUTE ORDER granting 29 Defendants' Motion for an Extension of Time by one day, to April 4, 2016, to file a dispositive motion. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 4/4/16.(ah) (Entered: 04/04/2016)
2016-04-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Dispositive Motion due by 4/4/2016. (mac) (Entered: 04/04/2016)
2016-04-0430MOTION for Summary Judgment by EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORD ADMINISTRATION, UNITED STATES MARSHAL SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Scanlon Declaration and Exhibits, # 2 Bordley Declaration and Exhibits, # 3 Lathrop Declarations, # 4 Lathrop Exhibits, # 5 Littlejohn Declaration, # 6 Blow Declarations, # 7 Blow Attachment 1, # 8 Blow Attachment 2, # 9 Blow Attachment 3, # 10 Blow Attachment 4)(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 04/04/2016)
2016-04-0531NOTICE of Filing of Declarations by EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORD ADMINISTRATION, UNITED STATES MARSHAL SERVICE re 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Hardy Declaration, # 2 Hardy Declaration Exhibits A-W, # 3 Hardy Declaration Exhibits X-WW, # 4 Hardy Declaration Exhibits XX-LLL, # 5 Jolly Declaration, # 6 Jolly Vaughn Index, # 7 Jolly Declaration Exhibit 1, # 8 Jolly Declaration Exhibit 2, # 9 Jolly Declaration Exhibit 3, # 10 Jolly Declaration Exhibit 4, # 11 Falken Declaration, # 12 Williams Declaration)(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 04/05/2016)
2016-04-1432MOTION for Extension of Time by ROBERT BURKE (zjf) (Entered: 04/19/2016)
2016-04-2033Order advising plaintiff to respond by June 3, 2016, to the defendants' motion for summary judgment or risk entry of judgment for the moving defendants on what will be treated as a conceded motion (see written order for details). Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 4/20/16.(ah) (Entered: 04/20/2016)
2016-04-20MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 32 Plaintiff's Motion for an Extension of Time to June 1, 2016, to respond to defendants' motion for summary judgment, in light of the advisements set forth in the Court's order issued separately this day. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 4/20/16.(ah) (Entered: 04/20/2016)
2016-04-20MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 19 Plaintiff's Motion for Discovery. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 4/20/16.(ah) (Entered: 04/20/2016)
2016-04-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff Response to Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment due by 6/3/2016. (mac) (Entered: 04/21/2016)
2016-04-2834MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION for Summary Judgment by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Declaration of Denise Higley, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Text of Proposed Order for Motion to Dismiss, # 9 Text of Proposed Order for Motion for Summary Judgment)(Carter, Kieran) (Entered: 04/28/2016)
2016-05-0335Order advising plaintiff to respond by June 30, 2016, to the IRS's dispositive motion or risk summary dismissal of certain counts of the complaint or entry of judgment in the IRS's favor on what will be treated as a conceded motion (see written order for details). Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 5/3/16.(ah) (Entered: 05/03/2016)
2016-05-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff Response due by 6/30/2016 to the IRS's dispositive motion. (mac) (Entered: 05/04/2016)
2016-05-2636Memorandum in opposition to re 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 34 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ROBERT BURKE. (jf) (Entered: 05/27/2016)
2016-06-0937MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment by EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORD ADMINISTRATION, UNITED STATES MARSHAL SERVICE (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
2016-06-14MINUTE ORDER granting 37 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to July 8, 2016, to file a reply brief. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 6/14/16.(ah) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
2016-06-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Reply due by 7/8/2016. (mac) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
2016-06-1638RESPONSE re 11 Answer to Complaint filed by ROBERT BURKE. (jf) (Entered: 06/20/2016)
2016-06-2239REPLY to opposition to motion re 34 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Carter, Kieran) (Entered: 06/22/2016)
2016-07-0640MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment by EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORD ADMINISTRATION, UNITED STATES MARSHAL SERVICE (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 07/06/2016)
2016-07-07MINUTE ORDER granting 40 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendants shall respond to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment no later than July 26, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on July 7, 2016. (lcegs4) (Entered: 07/07/2016)
2016-07-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants Response To Plaintiff's Motion For Summary Judgment due by 7/26/2016. (mac) (Entered: 07/08/2016)
2016-07-2641MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment by EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORD ADMINISTRATION, UNITED STATES MARSHAL SERVICE (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 07/26/2016)
2016-08-02MINUTE ORDER granting 41 Defendants' Motion for an Extension of Time to August 10, 2016, to File a Reply. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/2/16.(ah) (Entered: 08/02/2016)
2016-08-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Reply due by 8/10/2016. (mac) (Entered: 08/02/2016)
2016-08-1042MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment by EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORD ADMINISTRATION, UNITED STATES MARSHAL SERVICE (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 08/10/2016)
2016-08-11MINUTE ORDER granting 42 Defendants' Motion for an Extension of Time to August 25, 2016, to file reply. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/11/16.(ah) (Entered: 08/11/2016)
2016-08-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' Reply due by 8/25/2016. (mac) (Entered: 08/11/2016)
2016-08-2543MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment by EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORD ADMINISTRATION, UNITED STATES MARSHAL SERVICE (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 08/25/2016)
2016-08-30MINUTE ORDER granting 43 Defendants' Motion for an Extension of Time to August 31, 2016, to file reply. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/30/16.(ah) (Entered: 08/30/2016)
2016-08-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply due by 8/31/2016. (mac) (Entered: 08/31/2016)
2016-08-3144REPLY to opposition to motion re 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORD ADMINISTRATION, UNITED STATES MARSHAL SERVICE. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 08/31/2016)
2016-10-1745MOTION for an in camera inspection by ROBERT BURKE (jf) (Entered: 10/19/2016)
2016-10-3146RESPONSE re 45 MOTION for an in camera inspection filed by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Carter, Kieran) (Entered: 10/31/2016)
2016-11-0347Memorandum in opposition to re 45 MOTION for an in camera inspection filed by EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORD ADMINISTRATION, UNITED STATES MARSHAL SERVICE. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 11/03/2016)
2016-11-1748MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to 45 MOTION for an in camera inspection by ROBERT BURKE. "Let this be filed" signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 11/16/2016 (jf) (Entered: 11/18/2016)
2016-11-2149REPLY to opposition to re 45 MOTION for an in camera inspection filed by ROBERT BURKE. (jf) (Entered: 11/23/2016)
2017-03-21MINUTE ORDER granting nunc pro tunc 48 Plaintiff's Motion for an Extension of Time to File his Reply, which has been filed and docketed 49 . SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/21/17.(ah) (Entered: 03/21/2017)
2017-03-3050MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 30 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 34 Internal Revenue Service's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 45 Plaintiff's Motion for an In Camera Inspection; directing the Defendants to supplement the record by May 5, 2017, as to certain FBI records and EOUSA's referral of records to USPIS. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/30/17.(ah) (Entered: 03/30/2017)
2017-03-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants To Supplement The Record As To Certain FBI Records and EOUSA's Referral Of Records to USPIS due by 5/5/2017. (mac) (Entered: 03/30/2017)
2017-05-0151MOTION for Extension of Time to file renewed motion for summary judgment by EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 05/01/2017)
2017-05-3052MOTION for Extension of Time to File Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
2017-06-01MINUTE ORDER granting nunc pro tunc 51 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 6/1/17.(ah) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
2017-06-01MINUTE ORDER granting 52 Defendants' Motion for an Extension of Time to June 14, 2017, to file renewed motion for summary judgment. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 6/1/17.(ah) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
2017-06-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Renewed Summary Judgment motions due by 6/14/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
2017-06-1453MOTION for Extension of Time to File Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 06/14/2017)
2017-06-1954MOTION for Summary Judgment , Renewed, by EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Second Hardy Declaration, # 2 Exhibits to Second Hardy Declaration, # 3 Warner Declaration, # 4 Mungin Declaration)(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-06-20MINUTE ORDER granting nunc pro tunc 53 Defendants' Motion for an Extension of Time to file a renewed motion for summary judgment. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 6/20/17.(ah) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
2017-06-2055Order advising plaintiff to respond by July 31, 2017, to defendants' renewed motion for summary judgment or risk entry of judgment for the defendants based on their uncontested factual assertions (see written order for details). Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 6/20/17.(ah) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
2017-06-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff Response To Defendants' Renewed Motion For Summary Judgment Or Risk Entry Of Judgment due by 7/31/2017 (mac) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
2017-07-3156Memorandum in opposition to re 54 Renewed MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by ROBERT BURKE. (jf) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
2017-08-0857REPLY to opposition to motion re 54 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Renewed, filed by EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
2018-03-2058ORDER granting 54 Defendants' Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment, entering judgment in Defendants' favor and closing the case, for the reasons stated in the Memorandum Opinion issued separately this day and in the March 30, 2017 Memorandum Opinion. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/20/18.(ah) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
2018-03-2059MEMORANDUM OPINION accompanying final order issued separately this day. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/20/18.(ah) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff