Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleKING v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2015cv01445
Date Filed2015-09-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffRICHARD ALAN KING
Case DescriptionRichard Alan Young, a federal prisoner, submitted FOIA requests to various components of the Department of Justice for specific case files involving his investigation and conviction. After DOJ failed to respond, Young filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Recovery of Costs

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [46]
Opinion/Order [47]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2015-09-031COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE filed by RICHARD ALAN KING. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(zrdj) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
2015-09-032MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by RICHARD ALAN KING (zrdj) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
2015-09-033PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by RICHARD ALAN KING (zrdj) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
2015-09-034ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $19.83 be made from Prison Account of RICHARD ALAN KING ; further ordered, granting 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (See Order for full details). Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/1/2015. (zrdj) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
2015-09-045SUMMONS (3) Issued as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (md) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
2015-09-216RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 9/9/2015, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/9/2015., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/9/2015. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/9/2015.) (zrdj) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
2015-10-027NOTICE of Appearance by Jodi George on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (George, Jodi) (Entered: 10/02/2015)
2015-10-058MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (George, Jodi) (Entered: 10/05/2015)
2015-10-05MINUTE ORDER: Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time 8 is hereby GRANTED. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint 1 on or before November 6, 2015. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/5/2015. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 10/05/2015)
2015-10-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 11/6/2015 to the Complaint 1 . (dot) (Entered: 10/06/2015)
2015-11-059ANSWER to 1 Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(George, Jodi) (Entered: 11/05/2015)
2015-11-0510PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 9 Answer to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (George, Jodi) (Entered: 11/05/2015)
2015-11-0511ENTERED IN ERROR.....ORDER: Defendant's Motion for a Proposed Briefing Schedule 9 is hereby GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/5/2015. (lcrdm2, ) Modified on 11/6/2015 incorrect dates in attached Order (kt). (Entered: 11/05/2015)
2015-11-0612ORDER: Defendant's Motion for a Proposed Briefing Schedule 9 is hereby GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; Defendant shall file its Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Motion to Dismiss and any Vaughn index on or before December 7, 2015; Plaintiff shall file his opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Motion to Dismiss on or before January 4, 2016; andDefendant shall file a reply, if necessary, in support of its Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Motion to Dismiss on or before January 18, 2016. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/5/2015. (kt) (Entered: 11/06/2015)
2015-11-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall file its Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Motion to Dismiss and any Vaughn index on or before 12/7/2015; Plaintiff shall file his opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Motion to Dismiss on or before 1/4/2016; Defendant shall file a reply, if necessary, in support of its Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Motion to Dismiss on or before 1/18/2016. (kt) (Entered: 11/06/2015)
2015-12-0213NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Steven Taylor on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Taylor, Michael) (Entered: 12/02/2015)
2015-12-0214NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Michael Steven Taylor on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE Substituting for attorney Jodi George (Taylor, Michael) (Entered: 12/02/2015)
2015-12-0215MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Motion to Dismiss by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Taylor, Michael) (Entered: 12/02/2015)
2015-12-02MINUTE ORDER: Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time 15 is hereby GRANTED. Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment and/or motion to dismiss on or before December 21, 2015. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/2/2015. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 12/02/2015)
2015-12-02Set/Reset Deadline: Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment and/or motion to dismiss on or before 12/21/2015. (kt) (Entered: 12/02/2015)
2015-12-2116Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Motion to Dismiss by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Taylor, Michael) (Entered: 12/21/2015)
2015-12-21MINUTE ORDER: Defendant's Second Motion for Extension of Time 16 is hereby GRANTED. Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment and/or motion to dismiss on or before February 25, 2016. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/21/2015. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 12/21/2015)
2015-12-22Set/Reset Deadline: Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment and/or motion to dismiss on or before 2/25/2016. (kt) (Entered: 12/22/2015)
2016-02-0917MOTION for Referral to the Office of Professional Responsibility for Misconduct by RICHARD ALAN KING (zrdj) (Entered: 02/12/2016)
2016-02-0918MOTION for Referrel to the Office of the Inspector General by RICHARD ALAN KING (zrdj) (Entered: 02/12/2016)
2016-02-0919MOTION for Sanctions by RICHARD ALAN KING (zrdj) (Entered: 02/12/2016)
2016-02-0920MOTION for Declaratory Judgment by RICHARD ALAN KING (zrdj) (Entered: 02/12/2016)
2016-02-0921MOTION to Take Judicial Notice by RICHARD ALAN KING (zrdj) (Entered: 02/12/2016)
2016-02-10Partial Filing Fee Received from RICHARD ALAN KING in the amount of $10.00, receipt number: 4616075913. (zrdj) (Entered: 02/10/2016)
2016-02-2322RESPONSE re 17 MOTION for Referral to the Office of Professional Responsibility for Misconduct, 21 MOTION to Take Judicial Notice, 18 MOTION for Referrel to the Office of the Inspector General, 20 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment, 19 MOTION for Sanctions filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Taylor, Michael) (Entered: 02/23/2016)
2016-02-2523Third MOTION for Extension of Time to file Motion for Summary Judment and/or Motion to Dismiss by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Taylor, Michael) (Entered: 02/25/2016)
2016-02-2524SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 23 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to file Motion for Summary Judment and/or Motion to Dismiss (corrected memorandum) filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Taylor, Michael) (Entered: 02/25/2016)
2016-02-2525MINUTE ORDER: Defendant's Third Motion for Extension of Time 23 is hereby GRANTED. Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment and/or motion to dismiss on or before March 3, 2016. No further extensions of time will be granted absent a showing of extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/25/2016. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 02/25/2016)
2016-02-26Set/Reset Deadline: Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment and/or motion to dismiss on or before by 3/3/2016. (kt) (Entered: 02/26/2016)
2016-03-0326MOTION to Dismiss and/or Motion For Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Declaration of Katherine Myrick, # 4 Declaration of David Hardy, # 5 Declaration of David Luczynski, # 6 Declaration of Valerie Yancey, # 7 Text of Proposed Order, # 8 Certificate of Service)(Taylor, Michael). Added MOTION for Summary Judgment on 3/4/2016 (zrdj). (Entered: 03/03/2016)
2016-03-0427ORDER: Plaintiff shall respond to the Department's motion for summary judgment on or before April 15, 2016. If Plaintiff wishes to file a cross-motion for summary judgment, he shall do so on or before that date. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/4/2016. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 03/04/2016)
2016-03-07Set/Reset Deadline: Plaintiff shall respond to the Department's motion for summary judgment on or before 4/15/2016. (kt) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
2016-03-2328Memorandum in opposition to re 26 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Motion For Summary Judgment MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by RICHARD ALAN KING. (zrdj) (Entered: 03/25/2016)
2016-04-0429ORDER: For the reasons set out in the attached Order, King's motions for sanctions 17 18 19 , motion for a declaratory judgment 20 , and motion to take judicial notice 21 are hereby DENIED. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/4/2016. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 04/04/2016)
2016-04-0730MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 26 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Motion For Summary Judgment MOTION for Summary Judgment by RICHARD ALAN KING (zrdj) (Entered: 04/11/2016)
2016-04-1131ORDER: Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time 30 is hereby GRANTED. Plaintiff may file his opposition to the Department's motion to dismiss and/or motion for summary judgment, as well as his cross-motion for summary judgment, if any, on or before June 15, 2016. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/11/2016. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 04/11/2016)
2016-04-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff may file his opposition to the Department's motion to dismiss and/or motion for summary judgment, as well as his cross-motion for summary judgment, if any, on or before 6/15/2016. (kt) (Entered: 04/11/2016)
2016-04-13Partial Filing Fee Received from RICHARD ALAN KING in the amount of $10.10, receipt number: 4616077043. (zrdj) (Entered: 04/13/2016)
2016-05-0932NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Michael Benjamin Posner on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE Substituting for attorney Michael S.Taylor (Posner, Michael) (Entered: 05/09/2016)
2016-05-11Partial Filing Fee Received from RICHARD ALAN KING in the amount of $10.25, receipt number: 4616077519. (zrdj) (Entered: 05/12/2016)
2016-06-0933Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 26 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Motion For Summary Judgment by RICHARD ALAN KING (jf) (Entered: 06/13/2016)
2016-06-1334ORDER: Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time 33 is hereby GRANTED. Plaintiff may file his opposition to the Department's motion to dismiss and/or motion for summary judgment as well as his cross-motion for summary judgment, if any, on or before August 15, 2016. The Clerk of Court is hereby directed to send Plaintiff a copy of the Department's motion as it appears on the public docket, as well as a printout of the public docket. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/13/2016. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 06/13/2016)
2016-06-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff may file his opposition to the Department's motion to dismiss and/or motion for summary judgment as well as his cross-motion for summary judgment, if any, on or before 8/15/2016. (kt) (Entered: 06/13/2016)
2016-06-13Partial Filing Fee Received from RICHARD ALAN KING in the amount of $10.30, receipt number: 4616078429. (zrdj) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
2016-07-1335Letter to the Court from RICHARD ALAN KING "LEAVE TO FILE GRANTED", by Judge Randolph D. Moss(zrdj) (Entered: 07/13/2016)
2016-07-18Partial Filing Fee Received from RICHARD ALAN KING in the amount of $10.85, receipt number: 4616079450. (zrdj) (Entered: 07/18/2016)
2016-08-09Partial Filing Fee Received from RICHARD ALAN KING in the amount of $20.00, receipt number: 4616079811. (zrdj) (Entered: 08/09/2016)
2016-08-1136MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 26 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Motion For Summary Judgment MOTION for Summary Judgment by RICHARD ALAN KING (zrdj) (Entered: 08/15/2016)
2016-08-2437ORDER: Upon consideration of plaintiff's third motion for an extension of time 36 , the motion is hereby GRANTED in part. Plaintiff may file his response to defendant's motion to dismiss and/or motion for summary judgment, as well as his cross-motion for summary judgment, if any, on or before October 7, 2016. No further extensions of time will be granted absent a showing of extraordinary circumstances. See order for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/24/2016. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 08/24/2016)
2016-08-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff may file his response to defendant's motion to dismiss and/or motion for summary judgment, as well as his cross-motion for summary judgment, if any, on or before 10/7/2016. (kt) (Entered: 08/25/2016)
2016-09-14Partial Filing Fee Received from RICHARD ALAN KING in the amount of $2.65, receipt number: 4616080474. (zrdj) (Entered: 09/16/2016)
2016-10-14Partial Filing Fee Received from RICHARD ALAN KING in the amount of $2.00, receipt number: 4616081054. (zrdj) (Entered: 10/14/2016)
2016-10-2538MOTION for Extension of Time by RICHARD ALAN KING (zrdj) (Entered: 10/26/2016)
2016-10-3139ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Christopher Charles Hair on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Michael B. Posner (Hair, Christopher) Modified on 11/9/2016 (zrdj). (Entered: 10/31/2016)
2016-11-0340NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Christopher Charles Hair on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE Substituting for attorney Michael B. Posner (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 11/03/2016)
2016-11-09MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of plaintiff's fourth motion for an extension of time 38 , the motion is hereby GRANTED, and plaintiff may file his response to defendant's motion to dismiss and/or motion for summary judgment, as well as his cross-motion for summary judgment, if any, on or before January 23, 2017. This further extension allows plaintiff a total of 326 days to respond to defendant's motion. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/9/2016. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 11/09/2016)
2016-11-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff may file his response to defendant's motion to dismiss and/or motion for summary judgment, as well as his cross-motion for summary judgment, if any, on or before 1/23/2017. (kt) (Entered: 11/09/2016)
2016-11-10Partial Filing Fee Received from RICHARD ALAN KING in the amount of $12.20, receipt number: 4616081540. (zrdj) (Entered: 11/14/2016)
2016-12-13Partial Filing Fee Received from RICHARD ALAN KING in the amount of $2.21, receipt number: 4616082028. (zrdj) (Entered: 12/14/2016)
2017-01-10Partial Filing Fee Received from RICHARD ALAN KING in the amount of $2.00, receipt number: 4616082398. (zrdj) (Entered: 01/17/2017)
2017-01-2441MOTION To Toll Time to File Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Summary Judgment Motion by RICHARD ALAN KING "LEAVE TO FILE GRANTED" by Judge Randolph D. Moss (zrdj) (Entered: 01/26/2017)
2017-01-26MINUTE ORDER: Defendant is hereby ORDERED to respond to plaintiff's motion to toll time on or before February 2, 2017. In its opposition, defendant shall provide a chart showing which days over the past 365 days plaintiff has been on lockdown. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/26/2017. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 01/26/2017)
2017-01-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant is to respond to plaintiff's motion to toll time on or before 2/2/2017. (kt) (Entered: 01/27/2017)
2017-01-3142Memorandum in opposition to re 41 MOTION To Toll Time to File Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Summary Judgment Motion filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Michelle Cowart)(Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 01/31/2017)
2017-02-1343MOTION to Modify minute Order, MOTION to Take Judicial Notice by RICHARD ALAN KING (zrdj) (Entered: 02/16/2017)
2017-02-14Partial Filing Fee Received from RICHARD ALAN KING in the amount of $2.15, receipt number: 4616082953. (zrdj) (Entered: 02/15/2017)
2017-02-1644NOTICE of Lock down Status by RICHARD ALAN KING (td) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
2017-03-0145Memorandum in opposition to re 43 MOTION to Modify MOTION to Take Judicial Notice filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 03/01/2017)
2017-03-0846MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time 41 and his motion to modify the Court's Minute Order of January 26, 2017, and for judicial notice 43 are hereby DENIED. See attached document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/7/2017. (lcrdm2, ) Modified on 3/8/2017 (kt). (Entered: 03/08/2017)
2017-03-09Partial Filing Fee Received from RICHARD ALAN KING in the amount of $7.0, receipt number: 4616083463. (zrdj) (Entered: 03/10/2017)
2017-03-2847MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Defendants' motion for summary judgment 26 is hereby GRANTED in part and DENIED in part without prejudice. See opinion for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/28/2017. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 03/28/2017)
2017-04-2748MOTION for Extension of Time to File Status Report and Proposed Briefing Schedule by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 04/27/2017)
2017-05-04MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's motion for an extension of time 48 , the motion is hereby GRANTED, and it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file a status report and proposed briefing schedule on or before May 25, 2017. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/4/2017. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 05/04/2017)
2017-05-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall file a status report and proposed briefing schedule on or before 5/25/2017. (kt) (Entered: 05/04/2017)
2017-05-18Partial Filing Fee Received from RICHARD ALAN KING in the amount of $6.95, receipt number: 4616084690. (zrdj) (Entered: 05/19/2017)
2017-05-2549STATUS REPORT and Proposed Briefing Schedule by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Luczynski)(Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 05/25/2017)
2017-05-25MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of defendant's status report and proposed briefing schedule 49 , it is hereby ORDERED that the following briefing schedule shall govern further proceedings in this matter: defendant may file a renewed motion for summary judgment on or before August 23, 2017; plaintiff may file an opposition to defendant's renewed motion for summary judgment on or before September 22, 2017; and defendant may file a reply in support of its renewed motion for summary judgment on or before October 9, 2017. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/25/2017. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 05/25/2017)
2017-05-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's renewed motion for summary judgment due on or before 8/23/2017; Plaintiff's opposition to defendant's renewed motion for summary judgment due on or before 9/22/2017; Defendant's reply in support of its renewed motion for summary judgment due on or before 10/9/2017. (kt) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
2017-06-09Partial Filing Fee Received from RICHARD ALAN KING in the amount of $8.00, receipt number: 4616085214. (zrdj) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff