Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleUniversity of Washington et al v. Central Intelligence Agency
DistrictWestern District of Washington
CitySeattle
Case Number2:2015cv01577
Date Filed2015-10-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James L. Robart
PlaintiffUniversity of Washington a Washington State Agency
PlaintiffCenter for Human Rights at the University of Washington, a research center created by state law
PlaintiffMina Manuchehri a fellow at the Center
Case DescriptionThe University of Washington's Center for Human Rights submitted a FOIA request to the CIA for records concerning Col. Sigifredo Ochoa Perez, who had been identified as being involved in several massacres during the civil war in El Salvador. The CIA issued a Glomar response, refusing to either confirm or deny the existence of records on Ochoa Perez. The Center appealed the agency's Glomar response. The CIA affirmed the use of a Glomar response. The Center then submitted a second FOIA request to the CIA for records on Ochoa Perez's military service from 1976 to the present. The CIA refused the request on the basis that it was unduly burdensome. The Center then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Determination - Glomar response, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Request - Specificity

DefendantCentral Intelligence Agency U.S. Governmental Agency
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Opinion/Order [26]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2015-10-021COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Central Intelligence Agency (Receipt # 0981-4182789), filed by Mina Manuchehri, University of Washington, Center for Human Rights. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-T, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Wyrwich, Tom) (Entered: 10/02/2015)
2015-10-05Judge Brian A Tsuchida added. (MKB) (Entered: 10/05/2015)
2015-10-052Summonses (3) Issued as to defendant Central Intelligence Agency. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(MKB) (Entered: 10/05/2015)
2015-10-083AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Mara Woo on 10/7/2015, filed by Plaintiffs Center for Human Rights, Mina Manuchehri, University of Washington. (Wyrwich, Tom) (Entered: 10/08/2015)
2015-10-194APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Thomas R. Burke FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Center for Human Rights, Mina Manuchehri, University of Washington (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4198674 (Wyrwich, Tom) (Entered: 10/19/2015)
2015-10-195ORDER re 4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Thomas R Burke for Center for Human Rights, Mina Manuchehri and for University of Washington, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (DS) (Entered: 10/19/2015)
2015-12-216MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by William M. McCool. Case reassigned to Judge James L. Robart for all further proceedings. Hon. Brian A Tsuchida no longer assigned to case. Cc to JLR. (AE) (Entered: 12/21/2015)
2015-12-237ANSWER to 1 Complaint, Attorney Kayla Stahman added to party Central Intelligence Agency(pty:dft) by Central Intelligence Agency.(Stahman, Kayla) (Entered: 12/23/2015)
2016-01-148ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 2/18/2016, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/28/2016, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/11/2016, by Judge James L. Robart. (CC) (Entered: 01/14/2016)
2016-01-289Stipulated MOTION For Relief of 26(f) Conference, Initial Disclosures and Joint Status Report by Defendant Central Intelligence Agency. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/28/2016, (Stahman, Kayla) (Entered: 01/28/2016)
2016-01-2910ORDER by Judge James L. Robart granting 9 Stipulated Motion for Relief of 26(f) Conference, Initial Disclosures and Joint Status Report requirements. (PM) (Entered: 01/29/2016)
2016-12-07Set/Reset Deadlines: The court directs counsel to submit a Status Report by Wednesday, January 4, 2017. (CC) (Entered: 12/07/2016)
2017-01-0311STATUS REPORT by Defendant Central Intelligence Agency (Stahman, Kayla) (Entered: 01/03/2017)
2017-01-0412Pursuant to the Status Report filed January 3, 2017 (Dkt. # 11 ), the court directs counsel to submit another status report by April 15, 2017. (AD) (Entered: 01/04/2017)
2017-04-1413STATUS REPORT by Defendant Central Intelligence Agency (Stahman, Kayla) (Entered: 04/14/2017)
2017-04-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Pursuant to the Status Report filed April 14, 2017 (Dkt. # 13 ), the court directs counsel to submit another status report by June 9, 2017. (AD) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
2017-06-0914STATUS REPORT by Defendant Central Intelligence Agency (Stahman, Kayla) (Entered: 06/09/2017)
2017-06-21Pursuant to the Status Report filed June 9, 2017 (Dkt. # 14 ), the court directs counsel to submit another status report by August 1, 2017. (AD) (Entered: 06/21/2017)
2017-08-0115STATUS REPORT by Defendant Central Intelligence Agency (Stahman, Kayla) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
2017-08-1116PRAECIPE re 15 Status Report by Defendant Central Intelligence Agency (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Status Report)(Stahman, Kayla) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
2017-08-14Set/Reset Deadlines: The court directs counsel to submit another status report by October 10, 2017. (AD) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
2017-10-1017STATUS REPORT by Defendant Central Intelligence Agency (Stahman, Kayla) (Entered: 10/10/2017)
2017-10-26Set/Reset Deadlines: The court directs counsel to submit another Joint Status Report by 12/11/2017. (AD) (Entered: 10/26/2017)
2017-11-3018NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jordan Clark on behalf of Plaintiffs Center for Human Rights, Mina Manuchehri, University of Washington. (Clark, Jordan) (Entered: 11/30/2017)
2017-11-3019NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Tom Wyrwich for Plaintiffs Center for Human Rights, Mina Manuchehri, University of Washington. (Wyrwich, Tom) (Entered: 11/30/2017)
2017-12-0820NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michelle R. Lambert on behalf of Defendant Central Intelligence Agency. (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 12/08/2017)
2017-12-1121STATUS REPORT by Defendant Central Intelligence Agency (Stahman, Kayla) (Entered: 12/11/2017)
2017-12-12Set/Reset Deadlines: The court directs counsel to submit another Joint Status Report by 1/11/2018. (AD) (Entered: 12/12/2017)
2018-01-1122STATUS REPORT by Defendant Central Intelligence Agency (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
2018-01-12Set/Reset Deadlines: The court directs counsel to submit another Joint Status Report by 2/12/2018. (AD) (Entered: 01/12/2018)
2018-02-1223JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 3. (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 02/12/2018)
2018-02-20Set/Reset Deadlines: The court directs counsel to submit another Joint Status Report by 3/14/2018. (AD) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
2018-03-1324STATUS REPORT by Defendant Central Intelligence Agency (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 03/13/2018)
2018-03-15Set/Reset Deadlines: The court directs counsel to submit another Joint Status Report by 4/13/2018. (AD) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-04-1125STATUS REPORT by Defendant Central Intelligence Agency (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 04/11/2018)
2018-04-1326MINUTE ORDER directing parties to file a Joint Status Report by 5/18/2018 re settlement efforts. Authorized by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
2018-05-1727STATUS REPORT by Defendant Central Intelligence Agency (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 05/17/2018)
2018-05-17Set/Reset Deadlines: The court directs counsel to submit another Joint Status Report by 5/25/2018. (AD) (Entered: 05/17/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff