Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJOHNSON v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv00072
Date Filed2016-01-14
Date Closed2017-03-06
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffDAVID M. JOHNSON
Case DescriptionDavid Johnson submitted a FOIA request to the Equal Employment Opportunity Commission for a report entitled "IRS MD-715 Report," which apparently pertained to the data breach of OPM records. After the agency failed to respond, Johnson filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES OF AMERICA
DefendantBETH F. COBERT Acting Director, Office of Personnel Management
DefendantVICTORIA A. LIPNIC Commissioner, Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
DefendantDEFENDANTS
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF TREASURY, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
DefendantJACOB J. LEW
AppealD.C. Circuit 16-5221
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [60]
FOIA Project Annotation: Judge Tanya Chutkan has ruled that the Equal Employment Opportunity Commission properly responded to David Johnson's request for IRS MD-715 reports, which contains guidance to agencies for establishing effective equal employment opportunity programs, from 2003-2013. The agency initially disclosed all the reports except for 2013, which had not yet been filed. Johnson claimed he had also submitted a request to OPM for that agency's EEO reports. Noting that EEOC had released its 2014 and 2015 reports as well based on Johnson's claim that he had requested them, Chutkan pointed out that "EEOC did not release the IRS MD-715 Report for the fiscal year ending December 31, 2013, because IRS had not yet submitted its report. EEOC did not violate the FOIA by failing to disclose a record it did not have in its possession when it received Plaintiff's April 1, 2014 FOIA request. Even if EEOC were to have received an MD-715 Report from IRS for 2013 at some point after it responded to Plaintiff's April 1, 2014 FOIA request, EEOC would not have been obligated to release it." She added that "now that EEOC has released all of the records Plaintiff requested, this FOIA claim is moot." Dismissing Johnson's claim against OPM, Chutkan observed that "the Court concludes that Plaintiff had not submitted a FOIA request to OPM prior to filing this civil action."
Issues: Litigation - Jurisdiction - Moot
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-01-141COMPLAINT against BETH F. COBERT, VICTORIA A. LIPNIC, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNKNOWN DEFENDANTS filed by DAVID M. JOHNSON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(td) (Entered: 01/15/2016)
2016-01-142MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DAVID M. JOHNSON (td) (Entered: 01/15/2016)
2016-01-143MOTION for CM/ECF Password by DAVID M. JOHNSON (td) (Entered: 01/15/2016)
2016-01-14FIAT ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis "Leave to file without prepayment of costs GRANTED". Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on 1/14/2016. (zrdj) (Entered: 01/19/2016)
2016-01-284SUMMONS (4) Issued as to BETH F. COBERT, VICTORIA A. LIPNIC, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (md) (Entered: 01/28/2016)
2016-02-115RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA served on 2/8/2016 (td) (Entered: 02/11/2016)
2016-02-166RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/10/16. (td) (Entered: 02/16/2016)
2016-02-177NOTICE of Appearance by John Cuong Truong on behalf of BETH F. COBERT, VICTORIA A. LIPNIC, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Truong, John) (Entered: 02/17/2016)
2016-03-068MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by BETH F. COBERT, VICTORIA A. LIPNIC, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Truong, John) (Entered: 03/06/2016)
2016-03-09MINUTE ORDER: Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time 8 is GRANTED, and their Answer or other response to the Complaint is due by April 11, 2016. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/9/16. (ms) (Entered: 03/09/2016)
2016-03-099ORDER granting 3 Plaintiff's Motion for CM/ECF User Name and Password. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/9/16. (ms) (Entered: 03/09/2016)
2016-03-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 4/11/2016, (zsm) (Entered: 03/09/2016)
2016-03-2510RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BETH F. COBERT served on 3/24/2016 (td) (Entered: 03/28/2016)
2016-04-0411MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment 5 U.S.C. Sec. 552, et seq. by DAVID M. JOHNSON (JOHNSON, DAVID) (Entered: 04/04/2016)
2016-04-0412AFFIDAVIT re 11 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment 5 U.S.C. Sec. 552, et seq. by DAVID M. JOHNSON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(JOHNSON, DAVID) (Entered: 04/04/2016)
2016-04-0413NOTICE Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of the Motion For Summary Judgment by DAVID M. JOHNSON re 11 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment 5 U.S.C. Sec. 552, et seq. (JOHNSON, DAVID) (Entered: 04/04/2016)
2016-04-06MINUTE ORDER: Denying without prejudice 11 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Plaintiff may renew his motion after the Defendant files an answer and the parties meet and confer to propose a joint briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/6/16. (DJS) (Entered: 04/06/2016)
2016-04-1014MOTION for Briefing Schedule by BETH F. COBERT, VICTORIA A. LIPNIC, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Truong, John) (Entered: 04/10/2016)
2016-04-1115REPLY to opposition to motion re 14 MOTION for Briefing Schedule filed by DAVID M. JOHNSON. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(JOHNSON, DAVID) (Entered: 04/11/2016)
2016-04-1216MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Briefing Schedule by DAVID M. JOHNSON (JOHNSON, DAVID) (Entered: 04/12/2016)
2016-04-13MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for a Briefing Schedule 14 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time 16 is GRANTED. The parties shall file a joint proposed schedule for further proceedings in this action, including a proposed schedule for dispositive motions, by April 26, 2016. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/13/16. (ms) (Entered: 04/13/2016)
2016-04-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 4/26/2016 (zsm) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
2016-04-2617Joint MOTION for Scheduling Order by BETH F. COBERT, VICTORIA A. LIPNIC, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Truong, John) (Entered: 04/26/2016)
2016-05-0218ORDER granting 17 the parties' Joint Motion for Entry of a Scheduling Order and setting motions schedule. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/2/16. (ms) (Entered: 05/02/2016)
2016-05-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/13/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 7/19/2016. Response to Dispositive Motions due by 8/19/2016. Reply to Dispositive Motions due by 9/16/2016. Replies due by 10/4/2016. (zsm) (Entered: 05/02/2016)
2016-06-0919STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER 25 . . . . . AMENDED COMPLAINT against DAVID M. JOHNSON with Jury Demand.(JOHNSON, DAVID) Modified on 6/28/2016 (td). (Entered: 06/09/2016)
2016-06-0920MOTION to Certify Class by DAVID M. JOHNSON (JOHNSON, DAVID) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
2016-06-0921MOTION to Compel Defendants' Initial Disclosures and Rule 37 Sanctions by DAVID M. JOHNSON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(JOHNSON, DAVID) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
2016-06-1322STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER 25 . . . . .AMENDED COMPLAINT SECOND against DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, JACOB J. LEW, BETH F. COBERT,VICTORIA A. LIPNIC, UNKNOWN DEFENDANTS with Jury Demand.(JOHNSON, DAVID) Modified on 6/14/2016 (td). Modified on 6/28/2016 (ztd). (Entered: 06/13/2016)
2016-06-1323ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .AMENDED COMPLAINT SECOND against JACOB J. LEW with Jury Demand.(JOHNSON, DAVID) Modified on 6/14/2016 (ztd). (Entered: 06/13/2016)
2016-06-1324ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .AMENDED COMPLAINT SECOND against All Defendants with Jury Demand.(JOHNSON, DAVID) Modified on 6/14/2016 (ztd). (Entered: 06/13/2016)
2016-06-14NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 23 Amended Complaint, 24 Amended Complaint was entered in error. Said entries are duplicates of entry no. 22 . Docket entry no. 22 has been modified. (td) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
2016-06-2725ORDER: Denying 20 Plaintiff's Motion to Certify Class; Denying 21 Motion to Compel Initial Disclosures; Striking Plaintiff's Amended Complaints 19 22 . The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to: DAVID M. JOHNSON, 901 East 56th Street, 1 C, Brooklyn, NY 11234. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 6/27/16. (DJS) (Entered: 06/27/2016)
2016-06-2826RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re 25 Order on Motion to Certify Class, Order on Motion to Compel,, filed by DAVID M. JOHNSON. (JOHNSON, DAVID) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
2016-06-2827MOTION to Appoint Expert Statistician FRE 706 by DAVID M. JOHNSON (JOHNSON, DAVID) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
2016-07-0828NOTICE of Proposed Order Amended Proposed Order FRE 706 by DAVID M. JOHNSON re 27 MOTION to Appoint Expert Statistician FRE 706 (JOHNSON, DAVID) (Entered: 07/08/2016)
2016-07-1529Memorandum in opposition to re 27 MOTION to Appoint Expert Statistician FRE 706 filed by BETH F. COBERT, VICTORIA A. LIPNIC, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Truong, John) (Entered: 07/15/2016)
2016-07-1930MOTION for Summary Judgment by BETH F. COBERT, VICTORIA A. LIPNIC, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Stephanie Garner Declaration and Gov. Exh. 1-3, # 4 Yasmin Rosa Declaration)(Truong, John) (Entered: 07/19/2016)
2016-07-1931MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to Rule 12(c) by DAVID M. JOHNSON (JOHNSON, DAVID) (Entered: 07/19/2016)
2016-07-1932MOTION to Amend/Correct 31 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to Rule 12(c) by DAVID M. JOHNSON (JOHNSON, DAVID) (Entered: 07/19/2016)
2016-07-2233ORDER: Advising plaintiff to respond or Court may deem Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 30 conceded. Response due by 8/19/2016. Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings 31 and Plaintiff's 32 Motion to Amend. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/22/16. (DJS) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
2016-07-2534MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION to motion re 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DAVID M. JOHNSON. (JOHNSON, DAVID) Modified text/event on 7/26/2016 (td). (Entered: 07/25/2016)
2016-07-2535MOTION Plaintiff's Motion For Voluntary Dismissal by DAVID M. JOHNSON (JOHNSON, DAVID) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
2016-07-2536NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re Defendant Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (JOHNSON, DAVID) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
2016-07-2537NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to 25 Order on Motion to Certify Class, Order on Motion to Compel,, by DAVID M. JOHNSON. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (JOHNSON, DAVID) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
2016-07-2538NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to 33 Fox/Neal Order, Set Deadlines,, by DAVID M. JOHNSON. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (JOHNSON, DAVID) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
2016-07-2639NOTICE Plaintiff's Request For Judicial Notice FRE 201 by DAVID M. JOHNSON re 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment (JOHNSON, DAVID) (Entered: 07/26/2016)
2016-07-2640Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by DAVID M. JOHNSON (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of David Johnson, # 2 Statement of Facts Statement of Facts In Support of Plaintiff's Cross Motion For Summary Judgment)(JOHNSON, DAVID) (Entered: 07/26/2016)
2016-07-26NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 36 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal/Party was entered in error. Duplicate of docket entry no. 35 . (td) (Entered: 07/26/2016)
2016-07-2641Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Fee was not paid because it was filed In Forma Pauperis re 38 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, 37 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (td) (Entered: 07/26/2016)
2016-08-0142ORDER: To the extent Plaintiff's Response 26 is a motion for reconsideration of the court's June 27, 2016 25 order, the motion is denied. Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Expert Statistician FRE 706 27 is denied. See Order for Details. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/1/16. (DJS) (Entered: 08/01/2016)
2016-08-01USCA Case Number 16-5221 for 37 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by DAVID M. JOHNSON, 38 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by DAVID M. JOHNSON. (td) (Entered: 08/02/2016)
2016-08-1943RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re 33 Fox/Neal Order, Set Deadlines,, Plaintiff's Motion For Entry of a Final Judgment filed by DAVID M. JOHNSON. (JOHNSON, DAVID) (Entered: 08/19/2016)
2016-08-1944MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 40) by BETH F. COBERT, VICTORIA A. LIPNIC, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Truong, John) (Entered: 08/19/2016)
2016-08-2445MOTION to Appoint Counsel by DAVID M. JOHNSON (JOHNSON, DAVID) (Entered: 08/24/2016)
2016-08-25MINUTE ORDER: This matter proceeds as one under the Freedom of Information Act ("FOIA"), see 5 U.S.C. § 552, against the Office of Personnel Management and the Equal Employment Opportunity Commission ("EEOC"), regarding requests for information allegedly submitted in April 2014 and October 2015. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal 35 , which purports to dismiss the EEOC as a party defendant, is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. It is FURTHER ORDERED that, plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment 40 , insofar as it raises a new claim under the FOIA against the EEOC regarding an April 2016 FOIA request, is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time 44 is GRANTED in part and denied in part. The response to plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment addressing only the April 2014 and October 2015 FOIA requests to the EEOC is due by August 26, 2016. It is further ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel 45 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/25/16. (ms) (Entered: 08/25/2016)
2016-08-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 8/26/2016 (zsm) (Entered: 08/25/2016)
2016-08-2546MOTION for Sanctions by DAVID M. JOHNSON (JOHNSON, DAVID) (Entered: 08/25/2016)
2016-08-2547Amended MOTION for Sanctions by DAVID M. JOHNSON (JOHNSON, DAVID) (Entered: 08/25/2016)
2016-08-2648Memorandum in opposition to re 40 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by BETH F. COBERT, VICTORIA A. LIPNIC, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Truong, John) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
2016-08-2649REPLY to opposition to motion re 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by BETH F. COBERT, VICTORIA A. LIPNIC, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Truong, John) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
2016-10-0450MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Motion for Sanctions (ECF No. 47) by BETH F. COBERT, VICTORIA A. LIPNIC, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Truong, John) (Entered: 10/04/2016)
2016-10-0451Memorandum in opposition to re 47 Amended MOTION for Sanctions filed by BETH F. COBERT, VICTORIA A. LIPNIC, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Truong, John) (Entered: 10/04/2016)
2016-10-06MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the Court's August 25, 2016 Minute Order, on August 26, 2016, the defendants timely filed their opposition to the plaintiffs cross-motion for summary judgment and reply to the plaintiff's opposition to their motion for summary judgment. The plaintiff has filed a motion for sanctions under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26 and 37. According to the plaintiff, the Department of the Treasury and the defendants' counsel have committed "fraud upon the Court" and have failed to produce the Treasury Department records he has requested. Because of this alleged "fraud," the plaintiff asserts that any final order the Court may enter would be subject to reconsideration under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 60(b). The Department of the Treasury is not a party to this action, and the plaintiff does not demonstrate that defendants or their counsel have engaged in any activity that would warrant sanctions. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions 46 and Plaintiff's Amended Motion for Sanctions 47 are DENIED. It is further ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to file their response to Plaintiff's Amended Motion for Sanctions 50 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/6/16. (ms) (Entered: 10/06/2016)
2016-10-0652ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order on Motion for Sanctions,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by DAVID M. JOHNSON. (JOHNSON, DAVID) Modified on 10/7/2016 (td). (Entered: 10/06/2016)
2016-10-07NOTICE OF ERROR re 52 Response to Order of the Court; emailed to djohn1201@yahoo.com, cc'd 3 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please refile document, 2. The main document of all filings must have the case number, caption, title (Response to Order) and body. Supreme Court Document is an attachment to the main document. (ztd, ) (Entered: 10/07/2016)
2016-10-0753MOTION to Alter Judgment as to Order on Motion for Sanctions,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by DAVID M. JOHNSON (JOHNSON, DAVID) (Entered: 10/07/2016)
2016-10-0754Amended MOTION to Alter Judgment as to Order on Motion for Sanctions,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by DAVID M. JOHNSON (JOHNSON, DAVID) (Entered: 10/07/2016)
2016-10-0855Amended MOTION to Alter Judgment as to Order on Motion for Sanctions,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by DAVID M. JOHNSON (JOHNSON, DAVID) (Entered: 10/08/2016)
2016-10-0856MOTION for Recusal by DAVID M. JOHNSON (JOHNSON, DAVID) (Entered: 10/08/2016)
2016-10-0857Amended MOTION for Recusal by DAVID M. JOHNSON (JOHNSON, DAVID) (Entered: 10/08/2016)
2016-10-1158MOTION for Certification for interlocatory appeal by DAVID M. JOHNSON (JOHNSON, DAVID) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
2016-10-14MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Alter Judge Chutkan's October 6, 2016 Order 53 , as amended 54 55 , is DENIED. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Recusal 56 , as amended 57 , is DENIED. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion 58 Motion to Certify Judge Chutkan's June 27, 2016 Order 25 for Interlocutory Review Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b) is DENIED. It appears that the sole pending dispositive motion, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 30 , is fully briefed. UNTIL THE PARTIES ARE NOTIFIED TO THE CONTRARY, NO FURTHER FILINGS IN THIS ACTION WILL BE PERMITTED ABSENT LEAVE OF COURT. See Wallace v. Saffa, No. 06-402 (RBW), 2007 WL 1020791, at *2 (D.D.C. Mar. 30, 2007) (discussing a court's ability to place filing restrictions on civil litigants); see also Whitehead v. Paramount Pictures Corp., 145 F. Supp. 2d 3, 5-6 (D.D.C. 2001), aff'd sub nom. Whitehead v. Paramount Picture Corp., No. 01-7062, 2001 WL 936260 (D.C. Cir. July 27, 2001). Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/14/16. (ms) (Entered: 10/14/2016)
2016-10-1459STRICKEN PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER DATED 1014/16.....RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order on Motion to Alter Judgment,,, Order on Motion for Recusal,, Order on Motion for Certification for Interlocatory Appeal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by DAVID M. JOHNSON. (JOHNSON, DAVID) Modified on 10/14/2016 (zsm). (Entered: 10/14/2016)
2016-10-14MINUTE ORDER: When the Court granted Plaintiff's motion for a CM/ECF password 9 , its order instructed Plaintiff to limit his filings to documents that are relevant and required by court order, the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure or the Local Civil Rules of this court. In addition, Plaintiff was told to refrain from filing documents that are frivolous, vexatious or harassing. Today the Court issued a Minute Order which, among other things, advised the parties no further filings in this action will be permitted absent leave of court until further notice. Roughly one hour later, Plaintiff defied this Minute Order and filed a response 59 , without first seeking leave to do so. Plaintiff is warned that, if he files another document without first seeking leave of Court, the Court will revoke his electronic filing privileges. "Plaintiff's Reply to Judge Chutkan's October 6, 2016 Order" 59 is hereby STRICKEN. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/14/16. (DJS) (Entered: 10/14/2016)
2017-03-0660MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/3/17. (ms) (Entered: 03/06/2017)
2017-03-0661ORDER granting 30 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. This is a final appealable Order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/3/17. (ms) (Entered: 03/06/2017)
2017-03-3162Amended NOTICE OF APPEAL 60 , 61 by DAVID M. JOHNSON. (td) Modified per USCA on 4/4/2017 (td). (Entered: 04/04/2017)
2017-04-0463Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re 62 Amended Notice of Appeal ;USCA Case Number 16-5221. (td) (Entered: 04/04/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff