Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNational Day Laborer Organizing Network et al v. United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2016cv00387
Date Filed2016-01-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Paul A. Engelmayer
PlaintiffNational Day Laborer Organizing Network
PlaintiffImmigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law
PlaintiffAsian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus
Case DescriptionThe National Day Laborer Organizing Network and several other public interest organizations submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security and the Department of Justice for records concerning the Priority Enforcement Program. The agencies had disclosed five documents when the organization filed suit for the agency's failure to respond more fully.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
DefendantUnited States Department of Justice
DefendantUnited States Department of Justice
TERMINATED: 07/31/2018
DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security
DefendantUnited States Citizenship and Immigration Services
DefendantUnited States Citizenship and Immigration Services
TERMINATED: 07/31/2018
DefendantUnited States Customs and Border Protection
DefendantDepartment of Homeland Security's Office of Civil Rights and Civil Liberties
DefendantExecutive Office For Immigration Review
DefendantFederal Bureau Of Investigation
DefendantDepartment of Justice's Office of Information Policy
DefendantDepartment of Justice's Office of Information Policy
TERMINATED: 07/31/2018
DefendantDepartment of Justice's Office of Legal Counsel
DefendantDepartment of Justice's Office of Legal Counsel
TERMINATED: 07/31/2018
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-01-191COMPLAINT against Department of Homeland Security's Office of Civil Rights and Civil Liberties, Department of Justice's Office of Information Policy, Department of Justice's Office of Legal Counsel, Executive Office For Immigration Review, Federal Bureau Of Investigation, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Justice, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-11849461)Document filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus, Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law, National Day Laborer Organizing Network. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Part 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Part 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit A - Part 3)(Markowitz, Peter) (Entered: 01/19/2016)
2016-01-192CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Markowitz, Peter) (Entered: 01/19/2016)
2016-01-193STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 10-cv-3488. Document filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus, Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law, National Day Laborer Organizing Network.(Markowitz, Peter) (Entered: 01/19/2016)
2016-01-194FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Immigration and Customs Enforcement, re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus, Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law, National Day Laborer Organizing Network. (Markowitz, Peter) Modified on 1/20/2016 (dgo). (Entered: 01/19/2016)
2016-01-195REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Homeland Security, re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus, Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law, National Day Laborer Organizing Network. (Markowitz, Peter) (Entered: 01/19/2016)
2016-01-196FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Customs and Border Protection, re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus, Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law, National Day Laborer Organizing Network. (Markowitz, Peter) Modified on 1/20/2016 (dgo). (Entered: 01/19/2016)
2016-01-197FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Office for Civil Rights and Civil Liberties, re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus, Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law, National Day Laborer Organizing Network. (Markowitz, Peter) Modified on 1/20/2016 (dgo). (Entered: 01/19/2016)
2016-01-198REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus, Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law, National Day Laborer Organizing Network. (Markowitz, Peter) (Entered: 01/19/2016)
2016-01-199REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Justice, re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus, Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law, National Day Laborer Organizing Network. (Markowitz, Peter) (Entered: 01/19/2016)
2016-01-1910FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Executive Office For Immigration Review, re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus, Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law, National Day Laborer Organizing Network. (Markowitz, Peter) Modified on 1/20/2016 (dgo). (Entered: 01/19/2016)
2016-01-1911FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Federal Bureau of Investigation, re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus, Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law, National Day Laborer Organizing Network. (Markowitz, Peter) Modified on 1/20/2016 (dgo). (Entered: 01/19/2016)
2016-01-1912FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Justice's Office of Information Policy, re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus, Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law, National Day Laborer Organizing Network. (Markowitz, Peter) Modified on 1/20/2016 (dgo). (Entered: 01/19/2016)
2016-01-1913FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Justice's Office of Legal Counsel, re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus, Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law, National Day Laborer Organizing Network. (Markowitz, Peter) Modified on 1/20/2016 (dgo). (Entered: 01/19/2016)
2016-01-20CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (dgo) (Entered: 01/20/2016)
2016-01-20Case Designated ECF. (dgo) (Entered: 01/20/2016)
2016-01-20CASE REFERRED TO Judge Shira A. Scheindlin as possibly related to 1:10-cv-03488-SAS. (dgo) (Entered: 01/20/2016)
2016-01-2014ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Homeland Security. (dgo) (Entered: 01/20/2016)
2016-01-2015ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (dgo) (Entered: 01/20/2016)
2016-01-2016ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Justice. (dgo) (Entered: 01/20/2016)
2016-01-20***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney to RE-FILE Document No. 6 Request for Issuance of Summons, 7 Request for Issuance of Summons, 11 Request for Issuance of Summons, 13 Request for Issuance of Summons, 10 Request for Issuance of Summons, 12 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Filed Against errors. Multiple issues. Parties that are being requested a summons must properly be entered on ECF as they are on the pleading. Some documents have Department of Justice before the party being requested, party should be first and can be C/O Department of Justice;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dgo) (Entered: 01/20/2016)
2016-01-2017RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by National Day Laborer Organizing Network.(Markowitz, Peter) (Entered: 01/20/2016)
2016-01-2018RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus.(Markowitz, Peter) (Entered: 01/20/2016)
2016-01-2019RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law.(Markowitz, Peter) (Entered: 01/20/2016)
2016-01-2020MOTION for Thomas Fritzsche to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11858109. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus, Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law, National Day Laborer Organizing Network. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Fritzsche, Thomas) (Entered: 01/20/2016)
2016-01-20>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 20 MOTION for Thomas Fritzsche to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11858109. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. . The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu) (Entered: 01/20/2016)
2016-01-2021REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus, Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law, National Day Laborer Organizing Network. (Markowitz, Peter) (Entered: 01/20/2016)
2016-01-2022REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Office for Civil Rights and Civil Liberties, re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus, Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law, National Day Laborer Organizing Network. (Markowitz, Peter) (Entered: 01/20/2016)
2016-01-2023REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Customs and Border Protection, re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus, Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law, National Day Laborer Organizing Network. (Markowitz, Peter) (Entered: 01/20/2016)
2016-01-2024FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Office of Legal Counsel, re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus, Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law, National Day Laborer Organizing Network. (Markowitz, Peter) Modified on 1/21/2016 (dgo). (Entered: 01/20/2016)
2016-01-2025FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Office of Information Policy, re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus, Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law, National Day Laborer Organizing Network. (Markowitz, Peter) Modified on 1/21/2016 (dgo). (Entered: 01/20/2016)
2016-01-2026REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Federal Bureau of Investigation, re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus, Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law, National Day Laborer Organizing Network. (Markowitz, Peter) (Entered: 01/20/2016)
2016-01-2027REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Executive Office for Immigration Review, re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus, Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law, National Day Laborer Organizing Network. (Markowitz, Peter) (Entered: 01/20/2016)
2016-01-2128ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (dgo) (Entered: 01/21/2016)
2016-01-2129ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department of Homeland Security's Office of Civil Rights and Civil Liberties. (dgo) (Entered: 01/21/2016)
2016-01-2130ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Customs and Border Protection. (dgo) (Entered: 01/21/2016)
2016-01-2131ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Federal Bureau Of Investigation. (dgo) (Entered: 01/21/2016)
2016-01-2132ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Executive Office For Immigration Review. (dgo) (Entered: 01/21/2016)
2016-01-21***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney to RE-FILE Document No. 25 Request for Issuance of Summons, 24 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Party(s) being requested must match pleading, on ECF and on the Summons PDF Parties must appear as Department of Justice's Office of Information Policy and Department of Justice's Office of Legal Counsel;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dgo) (Entered: 01/21/2016)
2016-01-2133FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Justice's Office of Legal Counsel, re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus, Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law, National Day Laborer Organizing Network. (Markowitz, Peter) Modified on 1/25/2016 (pc). (Entered: 01/21/2016)
2016-01-2134FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Justice's Office of Information Policy, re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus, Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law, National Day Laborer Organizing Network. (Markowitz, Peter) Modified on 1/25/2016 (pc). (Entered: 01/21/2016)
2016-01-2535REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Justice's Office of Information Policy, re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus, Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law, National Day Laborer Organizing Network. (Markowitz, Peter) (Entered: 01/25/2016)
2016-01-2536REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Justice's Office of Legal Counsel, re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus, Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law, National Day Laborer Organizing Network. (Markowitz, Peter) (Entered: 01/25/2016)
2016-01-2537ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department of Justice's Office of Information Policy. (laq) (Entered: 01/25/2016)
2016-01-2538ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department of Justice's Office of Legal Counsel. (laq) (Entered: 01/25/2016)
2016-01-2839OBJECTION TO STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: 3 Statement of Relatedness, .Document filed by Department of Homeland Security's Office of Civil Rights and Civil Liberties, Department of Justice's Office of Information Policy, Department of Justice's Office of Legal Counsel, Executive Office For Immigration Review, Federal Bureau Of Investigation, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Justice, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Cargo, Shane) (Entered: 01/28/2016)
2016-02-01CASE DECLINED AS NOT RELATED. Case referred as related to 10-cv-3488 and declined by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin and returned to wheel for assignment. (wb) (Entered: 02/01/2016)
2016-02-01NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Katherine B. Forrest. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb) (Entered: 02/01/2016)
2016-02-01Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. (wb) (Entered: 02/01/2016)
2016-02-0340ORDER: Initial Conference set for 4/7/2016 at 01:00 AM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 2/3/2016) (mro) (Entered: 02/03/2016)
2016-02-0841CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 2/1/2016, answer due 2/22/2016. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus; Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law; National Day Laborer Organizing Network. (Markowitz, Peter) (Entered: 02/08/2016)
2016-02-0842CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. United States Customs and Border Protection served on 2/1/2016, answer due 2/22/2016. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus; Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law; National Day Laborer Organizing Network. (Markowitz, Peter) (Entered: 02/08/2016)
2016-02-0843CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. Department of Homeland Security's Office of Civil Rights and Civil Liberties served on 2/1/2016, answer due 2/22/2016. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus; Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law; National Day Laborer Organizing Network. (Markowitz, Peter) (Entered: 02/08/2016)
2016-02-0844CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. United States Department of Homeland Security served on 2/1/2016, answer due 2/22/2016. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus; Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law; National Day Laborer Organizing Network. (Markowitz, Peter) (Entered: 02/08/2016)
2016-02-0845CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. Executive Office For Immigration Review served on 2/1/2016, answer due 2/22/2016. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus; Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law; National Day Laborer Organizing Network. (Markowitz, Peter) (Entered: 02/08/2016)
2016-02-0846CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. Federal Bureau Of Investigation served on 2/1/2016, answer due 2/22/2016. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus; Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law; National Day Laborer Organizing Network. (Markowitz, Peter) (Entered: 02/08/2016)
2016-02-0847CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. Department of Justice's Office of Information Policy served on 2/1/2016, answer due 2/22/2016. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus; Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law; National Day Laborer Organizing Network. (Markowitz, Peter) (Entered: 02/08/2016)
2016-02-0848CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. Department of Justice's Office of Legal Counsel served on 2/1/2016, answer due 2/22/2016. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus; Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law; National Day Laborer Organizing Network. (Markowitz, Peter) (Entered: 02/08/2016)
2016-02-0849CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 2/1/2016, answer due 2/22/2016. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus; Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law; National Day Laborer Organizing Network. (Markowitz, Peter) (Entered: 02/08/2016)
2016-02-0850CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. United States Department of Justice served on 2/1/2016, answer due 2/22/2016. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus; Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law; National Day Laborer Organizing Network. (Markowitz, Peter) (Entered: 02/08/2016)
2016-02-0851NOTICE of Certificate of Service of Order Setting Initial Pretrial Conference and Court's Individual Practices on Defendants' counsel re: 40 Order for Initial Pretrial Conference. Document filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus, Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law, National Day Laborer Organizing Network. (Markowitz, Peter) (Entered: 02/08/2016)
2016-02-0852LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Arastu K. Chaudhury dated February 8, 2016. Document filed by Department of Homeland Security's Office of Civil Rights and Civil Liberties, Department of Justice's Office of Information Policy, Department of Justice's Office of Legal Counsel, Executive Office For Immigration Review, Federal Bureau Of Investigation, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Justice, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Chaudhury, Arastu) (Entered: 02/08/2016)
2016-02-1053ORDER granting 52 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Conference adjourned to 4/12/16 at 1pm. If this entire matter can be done on briefing without discovery, let me know and we will set that schedule. Initial Conference set for 4/12/2016 at 01:00 PM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 2/9/2016) (lmb) (Entered: 02/10/2016)
2016-02-1854LAW STUDENT INTERN APPEARANCE FORM: I authorize this student (Jacob Onile-Ere): (a) to appear in court or other proceedings on behalf of the above client, and (b) to prepare documents on behalf of the above client. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 2/18/2016) (lmb) (Entered: 02/18/2016)
2016-02-1855LAW STUDENT INTERN APPEARANCE FORM: I authorize this student (Danelly Bello): (a) to appear in court or other proceedings on behalf of the above client, and (b) to prepare documents on behalf of the above client. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 2/18/2016) (lmb) (Entered: 02/18/2016)
2016-02-1856LAW STUDENT INTERN APPEARANCE FORM: I authorize this student (Sophia Gurule): (a) to appear in court or other proceedings on behalf of the above client, and (b) to prepare documents on behalf of the above client. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 2/18/2016) (lmb) (Entered: 02/18/2016)
2016-02-1857ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judgment Clerk from Thomas Fritzche dated 2/9/2016 re: I write to request U.S. District Judge Forrest's authorization of the appearance of three law student interns in the above-captioned case and have directed this correspondence to your office at the instruction of the ECF Help Desk. ENDORSEMENT: Post to docket. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 2/18/2016) (lmb) (Entered: 02/18/2016)
2016-02-2958ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Department of Homeland Security's Office of Civil Rights and Civil Liberties, Department of Justice's Office of Information Policy, Department of Justice's Office of Legal Counsel, Executive Office For Immigration Review, Federal Bureau Of Investigation, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Justice, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Dolinger, Samuel) (Entered: 02/29/2016)
2016-03-0159ORDER: The Court modifies its Order for initial conference (ECF No. 40) as follows: the parties need not submit the proposed schedule based on the Court's form order. Rather, the Court understands from the pleadings that the form scheduling order may not be appropriate for this case. Parties should instead confer on a method of adjudication and submit their views-either jointly or singly-in a letter to the Court at least three business days prior to the IPTC. The IPTC is scheduled for April 12, 2016 at 1 p.m. (ECF No. 53.). (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 3/1/2016) (lmb) (Entered: 03/01/2016)
2016-03-2360ORDER: The initial pretrial conference currently scheduled for April 12, 2016, at 1:00 p.m. will now take place on April 19, 2016, at 1:00 p.m. Initial Conference set for 4/19/2016 at 01:00 PM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 3/23/2016) (lmb) (Entered: 03/23/2016)
2016-03-2961NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brandon Matthew Waterman on behalf of Department of Homeland Security's Office of Civil Rights and Civil Liberties, Department of Justice's Office of Information Policy, Department of Justice's Office of Legal Counsel, Executive Office For Immigration Review, Federal Bureau Of Investigation, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Justice, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Waterman, Brandon) (Entered: 03/29/2016)
2016-04-1362LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Arastu K. Chaudhury dated April 13, 2016 re: the Government's submission pursuant to the Court's Order, dated March 1, 2016 (Dkt. Entry No. 59). Document filed by Department of Homeland Security's Office of Civil Rights and Civil Liberties, Department of Justice's Office of Information Policy, Department of Justice's Office of Legal Counsel, Executive Office For Immigration Review, Federal Bureau Of Investigation, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Justice, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Chaudhury, Arastu) (Entered: 04/13/2016)
2016-04-1463MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 62 Letter, filed by Department of Homeland Security's Office of Civil Rights and Civil Liberties, United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Justice, Executive Office For Immigration Review, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Federal Bureau Of Investigation, Department of Justice's Office of Information Policy, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Department of Justice's Office of Legal Counsel, United States Department of Homeland Security. ENDORSEMENT: Do plaintiffs agree with the proposal set forth herein? Inform the court by C.O.B. 4/18/16. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 4/14/2016) (lmb) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
2016-04-1464LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Plaintiffs dated April 14, 2016 re: Plaintiffs' proposed method of adjudication. Document filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus, Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law, National Day Laborer Organizing Network.(Markowitz, Peter) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
2016-04-1565NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony J. Diana on behalf of National Day Laborer Organizing Network. (Diana, Anthony) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
2016-04-1566NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Erika Kweon on behalf of National Day Laborer Organizing Network. (Kweon, Erika) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
2016-04-1867NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Therese Craparo on behalf of National Day Laborer Organizing Network. (Craparo, Therese) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
2016-04-1868LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Arastu K. Chaudhury dated April 18, 2016 re: reply to the plaintiffs' April 14, 2016, letter. Document filed by Department of Homeland Security's Office of Civil Rights and Civil Liberties, Department of Justice's Office of Information Policy, Department of Justice's Office of Legal Counsel, Executive Office For Immigration Review, Federal Bureau Of Investigation, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Justice, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Chaudhury, Arastu) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
2016-04-1869ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 20 Motion for Thomas Fritzsche to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 4/18/2016) (tro) (Entered: 04/19/2016)
2016-04-1970LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Plaintiffs dated April 19, 2016 re: reply to Defendants April 18, 2016 letter. Document filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus, Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law, National Day Laborer Organizing Network.(Markowitz, Peter) (Entered: 04/19/2016)
2016-04-19Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Katherine B. Forrest: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/19/2016. (jp) (Entered: 05/11/2016)
2016-04-2071ORDER: The Court held an initial pretrial conference in this action on April 19, 2016. As stated at the conference, the following schedule shall govern: 1. For the following two weeks, the parties continue to negotiate in good faith regarding the scope of a narrowed Freedom of Information Act ("FOIA") request. 2. Not later than May 4, 2016, the parties shall submit a letter preferably jointly providing the outcome of such negotiations. 3. Such letter shall also state whether any party intends to move for summary judgment (or make any other procedurally appropriate motion) with regards to, for instance, burden or similar defense, and set forth a proposed schedule. 4. The parties shall work to prepare a "production grid" setting forth each agreed-to production item, custodian, and predicted production date. This grid shall be submitted to the Court not later than June 6, 2016. 5. The parties shall appear for a conference on Thursday, June 16, 2016, at 2 p.m. at which any issues regarding production timing shall be addressed. ( Status Conference set for 6/16/2016 at 02:00 PM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest.) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 4/20/2016) (mro) Modified on 4/22/2016 (mro). (Entered: 04/21/2016)
2016-05-0472JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from All Parties dated May 4, 2016 re: Joint Response to the Court's April 20, 2016 Order. Document filed by Department of Homeland Security's Office of Civil Rights and Civil Liberties, Department of Justice's Office of Information Policy, Department of Justice's Office of Legal Counsel, Executive Office For Immigration Review, Federal Bureau Of Investigation, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Justice, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Transcript of April 19, 2016 Conference, # 2 Plaintiffs' Appendix)(Waterman, Brandon) (Entered: 05/04/2016)
2016-05-1073ORDER: The Court received a joint letter from parties on May 4, 2016. In the letter, plaintiffs requested permission to submit a second, "narrowed" request on May 13, 2016. (ECF No. 72, at 4.) Defendants objected to plaintiffs' unilateral request to further narrow the request. (Id. at 2.) As the Court indicated clearly at the conference on April 19, 2016, the parties were to attempt to "reach... [an] agreement on the narrowed request." (Tr. 26:11-14.) This was referring to the first narrowed request submitted by plaintiffs on April 14, 2016. Nowhere did the Court indicate that plaintiffs could unilaterally submit yet another request. In fact, while the Court did not reject the possibility of moving forward on a narrowed request submitted after litigation has begun, it explicitly precluded the "version C" strategy that plaintiffs are employing now. (Tr. 16:23-17:1 ("If they do this, they're not going to be able to do this again in the litigation and come up with version C.")). The Court DENIES plaintiffs' request to submit a second narrowed request. In a decision to follow, the Court will rule on defendants' motion to strike portions of the first narrowed request and set a briefing schedule following its decision as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 5/10/2016) (lmb) (Entered: 05/10/2016)
2016-05-1174TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 4/19/2016 before Judge Katherine B. Forrest. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Karen Gorlaski, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/6/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/16/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/12/2016.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/11/2016)
2016-05-11***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 75 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (mt) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
2016-05-2776LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time and to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Brandon M. Waterman dated May 27, 2016. Document filed by Department of Homeland Security's Office of Civil Rights and Civil Liberties, Department of Justice's Office of Information Policy, Department of Justice's Office of Legal Counsel, Executive Office For Immigration Review, Federal Bureau Of Investigation, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Justice, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Waterman, Brandon) (Entered: 05/27/2016)
2016-05-2777LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Therese Craparo dated May 27, 2016 re: 76 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time and to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Brandon M. Waterman dated May 27, 2016. . Document filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus, Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law, National Day Laborer Organizing Network. (Craparo, Therese) (Entered: 05/27/2016)
2016-06-0178MEMO ENDORSEMENT on 77 Letter Response granting 76 Letter Motion for Extension of Time and to Adjourn Conference. ENDORSEMENT: The motion for an 18-day extension is granted on the understanding (based on the Government's representation in ECF No. 76) that such delay "should not significantly affect the dates when the Plaintiffs will receive documents". The Court is mindful of plaintiffs' desire to receive responsive records as soon as possible -- but the Court also wants the most complete production grid possible to assist us all in insuring that happens smoothly. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 6/1/2016) (kko) (Entered: 06/01/2016)
2016-06-0679MEMORANDUM DECISION & ORDER: For these reasons, the Government's motion to strike portions of the April 14 Request is GRANTED IN PART in accordance with the above. The status conference currently scheduled for June 16, 2016 shall be adjourned to July 14, 2016, at 10 a.m. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 6/6/2016) (kgo) Modified on 6/27/2016 (kgo). (Entered: 06/06/2016)
2016-06-06Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 7/14/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest. (kgo) (Entered: 06/06/2016)
2016-06-1780LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Arastu K. Chaudhury dated June 17, 2016. Document filed by Department of Homeland Security's Office of Civil Rights and Civil Liberties, Department of Justice's Office of Information Policy, Department of Justice's Office of Legal Counsel, Executive Office For Immigration Review, Federal Bureau Of Investigation, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Justice, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Chaudhury, Arastu) (Entered: 06/17/2016)
2016-06-2081ORDER granting 80 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Conference rescheduled to 7/14/16 at 3pm. Status Conference set for 7/14/2016 at 03:00 PM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 6/20/2016) (lmb) (Entered: 06/20/2016)
2016-06-2482LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Arastu K. Chaudhury dated June 24, 2016 re: Production Grid. Document filed by Department of Homeland Security's Office of Civil Rights and Civil Liberties, Department of Justice's Office of Information Policy, Department of Justice's Office of Legal Counsel, Executive Office For Immigration Review, Federal Bureau Of Investigation, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Justice, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 OLC, # 2 OIP and DOJ, # 3 EOIR, # 4 CBP, # 5 USCIS, # 6 FBI, # 7 DHS and CRCL, # 8 ICE)(Chaudhury, Arastu) (Entered: 06/24/2016)
2016-07-0583NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lindsay Cotten Nash on behalf of Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus, Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law, National Day Laborer Organizing Network. (Nash, Lindsay) (Entered: 07/05/2016)
2016-07-1484NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Emilou Harris MacLean on behalf of Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus, Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law, National Day Laborer Organizing Network. (MacLean, Emilou) (Entered: 07/14/2016)
2016-07-1585ORDER: The Court held a status conference in this action on July 14, 2016. As stated at the conference, the following briefing schedule shall govern this action: 1. Motion on timing of production: a. August 15, 2016: Plaintiffs' supplemental briefing. b. September 15, 2016: Defendants' opposition. c. October 14, 2016: Plaintiffs' reply. d. October 28, 2106: Defendants' surreply (if necessary). 2. Motion for summary judgment on grounds other than production timing: a. September 15, 2016: Defendants' opening brief. b. October 28, 2016: Plaintiffs' opposition. c. November 22, 2016: Defendants' reply., ( Brief due by 9/15/2016., Responses due by 10/28/2016, Replies due by 11/22/2016., Surreplies due by 10/28/2016.) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 7/15/2016) (lmb) (Entered: 07/15/2016)
2016-07-22Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Katherine B. Forrest: Status Conference held on 7/22/2016. (jp) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
2016-08-0186TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 7/14/2016 before Judge Katherine B. Forrest. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela Utter, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/25/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/5/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/3/2016.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 08/01/2016)
2016-08-0187NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 7/14/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 08/01/2016)
2016-08-0488LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Samuel Dolinger dated 8/4/2016 re: joint amendments to the production grid. Document filed by Department of Homeland Security's Office of Civil Rights and Civil Liberties, Department of Justice's Office of Information Policy, Department of Justice's Office of Legal Counsel, Executive Office For Immigration Review, Federal Bureau Of Investigation, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Justice, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Dolinger, Samuel) (Entered: 08/04/2016)
2016-08-1589MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus, Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law, National Day Laborer Organizing Network. Responses due by 9/15/2016(Diana, Anthony) (Entered: 08/15/2016)
2016-08-1590FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE 95 Declaration) - DECLARATION of Anthony Diana in Support re: 89 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus, Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law, National Day Laborer Organizing Network. (Attachments: # 1 Attach 1 - Production Grid)(Diana, Anthony) Modified on 8/16/2016 (db). (Entered: 08/15/2016)
2016-08-1591FILING ERROR - DUPLICATE DOCUMENT - DECLARATION of Anthony Diana in Support re: 89 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus, Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law, National Day Laborer Organizing Network. (Attachments: # 1 Attach 2 - Garcia Declaration)(Diana, Anthony) Modified on 8/16/2016 (db). (Entered: 08/15/2016)
2016-08-1592FILING ERROR - DUPLICATE DOCUMENT - DECLARATION of Anthony Diana in Support re: 89 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus, Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law, National Day Laborer Organizing Network. (Attachments: # 1 Attach 3 - Grosso Declaration, # 2 Attach 4 - LA Times Article, # 3 Attach 5 - Menchaca Declaration, # 4 Attach 6 - Hussain Declaration, # 5 Attach 7 - Newman Declaration, # 6 Attach 8 - Lofgren Letter, # 7 Attach 9 - Secure Comm Memo, # 8 Attach 10 - Priorities Memo, # 9 Attach 11 - Sanders Letter, # 10 Attach 12 - Tennessean Article, # 11 Attach 13 - Medina Declaration)(Diana, Anthony) Modified on 8/16/2016 (db). (Entered: 08/15/2016)
2016-08-1593FILING ERROR - DUPLICATE DOCUMENT - DECLARATION of Anthony Diana in Support re: 89 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus, Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law, National Day Laborer Organizing Network. (Attachments: # 1 Attach 14 - Salceda Declaration, # 2 Attach 15 Polstein Declaration, # 3 Attach 16 Arriaga Declaration, # 4 Attach 17 - Kiernan Declaration, # 5 Attach 18 - Lopez Declaration, # 6 Attach 19 - Hernandez Declaration, # 7 Attach 20 - Eldridge Letter, # 8 Attach 21 - Rickerd Declaration, # 9 Article 22 - Boston Globe Article)(Diana, Anthony) Modified on 8/16/2016 (db). (Entered: 08/15/2016)
2016-08-1694MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 89 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus, Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law, National Day Laborer Organizing Network. (Diana, Anthony) (Entered: 08/16/2016)
2016-08-16***NOTE TO ATTORNEY THAT THE ATTEMPTED FILING OF Document Nos. [91-93] HAVE BEEN REJECTED. THESE ARE DUPLICATED DOCUMENTS. Note to Attorney Anthony J. Diana : These are Duplicate Documents. Do Not Re-File. (db) (Entered: 08/16/2016)
2016-08-1695DECLARATION of Anthony Diana in Support re: 89 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus, Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law, National Day Laborer Organizing Network. (Attachments: # 1 Attach 1 - Production Grid, # 2 Attach 2 - Garcia Declaration, # 3 Attach 3 - Grosso Declaration, # 4 Attach 4 - LA Times Article, # 5 Attach 5 - Menchaca Declaration, # 6 Attach 6 - Hussain Declaration, # 7 Attach 7 - Newman Declaration, # 8 Attach 8 - Lofgren Letter, # 9 Attach 9 Secure Comm Memo, # 10 Attach 10 - Priorities Memo, # 11 Attach 11 - Sanders Letter, # 12 Attach 12 - Tennessean Article, # 13 Attach 13 - Medina Declaration, # 14 Attach 14 - Salceda Declaration, # 15 Attach 15 - Polstein Declaration, # 16 Attach 16 - Arriaga Declaration, # 17 Attach 17 - Kiernan Declaration, # 18 Attach 18 - Lopez Declaration, # 19 Attach 19 - Hernandez Declaration, # 20 Attach 20 - Eldridge Letter, # 21 Attach 21 - Rickerd Declaration, # 22 Attach 22 - Boston Globe Article)(Diana, Anthony) (Entered: 08/16/2016)
2016-09-1596MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 89 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Department of Homeland Security's Office of Civil Rights and Civil Liberties, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Chaudhury, Arastu) (Entered: 09/15/2016)
2016-09-1597MOTION for Summary Judgment on behalf of FBI and EOIR ., MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on behalf of USCIS and ICE . Document filed by Executive Office For Immigration Review, Federal Bureau Of Investigation, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Chaudhury, Arastu) (Entered: 09/15/2016)
2016-09-1598MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment on behalf of FBI and EOIR . MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on behalf of USCIS and ICE . . Document filed by Executive Office For Immigration Review, Federal Bureau Of Investigation, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Chaudhury, Arastu) (Entered: 09/15/2016)
2016-09-1599DECLARATION of Fernando Pineiro in Support re: 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment on behalf of FBI and EOIR . MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on behalf of USCIS and ICE .. Document filed by United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Chaudhury, Arastu) (Entered: 09/15/2016)
2016-09-15100DECLARATION of Jeffrey A. Wilson in Support re: 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment on behalf of FBI and EOIR . MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on behalf of USCIS and ICE .. Document filed by United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Chaudhury, Arastu) (Entered: 09/15/2016)
2016-09-15101DECLARATION of Brian K. Stokes in Support re: 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment on behalf of FBI and EOIR . MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on behalf of USCIS and ICE .. Document filed by United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Chaudhury, Arastu) (Entered: 09/15/2016)
2016-09-15102DECLARATION of Crystal R. Souza in Support re: 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment on behalf of FBI and EOIR . MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on behalf of USCIS and ICE .. Document filed by Executive Office For Immigration Review. (Chaudhury, Arastu) (Entered: 09/15/2016)
2016-09-15103DECLARATION of Jean King in Support re: 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment on behalf of FBI and EOIR . MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on behalf of USCIS and ICE .. Document filed by Executive Office For Immigration Review. (Chaudhury, Arastu) (Entered: 09/15/2016)
2016-09-15104DECLARATION of Brett Endres in Support re: 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment on behalf of FBI and EOIR . MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on behalf of USCIS and ICE .. Document filed by Executive Office For Immigration Review. (Chaudhury, Arastu) (Entered: 09/15/2016)
2016-09-15105DECLARATION of David M. Hardy in Support re: 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment on behalf of FBI and EOIR . MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on behalf of USCIS and ICE .. Document filed by Federal Bureau Of Investigation. (Chaudhury, Arastu) (Entered: 09/15/2016)
2016-09-15106DECLARATION of Albert Davis in Support re: 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment on behalf of FBI and EOIR . MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on behalf of USCIS and ICE .. Document filed by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Chaudhury, Arastu) (Entered: 09/15/2016)
2016-09-15107DECLARATION of Jill A. Eggleston in Support re: 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment on behalf of FBI and EOIR . MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on behalf of USCIS and ICE .. Document filed by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Chaudhury, Arastu) (Entered: 09/15/2016)
2016-09-15108DECLARATION of Kevin L. Tyrrell in Opposition re: 89 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Department of Homeland Security's Office of Civil Rights and Civil Liberties, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Chaudhury, Arastu) (Entered: 09/15/2016)
2016-10-11109LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from ANTHONY DIANA dated 10/11/2016. Document filed by National Day Laborer Organizing Network.(Diana, Anthony) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
2016-10-12110ORDER granting 109 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 10/11/2016) (cla) (Entered: 10/12/2016)
2016-10-14111REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 89 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law, National Day Laborer Organizing Network. (Diana, Anthony) (Entered: 10/14/2016)
2016-10-14112DECLARATION of Anthony J. Diana in Support re: 89 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law, National Day Laborer Organizing Network. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment 1, # 2 Affidavit Attachment 2, # 3 Affidavit Attachment 3, # 4 Affidavit Attachment 4, # 5 Affidavit Attachment 5, # 6 Affidavit Attachment 6, # 7 Affidavit Attachment 7, # 8 Affidavit Attachment 8, # 9 Affidavit Attachment 9, # 10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Diana, Anthony) (Entered: 10/14/2016)
2016-10-28113REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 89 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Surreply) . Document filed by Department of Homeland Security's Office of Civil Rights and Civil Liberties, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Chaudhury, Arastu) (Entered: 10/28/2016)
2016-10-28114DECLARATION of Fernando Pineiro (Supplemental) in Opposition re: 89 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Chaudhury, Arastu) (Entered: 10/28/2016)
2016-10-28115MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment on behalf of FBI and EOIR . MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on behalf of USCIS and ICE . . Document filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus, Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law, National Day Laborer Organizing Network. (Fritzsche, Thomas) (Entered: 10/28/2016)
2016-10-28116DECLARATION of Astha Sharma in Opposition re: 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment on behalf of FBI and EOIR . MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on behalf of USCIS and ICE .. Document filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus, Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law, National Day Laborer Organizing Network. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18 Part A, # 19 Exhibit 18 Part B, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25)(Fritzsche, Thomas) (Entered: 10/28/2016)
2016-10-28117DECLARATION of Daniel L. Regard II in Opposition re: 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment on behalf of FBI and EOIR . MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on behalf of USCIS and ICE .. Document filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus, Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law, National Day Laborer Organizing Network. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Fritzsche, Thomas) (Entered: 10/28/2016)
2016-10-28118DECLARATION of Emilou MacLean in Opposition re: 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment on behalf of FBI and EOIR . MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on behalf of USCIS and ICE .. Document filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus, Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law, National Day Laborer Organizing Network. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Fritzsche, Thomas) (Entered: 10/28/2016)
2016-10-28119DECLARATION of Bridget Kessler in Opposition re: 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment on behalf of FBI and EOIR . MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on behalf of USCIS and ICE .. Document filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus, Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law, National Day Laborer Organizing Network. (Fritzsche, Thomas) (Entered: 10/28/2016)
2016-10-28120DECLARATION of Thomas Fritzsche in Opposition re: 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment on behalf of FBI and EOIR . MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on behalf of USCIS and ICE .. Document filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus, Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law, National Day Laborer Organizing Network. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Fritzsche, Thomas) (Entered: 10/28/2016)
2016-10-28121NOTICE of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment re: 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment on behalf of FBI and EOIR . MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on behalf of USCIS and ICE .. Document filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus, Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law, National Day Laborer Organizing Network. (Fritzsche, Thomas) (Entered: 10/28/2016)
2016-11-16122ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Lindsay C. Nash dated 11/14/2016 re: Request for Authorization of the Appearance of three Law Student Interns. ENDORSEMENT: Ordered: Post to docket. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 11/16/2016) (cla) (Entered: 11/16/2016)
2016-11-22123REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment on behalf of FBI and EOIR . MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on behalf of USCIS and ICE . . Document filed by Executive Office For Immigration Review, Federal Bureau Of Investigation, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Chaudhury, Arastu) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
2016-11-22124DECLARATION of Crystal R. Souza (Supplemental) in Support re: 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment on behalf of FBI and EOIR . MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on behalf of USCIS and ICE .. Document filed by Executive Office For Immigration Review. (Chaudhury, Arastu) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
2016-11-22125DECLARATION of David M. Hardy (Second) in Support re: 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment on behalf of FBI and EOIR . MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on behalf of USCIS and ICE .. Document filed by Federal Bureau Of Investigation. (Chaudhury, Arastu) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
2017-01-07126FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Thomas Fritzsche to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus, Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law, National Day Laborer Organizing Network. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Fritzsche, Thomas) Modified on 1/11/2017 (db). (Entered: 01/07/2017)
2017-01-11***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Thomas Fritzsche to RE-FILE Document 126 MOTION for Thomas Fritzsche to Withdraw as Attorney . ERROR(S): Supporting Documents are filed separately, each receiving their own document #'s. (db) (Entered: 01/11/2017)
2017-01-11127MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 126 MOTION for Thomas Fritzsche to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law, Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus, National Day Laborer Organizing Network. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. Attorney Thomas Fritzsche terminated. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 1/11/2017) (tn) (Entered: 01/11/2017)
2017-02-07128FIRST MOTION for Angela Fuhn Chan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13288568. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus.(Chan, Angela) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
2017-02-07>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 128 FIRST MOTION for Angela Fuhn Chan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13288568. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. . The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
2017-02-13129LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Brandon M. Waterman dated February 13, 2017 re: DHS/CRCL's Amendment to the Production Grid. Document filed by Department of Homeland Security's Office of Civil Rights and Civil Liberties, United States Department of Homeland Security.(Waterman, Brandon) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
2017-02-15130ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 128 Motion for Angela Fuhn Chan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 2/15/2017) (mro) (Entered: 02/15/2017)
2017-02-17131MEMORANDUM DECISION & ORDER granting in part and denying in part 89 Motion for Summary Judgment. For the foregoing reasons, plaintiffs motion for summary judgment is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART, as set forth in this decision. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 89. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 2/17/2017) (cla) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
2017-04-19132MEMORANDUM DECISION & ORDER granting in part and denying in part 97 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 97 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. For the foregoing reasons, defendants' motion for summary judgment is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART and plaintiffs' cross-motion for summary judgment is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 97. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 4/19/2017) (cla) (Entered: 04/20/2017)
2017-05-10133LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Anthony Diana dated May 10, 2017 re: Redactions. Document filed by National Day Laborer Organizing Network.(Diana, Anthony) (Entered: 05/10/2017)
2017-05-12134MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: 133 Letter filed by National Day Laborer Organizing Network. Ordered. See my Individual Rules. Discovery motions are 3 pages. If this is other than a discovery motion, I don't require or have pre-motion conferences, just file a regular motion. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 5/12/2017) (ap) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
2017-06-16135NOTICE OF APPEAL from 132 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment,,,,. Document filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus, Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law, National Day Laborer Organizing Network. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number 0208-13794962. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Diana, Anthony) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
2017-06-16Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: 135 Notice of Appeal. (tp) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
2017-06-16Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for 135 Notice of Appeal, filed by Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law, Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus, National Day Laborer Organizing Network were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
2017-06-26136NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 4/19/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
2017-08-08137MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to 135 Notice of Appeal, filed by Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law, Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus, National Day Laborer Organizing Network. USCA Case Number 17-1927. The parties in the above-referenced case have filed a stipulation withdrawing this appeal pursuant to FRAP 42. The stipulation is hereby "So Ordered".. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 08/08/2017. (nd) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
2018-02-08138ORDER: As the Court has heard nothing from the parties in this case since May 2017, it assumes that no further proceedings in this case are necessary. The parties should inform the Court not later than February 16, 2018, if they disagree with this assessment. If the parties are silent or agree, the Court shall terminate this action. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 2/8/2018) (ap) (Entered: 02/08/2018)
2018-02-16139LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Anthony J. Diana dated February 16, 2018 re: Response to Order dated February 8, 2018. Document filed by National Day Laborer Organizing Network.(Diana, Anthony) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
2018-02-16140MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 139 Letter filed by National Day Laborer Organizing Network. ENDORSEMENT: Ordered. The parties shall provide this Court with a status update with regard to all open matters not later than 5/1/18. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 2/16/2018) (ras) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
2018-05-01141LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Anthony Diana dated 5/1/2018 re: Court Order dated 2/16/2018. Document filed by National Day Laborer Organizing Network.(Diana, Anthony) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
2018-07-31142LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Samuel Dolinger dated 7/31/2018 re: parties' joint status update. Document filed by Department of Homeland Security's Office of Civil Rights and Civil Liberties, Department of Justice's Office of Information Policy, Department of Justice's Office of Legal Counsel, Executive Office For Immigration Review, Federal Bureau Of Investigation, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Justice, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Dolinger, Samuel) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
2018-07-31143STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL IN PART: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the parties, as follows: This action is hereby dismissed with prejudice as against DOJ, OIP, OLC, and USCIS. The parties reserve all rights concerning any request for attorney's fees relating to the FOIA requests and/or the April 14 Request as they concern DOJ, OIP, OLC, and USCIS The parties understand and agree that this Stipulation and Order of Dismissal in Part contains the entire agreement between them, and that no statements, representations, promises, agreements, or negotiations, oral or otherwise, between the parties or their counsel that are not included herein shall be of any force or effect. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 7/31/2018) (js) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
2018-08-02144MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 142 Letter,, filed by Department of Homeland Security's Office of Civil Rights and Civil Liberties, United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Justice, Executive Office For Immigration Review, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Federal Bureau Of Investigation, Department of Justice's Office of Information Policy, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Department of Justice's Office of Legal Counsel, United States Department of Homeland Security. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 8/1/2018) (js) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
2018-09-20NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Judge Katherine B. Forrest is no longer assigned to the case. (sjo) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
2018-10-01145JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Arastu K. Chaudhury dated October 1, 2018 re: Joint Status Update. Document filed by Department of Homeland Security's Office of Civil Rights and Civil Liberties, Department of Justice's Office of Information Policy, Department of Justice's Office of Legal Counsel, Executive Office For Immigration Review, Federal Bureau Of Investigation, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Justice, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Chaudhury, Arastu) (Entered: 10/01/2018)
2018-10-03146MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 145 Letter filed by Department of Homeland Security's Office of Civil Rights and Civil Liberties, United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Justice, Executive Office For Immigration Review, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Federal Bureau Of Investigation, Department of Justice's Office of Information Policy, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Department of Justice's Office of Legal Counsel, United States Department of Homeland Security. ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates this update and looks forward to the December 3rd status update. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 10/2/2018) (jca) (Entered: 10/03/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar