Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHinson-Gribble v. United States Office of Personnel Management, et al
DistrictEastern District of North Carolina
CityWestern Division
Case Number5:2016cv00070
Date Filed2016-02-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Louise Wood Flanagan
PlaintiffQuancidine Hinson-Gribble
Case DescriptionQuancidine Hinson-Gribble filed suit against OPM and a number of related individual employees, many of whom worked for the Army for government's failure to correct the security breach that resulted in a number of names of government employees in the OPM database being exposed to hacking. While this is a privacy issue, Hinson-Gribble does not state a claim under FOIA, which pertains only to access to government information and has no remedy for the way in which records are maintained.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantUnited States Office of Personnel Management
DefendantKatherine Archeleta Former Director
DefendantKatherine Archeleta Former Director
TERMINATED: 09/05/2018
DefendantDonna Seymour Chief Information Officer
DefendantDonna Seymour Chief Information Officer
TERMINATED: 09/05/2018
DefendantArmy Community Services
DefendantArmy Community Services
TERMINATED: 09/08/2017
DefendantSurvivors Outreach Services
DefendantCharlotte Watson
DefendantCharlotte Watson
TERMINATED: 09/05/2018
DefendantAmy Melendez
DefendantAmy Melendez
TERMINATED: 09/05/2018
DefendantJoanie L. Hammons
DefendantJoanie L. Hammons
TERMINATED: 09/08/2017
DefendantDavid E. McDermott Deputy Director, Operations
DefendantDavid E. McDermott Deputy Director, Operations
TERMINATED: 09/08/2017
DefendantJim Szatkowski Congressional Team Lead
DefendantJim Szatkowski Congressional Team Lead
TERMINATED: 09/08/2017
DefendantCynthia Virrueta Beneficiary Services Branch
DefendantCynthia Virrueta Beneficiary Services Branch
TERMINATED: 09/05/2018
DefendantJohn W. Ellerbe DA Project Manager
DefendantJohn W. Ellerbe DA Project Manager
TERMINATED: 09/05/2018
DefendantJim Klemowski
DefendantJim Klemowski
TERMINATED: 09/05/2018
DefendantEthel Knock ID Card Supervisor
DefendantEthel Knock ID Card Supervisor
TERMINATED: 09/05/2018
DefendantJeffrey M. Sanborn Colonel
DefendantJeffrey M. Sanborn Colonel
TERMINATED: 09/08/2017
DefendantKay Hagan Senator
DefendantKay Hagan Senator
TERMINATED: 09/08/2017
DefendantUnited States of America
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [54]
Complaint
Opinion/Order [92]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-02-111MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Envelope) (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 02/11/2016)
2016-02-112Letter from Case Administrator to Plaintiff. (Baker, C.) (Entered: 02/11/2016)
2016-02-163MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet (signed) , # 2 Letter to Plaintiff from U.S. Office of Personnel Management, # 3 Envelope) (Baker, C.) (Entered: 02/16/2016)
2016-02-164Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. (Baker, C.) (Entered: 02/16/2016)
2016-02-16Motion Referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge James E. Gates - 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Baker, C.) (Entered: 02/16/2016)
2016-02-225Proposed Summonses and USM-285 Forms filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (Baker, C.) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
2016-05-056Courtesy Copy of Letter from Plaintiff to President Barack Obama. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (Baker, C.) (Entered: 05/05/2016)
2016-06-097Document: Memorandum for Plaintiff dated 5/6/2016 from Department of the Treasure, Internal Revenue Service filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (Baker, C.) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
2016-06-208Document: Proposed Subpoena for Regions Bank Fraud Department filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter, # 2 Envelope) (Tripp, S.) (Entered: 06/20/2016)
2016-08-129Document: VetsNet Compensation and Pension Award filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (Baker, C.) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
2016-08-1210Document: Letter to Plaintiff from U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs acknowledging receipt of electronic Privacy Act request filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (Baker, C.) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
2016-09-2611Document: Letter to plaintiff from U.S. Postal Service dated 10/29/2014 filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (Baker, C.) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
2016-10-1712Record of Memorandum filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (Baker, C.) (Entered: 10/17/2016)
2016-10-2613SEALED Document by Plaintiff - Various Vital Records. (available to: Plaintiff and Defendants). (Tripp, S.) Modified on 10/27/2016 to note accessibility (Tripp, S.). (Entered: 10/26/2016)
2016-11-0114Document: Record of Memorandum filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Summons, # 2 Envelope) (Baker, C.) (Entered: 11/01/2016)
2016-11-0315Document: Courtesy Copy of Letter to President filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. (Attachments: # 1 Copy of CM/ECF Inquiry, # 2 Envelope) (Baker, C.) (Entered: 11/03/2016)
2016-12-2116Document: Record of Memorandum filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter, # 2 Envelope) (Tripp, S.) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
2016-12-2217Document: Various FOIA Requests and Military Police Reports filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (Tripp, S.) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
2017-01-0318Document: Memorandum of Record filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (Baker, C.) (Entered: 01/03/2017)
2017-01-0319Document: Notice from Internal Revenue Service dated 01/02/2017 filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (Baker, C.) (Entered: 01/03/2017)
2017-01-1120Document: Notice from Internal Revenue Service and copy of email, both dated 01/06/2017, filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (Baker, C.) (Entered: 01/11/2017)
2017-01-1121Document: Notice from Internal Revenue Service and copy of email, both dated 12/20/2016, filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (Baker, C.) (Entered: 01/11/2017)
2017-01-1722Document: Various Supporting Documentation filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (Baker, C.) (Entered: 01/17/2017)
2017-01-1723Document: Memorandum of Record filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (Baker, C.) (Entered: 01/17/2017)
2017-01-1724Document: Letter from Department of Veterans Affairs, dated December 19, 2016 filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (Baker, C.) (Entered: 01/17/2017)
2017-01-2325Document: Letter from Inspector General/Department of Defense, dated January 17, 2017, filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (Baker, C.) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
2017-01-2626Document: Memorandum of Record filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (Baker, C.) (Entered: 01/26/2017)
2017-01-3027Document: Memorandum of Record filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (Baker, C.) (Entered: 01/30/2017)
2017-02-2728SEALED Document filed by Plaintiff Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (Baker, C.) (Entered: 02/27/2017)
2017-02-2729Document: Exhibit 1 - Government Issued ID Card filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (Baker, C.) (Entered: 02/27/2017)
2017-02-2730Document: Exhibit 2 - Military Police Report filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (Baker, C.) (Entered: 02/27/2017)
2017-02-2731Memorandum of Record filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (Baker, C.) (Entered: 02/27/2017)
2017-02-2732Document: Memorandum of Record filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (Baker, C.) (Entered: 02/27/2017)
2017-03-0833Document: E-mail Correspondence regarding FOIA Request filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter, # 2 Envelope) (Edwards, S.) (Entered: 03/08/2017)
2017-03-0834Document: Cover Letter filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (Edwards, S.) (Entered: 03/08/2017)
2017-03-0835Document: Letter from the Department of the Treasury dated 1/9/2017 filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (Edwards, S.) (Entered: 03/08/2017)
2017-03-0836Document: Letter from the Plaintiff to the US Department of the Treasury dated 1/18/2017 filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (Edwards, S.) (Entered: 03/08/2017)
2017-03-0837Document: Letter from the Department of the Treasury to the Plaintiff dated 1/24/2017 filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (Edwards, S.) (Entered: 03/08/2017)
2017-03-0838Document: Letter from the Department of the Treasury dated 2/22/2017 filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (Edwards, S.) (Entered: 03/08/2017)
2017-03-0839Document: Payment Display filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (Edwards, S.) (Entered: 03/08/2017)
2017-03-0840Document: Copy of Envelope addressed to the Plaintiff dated 2/27/2017 filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (Edwards, S.) (Entered: 03/08/2017)
2017-03-0841Document: Email from Plaintiff to Cynthia Sydnor dated 2/28/2017 regarding FOIA Request filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (Edwards, S.) (Entered: 03/08/2017)
2017-03-0842Document: Redacted Debit Card Information filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (Edwards, S.) (Entered: 03/08/2017)
2017-03-1343Document: Exhibit 2 - Military Police Report filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (Edwards, S.) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
2017-03-2244Document: Article titled "OPM warns of scam targeting federal annuitants" filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (Briggeman, N.) (Entered: 03/22/2017)
2017-03-2245Document: News Release titled "Nine South Florida Residents Charged with Stealing Over $800,000 from the United States Department of Veterans Affairs" filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (Briggeman, N.) (Entered: 03/22/2017)
2017-04-0546NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY AND ORDER regarding the Complaint at [DE 1-1] attached to 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If the plaintiff intends to pursue this case, she shall file by 4/19/2017 a signed proposed complaint. Signed by United States Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 4/5/2017. Copy sent to Quancidine Hinson-Gribble, 6129 Louise Street, Fayetteville, NC 28314 via US Mail. (Edwards, S.) (Entered: 04/05/2017)
2017-04-1247Notice of Change of Phone Number filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (Briggeman, N.) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
2017-04-1248Certificate of Service filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. (Attachments: # 1 Copy of 46 Notice of Deficiency and Order, # 2 Envelope) (Briggeman, N.) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
2017-04-1349Document: Proposed Complaint with certificate of service filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (Briggeman, N.) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
2017-04-1750Certificate of Service filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of the Case, # 2 Cover Letter, # 3 Envelope) (Edwards, S.) (Entered: 04/17/2017)
2017-04-1851Statement of the Case (signed) filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter, # 2 Envelope) (Briggeman, N.) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
2017-05-02Referred the documents at 49 , 50 , and 51 to United States Magistrate Judge James E. Gates, pursuant to his order at 46 . (Edwards, S.) (Entered: 05/02/2017)
2017-07-1152ORDER and MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATION regarding 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble - Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis is ALLOWED. Objections due by 7/25/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 7/11/2017. (Tripp, S.) (Entered: 07/11/2017)
2017-07-2653OBJECTIONS to 52 Order and Memorandum and Recommendation filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Documents, # 2 Letter to Clerk, # 3 Envelope, # 4 Envelope) (Collins, S.) Modified on 7/31/2017 (Collins, S.) to change docket entry from "Response" to "Objections". (Entered: 07/26/2017)
2017-07-26Referred the documents at 53 to United States Magistrate Judge James E. Gates. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 07/26/2017)
2017-07-31Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan: regarding 52 MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
2017-07-31Objections to Memorandum and Recommendation were removed from referral to United States Magistrate Judge James E. Gates. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
2017-09-0854ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 52 Memorandum and Recommendations. The court ADOPTS the M&R in full. The court DISMISSES plaintiffs FISMA and 40 U.S.C. § 11331 claims. The court also DISMISSES plaintiffs Privacy Act claims against the individual defendants, the2 Specifically, as set forth in the M&R, the Privacy Act does not provide a vehicle for plaintiffs to challenge substantive decisions made by an agency. See e.g., Melvin v. U.S. Dept of Veterans Affairs, 70 F. Supp. 3d 350, 357 (D.D.C. Sept., 30, 2014). Accordingly, to the extent plaintiff asserts claims under the Privacy Act to obtain relief from substantive decisions made with respect to various benefits she argues are due to her, such claims are dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Installation Command, the DFAS, and the agency defendants, to the extent such claims against the agency defendants seek to challenge substantive decisions made by those agencies. The court ALLOWS plaintiffs remaining Privacy Act claims against defendants OPM, the Outreach Center, the DMDC, the APO, and the ID Card Facility to proceed. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 9/7/2017. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
2017-09-0855Summons Issued, including USM-285, as to All Defendants. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
2017-09-0856COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
2017-09-0857Document: Correspondence from Plaintiff filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Email to President Trump 9/4/17, # 2 Envelope) (Collins, S.) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
2017-09-0858Document: Correspondence from Plaintiff Package 2 filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit OIG Audit Report, # 2 Envelope) (Collins, S.) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
2017-09-0859Document: Correspondence from Plaintiff Package 3 filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Court Case USA v. Yu Pingan, # 2 Envelope) (Collins, S.) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
2017-09-1160Document: Letter to President Trump dated 9/6/17 filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter from Plaintiff to President Trump, # 2 Envelope) (Collins, S.) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
2017-09-1161Document: Cover letter with Fox News report FBI arrest Chinese linked to 2015 US Government data hack filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Fox News report dated 8/25/17, # 2 Envelope) (Collins, S.) Modified on 9/12/2017 (Collins, S.). (Entered: 09/12/2017)
2017-09-1162Document: Cover Letter with NY Times articles Chinese National Arrested in Connection with US Cyberattacks filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit NY Times article, # 2 Envelope) (Collins, S.) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
2017-09-2163PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN served on Amy Melendez on 9/18/17. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 09/26/2017)
2017-09-2164PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN served on Charlotte Watson on 9/18/17. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 09/26/2017)
2017-09-2165PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN served on Survivors Outreach Services Center on 9/18/17. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 09/26/2017)
2017-09-2166PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN served on Army Community Services on 9/18/17. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 09/26/2017)
2017-09-2167PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN served on Ethel Knock, ID Card Supervisor on 9/18/17. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 09/26/2017)
2017-09-2168PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN served on Jeffey M. Sanborn on 9/18/17. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 09/26/2017)
2017-09-2669PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN served on Senator Kay Hagan on 9/21/17. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 09/26/2017)
2017-09-2670PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN served on John W. Ellerbe on 9/18/17. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 09/26/2017)
2017-09-2671PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN served on Joanie L. Hammons on 9/19/17. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 09/26/2017)
2017-09-2672PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN served on Jim Szatkowski on 9/19/17. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 09/26/2017)
2017-09-2673PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN served on Cynthia Virrueta on 9/19/17. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 09/26/2017)
2017-09-2674PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN served on Jim Klemowski on 9/19/17. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 09/26/2017)
2017-10-0275Process Receipt and Return for Summons and Petition served on United States Office of Personnel Management on 9/25/2017. (Tripp, S.) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
2017-10-1976PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN served on Donna Seymour on 9/22/17. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 10/24/2017)
2017-10-1977PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN served on David E. McDermott on 9/19/17. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 10/24/2017)
2017-10-1978PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN served on Katherine Archeleta on 9/20/17. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 10/24/2017)
2017-10-2479Letter from Plaintiff requesting default be entered in timely manner by clerk. (Attachments: # 1 USPS service tracking) (Collins, S.) (Entered: 10/24/2017)
2017-10-2780Letter from Quancidine Hinson-Gribble requesting default judgments against defendants McDermott, Seymour and Archleta. (Attachments: # 1 Process receipts, # 2 Envelope) (Collins, S.) (Entered: 11/01/2017)
2017-11-0181PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (duplicate) filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble served on Donna Seymour on 9/22/17. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (Collins, S.) (Entered: 11/01/2017)
2017-11-0682MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (Collins, S.) (Entered: 11/09/2017)
2017-11-1683MOTION for Entry of Default as to defendants The United States Office of Personnel Management, Survivors Outreach Service Center and Army Community Service filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. (Attachments: # 1 Copy of November 4, 2017 Request/Motion, # 2 Envelope) (Tripp, S.) (Entered: 11/20/2017)
2018-02-0984Letter from Plaintiff. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default, # 2 Envelope) (Collins, S.) Modified on 4/4/2018 to revise docket entry description. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 02/14/2018)
2018-02-15Motions Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding: 83 MOTION for Entry of Default, 82 MOTION for Entry of Default. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 02/15/2018)
2018-03-0985Notice of Appearance filed by Roberto F. Ramirez on behalf of United States of America. (Ramirez, Roberto) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
2018-03-0986MOTION to Dismiss for insufficient service of process filed by United States of America. (Ramirez, Roberto) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
2018-03-0987Memorandum in Support regarding 86 MOTION to Dismiss for insufficient service of process filed by United States of America. (Ramirez, Roberto) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
2018-03-1388Rule 12 Letter Issued to Pro Se Plaintiff as to 86 MOTION to Dismiss for insufficient service of process - Responses due by 4/2/2018. (Tripp, S.) (Entered: 03/13/2018)
2018-03-1489RESPONSE to Motion regarding 85 Notice of Appearance, 86 MOTION to Dismiss for insufficient service of process, 87 Memorandum in Support filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. (Attachments: # 1 Docket Sheet Excerpt, # 2 Envelope) (Tripp, S.) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
2018-03-2090Letter from Plaintiff contesting notice of appearance by defense counsel. (Attachments: # 1 Documents in support of letter, # 2 Envelope, # 3 Exhibit Copy of docket history) (Collins, S.) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
2018-04-03Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding 86 MOTION to Dismiss for insufficient service of process. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 04/03/2018)
2018-04-04Motions No Longer Referred to Clerk: 83 MOTION for Entry of Default, 82 MOTION for Entry of Default. Motions Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 04/04/2018)
2018-08-0991Letter from Pro se Plaintiff Quancidine Hinson-Gribble requesting status of pending motions. (Attachments: # 1 Order dated 9/8/17, # 2 Copy of case docket sheet, # 3 Envelope) (Collins, S.) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
2018-08-2292ORDER - The court GRANTS defendants' motion to dismiss 86 . For good cause shown, plaintiff's deadline to effect service is EXTENDED to September 21, 2018, and deadline for showing proof of service on the record shall be and is September 30, 2018. Plaintiff is NOTICED that failure to effect service properly within the appropriate time will result in dismissal of this action without prejudice for failure to serve, and the closing of this case. Where the court grants defendants' request, the court DENIES AS MOOT plaintiffs motions for entry of default 79 82 and 83 . Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 8/22/2018. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
2018-08-3193RESPONSE regarding 92 Order on Motion for Entry of Default, Order on Motion to Dismiss, filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: Pacer History, # 2 Exhibit 2: Pacer Docket Page, # 3 Exhibit 3: Copy of Order DE92 with handwritten comments by plaintiff, # 4 Envelope) (Collins, S.) (Entered: 08/31/2018)
2018-09-0594ORDER regarding 93 Response filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 9/5/2018. (A certified copy of this Order was sent via US mail to Quancidine Hinson-Gribble, 6129 Louise Street, Fayetteville, NC 28314.) (Collins, S.) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
2018-09-0795PRAECIPE Failure to Rule on a Motion and Delay of Judgments filed by Quancidine Hinson-Gribble. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1- Pacer.gov Manifest, # 2 Exhibit 2 - The FOIA Project, Manifest, # 3 Envelope) (Tripp, S.) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar