Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv00634
Date Filed2016-04-04
Date Closed2016-09-16
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER
Case DescriptionEPIC submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Transportation for records concerning the November 2015 meeting of the Unmanned Aircraft System Registration Task Force. After hearing nothing further from the agency, EPIC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-04-041COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4471288) filed by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Combined)(Tran, Thailam) (Entered: 04/04/2016)
2016-04-042Corporate Disclosure Statement by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Tran, Thailam) (Entered: 04/04/2016)
2016-04-043NOTICE of Appearance by Thailam John Tran on behalf of ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER (Tran, Thailam) (Entered: 04/04/2016)
2016-04-04Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (jd) (Entered: 04/05/2016)
2016-04-054SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Forms)(jd) (Entered: 04/05/2016)
2016-04-115NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Jay Butler on behalf of ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER (Butler, Alan) (Entered: 04/11/2016)
2016-04-116NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Rotenberg on behalf of ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER (Rotenberg, Marc) (Entered: 04/11/2016)
2016-04-127RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION served on 4/11/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Delivery Receipt)(Tran, Thailam) (Main Document 7 replaced on 4/13/2016) (znmw). (Entered: 04/12/2016)
2016-04-128RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/12/16. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Delivery Receipt)(Tran, Thailam) (Main Document 8 replaced on 4/13/2016) (znmw). (Entered: 04/12/2016)
2016-04-129RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/11/2016. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/11/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Delivery Receipt)(Tran, Thailam) (Main Document 9 replaced on 4/13/2016) (znmw). (Entered: 04/12/2016)
2016-04-2210NOTICE of Appearance by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 04/22/2016)
2016-05-0611Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 05/06/2016)
2016-05-06MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Defendant's Consent Motion for an Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before May 25, 2016. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 5/6/2016. (lcrc3) (Entered: 05/06/2016)
2016-05-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 5/25/2016, (tj) (Entered: 05/06/2016)
2016-05-2512ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION.(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 05/25/2016)
2016-05-25MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before June 9, 2016. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 5/25/2016. (lcrc3) (Entered: 05/25/2016)
2016-05-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 6/9/2016 (tj) (Entered: 05/26/2016)
2016-06-0913Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
2016-06-09MINUTE ORDER: In light of 13 the Parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant will complete its releases by July 11, 2016. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint status report on or before July 25, 2016. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 6/9/2016. (lcrc3) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
2016-06-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 7/25/2016 (tj) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
2016-07-2214Joint STATUS REPORT by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Tran, Thailam) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
2016-07-22MINUTE ORDER: In light of 14 the Parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint status report on or before August 22, 2016. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/22/2016. (lcrc3) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
2016-08-2215Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 08/22/2016)
2016-08-22MINUTE ORDER: In light of 15 the Parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that on or before September 21, 2016, the parties shall file either a joint stipulation of dismissal or a joint status report explaining their need for additional time. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/22/2016. (lcrc3) (Entered: 08/22/2016)
2016-09-1416NOTICE of Settlement and Stipulation of Dismissal by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement)(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 09/14/2016)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff