Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCOFFEY v. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv00653
Date Filed2016-04-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffDEBBIE COFFEY
912 N. Sweetzer Ave., Apt. D
West Hollywood, CA 90069
Case DescriptionDebbie Coffey submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Land Management for emails to or from Sally Spencer and other staff working as marketing and outreach specialists pertaining to the agency's wild horse and burro program. Coffey also asked for a fee waiver. The agency denied her fee waiver request and indicated the cost of processing the request would be $2,440. Coffey sent the agency a check for $2,440. The agency then told Coffey it was redacting 240 pages. Coffey then requested a refund of her fees and appealed the agency's decision. She then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Fees - Advance Payment, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Opinion/Order [24]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-04-071COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4475810) filed by DEBBIE COFFEY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 04/07/2016)
2016-04-07Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (sth) (Entered: 04/07/2016)
2016-04-072SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(sth) (Entered: 04/07/2016)
2016-04-253NOTICE of Appearance by April Denise Seabrook on behalf of BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
2016-05-094AMENDED COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT filed by DEBBIE COFFEY.(Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 05/09/2016)
2016-05-235Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 4 Amended Complaint by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 05/23/2016)
2016-06-026NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Stotter on behalf of DEBBIE COFFEY (Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 06/02/2016)
2016-06-03MINUTE ORDER granting the parties' consent motion for an extension of time. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on June 3, 2016. (lcegs4) (Entered: 06/03/2016)
2016-06-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 6/23/2016. (mac) (Entered: 06/06/2016)
2016-06-237ANSWER to 4 Amended Complaint by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. Related document: 4 Amended Complaint filed by DEBBIE COFFEY.(Seabrook, April) (Entered: 06/23/2016)
2016-08-038SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on August 3, 2016. (lcegs4) (Entered: 08/03/2016)
2016-08-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Scheduling Order due by 8/17/2016. (mac) (Entered: 08/03/2016)
2016-08-159Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Proposed Scheduling Order, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 08/15/2016)
2016-08-29MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on August 29, 2016. (lcegs4) (Entered: 08/29/2016)
2016-08-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Scheduling Order due by 9/9/2016. (mac) (Entered: 08/29/2016)
2016-09-0710PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE (Joint) by UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 09/07/2016)
2016-09-0711NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Claire M. Whitaker on behalf of UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT Substituting for attorney April Denise Seabrook (Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 09/07/2016)
2016-09-22MINUTE ORDER. Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed no later than November 30, 2016; Plaintiffs Opposition and Cross Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed no later than December 30, 2016; Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Cross Motion and Reply to PlaintiffsOpposition to Defendants Cross Motion shall be filed no later than January 30, 2017, and Plaintiffs Reply to Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Cross Motion shall be filed no later than February 28, 2017. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on September 22, 2016. (lcegs4) (Entered: 09/22/2016)
2016-09-22MINUTE ORDER. Although a summons was not properly issued to Defendants, Plaintiff proceeded to file a Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's Motion is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiff shall effectuate proper service to Defendants no later than October 28, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on September 22, 2016. (lcegs4) (Entered: 09/22/2016)
2016-09-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants Motion For Summary Judgment due by 11/30/2016. Plaintiffs Opposition And Cross Motion For Summary Judgment due by 12/30/2016. Defendants Opposition To Plaintiffs Cross Motion And Reply To Plaintiffs Opposition To Defendants Cross Motion due by 1/30/2017. Plaintiffs Cross Motion due by 2/28/2017.(mac) (Entered: 09/23/2016)
2016-09-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff To Effectuate Proper Service To Defendants due by 10/28/2016. (mac) (Entered: 09/23/2016)
2016-11-2312MOTION to Amend/Correct Set/Reset Deadlines, by UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Seabrook, April) (Entered: 11/23/2016)
2016-11-2813NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by April Denise Seabrook on behalf of UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT Substituting for attorney Claire M. Whitaker (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 11/28/2016)
2016-11-28MINUTE ORDER granting 12 consent motion to amend briefing schedule. The parties are directed to comply with the following briefing schedule: Defendant's motion for summary judgment shall be filed no later than December 30, 2016. Plaintiff's opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment and plaintiff's cross motion for summary judgment shall be filed by no later than January 30, 2017. Defendant's opposition to plaintiff's cross motion and reply in support of its motion for summary judgment shall be filed by no later than March 3, 2017. Plaintiff's reply in support of its cross motion shall be filed by no later than April 7, 2017. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 11/28/2016. (lcegs4) (Entered: 11/28/2016)
2016-11-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment due by 12/30/2016. Plaintiff's Opposition To Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment And Plaintiff's Cross Motion For Summary Judgment due by 1/30/2017. Defendant' Opposition To Plaintiff's Cross Motion And Reply In Support Of Its Motion For Summary Judgment due by 3/3/2017. Plaintiff's Reply In Support Of Its Cross Motion due by 4/7/2017. (mac) (Entered: 11/29/2016)
2016-12-2914Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,, Set/Reset Deadlines, by UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Seabrook, April) (Entered: 12/29/2016)
2016-12-30MINUTE ORDER granting 14 consent motion to amend briefing schedule. The parties are directed to comply with the following briefing schedule: Defendant's motion for summary judgment shall be filed no later than January 6, 2017. Plaintiff's opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment and plaintiff's cross motion for summary judgment shall be filed by no later than February 6, 2017. Defendant's opposition to plaintiff's cross motion and reply in support of its motion for summary judgment shall be filed by no later than March 9, 2017. Plaintiff's reply in support of its cross motion shall be filed by no later than April 13, 2017. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 12/30/2016. (lcegs4) (Entered: 12/30/2016)
2016-12-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment Motion due by 1/6/2017. Plaintiff's Opposition To Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment and Plaintiff's Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment due by 2/6/2017. Defendant's Opposition To Plaintiff's Cross Motion And Reply In Support Of Its Motion For Summary Judgment due by 3/9/2017. Plaintiff's Reply In Support Of Its Cross Motion due by 4/13/2017. (mac) (Entered: 12/30/2016)
2017-01-0615MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration of R. Witt, # 3 Exhibit - Exhibits to Witt Declaration, # 4 Memorandum in Support)(Seabrook, April) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
2017-01-1016NOTICE Lack of Service by UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 01/10/2017)
2017-01-3017Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply And To Modify Briefing Schedule by DEBBIE COFFEY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stotter, Daniel). Added MOTION to Modify Briefing Schedule on 1/31/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 01/30/2017)
2017-02-03MINUTE ORDER granting 17 consent motion for extension of time and to modify the briefing schedule. The parties are directed to comply with the following briefing schedule: Plaintiff shall file her combined opposition to defendants motion for summary judgment and cross motion for summary judgment by no later than February 21, 2017, Defendant shall file their combined opposition to plaintiff's cross motion for summary judgment and reply in support of defendant's motion for summary judgment by no later than March 24, 2017. Plaintiff shall file her reply in support of her cross motion for summary judgment by no later than April 28, 2017. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 2/3/2017. (lcegs4) (Entered: 02/03/2017)
2017-02-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff Combined Opposition To Defendants Motion For Summary Judgment and Cross Motion For Summary Judgment due by 2/21/2017. Defendants Combined Opposition To Plaintiff's Cross Motion For Summary Judgment and Reply In Support Of Defendant' Motion For Summary Judgment due by 3/24/2017. Plaintiff Reply In Support Of Her Cross Motion For Summary Judgment due by 4/28/2017. (mac) (Entered: 02/03/2017)
2017-02-2118MOTION for Summary Judgment & Memorandum of Points & Authorities by DEBBIE COFFEY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Debbie Coffey & Exhibits A - C, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 02/21/2017)
2017-02-2119RESPONSE re 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DEBBIE COFFEY. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Debbie Coffey & Exhibits A - C, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 02/21/2017)
2017-02-2220ERRATA Notice by UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Errata revised Vaughn index)(Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
2017-03-2421Memorandum in opposition to re 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment & Memorandum of Points & Authorities and Reply in Further Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Supplemented by Ryan Witt)(Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 03/24/2017)
2017-03-2422REPLY to opposition to motion re 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (See Docket Entry 21 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 03/27/2017)
2017-04-1323REPLY to opposition to motion re 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment & Memorandum of Points & Authorities filed by DEBBIE COFFEY. (Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
2017-09-18ENTERED IN ERROR.....Case directly reassigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. Judge Emmet G. Sullivan is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) Modified on 9/19/2017 to enter in error; Judge Sullivan will keep the case.(ztnr) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
2017-09-2924MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on September 29, 2017. (lcegs2) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
2017-09-2925ORDER. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on September 29, 2017. (lcegs2) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
2017-09-29MINUTE ORDER. In view of 24 Memorandum Opinion and 25 Order issued today, proceedings in this case are HEREBY STAYED. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/29/2017. (lcegs1) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
2017-10-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/10/2017. (mac) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff