Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv00656
Date Filed2016-04-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning any contracts or grants awarded or administered by the Office of Weapons Removal and Abatement for work conducted or planned for Libya. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE The Executive Office
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-04-071COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4476378) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons US Department of State, # 3 Summons US Attorney, # 4 Summons US Attorney General)(Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 04/07/2016)
2016-04-072LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 04/07/2016)
2016-04-07Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (md) (Entered: 04/07/2016)
2016-04-073SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 04/07/2016)
2016-04-184RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/13/2016. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/13/2016.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/13/2016., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 4/12/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
2016-04-205NOTICE of Appearance by April Denise Seabrook on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 04/20/2016)
2016-05-136ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Cedrone, Gerard) (Entered: 05/13/2016)
2016-07-087NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Arjun Garg on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE Substituting for attorney April Denise Seabrook and Gerard Justin Cedrone (Garg, Arjun) (Entered: 07/08/2016)
2016-08-038SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on August 3, 2016. (lcegs4) (Entered: 08/03/2016)
2016-08-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Scheduling Order due by 8/17/2016. (mac) (Entered: 08/03/2016)
2016-08-179PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Garg, Arjun) (Entered: 08/17/2016)
2016-08-19MINUTE ORDER. In view of 9 joint proposed scheduling order, the parties are directed to file a joint status report by no later than October 17, 2016.Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/19/2016. (lcegs1) (Entered: 08/19/2016)
2016-08-19Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 10/17/2016. (cdw) (Entered: 08/22/2016)
2016-10-1710Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Garg, Arjun) (Entered: 10/17/2016)
2016-10-18MINUTE ORDER. In view of 10 joint status report, the parties shall file a further joint status report by no later than December 16, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/18/2016. (lcegs1) (Entered: 10/18/2016)
2016-10-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 12/16/2016 (mac) (Entered: 10/18/2016)
2016-12-1611Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Garg, Arjun) (Entered: 12/16/2016)
2017-01-05MINUTE ORDER. In view of 11 joint proposed scheduling order, the parties are directed to file a joint status report by no later than February 17, 2017. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 1/5/2017. (lcegs1) (Entered: 01/05/2017)
2017-01-05Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 2/17/2017. (cdw) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
2017-02-1712Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Garg, Arjun) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
2017-02-17MINUTE ORDER. In view of 12 joint status report, the parties are directed to file a joint status report by no later than April 17, 2017 to update the Court on the status of the Department of State's response to the FOIA request. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 2/17/2017. (lcegs1) Modified event title on 2/21/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 02/17/2017)
2017-02-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/17/2017 (mac) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
2017-04-1713Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Garg, Arjun) (Entered: 04/17/2017)
2017-04-18MINUTE ORDER. In view of 13 joint status report, the parties shall submit a further joint status report by no later than June 16, 2017 to update the Court on the status of the Department of State's response to the FOIA request. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 4/18/2017. (lcegs1) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
2017-04-18Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 6/16/2017. (cdw) (Entered: 04/19/2017)
2017-06-1614Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Garg, Arjun) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
2017-06-19MINUTE ORDER. In view of 14 the parties' joint status report, the parties shall submit a further joint status report by no later than August 18, 2017 to update the Court on the status of the Department of State's response to the FOIA request. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 06/19/2017. (lcegs3) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-06-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/18/2017. (mac) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-07-2815STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 7/28/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (lcegs1) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
2017-08-1816Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Garg, Arjun) (Entered: 08/18/2017)
2017-09-12MINUTE ORDER. In view of 16 joint status report, the parties shall submit a further joint status report by no later than October 13, 2017 to update the Court on the status of the Department of State's response to the FOIA request. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/12/2017. (lcegs1) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
2017-09-12Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 10/13/2017. (zcdw) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
2017-10-1317Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Garg, Arjun) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
2017-10-16MINUTE ORDER in view of 17 joint status report, the parties shall submit a further joint status report by no later than December 15, 2017 to update the Court on the status of the Department of State's response to the FOIA request. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/16/2017. (lcegs3) (Entered: 10/16/2017)
2017-10-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/15/2017. (mac) (Entered: 10/16/2017)
2017-12-04Case directly reassigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. Judge Emmet G. Sullivan is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff