Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSharkey v. Federal Bureau of Investigation
DistrictNorthern District of Ohio
CityAkron
Case Number5:2016cv00837
Date Filed2016-04-08
Date Closed2017-08-04
JudgeJudge Sara Lioi
PlaintiffJohn J. Sharkey
Case DescriptionJohn Sharkey had made allegations to the FBI in 2009 of insider trading. He filed this suit against the FBI to obtain records about the results of the investigation.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantFederal Bureau of Investigation
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Opinion/Order [30]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-04-081Complaint against Federal Bureau of Investigation. Filing fee of $400.00 paid, receipt # 54660005878, filed by John J. Sharkey. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 FBI Information & Correspondence) (M,TL) (Entered: 04/08/2016)
2016-04-08Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (M,TL) (Entered: 04/08/2016)
2016-04-08Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (M,TL) (Entered: 04/08/2016)
2016-04-082Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to Plaintiff at counter for service upon Federal Bureau of Investigation, US Attorney and US Attorney General. (M,TL) (Entered: 04/08/2016)
2016-04-083Motion for appointment of counsel filed by Plaintiff John J. Sharkey. (M,TL) (Entered: 04/08/2016)
2016-04-08Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Federal Bureau of Investigation (receipt #7015 0920 0002 3451 7363), US Attorney General (receipt #7015 0920 0002 3451 7370) and US Attorney (receipt #7015 0920 0002 3451 7387) placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. (M,TL) (Entered: 04/08/2016)
2016-04-194Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon US Attorney General on 04/14/2016 filed on behalf of John J. Sharkey. Related document 2 . (M,TL) (Entered: 04/19/2016)
2016-04-19Copy of 4 Return of Service Executed - USA Defendant mailed to John J. Sharkey, 1329 Weathervane Lane Apt. 2A, Akron, OH 44313 on 04/19/2016. Related document 4 . (M,TL) (Entered: 04/19/2016)
2016-04-215Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Federal Bureau of Investigation c/o US Attorney on 4/14/2016 filed on behalf of John J. Sharkey. Related document 2 . (M,TL) (Entered: 04/21/2016)
2016-04-21Copy of 5 Return of Service Executed - USA Defendant mailed to John J. Sharkey, 1329 Weathervane Lane Apt. 2A, Akron, OH 44313 on 04/21/2016. Related document 5 . (M,TL) (Entered: 04/21/2016)
2016-04-276Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Federal Bureau of Investigation on 04/18/2016 filed on behalf of John J. Sharkey. Related document 2 . (M,TL) (Entered: 04/27/2016)
2016-04-27Copy of 6 Return of Service Executed - USA Defendant mailed to John J. Sharkey, 1329 Weathervane Lane Apt. 2A, Akron, OH 44313 on 04/27/2016. (M,TL) (Entered: 04/27/2016)
2016-05-057Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 5/5/2016. (P,J) (Entered: 05/05/2016)
2016-05-05Copy of 7 Initial Order mailed on 5/5/2016 to: John J. Sharkey, 1329 Weathervane Lane, Apt. 2A, Akron, OH 44313. (P,J) (Entered: 05/05/2016)
2016-05-068Addendum to 1 Complaint filed by John J. Sharkey. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff's Fax to Federal Bureau of Investigation)(M,TL) (Entered: 05/06/2016)
2016-05-139Motion for extension of time until June 14, 2016 to answer filed by Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Bennett, James) (Entered: 05/13/2016)
2016-05-16Order [non-document] granting 9 defendant's motion for extension of time to answer until 6/14/2016. Judge Sara Lioi on 5/16/2016.(P,J) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
2016-06-1410Answer to 1 Complaint filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Johnson, Lisa) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
2016-09-1611Order referring case to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke general pretrial supervision. This referral includes all motions, including dispositive motions, and motions for injunctive relief, through the close of discovery. The Magistrate Judge shall then prepare a report and recommendation on dispositive motions and motions for injunctive relief. Judge Sara Lioi on 9/16/2016. (P,J) (Entered: 09/16/2016)
2016-09-19Copy of 11 Order mailed to John J. Sharkey at 1329 Weathervane Lane, Apt. 2A, Akron, OH 44313 on 9/19/2016. (S,He) (Entered: 09/19/2016)
2016-09-1912Order regarding emails sent to address maintained by the Clerk's Office. See order for details. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 9/19/2016. (D,I) (Entered: 09/19/2016)
2016-09-19Copy of 12 Order mailed to John J. Sharkey at 1329 Weathervane Lane Apt. 2A Akron, OH 44313 on 9/19/2016. Related document(s) 12 . (D,I) (Entered: 09/19/2016)
2016-09-2213Order denying Plaintiff's Motion for appointment of counsel (Related Doc # 3 ). Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 9/22/2016.(D,I) (Entered: 09/22/2016)
2016-09-2214Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 10/18/2016 at 10:00 AM to be held telephonically before Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 9/22/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting, # 2 Appendix K, # 3 Consent Package)(D,I) (Entered: 09/22/2016)
2016-09-22Copy of 13 Order on Motion for appointment of counsel and 14 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order, mailed to John J. Sharkey 1329 Weathervane Lane Apt. 2A Akron, OH 44313 on 9/22/2016. (D,I) (Entered: 09/22/2016)
2016-09-2315Motion for appointment of counsel filed by Plaintiff John J. Sharkey. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter)(H,KR) (Entered: 09/23/2016)
2016-09-2816Motion for a sixty (60) day extension of time for the Case Management Conference filed by Plaintiff John J. Sharkey. Related document 14 . (M,TL) (Entered: 09/28/2016)
2016-09-3017Order: Plaintiff's motion to continue the Case Management Conference by two months (Doc. 16 ) is DENIED. The Case Management Conference will proceed as scheduled. Plaintiff's Second Motion for Appointment of Counsel (Doc. 15 ) is DENIED for the same reasons the Court denied his first motion for counsel. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 9/30/2016.(D,I) Modified text on 10/4/2016 (H,KR). (Entered: 09/30/2016)
2016-09-30Copy of 17 Order mailed to John J. Sharkey at 1329 Weathervane Lane, Apt. 2A, Akron, OH 44313 on 9/30/2016. Related document(s) 17 . (D,I) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
2016-09-3018Report of Parties' Planning Meeting , parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiffs Consent to Report of Parties Planning, # 2 Objections to Initial Disclosures)(Johnson, Lisa) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
2016-10-1319Motion for In Person Case Management Conference filed by Plaintiff John J. Sharkey. Related document 14 . (M,TL) (Entered: 10/13/2016)
2016-10-13Order [non-document] denying Plaintiff's Motion for an In Person Case Management Conference (Related Doc # 19 ). Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 10/13/2016.(D,I) (Entered: 10/13/2016)
2016-10-1921Minute Order of Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 10/18/2016. During the call, the Court discussed and adopted the jointly proposed case management dates set forth in the Report of Parties' Planning Meeting (Doc. 18 ). A Case Management Plan will issue by separate Order. Time: 5 minutes. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 10/19/2016. (D,I) (D,I). (Entered: 10/19/2016)
2016-10-1920Case Management Conference Order. Case is assigned to the administrative track. Deadline for Filing Dispositive Motions: 12/16/2016; Oppositions to Motions: 1/16/2017; Replies to Responses: 1/30/2017. Final Pretrial and Trial date to be determined. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 10/19/2016. (D,I) (Entered: 10/19/2016)
2016-10-19Copy of 20 Case Management Conference Plan/Order, 21 Minute Order mailed to John J. Sharkey at 1329 Weathervane Lane Apt. 2A Akron, OH 44313 on 10/19/2016. (D,I) (Entered: 10/19/2016)
2016-11-0322Motion to Consolidate with Case No. 5:16cv2672 filed by Plaintiff John J. Sharkey. (S,HR) (Entered: 11/03/2016)
2016-11-1723Motion for appointment of counsel filed by Plaintiff John J. Sharkey. (M,TL) (Entered: 11/17/2016)
2016-11-1724Brief in Opposition to Motion to Consolidate filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. Related document(s) 22 . (Bennett, James) (Entered: 11/17/2016)
2016-11-2325Addendum to Plaintiff's 22 Motion to consolidate cases filed by John J. Sharkey. (M,TL) (Entered: 11/23/2016)
2016-12-0126Order: Plaintiff's third Motion for Appointment of Counsel (Doc. 23 ) is DENIED for the same reasons explained in the Courts prior Orders denying him counsel (Docs. 13 , 17 ). Any further motions for appointment of counsel will be stricken by the Court. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 12/1/2016.(D,I) (Entered: 12/01/2016)
2016-12-01Copy of 26 Order on Motion for appointment of counsel, mailed to John J. Sharkey 1329 Weathervane Lane Apt. 2A Akron, OH 44313 on 12/1/2016. Related document(s) 26 . (D,I) (Entered: 12/01/2016)
2016-12-1427Order denying Plaintiff's Motion to consolidate his two cases (Related Doc # 22 ). The dispositive motion deadline in this case is December 16, 2016; it shall proceed as scheduled. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 12/14/2016.(D,I) (Entered: 12/14/2016)
2016-12-14Copy of 27 Order on Motion to consolidate cases mailed to John J. Sharkey at 1329 Weathervane Lane Apt. 2A Akron, OH 44313 on 12/14/2016. (D,I) (Entered: 12/14/2016)
2016-12-1628Motion for summary judgment filed by Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of David M. Hardy, # 3 Exhibit A - Email from John Sharkey on 9/22/15, # 4 Exhibit B - FBI Request, # 5 Exhibit C - Email from John Sharkey on 9/29/15, # 6 Exhibit D - FBI Acknowledgment, # 7 Exhibit E - Hardy Response 10/14/15, # 8 Exhibit F - Request Summary Report on 10/18/15, # 9 Exhibit G - Letter to John Sharkey on 10/22/15, # 10 Exhibit H - Letter to John Sharkey from FOIA Appeal Staff on 11/17/15, # 11 Exhibit I - Letter from John Sharkey on 9/14/15, # 12 Exhibit J - Letter to John Sharkey 9/25/15, # 13 Exhibit K - Email to John Sharkey on 9/29/15, # 14 Exhibit L - Letter from John Sharkey on 10/9/15, # 15 Exhibit M - Emails to John Sharkey on 12/14/15, # 16 Exhibit N - Request Summary Report on 11/16/15, # 17 Exhibit O - Letter from John Sharkey on 11/17/15, # 18 Exhibit P - Letter from John Sharkey on 11/18/15, # 19 Exhibit Q - Letter to John Sharkey on 11/23/15, # 20 Exhibit R - Letter from John Sharkey on 11/27/15, # 21 Exhibit S - Letter to John Sharkey from FOIA Appeals Staff on 2/17/16, # 22 Exhibit T - Letter from John Sharkey on 3/25/16, # 23 Exhibit U - Letter to John Sharkey from FBI on 4/7/16, # 24 Exhibit V - FOIA Appeals Status Details, # 25 Exhibit W - Letter to John Sharkey from FBI on 4/19/16, # 26 Exhibit X - Letter to John Sharkey from FOIA Appeal Staff on 5/27/16)(Bennett, James) (Entered: 12/16/2016)
2017-01-3029Reply in support of 28 Motion for summary judgment filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Johnson, Lisa) (Entered: 01/30/2017)
2017-08-0430Memorandum Opinion: For the reasons stated herein, as well as those set forth in defendant's dispositive motion, defendant's motion for summary judgment is granted, and this case is dismissed. (Related Doc. Nos. 1 , 28 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 8/4/2017. (P,J) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
2017-08-0431Judgment Entry: The motion of defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation for summary judgment (Doc. No. 28 ) is granted, and this case is dismissed. (Related Doc. No. 30 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 8/4/2017. (P,J) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
2017-08-04Copy of 30 Memorandum Opinion and 31 Judgment Entry mailed on 8/4/2017 to: John J. Sharkey, 1329 Weathervane Lane, Apt. 2A, Akron, OH 44313. (P,J) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff