Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFREE MARKET ENVIRONMENTAL LAW CLINIC et al v. UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv00676
Date Filed2016-04-11
Date Closed2016-06-24
JudgeJudge Rosemary M. Collyer
PlaintiffFREE MARKET ENVIRONMENTAL LAW CLINIC
PlaintiffENERGY AND ENVIRONMENT LEGAL INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionThe Energy & Environment Legal Institute and the Free Market Environmental Law Clinic submitted a FOIA request to the SEC for emails and text messages sent to or from SEC Commissioner Kara Stein and a list of specific individuals that referenced the term "climate risk." The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the two organizations filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-04-111COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4480447) filed by FREE MARKET ENVIRONMENTAL LAW CLINIC, ENERGY AND ENVIRONMENT LEGAL INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons To Attorney General, # 3 Summons To US Attorney, # 4 Summons To Securities and Exchange Commission)(Mandelbaum, Chaim) (Entered: 04/11/2016)
2016-04-112Corporate Disclosure Statement by ENERGY AND ENVIRONMENT LEGAL INSTITUTE. (Mandelbaum, Chaim) (Entered: 04/11/2016)
2016-04-113Corporate Disclosure Statement by FREE MARKET ENVIRONMENTAL LAW CLINIC. (Mandelbaum, Chaim) (Entered: 04/11/2016)
2016-04-11Case Assigned to Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (md) (Entered: 04/12/2016)
2016-04-124SUMMONS Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 04/12/2016)
2016-04-275RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/18/2016. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/18/2016.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/18/2016., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION served on 4/18/2016 (Mandelbaum, Chaim) (Entered: 04/27/2016)
2016-05-166Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION.(Tallarico, Mark) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
2016-05-17MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to file a joint proposed dispositive motion briefing schedule no later than May 30, 2016. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 5/17/2016. (lcrmc1) *Modified on 5/18/2016 to correct year. (cdw). (Entered: 05/17/2016)
2016-05-17Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint proposed dispositive motion briefing schedule due by 5/30/2016. (cdw) (Entered: 05/18/2016)
2016-05-267Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule filed by UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION (Tallarico, Mark) (Entered: 05/26/2016)
2016-05-26MINUTE ORDER denying 7 Motion for Briefing Schedule. The Parties have proposed a most generous schedule for briefing this FOIA case without providing any basis to support it. The briefing schedule will be as follows: Defendant shall file its Motion for Summary Judgment no later than August 12, 2016 ; Plaintiffs shall file their Opposition no later than September 12, 2016 ; and Defendant may file a Reply brief no later than October 12, 2016 . Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 5/26/2016. (lcrmc1) (Entered: 05/26/2016)
2016-05-26Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendant's Summary Judgment motion due by 8/12/2016. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/12/2016. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/12/2016. (cdw) (Entered: 05/31/2016)
2016-06-208STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Tallarico, Mark) (Entered: 06/20/2016)
2016-06-21MINUTE ORDER approving 8 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. This case is closed. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 6/21/2016. (lcrmc1) (Entered: 06/21/2016)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff