Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCORNUCOPIA INSTITUTE v. AGRICULTURAL MARKETING SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv00692
Date Filed2016-04-13
Date Closed2017-05-04
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffCORNUCOPIA INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionThe Cornucopia Institute submitted a FOIA request to the Agricultural Marketing Service for records concerning detailed financial statements for 2014 for the National Organic Program and NOP's 2015 budget. The agency responded with a one-page document concerning its 2015 budget. The Cornucopia Institute tried to clarify the kinds of records it was seeking, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Cornucopia Institute filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantAGRICULTURAL MARKETING SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-04-131COMPLAINT against AGRICULTURAL MARKETING SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4483086) filed by CORNUCOPIA INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 04/13/2016)
2016-04-13Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (sth) (Entered: 04/13/2016)
2016-04-132SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to AGRICULTURAL MARKETING SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(sth) (Entered: 04/13/2016)
2016-04-283NOTICE of Appearance by C. Peter Sorenson on behalf of CORNUCOPIA INSTITUTE (Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 04/28/2016)
2016-06-024NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Stotter on behalf of CORNUCOPIA INSTITUTE (Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 06/02/2016)
2016-06-075NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Daniel Shoaibi on behalf of AGRICULTURAL MARKETING SERVICE (Shoaibi, Alexander) (Entered: 06/07/2016)
2016-06-076Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by AGRICULTURAL MARKETING SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shoaibi, Alexander) (Entered: 06/07/2016)
2016-06-13MINUTE ORDER granting 6 defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time. Defendant shall answer, or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint, by no later than July 8, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on June 13, 2016. (lcegs3) (Entered: 06/13/2016)
2016-06-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Answer or Response To Plaintiff's Complaint due by 7/8/2016. (mac) (Entered: 06/13/2016)
2016-07-087ANSWER to Complaint by AGRICULTURAL MARKETING SERVICE.(Shoaibi, Alexander) (Entered: 07/08/2016)
2016-07-088STANDING ORDER. The parties are directed to read this Order in its entirety upon receipt. The parties shall file a joint proposed schedule for future proceedings by no later than July 22, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on July 8, 2016. (lcegs3) (Entered: 07/08/2016)
2016-07-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Scheduling Order due by 7/22/2016. (mac) (Entered: 07/08/2016)
2016-07-219Joint Proposed Scheduling Order by AGRICULTURAL MARKETING SERVICE. (Shoaibi, Alexander) Modified on 7/22/2016 to correct docket text (jf). (Entered: 07/21/2016)
2016-07-25MINUTE ORDER re 9 parties' joint proposed scheduling order. The parties shall submit a further joint status report by no later than September 16, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on July 25, 2016. (lcegs3) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
2016-07-25Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 9/16/2016. (cdw) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
2016-09-1610MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 09/16/2016)
2016-09-16MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' joint proposed scheduling order, the parties are directed to comply with the following briefing schedule: defendant's motion for summary judgment shall be filed no later than January 13, 2017. Plaintiff's opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment shall be combined and shall be filed no later than February 10, 2017. Defendant's combined reply and opposition shall be filed no later than March 10, 2017. Plaintiff's reply shall be filed no later than April 7, 2017. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 09/16/2016. (lcegs3) (Entered: 09/16/2016)
2016-09-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment due by 1/13/2017. Plaintiff's Opposition And Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment Shall Be Combined due by 2/10/2017. Defendant's Combined Reply And Opposition due by 3/10/2017. Plaintiff's Reply due by 4/7/2017. (mac) (Entered: 09/19/2016)
2017-01-1111Consent MOTION to Modify Briefing Schedule by AGRICULTURAL MARKETING SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shoaibi, Alexander) (Entered: 01/11/2017)
2017-01-11MINUTE ORDER granting 11 defendant's consent motion for modification of briefing schedule. The parties are directed to comply with the following briefing schedule: defendant's motion for summary judgment shall be filed by no later than February 13, 2017; plaintiff's combined opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment shall be filed by no later than March 15, 2017; defendant's combined reply and opposition shall be filed by no later than April 14, 2017; and plaintiff's reply shall be filed by no later than May 12, 2017. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 01/11/2017. (lcegs3) (Entered: 01/11/2017)
2017-01-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment due by 2/13/2017. Plaintiff's Combined Opposition And Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment due by 3/15/2017. Defendant's Combined Reply And Opposition due by 4/14/2017. Plaintiff's Reply due by 5/12/2017. (mac) (Entered: 01/12/2017)
2017-02-0912Consent MOTION to Modify Briefing Schedule by AGRICULTURAL MARKETING SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shoaibi, Alexander) (Entered: 02/09/2017)
2017-02-10MINUTE ORDER granting 12 consent motion for modification of the briefing schedule. The parties shall comply with the following briefing schedule: defendant's motion for summary judgment shall be filed by no later than March 13, 2017; plaintiff's combined opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment shall be filed by no later than April 17, 2017; defendant's combined reply and opposition shall be filed by no later May 15, 2017; and plaintiff's reply shall be filed by no later than June 12, 2017. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 02/10/2017. (lcegs3) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
2017-02-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment due by 3/13/2017. Plaintiff Combined Opposition And Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment due by 4/17/2017. Defendant's Combined Reply And Opposition due by 5/15/2017. Plaintiff's Reply due by 6/12/2017. (mac) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
2017-03-0813Joint MOTION to Stay Schedule by CORNUCOPIA INSTITUTE (Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 03/08/2017)
2017-03-09MINUTE ORDER granting 13 joint motion to stay schedule. In view of the parties' joint motion, the extant briefing schedule is hereby vacated. It is FURTHER ORDERED that this matter is STAYED pending further order of the Court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that by no later than May 8, 2017, the parties shall file a stipulation of settlement and dismissal or a proposal for a new briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 03/9/2017. (lcegs3) (Entered: 03/09/2017)
2017-03-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposal For A New Briefing Schedule Or Stipulation Of Settlement due by 5/8/2017. Case Stayed (mac) (Entered: 03/09/2017)
2017-05-0414STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint by AGRICULTURAL MARKETING SERVICE. (Shoaibi, Alexander) (Entered: 05/04/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff