Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAGRAMA v. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv00716
Date Filed2016-04-15
Date Closed2017-09-29
JudgeJudge Rosemary M. Collyer
PlaintiffFRANK AGRAMA
Case DescriptionFrank Agrama submitted a FOIA request to the IRS for records concerning the agency's finding that he owned shares in foreign companies that were required to submit a certain form which had not been submitted. Agrama indicated that he would not consent to the agency's request to take an extension to respond to his request. The agency sent him a letter indicating it would take an extension and Agrama filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantINTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Opinion/Order [20]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-04-151COMPLAINT against INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4487583) filed by FRANK AGRAMA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons to IRS, # 6 Summons to USA-DC, # 7 Summons to USAG)(Rizek, Christopher) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
2016-04-152MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Dennis L. Perez, :Firm- Hochman, Salkin, Rettig, Toscher & Perez, P.C., :Address- 9150 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 300, Beverly Hills, CA 90212. Phone No. - (310) 281-3240. Fax No. - (310) 859-1430 Email - perez@taxlitigator.com Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4487936. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by FRANK AGRAMA (Attachments: # 1 Certification in Support)(Rizek, Christopher) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
2016-04-15Case Assigned to Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (md) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
2016-04-153SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
2016-04-19MINUTE ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Attorney Dennis L. Perez. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 4/19/2016. (lcrmc1) (Entered: 04/19/2016)
2016-08-014RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/13/2016. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/12/2016. (Rizek, Christopher) (Entered: 08/01/2016)
2016-08-015RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/13/2016. (Rizek, Christopher) (Entered: 08/01/2016)
2016-08-016RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE served on 7/13/2016 (Rizek, Christopher) (Entered: 08/01/2016)
2016-08-127ANSWER to Complaint by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE.(Sasarak, Stephanie) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
2016-08-15MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to file a joint proposed briefing schedule on dispositive motions no later than August 26, 2016 . Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 8/15/2016. (lcrmc1) (Entered: 08/15/2016)
2016-08-15Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint proposed briefing schedule due by 8/26/2016. (cdw) (Entered: 08/15/2016)
2016-08-268PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE re Order by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Sasarak, Stephanie) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
2016-08-26MINUTE ORDER approving 8 Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule. Defendant shall initiate rolling production of responsive, non-exempt records on September 16, 2016 and shall continue production once every two weeks through November 16, 2016 . The parties shall file a status report on the earlier of either (1) 14 days after Defendant notifies Plaintiffs counsel that its production is complete, or (2) December 2, 2016 . Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 8/26/2016. (lcrmc1) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
2016-12-029Joint STATUS REPORT And Proposed Briefing Schedule by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Sasarak, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/02/2016)
2016-12-05MINUTE ORDER setting briefing schedule: Defendant shall file any summary judgment motion on or before January 27, 2017. Plaintiff shall file any opposition on or before February 27, 2017. Defendant shall file any reply on or before March 13, 2017. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 12/5/2016. (lcrmc1) (Entered: 12/05/2016)
2016-12-05Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendant's Summary Judgment motion due by 1/27/2017. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/27/2017. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/13/2017. (cdw) (Entered: 12/05/2016)
2017-01-1310MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Evan J. Davis, :Firm- Hochman, Salkin, Rettig, Toscher & Perez, P.C., :Address- 9150 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 300, Beverly Hills, CA 90212. Phone No. - (310) 281-3288. Fax No. - (310) 859-1430 Email - davis@taxlitigator.com Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4806597. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by FRANK AGRAMA (Attachments: # 1 Certification in Support)(Rizek, Christopher) (Entered: 01/13/2017)
2017-01-17MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Attorney Evan J. Davis. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 1/17/2017. (lcrmc1) (Entered: 01/17/2017)
2017-01-2711Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment and to Reset Deadlines by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sasarak, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/27/2017)
2017-02-01MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 11 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall file any summary judgment motion on or before February 10, 2017. Plaintiff shall file any response on or before March 17, 2017. Defendant shall file any reply on or before March 31, 2017. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 2/1/2017. (lcrmc1) (Entered: 02/01/2017)
2017-02-01Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendant's Summary Judgment motion due by 2/10/2017. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/17/2017. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/31/2017. (cdw) (Entered: 02/01/2017)
2017-02-1012MOTION for Summary Judgment by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Affidavit Lapore Declaration, # 3 Affidavit Rossi Declaration, # 4 Affidavit Valvardi Declaration, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Sasarak, Stephanie) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
2017-02-1013MOTION for Leave to File Documents for the Court's In Camera Review by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sasarak, Stephanie) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
2017-02-2114ERRATA Regarding Filing Error for the Internal Revenue Service's Motion for Summary Judgment by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts)(Sasarak, Stephanie) (Entered: 02/21/2017)
2017-02-2415Memorandum in opposition to re 13 MOTION for Leave to File Documents for the Court's In Camera Review filed by FRANK AGRAMA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Evan) (Entered: 02/24/2017)
2017-03-1616Memorandum in opposition to re 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FRANK AGRAMA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Denying Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment)(Davis, Evan) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
2017-03-2817ORDER granting Defendant's 13 Motion for Leave to File Documents for the Courts In Camera Review. Defendant is further ordered to deliver to chambers for its in camera review no more than two declarations and addendum brief by March 31, 2017 Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 3/28/2017. (lcrmc1) (Entered: 03/28/2017)
2017-03-3018REPLY to opposition to motion re 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Sasarak, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/30/2017)
2017-03-3119NOTICE of Compliance by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE re 17 Order on Motion for Leave to File, (Sasarak, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
2017-09-2820MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 9/28/2017. (lcrmc1) (Entered: 09/28/2017)
2017-09-2821ORDER granting Defendant's 12 Motion for Summary Judgment. Judgment is entered in favor of Defendant on all counts. This case is closed. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 9/28/2017. (lcrmc1) (Entered: 09/28/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff