Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePassino vs. Social Security Administration
DistrictNorthern District of New York
CitySyracuse Utica
Case Number6:2016cv00430
Date Filed2016-04-15
Date Closed2017-02-14
JudgeChief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby
PlaintiffKristerfer G. Passino
Case DescriptionKristerper Passino submitted a FOIA request to the Social Security Administration for records about himself. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Passino filed an appeal. After hearing nothing further pertaining to his request or appeal, Passino filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantSocial Security Administration
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Opinion/Order [12]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-04-151COMPLAINT & SUPPORTING EXHIBITS A & B: against Social Security Administration filed by Kristerfer G. Passino, Pro Se. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Cover Letter & Mailing Envelope) (jmb) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
2016-04-152MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kristerfer G. Passino, Pro Se. Motion referred to Andrew T. Baxter. (jmb) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
2016-04-153INMATE AUTHORIZATION FORM: filed by Kristerfer G. Passino, Pro Se, with attached Inmate Account Statement for March 2016. (jmb) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
2016-04-194ORDER: Granting the # 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall issue a summons and forward it, along with a copy of the complaint to the United States Marshal for service upon the named defendant pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(i)(2). In addition, the Clerk shall forward a copy of the summons and complaint by mail to the Office of the United States Attorney for the Northern District of New York, together with a copy of this Decision and Order. It is also ORDERED, that the Clerk serve a copy of this Order upon Plaintiff in accordance with the Local Rules. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on April 19, 2016. {The clerk sent a copy of this order to the Pro Se Plaintiff at Marcy Correctional Facility, P.O. Box 3600, Marcy, NY 13403 via regular U.S. Postal Mail}. (rep) (Entered: 04/19/2016)
2016-04-205Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Issued as to the Attorney General, # 2 Summons Issued as to the U.S. Attorney's Office)(rep) (Entered: 04/20/2016)
2016-04-20Pursuant to the # 4 Order, service packets for the Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, and U.S. Attorney's Office were prepared and forwarded to the U.S. Marshals for service. (rep) (Entered: 04/20/2016)
2016-04-22Pursuant to the # 4 Order, the clerk forwarded a copy of the summons, complaint, and order to the U.S. Attorney's Office for the Northern District of New York via regular U.S. Postal Mail on 4/20/2016. (rep) (Entered: 04/22/2016)
2016-05-246NOTICE of Appearance by Fergus J. Kaiser on behalf of Social Security Administration (Kaiser, Fergus) (Entered: 05/24/2016)
2016-05-247PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN: Type of Process: Summons and Complaint personally served on Maria Reamy on behalf of the United States Attorney's Office, filed by the United States Marshal Service on behalf of Kristerfer G. Passino. (jmb) (Entered: 05/26/2016)
2016-05-248PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN: Type of Process: Summons and Complaint served upon the United States Attorney General by certified mail on 5/17/2016, filed by the United States Marshal Service on behalf of Kristerfer G. Passino. (jmb) (Entered: 05/26/2016)
2016-06-289PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN: Type of Process - Summons and Complaint served upon the Social Security Administration by USPS Certified Mail, delivered on 5/16/2016. (jmb) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
2016-06-2810BILL OF COSTS: submitted by US Marshal re: Service Fees in the amount of $81.00. (jmb) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
2016-07-01Answer deadline set to 7/18/2016 for the Social Security Administration. (mae) (Entered: 07/01/2016)
2016-07-1811MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion Hearing set for 9/1/2016 10:00 AM in Syracuse before Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby Response to Motion due by 8/15/2016 Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/22/2016. filed by Social Security Administration. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Exhibit(s), # 4 Appendix) (Kaiser, Fergus) (Entered: 07/18/2016)
2016-07-18TEXT NOTICE of Hearing on # 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion Hearing set for 9/1/2016 on submission of motion papers before Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby. No personal appearance. Response to Motion due by 8/15/2016. Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/22/2016. (lmw) (Entered: 07/18/2016)
2017-02-1412DECISION AND ORDER granting # 11 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed in its entirety. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 2/14/17. (lmw)(Copy served upon pro se plaintiff via regular and certified mail) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
2017-02-1413JUDGMENT in favor of Social Security Administration against Kristerfer G. Passino. (lmw)(Copy served upon pro se plaintiff via regular and certified mail) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff