Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSANCHEZ-ALANIS v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv00705
Date Filed2016-04-14
Date Closed2017-09-14
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffMARTIN SANCHEZ-ALANIS
Case DescriptionMartin Sanchez-Alanis, a federal prisoner, submitted four FOIA requests to the Bureau of Prisons for records about himself. After the agency failed to respond to any of his request, Sanchez-Alanis filed suit
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Opinion/Order [26]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-04-141PETITION for Writ of Mandamus (Filing fee $ 0.00) filed by MARTIN SANCHEZ-ALANIS. (Attachment: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dr) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
2016-04-142MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MARTIN SANCHEZ-ALANIS (dr) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
2016-04-14SUMMONS Not Issued as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS. (dr) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
2016-04-143PRO SE ORDER directing within 30 days of this Order, unless an extension of time is granted, plaintiff to provide a six month trust fund prisoner account statement and failure to comply will result in dismissal of case. Plaintiff shall provide the requested information specific within this order.. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 4/12/2016. (dr) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
2016-04-14Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 4/5/2016. (dr) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
2016-04-224PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by MARTIN SANCHEZ-ALANIS (jd) (Entered: 05/03/2016)
2016-05-115PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by MARTIN SANCHEZ-ALANIS. (md) (Entered: 05/12/2016)
2016-05-27Case Reassign to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. Unassigned no longer assigned to the case. (sth) (Entered: 05/27/2016)
2016-05-276ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $12.49 from Prison Account of MARTIN SANCHEZ-ALANIS and granting MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (see order for full details). Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 5/18/16. (td) (Entered: 05/31/2016)
2016-06-087SUMMONS (3) Issued as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (sth) (Entered: 06/08/2016)
2016-07-058RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/24/2016. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/24/2016. (td) (Entered: 07/05/2016)
2016-07-209NOTICE of Appearance by Claire M. Whitaker on behalf of FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS (Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 07/20/2016)
2016-07-2210MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1 (Baime Decl), # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
2016-07-25MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint no later than September 19, 2016. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 7/25/2016. (lccrc3) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
2016-07-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint no later than 9/19/2016. (kt) (Entered: 07/26/2016)
2016-09-1611Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Status Report by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 09/16/2016)
2016-09-1612STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS; (See docket entry no. 11 to view.) (td) (Entered: 09/19/2016)
2016-09-1913CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS re 11 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Status Report (Amended Certificate of Service of ECF No. 11) . (Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 09/19/2016)
2016-10-03MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Defendant's Motion for an Extension of Time to October 5, 2016, to file its dispositive motion. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/3/16.(ah) (Entered: 10/03/2016)
2016-10-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Dispositive Motions due by 10/5/2016. (zlsj) (Entered: 10/04/2016)
2016-10-0514MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Treadway Decl and Attachments 1-6, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 10/05/2016)
2016-10-1315Order advising plaintiff to respond by November 30, 2016, to defendant's dispositive motion or risk summary dismissal of the case or entry of judgment for the defendant on what will be treated as a conceded motion (see written order for details). Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/13/16.(ah) (Entered: 10/13/2016)
2016-10-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Responses to Dispositive Motion due by 11/30/2016. (lsj) (Entered: 10/14/2016)
2016-10-2716MOTION for Extension of Time to File the Plaintiffs Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment by MARTIN SANCHEZ-ALANIS (td) (Entered: 11/01/2016)
2016-11-02MINUTE ORDER: It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for an enlargement of time to respond to Defendant's dispositive motion 16 is GRANTED. In light of Plaintiff's representations, Defendant shall immediately serve a copy of its dispositive motion upon Plaintiff at his current location--USP Hazelton in Bruceton Mills, West Virginia. In addition, the Clerk of Court shall include with this order a copy of the court's order issued on October 13, 2016 15 . Plaintiff shall file his response to Defendant's dispositive motion by December 23, 2016, or risk summary dismissal of the case or entry of judgment for the defendant on what will be treated as a conceded motion. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/2/16.(ah) (Entered: 11/02/2016)
2016-11-0217Mail Returned as undeliverable. Sent to Martin Sanchez-Alanis; Type of Document Returned: Document 15 - Order of the Court; Resent at new address: R31293-177, HAZELTON UNITED STATES PENITENTIARY, P.O. Box 2000, Bruceton Mills, WV 26525. (zlsj) (Entered: 11/02/2016)
2016-11-0218CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS re Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File,, 14 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment (Amended Certificate of Service) . (Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 11/02/2016)
2017-01-1719MOTION for Leave to File Out of Time Response to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment by MARTIN SANCHEZ-ALANIS (td) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
2017-01-3020Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment, MOTION for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief for a Pattern of Practice of Illegal Conduct by MARTIN SANCHEZ-ALANIS (td) (Entered: 02/01/2017)
2017-02-01MINUTE ORDER granting 19 Plaintiff's motion for leave to file response to Defendant's dispositive motion out of time. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 2/1/17.(ah) (Entered: 02/01/2017)
2017-02-1021Memorandum in opposition to re 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Order filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Treadway Decl with Att. 1 and Att. 2, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
2017-02-1022ENTERED IN ERROR.....REPLY to opposition to motion re 14 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS. (Whitaker, Claire) Modified on 2/13/2017 (jf). (Entered: 02/10/2017)
2017-02-1323REPLY to opposition to motion re 14 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS. (Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
2017-03-1024MOTION for Leave of Court to File Out of Time Opposition to the Defendants Opposition to the Plaintiffs' Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and Request for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief for a Pattern of Practice of Illegal Conduct in Violation of the FOIA by MARTIN SANCHEZ-ALANIS (td) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
2017-04-03MINUTE ORDER granting nunc pro tunc 24 Plaintiff's motion for leave to file out of time his reply to defendant's opposition to his cross motion for summary judgment. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/3/17. (ah) (Entered: 04/03/2017)
2017-08-0925NOTICE of Intent to /file Renewed Cross Motion for Summary Judgment for a Pattern or Practice of Illegal Conduct in Violation of the Freedom of Information Act and in Violation of the Privacy Act by MARTIN SANCHEZ-ALANIS (td) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
2017-09-1426OPINION and ORDER granting 14 Defendant's dispositive motion and denying 20 Plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 9/14/2017. (lccrc3) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff