Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCohens v. United States Federal Bureau of Investigation
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2016cv03665
Date Filed2016-06-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHon. James Donato
PlaintiffEdwin J. Cohens
Case DescriptionEdwin Cohens submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records about himself. He also asked a number of questions about the involvement of the Alameda County Sheriff's Department in his alleged torture. According to Cohens, the FBI denied his request, but he does not indicate that he appealed the agency's denial. Nevertheless, he filed suit against the agency.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search

DefendantUnited States Federal Bureau of Investigation
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [18]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-06-291FOIA Request against United States Federal Bureau of Investigation (Filing fee $400, Receipt NO. 44611013489 ). Filed by Edwin J. Cohens. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2016) Modified on 6/29/2016 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/29/2016)
2016-06-292Summons Issued as to United States Federal Bureau of Investigation. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2016) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
2016-06-293Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/20/2016. Case Management Conference set for 9/27/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2016) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
2016-06-294NOTICE Regarding Resources Available to Pro Se Litigants. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2016) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
2016-06-295CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Edwin J. Cohens. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2016) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
2016-06-306CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2016) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
2016-06-307ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on June 30, 2016. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2016) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
2016-07-128SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edwin J. Cohens. United States Federal Bureau of Investigation served on 7/6/2016, answer due 9/6/2016. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2016) (Entered: 07/13/2016)
2016-07-299MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by United States Federal Bureau of Investigation. Motion Hearing set for 9/7/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Responses due by 8/12/2016. Replies due by 8/19/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David M. Hardy; Exh. A - J, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Reding, Ann) (Filed on 7/29/2016) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
2016-08-0410CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 9 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint . Motion Hearing set for 9/8/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2016) (Entered: 08/04/2016)
2016-08-1212MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by Edwin J. Cohens. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2016) (Entered: 08/17/2016)
2016-08-1611CLERK'S NOTICE FINDING THAT this case and case 15-cv-04342 JCS Cohens v. Comey ARE NOT RELATED. Signed by Karen L. Hom, Deputy Clerk. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2016) (Entered: 08/16/2016)
2016-08-2313CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edwin J. Cohens re 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2016) (Entered: 08/25/2016)
2016-08-2614Order by Hon. James Donato granting in part 12 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The September 8, 2016 hearing is vacated pending further order of the Court. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2016) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
2016-08-26Set/Reset Deadlines as to Responses due by 10/7/2016. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2016) (Entered: 08/29/2016)
2016-10-0715RESPONSE (re 9 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint ) filed byEdwin J. Cohens. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2016) (Entered: 10/12/2016)
2016-10-1416REPLY (re 9 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint ) filed byUnited States Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Reding, Ann) (Filed on 10/14/2016) (Entered: 10/14/2016)
2016-10-1917CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edwin J. Cohens re 15 Opposition/Response to Motion (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2016) (Entered: 10/21/2016)
2017-03-2118Order granting 9 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James Donato on March 21, 2017. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/22/2017: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (lrcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/21/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff