Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLOCKETT v. COMEY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv01597
Date Filed2016-08-05
Date Closed2017-10-03
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffRODNEY EUGENE LOCKETT
Case DescriptionRodney Lockett, a state prisoner, submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning himself. The agency denied his request and Lockett appealed. His appeal was denied. He also sought mediation from the Office of Government Information Services. Lockett then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Exemption 7 - Law enforcement records

DefendantJAMES B. COMEY Director, FBI
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [25]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-08-051COMPLAINT against JAMES B. COMEY (Filing fee $ 0.00) filed by RODNEY EUGENE LOCKETT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf) (Entered: 08/08/2016)
2016-08-05SUMMONS Not Issued as to JAMES B. COMEY (jf) (Entered: 08/08/2016)
2016-08-052MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by RODNEY EUGENE LOCKETT (jf) (Entered: 08/08/2016)
2016-08-053PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by RODNEY EUGENE LOCKETT (jf) (Entered: 08/08/2016)
2016-08-054ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $0.00 from Prison Account of Rodney Eugene Lockett and granting 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (see order for full details). Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 08/04/2016. (jf) (Entered: 08/08/2016)
2016-08-095SUMMONS (3) Issued as to JAMES B. COMEY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Forms)(dr) (Entered: 08/09/2016)
2016-08-116RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/10/2016., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/10/2016. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/9/2016.) (jf) (Entered: 08/11/2016)
2016-08-117SUMMONS REISSUED as to JAMES B. COMEY (md) (Entered: 08/11/2016)
2016-08-168RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JAMES B. COMEY served on 8/15/2016 (jf) (Entered: 08/16/2016)
2016-09-099ANSWER to 1 Complaint by JAMES B. COMEY.(Ross, Carl) (Entered: 09/09/2016)
2016-09-13MINUTE ORDER: Local Civil Rules 16.3(b)(9) and 16.5(c)(1) exempt this FOIA action from the conferencing, scheduling, and discovery rules. Accordingly, Defendant shall file a proposed schedule by September 27, 2016. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/13/16.(ah) Modified on 9/13/2016 (ah). (Entered: 09/13/2016)
2016-09-2710MOTION for Briefing Schedule by JAMES B. COMEY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ross, Carl) (Entered: 09/27/2016)
2016-09-2911ORDER granting 10 Defendant's Motion for Briefing Schedule and setting schedule (see written order for details). Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/29/16.(ah) (Entered: 09/29/2016)
2016-09-2912MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Defendant's Answer by RODNEY EUGENE LOCKETT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Reply)(jf) (Entered: 10/03/2016)
2016-10-0613MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by RODNEY EUGENE LOCKETT (jf) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
2016-10-2114MOTION for Summary Judgment by JAMES B. COMEY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ross, Carl) (Entered: 10/21/2016)
2016-10-2715ORDER denying as moot 12 plaintiff's motion for leave to file reply to Answer; directing plaintiff to respond by November 28, 2016, to defendant's motion for summary judgment or risk entry of judgment for the defendant on what may be treated as a conceded motion (see written order for details). Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/27/16.(ah) Modified on 10/27/2016 (ah). (Entered: 10/27/2016)
2016-11-0716RESPONSE re 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by RODNEY EUGENE LOCKETT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(zrdj) (Entered: 11/09/2016)
2016-11-1717MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 13 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment by JAMES B. COMEY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ross, Carl) (Entered: 11/17/2016)
2016-11-17MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 17 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time, it is hereby ORDERED that 17 Defendant's Motion is GRANTED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment and Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment shall be due by December 6, 2016. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/17/2016. (lcrc2) (Entered: 11/17/2016)
2016-11-2118SUPPLEMENT re 16 Response to motion filed by RODNEY EUGENE LOCKETT. (zrdj) (Entered: 12/05/2016)
2016-12-0619Memorandum in opposition to re 13 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by JAMES B. COMEY. (Ross, Carl) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
2016-12-0620REPLY to opposition to motion re 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JAMES B. COMEY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Ross, Carl) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
2016-12-1921REPLY to opposition to 13 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by RODNEY EUGENE LOCKETT. (jf) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
2017-01-2322NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Joshua L. Rogers on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Carl Ross (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
2017-01-2323NOTICE Notice of Certificate of Service by JAMES B. COMEY re 22 Substitution of Counsel (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
2017-09-2524ORDER denying 13 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 14 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; entering judgment for the Defendant and closing the case, for the reasons stated in the Memorandum Opinion issued separately this day. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/25/17.(ah) (Entered: 09/25/2017)
2017-09-2525MEMORANDUM OPINION accompanying final order issued separately this day. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/25/17.(ah) (Entered: 09/25/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff