Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2016-08-09 | 1 | COMPLAINT against ALL DEFENDANTS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4632777) filed by KING & SPALDING, LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, # 3 Summons U.S. Department of Justice)(Richter, John) (Entered: 08/09/2016) |
2016-08-09 | 2 | LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by KING & SPALDING, LLP (Richter, John) (Entered: 08/09/2016) |
2016-08-09 | | Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (md) (Entered: 08/09/2016) |
2016-08-10 | 3 | SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 08/10/2016) |
2016-08-12 | 4 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/11/2016. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/10/2016. (Richter, John) (Entered: 08/12/2016) |
2016-08-12 | 5 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/12/2016. (Richter, John) (Entered: 08/12/2016) |
2016-08-12 | 6 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 8/11/2016 (Richter, John) (Entered: 08/12/2016) |
2016-08-12 | 7 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 8/11/2016 (Richter, John) (Entered: 08/12/2016) |
2016-09-06 | 8 | NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy S. Simon on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/06/2016) |
2016-09-07 | 9 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/07/2016) |
2016-09-07 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before September 30, 2016. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/07/2016. (lcapm3) (Entered: 09/07/2016) |
2016-09-08 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Answer or other response to complaint due by 9/30/2016. (cdw) (Entered: 09/08/2016) |
2016-09-30 | 10 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/30/2016) |
2016-09-30 | 11 | ORDER: Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before October 14, 2016. Please see the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/30/2016. (lcapm3) (Entered: 09/30/2016) |
2016-09-30 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 10/14/2016. (cdw) (Entered: 10/03/2016) |
2016-09-30 | | ENTERED IN ERROR.............Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference reset for 10/17/2016 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (cdw) Modified on 10/3/2016 (zcdw). (Entered: 10/03/2016) |
2016-10-12 | 12 | Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/12/2016) |
2016-10-13 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report. The parties shall submit a Joint Status Report on or before October 21, 2016. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/13/2016. (lcapm3) (Entered: 10/13/2016) |
2016-10-13 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 10/21/2016. (cdw) (Entered: 10/13/2016) |
2016-10-21 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Schedule by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/21/2016) |
2016-11-08 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties are directed to file another Joint Status Report in this matter on or before December 5, 2016, which informs the court of the status of document processing and production. By that date, absent good cause, (1) the Civil Division shall complete its review of the two boxes of documents referenced in the parties' Status Report, ECF No. 13, and produce any non-exempt records, and (2) CMS and HHS shall complete their searches and produce any non-exempt records. In their next status report, the parties shall propose a summary judgment briefing schedule, if necessary. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/08/2016. (lcapm3) (Entered: 11/08/2016) |
2016-11-08 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/5/2016. (mac) (Entered: 11/08/2016) |
2016-12-05 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT of the Parties and Proposed Schedule by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/05/2016) |
2016-12-05 | 15 | MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Search and Processing and Release of Responsive Records by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/05/2016) |
2016-12-06 | 16 | ENTERED IN ERROR............ORDER setting the following schedule for further proceedings in this matter: Defendant shall file the Administrative Record on or before January 31, 2017; Plaintiffs shall file their Motion for Summary Judgment on or before February 28, 2017; Defendant shall file its Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment on or before March 28, 2017; Plaintiffs shall file their Opposition to Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Reply, if any, on or before April 11, 2017; and Defendant shall file its Reply, if any, on or before April 25, 2017. Please see attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/06/2016. (lcapm3) Modified on 12/6/2016 (zcdw). (Entered: 12/06/2016) |
2016-12-06 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall appear for a status hearing on December 9, 2016, at 2:15 p.m., in Courtroom 10. In the event counsel or a party is unable to appear on the scheduled date and time due to an unresolvable scheduling conflict, counsel shall meet and confer and provide, via email, two alternative dates and times to the Courtroom Deputy Clerk, Ms. Chashawn White (Chashawn_White@dcd.uscourts.gov), who shall reset the status hearing and provide notice to the parties. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/06/2016. (lcapm3) (Entered: 12/06/2016) |
2016-12-06 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference set for 12/9/2016 at 2:15 PM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (cdw) (Entered: 12/06/2016) |
2016-12-06 | 17 | MEMORANDUM in opposition to re 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Search and Processing and Release of Responsive Records filed by KING & SPALDING, LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Richter, John) Modified on 12/7/2016 to correct docket event/text (jf). (Entered: 12/06/2016) |
2016-12-09 | | MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 15 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Search and Processing and Release of Responsive Records. Defendants shall conclude all processing and production on or before December 23, 2016. The parties shall thereafter meet and confer and shall file a Joint Status Report on or before January 5, 2017, addressing whether summary judgment briefing is needed, and, if so, to what extent. If summary judgment briefing is necessary, parties shall include a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/09/2016. (lcapm3) (Entered: 12/09/2016) |
2016-12-09 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 1/5/2017. (cdw) (Entered: 12/12/2016) |
2016-12-09 | | Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Status Conference held on 12/9/2016. (Court Reporter: Crystal Pilgrim) (cdw) (Entered: 12/12/2016) |
2017-01-05 | 18 | Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Briefing Schedule by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/05/2017) |
2017-01-06 | 19 | ORDER entering the following schedule for further proceedings in this matter: Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed on or before February 7, 2017; Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed on or before February 28, 2017; Defendants' Reply and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed on or before March 21, 2017; and Plaintiff's Reply shall be filed on or before April 11, 2017. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 01/06/2017. (lcapm3) (Entered: 01/06/2017) |
2017-01-06 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendants' Summary Judgment motions due by 2/7/2017. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/28/2017. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/21/2017. Plaintiff's Cross Motion due by 2/28/2017. Response to Cross Motion due by 3/21/2017. Reply to Cross Motion due by 4/11/2017. (cdw) (Entered: 01/06/2017) |
2017-02-07 | 20 | MOTION for Summary Judgment , Local Rule 7(h) Statement and Supporting Memorandum by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Tricia Francis and EOUSA Vaughn Index, # 3 Declaration of Theresa D. Jones, # 4 Declaration of Jarell Oshodi, # 5 Declaration of Michael Bell, # 6 Declaration of Robin Brooks, # 7 Declaration of Hugh Gilmore)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/07/2017) |
2017-02-28 | 21 | Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by KING & SPALDING, LLP (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John C. Richter and Exhibits, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Richter, John) (Entered: 02/28/2017) |
2017-02-28 | 22 | RESPONSE re 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Local Rule 7(h) Statement and Supporting Memorandum filed by KING & SPALDING, LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John C. Richter and Exhibits)(Richter, John) (Entered: 02/28/2017) |
2017-03-20 | 23 | MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Combined Reply and Opposition by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/20/2017) |
2017-03-20 | 24 | Memorandum in opposition to re 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Combined Reply and Opposition filed by KING & SPALDING, LLP. (Richter, John) (Entered: 03/20/2017) |
2017-03-21 | | MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 23 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' Reply and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed on or before April 11, 2017; and Plaintiff's Reply shall be filed on or before May 2, 2017. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 03/21/2017. (lcapm3) (Entered: 03/21/2017) |
2017-03-21 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendants' Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 4/11/2017. Defendants' Response to Cross Motion due by 4/11/2017. Reply to Cross Motion due by 5/2/2017. (cdw) (Entered: 03/23/2017) |
2017-04-10 | 25 | Memorandum in opposition to re 21 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Response to Plaintiff's Local Rule 7(h) Statement filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Facts, # 2 Second Declaration of Tricia Francis, # 3 Supplemental Declaration of Theresa Jones, # 4 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/10/2017) |
2017-04-10 | 26 | REPLY to opposition to motion re 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Local Rule 7(h) Statement and Supporting Memorandum (Combined Reply and Opposition to Cross Motion) (duplicate of Docket Entry No. 25) filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Response to Plaintiff's Fact Statement, # 2 Second Declaration of Tricia Francis, # 3 Supplemental Declaration of Theresa Jones, # 4 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/10/2017) |
2017-05-02 | 27 | REPLY to opposition to motion re 21 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by KING & SPALDING, LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Flynn Declaration, # 2 Exhibit B - Finley Declaration, # 3 Exhibit C - Richter Supplemental Declaration)(Richter, John) (Entered: 05/02/2017) |
2017-09-06 | 28 | MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying without prejudice 20 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and 21 Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. See the attached Memorandum Opinion and Order for further details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/06/2017. (lcapm2) (Entered: 09/06/2017) |
2017-09-06 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 9/22/2017. (cdw) (Entered: 09/07/2017) |
2017-09-22 | 29 | Joint STATUS REPORT AND PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by KING & SPALDING, LLP. (Richter, John) (Entered: 09/22/2017) |
2017-09-26 | | MINUTE ORDER. The court has considered the parties' positions as set forth in their Joint Status Report and Proposed Briefing Schedule, ECF No. 29. Further proceedings shall be governed by the following schedule: (1) Defendants' Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment and Any Additional Supporting Declarations/Vaughn Index Entries shall be filed no later than October 20, 2017; (2) Plaintiff's Cross-Motion and Opposition shall be filed no later than November 10, 2017; (2) Defendants' Reply and Opposition to Cross-Motion shall be filed no later than November 21, 2017; and (4) Plaintiff's Reply shall be filed no later than December 5, 2017. Each party's opening brief shall be limited to 15 double-spaced pages; each party's reply brief shall be limited to 7 double-spaced pages. The parties shall avoid repeating arguments made in the initial round of summary judgment briefing and may incorporate such arguments by reference. Additionally, the parties need not re-submit any evidence already offered and may refer to such evidence as necessary. The parties' briefs shall address the issues raised by the court in its Memorandum Opinion and Order, ECF No. 28, at 4-5. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/26/2017. (lcapm3) (Entered: 09/26/2017) |
2017-10-19 | 30 | MOTION for Extension of Time to File Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/19/2017) |
2017-10-20 | 31 | Memorandum in opposition to re 30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment filed by KING & SPALDING, LLP. (Richter, John) (Entered: 10/20/2017) |
2017-10-20 | | MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 30 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment and Any Additional Supporting Declarations/Vaughn Index Entries shall be filed no later than November 2, 2017, and all remaining deadlines in the current briefing schedule are moved back by seven days. Plaintiff's Cross-Motion and Opposition shall be filed no later than November 17, 2017; Defendants' Reply and Opposition to Cross-Motion shall be filed no later than November 28, 2017; and Plaintiff's Reply shall be filed no later than December 12, 2017. All other terms of the court's Minute Order of September 26, 2017, shall continue to apply. No further extensions of time will be granted except for extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/20/2017. (lcapm3) (Entered: 10/20/2017) |
2017-10-20 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendants' Renewed Summary Judgment motion and supporting declarations/Vaughn Index due by 11/2/2017. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 11/17/2017. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 11/28/2017. Plaintiff's Cross Motion due by 11/17/2017. Response to Cross Motion due by 11/28/2017. Reply to Cross Motion due by 12/12/2017. (zcdw) (Entered: 10/23/2017) |
2017-11-02 | 32 | MOTION for Summary Judgment (Defendants' Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment) by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/02/2017) |
2017-11-17 | 33 | Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by KING & SPALDING, LLP (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Richter, John) (Entered: 11/17/2017) |
2017-11-17 | 34 | Memorandum in opposition to re 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Defendants' Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment) filed by KING & SPALDING, LLP. (Richter, John) (Entered: 11/17/2017) |
2017-11-28 | 35 | Memorandum in opposition to re 33 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment (Defendants' Combined Opposition and Reply Memorandum) filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/28/2017) |
2017-11-28 | 36 | REPLY to opposition to motion re 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Defendants' Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment) Defendants' Combined Opposition and Reply) (duplicate of ECF 35) filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/28/2017) |
2017-12-12 | 37 | REPLY to opposition to motion re 33 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by KING & SPALDING, LLP. (Richter, John) (Entered: 12/12/2017) |
2018-09-07 | 38 | MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 32 Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment and Plaintiff's 33 Renewed Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Please see the attached Memorandum Opinion and Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/07/2018. (lcapm1) (Entered: 09/07/2018) |
2018-09-07 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Supplemental Declarations due by 10/9/2018. Joint Status Report due by 10/22/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 09/12/2018) |
2018-10-09 | 39 | NOTICE of Filing Pursuant to the Court's September 7, 2018 Memorandum Opinion by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Second Supplemental Declaration of Theresa Jones, # 2 Third Declaration of Tricia Francis)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/09/2018) |
2018-10-09 | 40 | SEALED DOCUMENT filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE re 39 Notice (Other), (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Third Francis Declaration)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/09/2018) |
2018-10-19 | 41 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Status Report by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/19/2018) |
2018-10-19 | | MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' 41 Consent Motion for Extension of Time for Parties to File Status Report. The parties' Joint Status Report shall now be due on or before October 31, 2018. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/19/2018. (lcapm1) (Entered: 10/19/2018) |
2018-10-19 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/31/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 10/19/2018) |
2018-10-31 | 42 | Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Briefing Schedule by KING & SPALDING, LLP. (Richter, John) (Entered: 10/31/2018) |
2018-11-06 | 43 | ORDER declining to disclose, in whole or in part, the sealed 40 Declaration filed with the court on October 9, 2018. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/06/2018. (lcapm1) (Entered: 11/06/2018) |
2018-11-06 | | Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 11/15/2018 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zjd) (Entered: 11/07/2018) |
2018-11-15 | | Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Status Conference held on 11/15/2018. Defendants' Status Report due by 11/28/2018. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook) (zjd) (Entered: 11/16/2018) |
2018-11-28 | 44 | TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE before Judge Amit P. Mehta held on November 15, 2018. Page Numbers: 1 - 48. Date of Issuance: November 28, 2018. Court Reporter: Jeff Hook. Telephone number: 202-354-3373. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order Form For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter ref erenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 12/19/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/29/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/26/2019.(Hook, Jeff) (Entered: 11/28/2018) |
2018-11-28 | 45 | STATUS REPORT (Defendants' Status Report) by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/28/2018) |
2018-11-28 | 46 | STATUS REPORT by KING & SPALDING, LLP. (Richter, John) (Entered: 11/28/2018) |
2018-12-05 | 47 | ORDER. After reviewing the parties' Status Reports, ECF Nos. 45 and 46 , the court orders the following with respect to further proceedings in this matter: No later than December 14, 2018, the parties shall have met and conferred. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report on December 18, 2018, advising whether any disputes remain about the scope of the search. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed on or before December 21, 2018; Plaintiff's Consolidated Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion for Reconsideration shall be filed on or before January 11, 2019; Defendants' Consolidated Reply and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Reconsideration shall be filed on or before February 1, 2019; and Plaintiff's Reply shall be filed on or before February 15, 2019. If the parties reach agreement on the scope of the search, thereby leaving only Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration, the deadlines above are vacated and the briefing shall proceed as follows: Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration shall be due on December 21, 2018; Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion shall be due on January 11, 2019; and Plaintiff's Reply shall be due on February 1, 2019. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/5/2018 (lcapm2) (Entered: 12/05/2018) |
2018-12-05 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Attorney Meet and Confer Conference due by 12/14/2018. Joint Status Report due by 12/18/2018. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/21/2018. Plaintiff's Consolidated Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/11/2019. Defendants' Consolidated Reply and Opposition due by 2/1/2019. Plaintiff's Reply due by 2/15/2019. Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration due by 12/21/2018. Defendants' Opposition due by 1/11/2019. Plaintiff's Reply due by 2/1/2019. (zjd) (Entered: 12/06/2018) |
2018-12-10 | 48 | Unopposed MOTION to Clarify re 47 Order,,,,, by KING & SPALDING, LLP (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Richter, John) (Entered: 12/10/2018) |
2018-12-11 | 49 | ORDER granting 48 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Clarify. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/11/2018. (lcapm1) (Entered: 12/11/2018) |
2018-12-18 | 50 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Third Supplemental Jones Declaration)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/18/2018) |
2018-12-21 | 51 | Second Renewed MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) Modified on 12/26/2018 (jf). (Entered: 12/21/2018) |
2019-01-11 | 52 | Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment (Second Renewed) , MOTION for Reconsideration re 38 Memorandum & Opinion, by KING & SPALDING, LLP (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John C. Richter and Exhibits, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Richter, John) (Entered: 01/11/2019) |
2019-01-11 | 53 | RESPONSE re 51 Second Renewed MOTION for Summary Judgment (Duplicate of Docket Entry No. 52) filed by KING & SPALDING, LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John C. Richter and Exhibits, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Richter, John) (Entered: 01/11/2019) |
2019-01-11 | 54 | MOTION for Leave to File Amended Memorandum of Points and Authorities by KING & SPALDING, LLP (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Amended Memorandum, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Richter, John) (Entered: 01/11/2019) |
2019-01-14 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 54 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Memorandum of Points and Authorities. Plaintiff shall file an Amended Memorandum of Points and Authorities on or before January 16, 2019. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 01/14/2019. (lcapm1) (Entered: 01/14/2019) |
2019-01-14 | 55 | ERRATA (Amended Memorandum in Support) re 53 Response to motion, and 52 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment (Second Renewed) MOTION for Reconsideration re 38 Memorandum & Opinion, filed by KING & SPALDING, LLP. (jf) (Entered: 01/15/2019) |
2019-01-31 | 56 | Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Consolidated Reply and Opposition and to Adjust Remaining Deadlines in Briefing Schedule by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/31/2019) |
2019-02-01 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 56 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The remaining deadlines in the this matter are modified as follows: (1) Defendants' Consolidated Reply and Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion and Motion for Reconsideration shall be due on or before February 6, 2019; and (2) Plaintiff's Reply in Support of its Cross-Motion and Motion for Reconsideration shall be due on or before February 21, 2019. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 02/01/2019. (lcapm1) (Entered: 02/01/2019) |
2019-02-01 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Reply and Opposition due by 2/6/2019. Plaintiff's Reply due by 2/21/2019. (zjd) (Entered: 02/06/2019) |
2019-02-06 | 57 | Memorandum in opposition to re 52 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment (Second Renewed) MOTION for Reconsideration re 38 Memorandum & Opinion, filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Response to Plaintiff's Local Rule 7(h) Statement)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/06/2019) |
2019-02-06 | 58 | REPLY to opposition to motion re 51 Second Renewed MOTION for Summary Judgment (duplicate of Docket Entry No. 57) filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Response to Plaintiff's Local Rule 7(h) Statement)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/06/2019) |
2019-02-21 | 59 | REPLY to opposition to motion re 52 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment (Second Renewed) MOTION for Reconsideration re 38 Memorandum & Opinion, filed by KING & SPALDING, LLP. (Richter, John) (Entered: 02/21/2019) |
2019-05-28 | | MINUTE ORDER. On April 12, 2019, the DC Circuit decided John Doe, 1 v. Federal Election Commission, 920 F.3d 866 (D.C. Cir. 2019). At pages 872-73 of the decision, the court addressed the privacy interests of a lawyer serving as a trustee for a trust for purposes of FOIA Exemption 7(C). In rejecting the potential application of Exemption 7(C), the court held: "[T]he trustee's privacy interest in his representational capacity is minimal." Furthermore, citing Washington Post Co. v. U.S. Dep't of Justice, 863 F.2d 96, 100 (D.C. Cir. 1998), the court stated: "Information relating to business judgments and relationships does not qualify for exemption. This is so even if disclosure might tarnish someone's professional reputation." Also, in footnote 12, the court distinguished SafeCard Services, Inc. v. SEC, 926 F.2d 1197 (D.C. Cir. 1991). By June 5, 2019, the parties may file a supplement of no more than five double-spaced pages, addressing the impact of John Doe, 1 on Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 05/28/2019. (lcapm1) (Entered: 05/28/2019) |
2019-05-28 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Supplemental Memoranda due by 6/5/2019. (zjd) (Entered: 05/29/2019) |
2019-06-05 | 60 | SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to 52 Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration in Response to the May 28, 2019 Order filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Simon, Jeremy) Modified to add linkage on 6/6/2019 (ztd). (Entered: 06/05/2019) |
2019-06-05 | 61 | SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to 52 re Minute Order,,,, filed by KING & SPALDING, LLP. (Richter, John) Modified on 6/6/2019 (ztd). (Entered: 06/05/2019) |
2019-07-24 | 62 | MEMORANDUM AND OPINION denying Defendants' Second Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment, ECF No. 51 , and granting Plaintiff's Combined Motion for Reconsideration and Second Renewed Cross Motion for Summary Judgment, ECF No. 52 . See attached Memorandum Opinion for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 7/24/2019. (lcapm2) (Entered: 07/24/2019) |
2019-07-24 | 63 | ORDER. For the reasons set forth in the courts Memorandum Opinion, ECF No. 62 , Defendants Second Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment, ECF No. 51 , is denied, and Plaintiffs Combined Motion for Reconsideration and Second Renewed Cross Motion for Summary Judgment, ECF No. 52 , is granted in full. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 7/24/2019. (lcapm2) Modified on 7/24/2019 (lcapm2, ). (Entered: 07/24/2019) |
2019-08-06 | 64 | Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Attorneys' Fees by KING & SPALDING, LLP (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Richter, John) (Entered: 08/06/2019) |
2019-08-06 | 65 | ORDER granting extension of time to file Plaintiff's motion for attorneys' fees and costs. If Defendants choose not to appeal, King & Spalding shall move for attorneys' fees and costs within 21 days after Defendants time to file their notice of appeal has expired; or if Defendants file a notice of appeal, King & Spalding shall move for attorneys' fees and costs within 21 days after issuance of the mandate by the D.C. Circuit, so long as there remains a final judgment in King & Spalding's favor. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 8/6/2019. (lcapm2) (Entered: 08/06/2019) |
2019-08-21 | 66 | MOTION to Alter Judgment (Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment Under Rule 59(e) by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/21/2019) |
2019-08-21 | 67 | ERRATA (Corrected Proposed Order) by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE 66 MOTION to Alter Judgment (Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment Under Rule 59(e) filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/21/2019) |
2019-09-04 | 68 | Memorandum in opposition to re 66 MOTION to Alter Judgment (Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment Under Rule 59(e) filed by KING & SPALDING, LLP. (Richter, John) (Entered: 09/04/2019) |
2019-09-11 | 69 | REPLY to opposition to motion re 66 MOTION to Alter Judgment (Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment Under Rule 59(e) filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/11/2019) |
2019-11-12 | 70 | ORDER denying 66 Defendants' Motion to Alter Judgment. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/12/2019. (lcapm2) (Entered: 11/12/2019) |
2020-01-31 | 71 | Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Attorneys' Fees by KING & SPALDING, LLP (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Richter, John) (Entered: 01/31/2020) |
2020-02-03 | 72 | WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO 85 ORDER FILED 4/21/2020.....MOTION for Attorney Fees by KING & SPALDING, LLP (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H)(Richter, John) Modified on 4/22/2020 (zjd). (Entered: 02/03/2020) |
2020-02-03 | 73 | SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by KING & SPALDING, LLP (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B)(Richter, John) (Entered: 02/03/2020) |
2020-02-04 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 71 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiff shall file its motion for attorneys fees and costs on or before March 4, 2020; Defendants shall file their opposition motion on or before April 16, 2020; and Plaintiff shall file its reply on or before April 30, 2020. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 02/04/2020. (lcapm2) (Entered: 02/04/2020) |
2020-02-04 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees due by 3/4/2020. Defendant's Response due by 4/16/2020. Plaintiff's Reply due by 4/30/2020. (zjch) (Entered: 02/04/2020) |
2020-02-10 | | VACATED PURSUANT TO 80 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER FILED 4/7/2020.....MINUTE ORDER granting 73 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 02/10/2020. (lcapm2) Modified on 4/7/2020 (zjd). (Entered: 02/10/2020) |
2020-02-10 | 75 | SEALED DOCUMENT filed by KING & SPALDING, LLP. re 72 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by KING & SPALDING, LLP. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(eg) (Entered: 02/14/2020) |
2020-02-12 | 74 | MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1 (K&S filing in Global Brokerage litigation), # 3 Exhibit 2 (Feb. 3, 2020 email))(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/12/2020) |
2020-02-26 | 76 | Memorandum in opposition to re 74 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal filed by KING & SPALDING, LLP. (Richter, John) (Entered: 02/26/2020) |
2020-03-02 | 77 | REPLY to opposition to motion re 74 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/02/2020) |
2020-03-09 | 78 | MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration of the Sealing Order by KING & SPALDING, LLP (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff's Surreply in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration of the Sealing Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Richter, John) (Entered: 03/09/2020) |
2020-03-23 | 79 | Memorandum in opposition to re 78 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration of the Sealing Order filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/23/2020) |
2020-04-07 | 80 | MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER granting 74 Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration and vacating the court's February 10, 2020 Minute Order; and granting 78 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Surreply in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration. Unless Plaintiff notifies the court by April 9, 2020, that it intends to withdraw its fees request, the clerk of the court shall make available on the public docket Exhibits A and B in support of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees. See the attached Memorandum Opinion & Order for further details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/07/2020. (lcapm3) (Entered: 04/07/2020) |
2020-04-07 | 81 | SURREPLY to re 74 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal filed by KING & SPALDING, LLP. (eg) (Entered: 04/07/2020) |
2020-04-08 | 82 | MOTION to Withdraw 75 Sealed Document, 72 MOTION for Attorney Fees by KING & SPALDING, LLP (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Richter, John) (Entered: 04/08/2020) |
2020-04-09 | | MINUTE ORDER. Defendants shall advise the court by April 16, 2020, whether they oppose Plaintiff's request for an order that "the Clerk of the Court and Defendants destroy all copies of the sealed exhibits in their possession." Pl.'s Mot. to Withdraw Pl.'s Mot. for Attorneys' Fees and Sealed Exhibits A & B, ECF No. 82 , at 1. Until such time as the court resolves Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw, the filings that the court ordered sealed in its Minute Order of February 10, 2020, shall remain under seal. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/09/2020. (lcapm3) (Entered: 04/09/2020) |
2020-04-09 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants shall advise the court by 4/16/2020. (zjd) (Entered: 04/09/2020) |
2020-04-13 | 83 | RESPONSE re 82 MOTION to Withdraw 75 Sealed Document, 72 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/13/2020) |
2020-04-13 | | MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff shall file a reply to 83 Defendants' Response to Motion to Withdraw by April 17, 2020. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/13/2020. (lcapm3) (Entered: 04/13/2020) |
2020-04-13 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply due by 4/17/2020. (zjd) (Entered: 04/14/2020) |
2020-04-17 | 84 | REPLY re 83 Response to motion to Withdraw Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Sealed Exhibits A & B filed by KING & SPALDING, LLP. (Richter, John) (Entered: 04/17/2020) |
2020-04-21 | 85 | ORDER granting in part and denying in part 82 Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Sealed Exhibits A & B. Plaintiff may withdraw its motion for attorney's fees. The court will not destroy Exhibits A and B but shall maintain those exhibits under seal. Plaintiff's request that Defendants either destroy or return the exhibits is denied. See the attached Order for further details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/21/2020. (lcapm3) (Entered: 04/21/2020) |
Hide Docket Events |