Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSMALLWOOD v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv01654
Date Filed2016-08-16
Date Closed2017-07-19
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffWILLIAM H. SMALLWOOD, JR.
Case DescriptionWilliam Smallwood submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning the settlement of a class action suit brought against the U.S. by native farmers. The agency told Smallwood that his request was complex and would take time to process. He appealed that designation, but the agency rejected his appeal since there was no adverse action yet. Smallwood then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Opinion/Order [15]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-08-161CIVIL COVER SHEET by WILLIAM H. SMALLWOOD, JR filed by WILLIAM H. SMALLWOOD, JR.(Rubinstein, Reed) (Entered: 08/16/2016)
2016-08-162COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4640158) filed by WILLIAM H. SMALLWOOD, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons)(Rubinstein, Reed) (Entered: 08/16/2016)
2016-08-16Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (jd) (Entered: 08/16/2016)
2016-08-16SUMMONS Not Issued as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. Incorrect summons filed with complaint. (jd) (Entered: 08/16/2016)
2016-08-163REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by WILLIAM H. SMALLWOOD, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Rubinstein, Reed) (Entered: 08/16/2016)
2016-08-164SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Forms)(jd) (Entered: 08/16/2016)
2016-08-245RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/17/2016. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/16/2016. (Rubinstein, Reed) (Entered: 08/24/2016)
2016-08-246RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/17/2016. (Rubinstein, Reed) Modified on 8/25/2016 (znmw). (Entered: 08/24/2016)
2016-09-167NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua M. Kolsky on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 09/16/2016)
2016-09-168Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 2 Complaint, by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 09/16/2016)
2016-09-16MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by September 26, 2016. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 09/16/2016. (lccrc3) (Entered: 09/16/2016)
2016-09-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Answer Or Response To The Complaint due by 9/26/2016. (mac) (Entered: 09/19/2016)
2016-09-269ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
2016-10-26MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. Since the requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure do not apply, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by November 9, 2016. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/26/2016. (lccrc3, ) (Entered: 10/26/2016)
2016-10-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 11/9/2016. (zlsj) (Entered: 10/26/2016)
2016-10-2810Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 10/28/2016)
2016-10-31MINUTE ORDER: The Court hereby enters the following briefing schedule, proposed in 10 Joint Status Report: Defendant shall submit its Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings by November 4, 2016. Plaintiff may submit an opposition brief by November 22, 2016. Defendant may submit a reply brief by December 6, 2016. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/31/2016. (lccrc3) (Entered: 10/31/2016)
2016-11-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Dispositive Motions due by 11/4/2016. Response to Dispositive Motions due by 11/22/2016. Reply to Dispositive Motions due by 12/6/2016. (zlsj) (Entered: 11/01/2016)
2016-11-0411MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration (with Exhibits), # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 11/04/2016)
2016-11-2212Memorandum in opposition to re 11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by WILLIAM H. SMALLWOOD, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Rubinstein, Reed) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
2016-12-0613REPLY to opposition to motion re 11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
2017-04-2714NOTICE of Appearance by William A. Sherman, II on behalf of WILLIAM H. SMALLWOOD, JR (Sherman, William) (Entered: 04/27/2017)
2017-07-1915ORDER granting 11 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. This is final, appealable Order. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 7/19/2017. (lccrc3) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff