Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBrinkman et al v. Internal Revenue Service
DistrictDistrict of Minnesota
CityDMN
Case Number0:2016cv02774
Date Filed2016-08-18
Date Closed2017-07-25
JudgeJudge Susan Richard Nelson
PlaintiffRandal Scot Brinkman
PlaintiffCarol Marie Brinkman
DefendantInternal Revenue Service
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Opinion/Order [33]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-08-181COMPLAINT against Internal Revenue Service. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 44641090052.) Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per Master list referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I Brisbois. Filed by Randal Scot Brinkman, Carol Marie Brinkman. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit(s) A, # 3 Exhibit(s) B, # 4 Exhibit(s) C, # 5 Exhibit(s) D, # 6 Exhibit(s) E, # 7 Certificate of Service) (LPH) cc: Plfs. Modified text on 8/18/2016 (lmb). Qc'd on 8/23/2016 (AKL). (Entered: 08/18/2016)
2016-08-182Summons Issued as to Internal Revenue Service. (lmb) cc: Plaintiffs. Modified on 8/18/2016 (lmb). (Entered: 08/18/2016)
2016-08-253MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for U.S. Government Attorney Kunal J. Choksi by Internal Revenue Service. (JGK) (Entered: 08/25/2016)
2016-08-294TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting 3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of U.S. Government Attorney Kunal Janak Choksi for the Internal Revenue Service. Approved by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 8/29/2016. (JLW) Modified text on 8/30/2016 (LEG). cc: Carol Marie Brinkman and Randal Scot Brinkman. (Entered: 08/29/2016)
2016-11-105ANSWER to Complaint by Internal Revenue Service. (Choksi, Kunal) With Certificate of Service. Modified on 11/14/2016 (las). (Entered: 11/10/2016)
2016-11-296PRETRIAL CONFERENCE NOTICE AND ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 12/12/2016 11:30 AM in Edward J. Devitt Courtroom (STP) before Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 11/29/16. (LPH) cc: Brinkmans (Entered: 11/29/2016)
2016-12-017OBJECTION to IRS Motion to Dismiss Freedom of Information Act Title 5 U.S.C. 552 (FOIA) by Carol Marie Brinkman, Randal Scot Brinkman re 5 Answer to Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(LPH) Modified text on 12/2/2016 (KMM). DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 12/30/16. (kt) (Entered: 12/01/2016)
2016-12-068MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for U.S. Government Attorney Kieran O'Neill Carter by Internal Revenue Service. (JGK) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
2016-12-089TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting 8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of U.S. Government Attorney Kieran O'Neill Carter for the Internal Revenue Service. Approved by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 12/8/2016. (JLW) (Entered: 12/08/2016)
2016-12-0810REQUEST re 6 Order for Extension of Time to File Documents and Postponement of Pretrial Conference by Internal Revenue Service. (Carter, Kieran) (Entered: 12/08/2016)
2016-12-0911DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. WILL BE REFILED. AMENDED PRETRIAL CONFERENCE NOTICE AND ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 1/23/2017 02:30 PM in Edward J. Devitt Courtroom (STP) before Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 12/9/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form)(ACH) Modified text on 12/9/2016 (ACH). (Entered: 12/09/2016)
2016-12-1212AMENDED PRETRIAL CONFERENCE NOTICE AND ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 1/23/2017 02:30 PM in Edward J. Devitt Courtroom (STP) before Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 12/9/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form) cc: Randal Scot Brinkman, Carol Marie Brinkman (ACH) (Entered: 12/12/2016)
2017-01-1813REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Internal Revenue Service.(Choksi, Kunal) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
2017-01-1814STATEMENT OF CASE as to Internal Revenue Service. (Choksi, Kunal) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
2017-01-2315Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 1/23/2017. Order to issue. (LPH) cc: Brinkmans (Entered: 01/23/2017)
2017-01-3116LETTER REFERRING Litigant to FBA Pro Se Project from Magistrate Judge Brisbois. (LPH) cc: Plfs (Entered: 01/31/2017)
2017-01-3117PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 4/1/2017. Motions (non-disp) due 5/1/2017. Motions (disp) due by 4/1/2017. Ready for trial due by 11/1/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 1/31/17. (LPH) cc: Plfs (Entered: 01/31/2017)
2017-03-1418TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Due to the appointment of Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz, this case is reassigned to him. Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois is no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 16-cv-2774 (SRN/DTS) . Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Please contact Katie Haagenson 612-664-5460, for scheduling or other matters related to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. (lmb) cc: Pro Se Plaintiffs. (Entered: 03/14/2017)
2017-03-2719ORDER referring the Internal Revenue Service's Motion for Summary Judgment to the Hon. David T. Schultz for findings of fact and a recommendation for the disposition of the motion. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 03/27/2017. (SMD) cc: Plaintiffs. Modified on 3/28/2017 (lmb). (Entered: 03/27/2017)
2017-04-0620TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE to Attorneys: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment has been scheduled for hearing before Magistrate Judge David Schultz on July 10, 2017 at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 9E, U.S. Courthouse, 300 South Fourth Street, Minneapolis, MN. (KMH) cc: Plaintiffs. Modified on 4/6/2017 (lmb). (Entered: 04/06/2017)
2017-05-2621MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Internal Revenue Service. DOCUMENT/ATTACHMENT FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE AS SEPARATE EVENT. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order. (Choksi, Kunal) Modified text on 5/30/2017 (lmb). (Entered: 05/26/2017)
2017-05-2622MEMORANDUM in Support re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Choksi, Kunal) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
2017-05-2623DECLARATION of Leon Wells in SUPPORT OF 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C, # 4 Exhibit(s) D, # 5 Exhibit(s) E, # 6 Exhibit(s) F, # 7 Exhibit(s) G, # 8 Exhibit(s) H, # 9 Exhibit(s) I). (Choksi, Kunal) Modified text on 5/30/2017 (lmb). (Entered: 05/26/2017)
2017-05-2624DECLARATION of David Skinner in SUPPORT OF 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) J, # 2 Exhibit(s) K). Choksi, Kunal) Modified text on 5/30/2017 (lmb). (Entered: 05/26/2017)
2017-05-2625NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 7/10/2017 01:00 PM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. (Choksi, Kunal) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
2017-05-3027PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Internal Revenue Service.(Choksi, Kunal) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
2017-06-2828ORDER that the July 10, 2017 hearing on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment [Docket No. 21] is CANCELED. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment will be decided upon the written submissions. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 6/28/17. (kt) CC: Brinkmans. (kt) (Entered: 06/28/2017)
2017-07-0729REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that 1. The IRS's Motion for Summary Judgment [Docket No. 21 ] be DENIED AS MOOT. 2. The Complaint [Docket No. 1 ] be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b) for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 7/7/2017. (lmb) cc: Plaintiffs. (Entered: 07/07/2017)
2017-07-2430OBJECTION to 29 Report and Recommendations by Carol Marie Brinkman, Randal Scot Brinkman. (LPH) (Entered: 07/24/2017)
2017-07-2431MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss filed by Carol Marie Brinkman, Randal Scot Brinkman. (LPH) (Entered: 07/24/2017)
2017-07-2432PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re 31 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Carol Marie Brinkman, Randal Scot Brinkman.(LPH) (Entered: 07/24/2017)
2017-07-2533ORDER denying as moot 21 Motion for Summary Judgment; adopting 29 Report and Recommendation; granting 31 Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 07/25/2017. (SMD) cc: Brinkmans. Modified on 7/25/2017 (lmb). (Entered: 07/25/2017)
2017-07-2534JUDGMENT (Attachments: # 1 Civil Notice - appeal) (lmb) cc: Brinkmans. (Entered: 07/25/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff