Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWhite v. Office of the Federal Defender
DistrictSouthern District of Illinois
CityEast St. Louis
Case Number3:2016cv00971
Date Filed2016-08-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge J. Phil Gilbert
PlaintiffWilliam A White
Case DescriptionWilliam White, a federal prisoner, submitted a FOIA request to the Office of the Federal Defender for records that were referred to in records he had received from the FBI pursuant to a previous FOIA request. The agency acknowledged receipt of his request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, White filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantOffice of the Federal Defender
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Opinion/Order [7]
Opinion/Order [8]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-08-291COMPLAINT against Office of the Federal Defender, filed by William A White.(anm) (Entered: 08/30/2016)
2016-08-292MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by William A White. (anm) (Entered: 08/30/2016)
2016-08-303Letter to Plaintiff regarding case number. (Attachments: # 1 Consent to Magistrate Judge) (anm) (Entered: 08/30/2016)
2016-09-194Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement. (tjk) (Entered: 09/19/2016)
2016-09-205ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of White, granting 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by William A White. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 9/20/2016. (tjk) (Entered: 09/20/2016)
2016-09-306MOTION to Stay Collection of Fees and Costs by William A White. (mar) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
2016-10-277MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, denying 6 MOTION to Stay filed by William A White. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 10/27/2016. (jdh) (Entered: 10/27/2016)
2016-11-09Filing fee: $ 350.00, receipt number 34625070323 (jsm2) (Entered: 11/09/2016)
2017-06-198MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, The Court ORDERS that White shall have 90 days, the period provided for service under the current version of Rule 4(m), from entry of this order to service process in this case. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to complete, on Plaintiffs behalf, a summons and form USM-285 for service of process on defendant OFFICE OF THE FEDERAL DEFENDER FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF FLORIDA and to issue a completed summons. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 6/19/2017. (jdh) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-06-209Summons Issued as to Office of the Federal Defender. (trb) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
2017-07-1910Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Office of the Federal Defender. (kdb) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff