Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSteinbuch v. University of Arkansas et al
DistrictEastern District of Arkansas
CityLittle Rock
Case Number4:2016cv00622
Date Filed2016-08-30
Date Closed2017-08-29
JudgeJudge Kristine G. Baker
PlaintiffRobert Steinbuch
Case DescriptionRobert Steinbuch submitted a request made under the Arkansas Freedom of Information Act to the University of Arkansas for information concerning the LSAT scores of individuals who had been submitted to the University of Arkansas Law School. Dissatisfied with the University's response, Steinbuch filed suit in state court in Arkansas. Although his complaint cites a violation of the Arkansas FOIA, he also filed suit in federal court as well.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantUniversity of Arkansas
also known as University of Arkansas at Little Rock
DefendantUniversity of Arkansas Board of Trustees
DefendantMichael Schwartz in his official and personal capacity
DefendantTheresa Beiner in her official and personal capacity
DefendantZulma Toro in her official capacity
DefendantJoann Maxey in her official capacity
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Opinion/Order [16]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-08-301NOTICE OF REMOVAL by all Defendants from Pulaski County Circuit Court, case number 60CV-15-5690. Fee of $400 paid - receipt number LIT058154. (rhm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/30/2016: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (rhm). (Entered: 08/30/2016)
2016-08-302COMPLAINT filed by Robert Steinbuch against Michael Schwartz and University of Arkansas - Little Rock. (rhm) (Entered: 08/30/2016)
2016-08-303MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (non-FOIA claims) by Theresa Beiner, Joann Maxey, Michael Schwartz, Zulma Toro, Trustees of the University of Arkansas, University of Arkansas (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Board Policy 405.1, # 2 Exhibit Maxey letter to Campbell (22 Dec 2015))(Curran, David) (Entered: 08/30/2016)
2016-08-304BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 3 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by All Defendants. (Curran, David) (Entered: 08/30/2016)
2016-08-305AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Robert Steinbuch against Theresa Beiner, Michael Schwartz, and University of Arkansas - Little Rock. (rhm) (Entered: 08/30/2016)
2016-08-306SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Robert Steinbuch against Theresa Beiner, Joann Maxey, Michael Schwartz, Zulma Toro,and University of Arkansas, aka University of Arkansas - Little Rock. (rhm) (Entered: 08/30/2016)
2016-08-307THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Robert Steinbuch against Theresa Beiner, Joann Maxey, Michael Schwartz, Zulma Toro, and University of Arkansas, aka University of Arkansas - Little Rock. (rhm) (Entered: 08/30/2016)
2016-08-308ANSWER to 7 Third Amended Complaint by Theresa Beiner, Joann Maxey, Michael Schwartz, Zulma Toro, and University of Arkansas, a/k/a University of Arkansas - Little Rock. (rhm) (Entered: 08/30/2016)
2016-08-309FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Robert Steinbuch against all Defendants. (rhm) (Entered: 08/30/2016)
2016-08-3010ANSWER to 9 Fourth Amended Complaint filed by all Defendants. (rhm) (Entered: 08/30/2016)
2016-08-3111NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: 1 Notice of Removal. CORRECTION: The Civil Cover Sheet was omitted from the original entry due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The Civil Cover Sheet was added as an attachment to docket entry 1 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (thd) (Entered: 08/31/2016)
2016-09-0112MOTION to Remand to State Court by Robert Steinbuch (Attachments: # 1 Document brief in support of motion, # 2 Exhibit exhibit)(Corbitt, Chris) (Entered: 09/01/2016)
2016-09-1413MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (non-FOIA claims) by Robert Steinbuch (Corbitt, Chris) (Entered: 09/14/2016)
2016-09-1514ORDER granting plaintiff Robert Steinbuch's 13 motion for extension of time to file response to defendant's 3 motion to dismiss but modifies the relief. Mr. Steinbuch will not be required to respond to defendant's motion to dismiss until after this Court has ruled on the pending motion to remand. Mr. Steinbuch will then have 14 days from entry of the Court's Order on the motion to remand to respond to defendants' motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/15/2016. (ljb) (Entered: 09/15/2016)
2016-09-1615RESPONSE to Motion re 12 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by All Defendants. (Curran, David) (Entered: 09/16/2016)
2017-08-2916ORDER granting 12 Mr. Steinbuch's motion to remand, which the Court construes as Mr. Steinbuch's motion to dismiss voluntarily his federal First Amendment claim; denying as moot 3 all other pending motions in this matter; and directing the Clerk of Court to remand this action to the Circuit Court of Pulaski County. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/29/2017. (mef) (Entered: 08/29/2017)
2017-08-2917LETTER to the Clerk for the Circuit Court of Pulaski County transmitting a copy of the case file and certified copies of 16 Order to Remand and the docket sheet via certified mail. (Certified mail # 7003 3110 0000 4622 4982) (mef) (Entered: 08/29/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff