Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAyyad et al v. Internal Revenue Service of the United States of America
DistrictDistrict of Maryland
CityGreenbelt
Case Number8:2016cv03032
Date Filed2016-08-31
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Paula Xinis
PlaintiffAbdelrahman Ayyad
PlaintiffSara Ayyad
Case DescriptionAbdelrahman and Sara Ayaad submitted a FOIA request to the IRS for any records concerning an audit of their taxes. The agency provided a CD with 2,885 pages, some of which were responsive to the Ayaads request. However, the agency did not indicate what records may have been withheld. The Ayaads appealed the agency's response, but after hearing nothing further from agency, the Ayaads filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantInternal Revenue Service
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Opinion/Order [43]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-08-311COMPLAINT against Internal Revenue Service of the United States of America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-6213255.), filed by Internal Revenue Service of the United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits A - G)(Kelly, Gerald) (Entered: 08/31/2016)
2016-08-312NOTICE by Internal Revenue Service of the United States of America re 1 Complaint, (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(Kelly, Gerald) (Entered: 08/31/2016)
2016-08-31Case reassigned to Judge Paula Xinis. Judge Marvin J. Garbis no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/31/2016)
2016-09-013Summons Issued 21 days as to Internal Revenue Service. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/01/2016)
2016-10-064SUMMONS Returned Executed by Abdelrahman Ayyad, Sara Ayyad. Internal Revenue Service served on 10/4/2016, answer due 12/5/2016. (Kelly, Gerald) (Entered: 10/06/2016)
2016-11-045Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by Internal Revenue Service (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peyton, Joycelyn) (Entered: 11/04/2016)
2016-11-086PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 5 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's Answer or otherwise Response to the Complaint is due by December 6, 2016. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 11/8/2016. (tb2s, Chambers) (Entered: 11/08/2016)
2016-12-067ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Internal Revenue Service.(Peyton, Joycelyn) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
2016-12-078SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 4/20/2017. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 12/7/2016. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/08/2016)
2016-12-079LETTER ORDER re The Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 12/7/2016. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/08/2016)
2016-12-1610STATUS REPORT by Internal Revenue Service(Peyton, Joycelyn) (Entered: 12/16/2016)
2016-12-20Telephone Conference held on 12/20/2016 before Judge Paula Xinis. (tb2s, Chambers) (Entered: 12/20/2016)
2016-12-2011PAPERLESS ORDER: For the reasons discussed during today's status conference and in light of the nature of this case, the Court suspends the scheduling order issued at ECF No. 10. Dispositive Motions are due March 13, 2017. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 12/20/16. (tb2s, Chambers) (Entered: 12/20/2016)
2017-03-1012Correspondence re: Dispositive Motion (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Ronzhes, Vadim) (Entered: 03/10/2017)
2017-03-1313LETTER ORDER scheduling a conference call for March 20, 2017 at 11:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 3/13/2017. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
2017-03-1314PAPERLESS NOTICE: The conference call scheduled for March 20, 2017 is CANCELLED. (tb2s, Chambers) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
2017-03-1315MOTION for Extension of Time for Dispositive Motions by Internal Revenue Service (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peyton, Joycelyn) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
2017-03-1516RESPONSE in Opposition re 15 MOTION for Extension of Time for Dispositive Motions filed by Abdelrahman Ayyad, Sara Ayyad. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kelly, Gerald) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
2017-03-1517(FILED IN ERROR - PER COUNSEL) MOTION for Summary Judgment by Abdelrahman Ayyad, Sara Ayyad. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Pts and Auth, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Text of Proposed Order, # 5 Certificate of Service)(Ronzhes, Vadim) Modified on 3/17/2017 (jf3s, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 03/15/2017)
2017-03-1718MOTION for Summary Judgment by Abdelrahman Ayyad, Sara Ayyad. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Text of Proposed Order, # 5 Certificate of Service)(Ronzhes, Vadim) (Entered: 03/17/2017)
2017-03-2019PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 15 Motion for Extension of Time. Dispositive Motions shall be filed no later than April 12, 2017. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 3/20/2017. (tb2s, Chambers) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
2017-04-1220MOTION to Stay Further Summary Judgment Briefing and to Modify Briefing Schedule by Internal Revenue Service (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peyton, Joycelyn) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
2017-04-1721Corrected MOTION to Stay re 20 MOTION to Stay Further Summary Judgment Briefing and to Modify Briefing Schedule by Internal Revenue Service (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peyton, Joycelyn) (Entered: 04/17/2017)
2017-04-1922Letter Order scheduling a conference call for April 25, 2017 at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 4/19/2017. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/19/2017)
2017-04-2523Telephone Conference held on 4/25/2017 before Judge Paula Xinis.(FTR - Ulander - 4C.) (bus, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
2017-04-2524ORDER granting in part 21 Motion to Continue; setting Amended Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 4/25/2017. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
2017-05-3125MOTION for Summary Judgment by Internal Revenue Service (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Cross Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Declaration of K. Feldman, # 3 Declaration of M. Cottrell, # 4 Declaration of J. Perez, # 5 Declaration of W. Rowe, # 6 Exhibit A, # 7 Exhibit B, # 8 Exhibit C, # 9 Exhibit D, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Peyton, Joycelyn) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
2017-06-1626RESPONSE in Opposition re 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Abdelrahman Ayyad, Sara Ayyad. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Kelly, Gerald) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
2017-07-0327RESPONSE in Opposition re 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Internal Revenue Service.(Peyton, Joycelyn) (Entered: 07/03/2017)
2017-07-1228Supplemental to 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Internal Revenue Service (Attachments: # 1 Supplement W. Rowe Declaration)(Peyton, Joycelyn) (Entered: 07/12/2017)
2017-08-1829Correspondence re: Discovery Motion (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Heller, Daniel) (Entered: 08/18/2017)
2017-08-1830Correspondence re: Plaintiffs' Discovery Motion (Peyton, Joycelyn) (Entered: 08/18/2017)
2017-08-2231ORDER scheduling a conference call for September 1, 2017 at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 8/22/2017. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
2017-09-0132NOTICE of Appearance by Beatriz Teresa Saiz on behalf of Internal Revenue Service (Saiz, Beatriz) (Entered: 09/01/2017)
2017-09-0133PAPERLESS ORDER: For the reasons stated during today's telephone conference, the parties are to submit letter pleadings of no more than 5 pages, exclusive of exhibits, with exhibits filed under seal, pursuant to the following schedule: Plaintiff's motion is due by 9/15/2017, the government's reply is due by 9/29/2017, and Plaintiff's reply is due by 10/6/2017. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 9/1/2017. (sat, Chambers) (Entered: 09/01/2017)
2017-09-0134Telephone Conference held on 9/1/2017 before Judge Paula Xinis.(FTR Station.) (bus, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/01/2017)
2017-09-1535-SEALED- MOTION for Discovery Determination Pursuant to FRCP 26(b)(5)(B) by Abdelrahman Ayyad, Sara Ayyad (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Certificate of Service, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Heller, Daniel) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
2017-09-1936QC NOTICE: A certificate of service indicating how service was made for 35 Motion for Discovery, filed by Abdelrahman Ayyad and Sara Ayyad, has not been filed - Sealed documents are not accessible through ECF, Please provide the Government with a service copy of the sealed documents filed then file the Certificate of Service. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
2017-09-1937CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Abdelrahman Ayyad, Sara Ayyad re 35 MOTION for Discovery Determination Pursuant to FRCP 26(b)(5)(B) (Heller, Daniel) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
2017-09-2938RESPONSE in Opposition re 35 MOTION for Discovery Determination Pursuant to FRCP 26(b)(5)(B) filed by Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of J. Peyton, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M)(Peyton, Joycelyn) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
2017-09-2939-SEALED - NOTICE of Filing Under Seal Declaration of J. Peyton with Exhibits by Internal Revenue Service re 38 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M)(Peyton, Joycelyn) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
2017-10-0640-SEALED-REPLY to Response to Motion re 35 MOTION for Discovery Determination Pursuant to FRCP 26(b)(5)(B) filed by Abdelrahman Ayyad, Sara Ayyad. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Heller, Daniel) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
2018-01-1841NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing set for 2/1/2018 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4C, 6500 Cherrywood Lane, Greenbelt, Maryland 20770, before Judge Paula Xinis. (tb2s, Chambers) (Entered: 01/18/2018)
2018-02-0142Motion Hearing held on 2/1/2018 re 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Internal Revenue Service, 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Abdelrahman Ayyad, Sara Ayyad before Judge Paula Xinis.(Court Reporter: Marlene Kerr - 4C) (bus, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
2018-02-0243MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 2/2/2018. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/05/2018)
2018-02-0244ORDER granting in part and denying in part 18 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 25 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 35 Motion for Discovery Determination. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 2/2/2018. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/05/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff