Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleKnuckles v. Department of Army
DistrictSouthern District of Georgia
CityAugusta
Case Number1:2016cv00164
Date Filed2016-09-28
Date Closed2017-03-13
JudgeJudge J. Randal Hall
PlaintiffJeniqua Irene Knuckles
TERMINATED: 03/13/2017
Case DescriptionJeniqua Knuckles submitted a FOIA request to the FOIA officer at Fort Gordon. Although she had several email communications with the FOIA office, it did not respond to her request. After hearing nothing further from the FOIA office, Knuckles filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantDepartment of Army
TERMINATED: 03/13/2017
DefendantDepartment of Army
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [29]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-09-281COMPLAINT against Department of Army filed by Jeniqua Irene Knuckles. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(maa) (Entered: 09/28/2016)
2016-09-282MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jeniqua Irene Knuckles. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(maa) (Entered: 09/28/2016)
2016-09-283Litigants' Bill of Rights by Jeniqua Irene Knuckles. (maa) (Entered: 09/28/2016)
2016-10-184ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; directing that service of process be effected on Defendant Department of the Army; and directing Plaintiff to serve upon the defendant, or upon its defense attorney if appearance has been entered by counsel, a copy of every further pleading or other document submitted to the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 10/18/2016. (thb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/18/2016: # 1 USM-285) (thb). (Entered: 10/18/2016)
2016-11-025U.S. Marshal Return as to Office of the U.S. Army for 4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, 1 Complaint filed by Jeniqua Irene Knuckles, on 10/28/16. (trb) (Entered: 11/02/2016)
2016-11-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Department of Army answer due 12/27/2016. (thb) (Entered: 11/02/2016)
2016-11-046U.S. Marshal Return as to Loretta Lynch, Attorney General for 4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, 1 Complaint filed by Jeniqua Irene Knuckles on 10/31/16. (wwp) (Entered: 11/04/2016)
2016-11-047NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon Heath Statkus on behalf of Department of Army (Statkus, Shannon) (Entered: 11/04/2016)
2016-11-048U.S. Marshal Return as to Department of Army for 4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, 1 Complaint filed by Jeniqua Irene Knuckles, on 10/28/16. (trb) (Entered: 11/04/2016)
2016-11-229MOTION to Dismiss by Department of Army. Responses due by 12/9/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Statkus, Shannon) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
2016-11-2210AMENDED DOCUMENT by Department of Army. Amendment to 9 MOTION to Dismiss (Amended Certificate of Service) . (Statkus, Shannon) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
2016-11-3011Litigants' Bill of Rights by Department of Army. (Statkus, Shannon) (Entered: 11/30/2016)
2016-12-2112ORDER SETTING MEDIATION that, by the request of the parties, the Court hereby schedules a mediation before the undersigned on Tuesday, January 31, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. in the United States District Courthouse, 600 James Brown Boulevard, Augusta, Georgia, etc., and including Settlement Conference Preference attachment, (Mediation Conference set for 1/31/2017 09:00 AM in Augusta - 1st Floor before Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps). Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 12/21/2016. (jah) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
2017-01-1113REQUEST/MOTION to modify mediation by Jeniqua Irene Knuckles. Responses due by 1/25/2017. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(cmr) (Entered: 01/11/2017)
2017-01-1714ORDER denying 13 REQUEST/MOTION to modify mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 01/17/2017. (thb) (Entered: 01/17/2017)
2017-01-3015AMENDED DOCUMENT by Department of Army. Amendment to 9 MOTION to Dismiss (Supplement to Motion to Dismiss) . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Filed Under Seal))(Statkus, Shannon) (Entered: 01/30/2017)
2017-01-3016MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit 1 of 15 AMENDED DOCUMENT Under Seal by Department of Army. Responses due by 2/13/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Statkus, Shannon) Modified on 1/30/2017 (thb). (Entered: 01/30/2017)
2017-01-30MOTION REFERRED: 16 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit 1 of 15 AMENDED DOCUMENT Under Seal. (thb) (Entered: 01/30/2017)
2017-01-3119Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps: Settlement Conference held on 1/31/2017. Settlement reached as to cases 1:15cv77 and 1:16cv164. Settlement documents to be executed by all parties on or before Friday, 2/17/2017. (rc) (Entered: 02/03/2017)
2017-02-0217ORDER directing parties to appear at status conference on February 3, 2017 at 9:30 am. The Court directs the Clerk to send a copy of this order to Plaintiff at the e-mail address with which she has been communicating with the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 02/02/2017. (thb) (Entered: 02/02/2017)
2017-02-0218***ENTERED IN ERROR*** Modified on 2/2/2017 (maa). (Entered: 02/02/2017)
2017-02-0320Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps: Status Conference held on 2/3/2017. Status conference continued to Monday, 2/6/17, at 9:00 AM. (Court Reporter FTR.) (rc) (Entered: 02/03/2017)
2017-02-0621Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps: Status Conference held on 2/6/2017. (Court Reporter FTR.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C) (rc) (Entered: 02/09/2017)
2017-02-0622ORAL MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement by Department of Army. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(rc) (Entered: 02/09/2017)
2017-02-1023REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that the 22 MOTION Enforce Settlement Agreement be denied as moot, this case be dismissed with prejudice as a sanction, and this civil action be closed. Objections to R&R due by 2/27/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 02/10/2017. (thb) Modified on 2/10/2017 (thb). (Entered: 02/10/2017)
2017-02-1024ORDER directing service of the 23 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 02/27/2017. (thb) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
2017-02-1525ORDER denying without prejudice 16 Motion for Leave to File Exhibit 1 of 15 AMENDED DOCUMENT Under Seal, and directing the Clerk of Court to return in accordance with Local Rule 79.7(c) the documents marked as Government Exhibit A to Defendants Supplement to Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 02/15/2017. (thb) (Entered: 02/15/2017)
2017-02-1626NOTICE by Department of Army re 15 Amended Document Exhibit A (Statkus, Shannon) (Entered: 02/16/2017)
2017-02-2727OBJECTION to 23 Report and Recommendations by Jeniqua Irene Knuckles. (thb) (Entered: 02/27/2017)
2017-03-0728RESPONSE to 27 Objection to Report and Recommendations filed by Jeniqua Irene Knuckles by Department of Army. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Statkus, Shannon) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
2017-03-1329ORDER ADOPTING 23 Report and Recommendations, DENYING AS MOOT 22 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Department of Army, OVERRULING Plaintiff's objections, DISMISSING with prejudice this case as a sanction, and CLOSING this civil action. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 03/13/2017. (maa) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
2017-03-1330CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered in accordance with 29 Order. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 03/13/2017. (maa) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff