Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRosiere v. United States of America
DistrictDistrict of Nevada
CityLas Vegas
Case Number2:2016cv02286
Date Filed2016-09-28
Date Closed2017-05-09
JudgeChief Judge Gloria M. Navarro
PlaintiffShaun Rosiere
Case DescriptionShaun Rosiere, a federal prisoner in Nevada, had his FOIA suit filed in May in the Northern District of California transferred to the District of Nevada.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Jurisdiction - Venue

DefendantUnited Sates of America
AppealNinth Circuit 17-15994
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Opinion/Order [60]
Opinion/Order [61]
Opinion/Order [64]
Opinion/Order [68]
Opinion/Order [79]
Opinion/Order [84]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-05-231COMPLAINT against United States of America. (IFPP) No Process. Filed byShaun Rosiere. by 6/6/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/28/2016.] (Entered: 05/24/2016)
2016-05-232MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Shaun Rosiere. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/28/2016.] (Entered: 05/24/2016)
2016-05-233Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/11/2016. Case Management Conference set for 8/18/2016 11:00 AM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/28/2016.] (Entered: 05/24/2016)
2016-05-254ORDER RE APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/28/2016.] (Entered: 05/25/2016)
2016-06-035CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 6/17/2016. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/28/2016.] (Entered: 06/03/2016)
2016-06-036AMENDED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 6/3/2016. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/28/2016.] (Entered: 06/03/2016)
2016-06-067Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 USM 285, # 2 USM 285)(farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/28/2016.] (Entered: 06/06/2016)
2016-06-108Acknowledgment of Receipt received from the USMS re summons. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/28/2016.] (Entered: 06/10/2016)
2016-06-209SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 7/1/2016. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences.(lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/28/2016.] (Entered: 06/20/2016)
2016-06-2910SUMMONS Returned Executed United States of America served on 6/27/2016, answer due 8/26/2016. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/28/2016.] (Entered: 07/01/2016)
2016-07-0511THIRD CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 7/15/2016. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/28/2016.] (Entered: 07/05/2016)
2016-07-1512MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue Or, Alternatively, To Transfer Venue filed by United States of America. Motion Hearing set for 8/25/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 8/1/2016. Replies due by 8/8/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wang, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/15/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/28/2016.] (Entered: 07/15/2016)
2016-07-1513Request for Judicial Notice re 12 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue Or, Alternatively, To Transfer Venue filed byUnited States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E, # 2 Exhibit F-K)(Related document(s) 12 ) (Wang, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/15/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/28/2016.] (Entered: 07/15/2016)
2016-07-1514CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re 12 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue Or, Alternatively, To Transfer Venue , 13 Request for Judicial Notice, (Wang, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/15/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/28/2016.] (Entered: 07/15/2016)
2016-07-1815CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 8/1/2016. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/28/2016.] (Entered: 07/18/2016)
2016-07-1816CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States of America.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Wang, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/18/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/28/2016.] (Entered: 07/18/2016)
2016-07-2817MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Shaun Rosiere. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/28/2016.] (Entered: 07/29/2016)
2016-07-2818MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue Or, Alternatively, To Transfer Venue filed by Shaun Rosiere. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/28/2016.] (Entered: 07/29/2016)
2016-07-2921"Notice or Response related to Magistrate Powers over the full case" by Shaun Rosiere (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/28/2016.] (Entered: 08/02/2016)
2016-08-0119NOTICE REGARDING LEGAL HELP DESK AND HANDBOOK FOR LITIGANTS WITHOUT A LAWYER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 8/1/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Pro Se Handbook, # 2 Pro Se Flyer)(lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/28/2016.] (Entered: 08/01/2016)
2016-08-0120CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 8/8/2016. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/28/2016.] (Entered: 08/01/2016)
2016-08-0222ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler denying 17 Motion to Appoint Counsel; granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 12 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue Or, Alternatively, To Transfer Venue Responses due by 9/8/2016. Replies due by 9/15/2016. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2016) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/3/2016: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (lsS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 9/28/2016.] (Entered: 08/02/2016)
2016-08-03Set/Reset Deadlines as to 12 Motion to Dismiss Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue Or, Alternatively, To Transfer Venue. Responses due by 9/8/2016. Replies due by 9/15/2016. Motion Hearing set for 9/29/2016 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/28/2016.] (Entered: 08/03/2016)
2016-08-0323CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE on August 18, 2016 before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. A Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/10/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/17/2016 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/28/2016.] (Entered: 08/03/2016)
2016-08-0524NOTICE related to Magistrate Powers by Shaun Rosiere (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/28/2016.] (Entered: 08/08/2016)
2016-08-0925ORDER REGARDING CONSENT OR DECLINATION. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 8/9/2016) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/9/2016: # 1 Certificate of Service) (ahm, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 9/28/2016.] (Entered: 08/09/2016)
2016-08-10Set/Reset Hearing: Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/17/2016 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/28/2016.] (Entered: 08/10/2016)
2016-09-0626ORDER re consent or declination. The court directs Mr. Rosiere to return the attached form by September 22, 2016. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 9/6/2016. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/28/2016.] (Entered: 09/06/2016)
2016-09-0627CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 26 Order. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/28/2016.] (Entered: 09/06/2016)
2016-09-1328MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint filed by Shaun Rosiere. Responses due by 9/27/2016. Replies due by 10/4/2016. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/28/2016.] (Entered: 09/13/2016)
2016-09-1429NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Steven J. Saltiel (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Saltiel, Steven) (Filed on 9/14/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/28/2016.] (Entered: 09/14/2016)
2016-09-1430REPLY (re 12 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue Or, Alternatively, To Transfer Venue ) Defendant's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue filed byUnited States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Saltiel, Steven) (Filed on 9/14/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/28/2016.] (Entered: 09/14/2016)
2016-09-1931CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Shaun Rosiere.. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/28/2016.] (Entered: 09/20/2016)
2016-09-2732CLERK'S NOTICE: Defendants Motion to Dismiss, or Alternatively, Motion to Transfer Venue Hearing set for September 29, 2016 before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler is VACATED. The motion will be determined on the pleading. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/28/2016.] (Entered: 09/27/2016)
2016-09-2733ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO DISTRICT OF NEVADA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 9/27/2016. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/28/2016.] (Entered: 09/27/2016)
2016-09-27Case electronically transferred to the District of Nevada. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2016) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/28/2016.] (Entered: 09/27/2016)
2016-09-2834Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:16-cv-02765. Original file with documents numbered 1 - 33, copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (MMM) (Entered: 09/28/2016)
2016-09-28Case assigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (MMM) (Entered: 09/28/2016)
2016-09-2835MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro, on 9/28/2016. This action was received on * 9/27/16 * pursuant to a court order directing transfer from the * Northern District of California * and assigned case number 2:16-cv-02286-GMN-PAL. All future documents must bear said correct case number. Joint Status Report due by 10/28/2016. Verified Petition due by 11/12/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) (Entered: 09/28/2016)
2016-09-2936MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro, on 9/29/2016. By Deputy Clerk: Aaron Blazevich. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Chief Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: www.nvd.uscourts.gov . (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB) (Entered: 09/29/2016)
2016-09-3037MOTION for Summary Judgment by Petitioner Shaun Rosiere. Responses due by 10/24/2016. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/14/2016. (MMM) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 09/30/2016)
2016-09-3038MOTION to Compel Discovery by Petitioner Shaun Rosiere. Responses due by 10/17/2016. (MMM) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
2016-09-3039MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to 37 Motion for Summary Judgment,. Opposition due 21 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due 14 days after the filing of the opposition. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/30/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
2016-10-0340CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Shaun Rosiere. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (MMM) (Entered: 10/04/2016)
2016-10-0641Copy of Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion to Compel Discovery filed by petitioner in Northern District of California case 3:16-cv-02765 and forwarded by CAND to District of Nevada. (MMM) (Entered: 10/06/2016)
2016-10-1742MOTION to Dismiss by Respondent United Sates of America. Responses due by 11/3/2016. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/1/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A. District of New Jersey Docket, # 2 Exhibit A-1 Complaint, ECF 1, # 3 Exhibit B. District of Colorado Docket 1:16-cv-00143-LTB, # 4 Exhibit B-1 Complaint, ECF 5, # 5 Exhibit B-2 Order of Dismissal, ECF 11, # 6 Exhibit B-3 Order and Judgment, 10th Cir. - No. 16-1100, # 7 Exhibit C. District of Colorado Docket 1:16-cv-01251-LTB, # 8 Exhibit C-1 Complaint, ECF 1, # 9 Exhibit C-2 Order to Dismiss, ECF 13, # 10 Exhibit D. 9th Circuit Docket No. 16-55821, # 11 Exhibit D-1 Order, ECF 4, # 12 Exhibit D-2 Order, ECF 5, # 13 Exhibit E. 9th Circuit Docket No. 16-35581, # 14 Exhibit E-1 Order, ECF 3, # 15 Exhibit F. District of Hawaii Docket 1:16-cv-00260-HG-RLP, # 16 Exhibit F-1 Minute Order Closing Case, ECF 8, # 17 Exhibit F-2 Order adopting MJ Findings and Recommendation, ECF 5, # 18 Exhibit F-3 Findings and Recommendation, ECF 4, # 19 Index Exhibit List)(Rose, Patrick) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 10/17/2016)
2016-10-1743MOTION to Stay re 42 Motion to Dismiss, by Respondent United Sates of America. (Rose, Patrick) (Entered: 10/17/2016)
2016-10-1744NOTICE OF RELATED CASES 2:15-cv-02187-APG-GWF by Respondent United Sates of America. (Rose, Patrick) (Entered: 10/17/2016)
2016-10-1745MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to 42 Motion to Dismiss. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/17/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS) (Entered: 10/17/2016)
2016-10-2146NOTICE of Case Management Conference regarding 38 MOTION to Compel, and 43 MOTION to Stay: Motion Hearing set for 11/1/2016, at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (no image attached) (TKH) (Entered: 10/21/2016)
2016-10-2447MOTION for Demand for Judgment by Petitioner Shaun Rosiere. Responses due by 11/10/2016. (MMM) (Entered: 10/24/2016)
2016-10-2448MOTION to Stay Proceedings pending Ruling on 37 Motion for Summary Judgment and 47 Motion for Demand for Judgment by Petitioner Shaun Rosiere. (MMM) (Entered: 10/24/2016)
2016-10-2549MOTION to Stay the Proceedings by Petitioner Shaun Rosiere. (MMM) (Entered: 10/25/2016)
2016-10-2750STATUS REPORT United States' by Respondent United Sates of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A. New Jersey Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion to Compel Discovery, # 2 Exhibit B. New Jersey Letter to Court from United States requesting 90-day Stay, # 3 Exhibit C. New Jersey Order granting 90-day stay and denying Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion to Compel)(Rose, Patrick) (Entered: 10/27/2016)
2016-10-2751RESPONSE to 49 Motion to Stay, filed by Respondent United Sates of America. Replies due by 11/6/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit New Jersey Order denying Motion for Discovery)(Rose, Patrick) (Entered: 10/27/2016)
2016-10-2752STATUS REPORT RE: REMOVAL filed by Petitioner Shaun Rosiere. (MMM) (Entered: 10/28/2016)
2016-10-2853MOTION to Withdraw the Complaint without prejudice, filed by Petitioner Shaun Rosiere. (MMM) (Entered: 10/28/2016)
2016-10-3154RESPONSE to 42 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Petitioner Shaun Rosiere. Replies due by 11/10/2016. (MMM) (Entered: 10/31/2016)
2016-10-3155MOTION for Sanctions by Petitioner Shaun Rosiere. Responses due by 11/17/2016. (MMM) (Entered: 10/31/2016)
2016-10-3156MOTION Challenging Jurisdiction of Colorado District Court over other Cases by Petitioner Shaun Rosiere. Responses due by 11/17/2016. (MMM) (Entered: 10/31/2016)
2016-10-3157MOTION to Put on Hold 53 Motion of Withdrawal of the Complaint without Prejudice, filed by Petitioner Shaun Rosiere. (MMM) (Entered: 10/31/2016)
2016-11-0158MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Hearing re motion to compel 38 and motion to stay 43 held on 11/1/2016 before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Crtrm Administrator: J. Ries ; Def Counsel: Patrick Rose ; Court Reporter/FTR #: 10:11 - 10:51 ; Time of Hearing: 10:00 a.m. ; Courtroom: 3B ; The plaintiff Shaun Rosiere is present. The court canvasses and hears representations and arguments from the parties. ORDERED that the motion to compel 38 is DENIED without prejudice. The motion to stay 43 is GRANTED to the extent a temporary stay is entered for 120 days. Status check hearing is set for 2/7/17 at 10:00 a.m.. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties file a joint status report by 2/3/17. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAR) (Entered: 11/03/2016)
2016-11-0959FIRST MOTION to Extend Time re 42 Motion to Dismiss , filed by Respondent United Sates of America. (Rose, Patrick) Modified on 11/10/2016 to correct docket entry relationship (TR). (Entered: 11/09/2016)
2016-11-0960ORDER. Plaintiff Shaun Rosiere's Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 37 ); Motion forDemand for Judgment (ECF No. 47 ); Motion to Stay Proceedings Motion for SummaryJudgment (ECF No. 48 ); Motion to Stay Proceedings (ECF No. 49 ); Motion toWithdraw (ECF No. 53 ); Motion for Sanctions (ECF No. 55 ); Motion ChallengingJurisdiction of Colorado District Court (ECF No. 56 ); and Motion to Stay Motion toWithdraw Document (ECF No. 57 ), are DENIED without prejudice. Discovery and other proceedings in this case are stayed pending decision of the government's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No 42 ). A status hearing is set for February 7, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. The hearing will be vacated if the district judge has not yet decided the government's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/9/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) (Entered: 11/10/2016)
2016-11-1461ORDER Granting 59 Motion to Extend Time re 42 Motion to Dismiss. ( Replies due by 11/23/2016.) Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/14/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Entered: 11/14/2016)
2016-11-2362REPLY to Response to 42 Motion to Dismiss,,,,, filed by Respondent United Sates of America. (Rose, Patrick) (Entered: 11/23/2016)
2017-01-0563MOTION to Resend any Sent Paper for the Last Few Months by Petitioner Shaun Rosiere. Responses due by 1/19/2017. (MMM) (Entered: 01/10/2017)
2017-01-2464ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's 63 Motion to Resend any Sent Paper for the Last Few Months is Denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 01/23/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV) (Entered: 01/25/2017)
2017-01-2665STATEMENT of Material Facts by Petitioner Shaun Rosiere. (MMM) (Entered: 01/27/2017)
2017-02-0366STATUS REPORT by Respondent United Sates of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter to Rosiere)(Rose, Patrick) (Entered: 02/03/2017)
2017-02-0667MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen, on 2/6/2017. The court conducted a hearing on November 9, 2016. At that hearing, discovery and other proceedings in this case were stayed pending decision of the government's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 42). The court set a status hearing for February 7, 2017, at 10:00 a.m., but advised that the hearing would be vacated if the district judge had not yet decided the government's Motion to Dismiss. As the Motion to Dismiss is still pending before the district judge, IT IS ORDERED that the status hearing scheduled for February 7, 2017, at 10:00 a.m., is VACATED. The parties shall submit a joint status report within 14 days of decision of the Motion to Dismiss in the event any claim survives. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TKH) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
2017-05-0968ORDER that 42 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Complaint, (ECF No. 1 ), is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/9/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) (Entered: 05/09/2017)
2017-05-0969CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of United Sates of America against Shaun Rosiere. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 5/9/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) (Entered: 05/09/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff