Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWunderlich v. United States Special Operations Command
DistrictMiddle District of Florida
CityTampa
Case Number8:2016cv02707
Date Filed2016-09-21
Date Closed2017-03-16
JudgeJudge James S. Moody, Jr
PlaintiffRobert W. Wunderlich
DefendantUnited States Special Operations Command
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [17]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-09-211COMPLAINT against United States Special Operations Command (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number TPA039271) filed by Robert W. Wunderlich. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(GLS) (Entered: 09/21/2016)
2016-09-212SUMMONS issued as to United States Special Operations Command, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Dept. of Justice. (GLS) (Entered: 09/21/2016)
2016-09-233RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Issued by Deputy Clerk on 9/23/2016. (AR) (Entered: 09/23/2016)
2016-10-134SUMMONS returned executed by Robert W. Wunderlich. United States Special Operations Command served on 9/26/2016, answer due 11/25/2016. (BSN) (Entered: 10/14/2016)
2016-10-135PROOF of service by Robert W. Wunderlich as to Commander. (BSN) (Entered: 10/14/2016)
2016-10-136PROOF of service by Robert W. Wunderlich as to U.S. Dept. of Justice. (BSN) (Entered: 10/14/2016)
2016-10-137NOTICE of pendency of related cases re 3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Robert W. Wunderlich. Related case(s): n (BSN) (Entered: 10/14/2016)
2016-10-218ANSWER to 1 Complaint by United States Special Operations Command.(Stegeby, Erik) (Entered: 10/21/2016)
2016-10-249NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by United States Special Operations Command. Related case(s): No (Stegeby, Erik) (Entered: 10/24/2016)
2016-10-2410Amended ANSWER to 1 Complaint by United States Special Operations Command.(Stegeby, Erik) (Entered: 10/24/2016)
2017-02-0211ORDER to show cause Re: failure to file a Case Management Report. Show Cause Response due by 2/16/2017. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 2/2/2017. (LN) (Entered: 02/02/2017)
2017-02-1012MOTION to Dismiss the Request for Injunction and request for cost of litigation by Robert W. Wunderlich. (BSN) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
2017-03-0113ORDER to show cause Re: Defendant's failure to respond to 12 Motion to Dismiss and Request for Cost of Litigation. Show Cause Response due by 3/15/2017. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 3/1/2017. (LN) (Entered: 03/01/2017)
2017-03-1514COUNSEL CALLED REFILING WITH CORRECT DOCUMENT; IMAGE REMOVED PER COUNSEL (personal identifiers) STIPULATION for Compromise and Release of Claims by United States Special Operations Command. (Stegeby, Erik) Modified on 3/15/2017 (BSN). (Entered: 03/15/2017)
2017-03-1515NOTICE of settlement Joint by United States Special Operations Command (Stegeby, Erik) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
2017-03-1516RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 13 Order to show cause filed by United States Special Operations Command. (Stegeby, Erik) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
2017-03-161760-DAY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. All pending motions are denied as moot. Clerk shall close the file. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 3/16/2017. (LN) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff