Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRutila v. United States Department of Transportation et al
DistrictNorthern District of Texas
CityDallas
Case Number3:2016cv02911
Date Filed2016-10-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Jane J. Boyle
PlaintiffHarold Edward Rutila, IV
Case DescriptionHarold Rutila submitted a number of FOIA requests to the Federal Aviation Administration for records concerning the FAA Academy. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after the agency failed to respond substantively to his requests, Rutila filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Transportation
DefendantFederal Aviation Administration
DefendantMediator
ADR Provider
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Opinion/Order [73]
User-contributed Documents
 35 - Notice of Filing of Third Am. Compl.
35-1 - Third Am. Compl.
39 - Defs.' Partial Mot. to Dismiss
40 - Defs.' Br. in Supp. of Partial Mot. to Dismiss
41 - Ex. A in Supp. of Defs.' Partial Mot. to Dismiss
41-2 - Ex. B: FOIA Reference Guide
43 - Defs.' Answer to Pla.'s Third Amended Compl.
44 - Pl.'s Resp. to Defs.' Partial Mot. to Dismiss
45 - App. in Exhibits of Supp.
45-1 - Resp. to Defs.' Ex. A
46 - Pl.'s Notice of Supplemental Authority
47 - Defs.' REPLY Re: 44 (Pl.'s Resp. to Defs.' Mot. to Dismi
48 - Def.'s Mot. to Consolidate
48 - Pl.'s Resp. in Opp'n to Defs.' Mot. to Consolidate
Scheduling Order
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-10-171New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid, receipt # 94801. Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the national and circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (epm) Modified on 10/17/2016 (epm). (Entered: 10/17/2016)
2016-10-172Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (epm) (Entered: 10/17/2016)
2016-10-173COMPLAINT against Federal Aviation Administration, United States Department of Transportation filed by Harold Edward Rutila, IV. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 94801) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (epm) (Entered: 10/17/2016)
2016-10-174CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Harold Edward Rutila, IV. (epm) (Entered: 10/17/2016)
2016-10-175Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (epm) (Entered: 10/17/2016)
2016-10-17***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Mon Oct 17 15:54:00 CDT 2016 (crt) (Entered: 10/17/2016)
2016-10-186NOTICE of Change of Address for Pro Se litigant Harold Edward Rutila, IV. New address: 2255 Arkansas Lane Apt # 3311 Grand Prairie, TX 75052. (Rutila, Harold) (Entered: 10/18/2016)
2016-10-227AMENDED COMPLAINT AND NOTICE OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Harold Edward Rutila, IV. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) First Amended Complaint for Injunctive Relief, # 2 Exhibit(s) 1-40) (Rutila, Harold) (Entered: 10/22/2016)
2016-10-268SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Federal Aviation Administration, served on 10/24/2016; United States Department of Transportation, served on 10/24/2016 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) USPS Confirmation) (Rutila, Harold) Modified text on 10/27/2016 (rekc). (Entered: 10/26/2016)
2016-10-269CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Harold Edward Rutila, IV re 7 Amended Complaint,, NOTICE OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF Served Upon All Federal Defendants, Civil Process Clerk for the Northern District of Texas (Dallas Division), Attorney General of the U.S. Service completed 10/26/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) USPS Proof) (Rutila, Harold) (Entered: 10/26/2016)
2016-10-2810Mail returned as undeliverable. 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party, 1 New Case/QC, received back from Harold Edward Rutila, IV as RTS-No such number. Address updated from last filed document, 6 . New address: 2255 Arkansas Lane Apt # 3311 Grand Prairie, TX 75052. The current document has been ReNEF, plaintiff provided email address. (epm) Modified on 10/28/2016 (epm). (Entered: 10/28/2016)
2016-11-1611ANSWER to 7 Amended Complaint,, filed by Federal Aviation Administration, United States Department of Transportation. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Marti M Watkins Cherry-DOJ added to party Federal Aviation Administration(pty:dft), Attorney Marti M Watkins Cherry-DOJ added to party United States Department of Transportation(pty:dft) (Cherry-DOJ, Marti) (Entered: 11/16/2016)
2016-11-1612CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Federal Aviation Administration, United States Department of Transportation. (Cherry-DOJ, Marti) (Entered: 11/16/2016)
2016-11-1713STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 12/16/2016. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 11/17/2016) (sss) (Entered: 11/17/2016)
2016-12-1514Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Federal Aviation Administration, United States Department of Transportation. (Cherry-DOJ, Marti) (Entered: 12/15/2016)
2016-12-1615Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time Initial Disclosure Deadline filed by Federal Aviation Administration, United States Department of Transportation (Cherry-DOJ, Marti) (Entered: 12/16/2016)
2016-12-1616RESPONSE filed by Harold Edward Rutila, IV re: 15 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time Initial Disclosure Deadline (Rutila, Harold) (Entered: 12/16/2016)
2016-12-2117ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 15 Motion to Extend Time. The Court GRANTS Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Extend Initial Disclosure Deadline. Defendants' initial disclosures under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26 are now due January 20, 2017. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 12/21/2016) (chmb) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
2016-12-2118SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 12/4/2017 before Judge Jane J Boyle. Joinder of Parties due by 3/9/2017. Amended Pleadings due by 3/9/2017. Motions due by 9/5/2017. Discovery due by 8/7/2017. Deadline for mediation is on or before 7/7/2017. Pretrial Order due by 11/20/2017. Pretrial Materials due by 11/20/2017. Pretrial Conference set for 12/1/2017 10:00 AM before Judge Jane J Boyle. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 12/21/2016) (epm) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
2016-12-3019First MOTION to Compel Vaughn Index of Withholding , First MOTION to Expedite Deadlines set forth in Scheduling Order (), First MOTION to Vacate 18 Scheduling Order, 17 Order on Motion to Extend Time, Request First Amended Complaint due by 2/1/17, Vaughn by 3/15/17, Mediation by 3/27/17, Defendant's MSJ by 4/10/17, Response/Cross-Motion by 5/15/17, Defendant's Reply by 6/5/17, Plaintiff's Reply (Cross-Motion) by 06/26/17. filed by Harold Edward Rutila, IV with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Rutila, Harold) (Entered: 12/30/2016)
2017-01-0420RESPONSE filed by Federal Aviation Administration, United States Department of Transportation re: 19 First MOTION to Compel Vaughn Index of Withholding First MOTION to Expedite Deadlines set forth in Scheduling Order First MOTION to Vacate 18 Scheduling Order, 17 Order on Motion to Extend Time, Request First Amended Complaint due by 2/1/17, Vaughn by 3/15/17, Mediation by 3/27/17, Defendant's MSJ by 4/10/17, Response/Cross-Motion by 5/15/17, Defen (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s), # 2 Exhibit(s), # 3 Exhibit(s)) (Cherry-DOJ, Marti) (Entered: 01/04/2017)
2017-01-1121REPLY filed by Harold Edward Rutila, IV re: 19 First MOTION to Compel Vaughn Index of Withholding First MOTION to Expedite Deadlines set forth in Scheduling Order First MOTION to Vacate 18 Scheduling Order, 17 Order on Motion to Extend Time, Request First Amended Complaint due by 2/1/17, Vaughn by 3/15/17, Mediation by 3/27/17, Defendant's MSJ by 4/10/17, Response/Cross-Motion by 5/15/17, Defen (Rutila, Harold) (Entered: 01/11/2017)
2017-01-1222ORDER REFERRING MOTION: Before the Court is Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate, Set, Expedite Deadlines; Compel Vaughn Index. Doc. 19 . The Court refers this motion to United States Magistrate Judge Renee H. Toliver for hearing, if necessary, and determination or recommendation to this Court. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 1/12/2017) (sss) (Entered: 01/13/2017)
2017-01-1723Initial Disclosures filed by Harold Edward Rutila, IV re: 17 Order on Motion to Extend Time. (Rutila, Harold) Modified text on 1/18/2017 (rekc). (Entered: 01/17/2017)
2017-01-2024Designation of Mediator by Federal Aviation Administration, United States Department of Transportation. (Cherry-DOJ, Marti) (Entered: 01/20/2017)
2017-01-2325MEDIATION ORDER. The court appoints Paul L Salzberger as mediator. Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. The Court ORDERS the parties to complete mediation no later than 7/7/2017. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 1/23/2017) (twd) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
2017-03-0926AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants filed by Harold Edward Rutila, IV. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Amendment Proposed Amendment & Exhibit 1 - Second Amended Complaint for Injunctive Relief, # 2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2 - Exhibits to Second Amended Complaint, # 3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 3 - Communications between Parties) (Rutila, Harold) (Entered: 03/09/2017)
2017-03-2327ANSWER to 26 Amended Complaint filed by Federal Aviation Administration, United States Department of Transportation. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Cherry-DOJ, Marti) (Entered: 03/23/2017)
2017-04-0428First MOTION to Vacate 18 Scheduling Order, 25 Order Referring Case to ADR, Vacate Mediation filed by Harold Edward Rutila, IV (Rutila, Harold) (Entered: 04/04/2017)
2017-04-0629ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to 28 Motion to Vacate by Plaintiff Harold Edward Rutila, IV. (Rutila, Harold) (Entered: 04/06/2017)
2017-04-0630Designation of Experts by Harold Edward Rutila, IV. (Rutila, Harold) (Entered: 04/06/2017)
2017-04-2031RESPONSE filed by Federal Aviation Administration, United States Department of Transportation re: 28 First MOTION to Vacate 18 Scheduling Order, 25 Order Referring Case to ADR, Vacate Mediation (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Cherry-DOJ, Marti) (Entered: 04/20/2017)
2017-04-2032ELECTRONIC ORDER denying 28 Motion to Vacate. The parties are ORDERED to complete the mediation process as scheduled. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 4/20/2017) (Judge Jane J. Boyle) (Entered: 04/20/2017)
2017-05-0933ELECTRONIC ORDER finding as moot 19 Motion to Compel; finding as moot 19 Motion to Expedite; finding as moot 19 Motion to Vacate. Plaintiff's Motion is DENIED as moot given the events that have transpired in the case since the filing of the motion. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to seek leave of Court prior to filing another motion to compel a Vaughn index. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 5/9/2017) (chmb) (Entered: 05/09/2017)
2017-06-2834Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary filed by Paul L Salzberger. Attorneys in Attendance: Mary Cherry. Prv Fee: $ 1000.00. Outcome of ADR: Parties were unable to reach a settlement. (Salzberger, Paul) (Entered: 06/28/2017)
2017-07-0435THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against Federal Aviation Administration, United States Department of Transportation filed by Harold Edward Rutila, IV. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Amendment Third Amended Complaint for Injunctive Relief, # 2 Exhibit(s) 1-78) (Rutila, Harold) (Entered: 07/04/2017)
2017-07-1236MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to 35 Amended Complaint,,,, MOTION to Stay Deadlines () filed by Federal Aviation Administration, United States Department of Transportation (Cherry-DOJ, Mary) (Entered: 07/12/2017)
2017-07-1337RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Harold Edward Rutila, IV re: 36 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to 35 Amended Complaint, MOTION to Stay Deadlines (Rutila, Harold) (Entered: 07/13/2017)
2017-07-1438ORDER granting 36 Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply; granting 36 Motion to Stay. The Court further ORDERS that Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint (Dkt. 35) on or before 8/25/2017. The Court further ORDERS that the remaining deadlines in this case are hereby STAYED. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 7/14/2017) (ykp) (Entered: 07/17/2017)
2017-08-2539MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Federal Aviation Administration, United States Department of Transportation (Cherry-DOJ, Mary) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
2017-08-2540Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Federal Aviation Administration, United States Department of Transportation re 39 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT (Cherry-DOJ, Mary) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
2017-08-2541Appendix in Support filed by Federal Aviation Administration, United States Department of Transportation re 40 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Attachments: # 1 Additional Page(s), # 2 Additional Page(s), # 3 Additional Page(s)) (Cherry-DOJ, Mary) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
2017-08-2542***DISREGARD, counsel will refile*** ANSWER to 35 Amended Complaint,,, filed by Federal Aviation Administration, United States Department of Transportation. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Cherry-DOJ, Mary) Docket text modified on 8/25/2017 (twd). (Entered: 08/25/2017)
2017-08-2543ANSWER to 35 Amended Complaint,,, filed by Federal Aviation Administration, United States Department of Transportation (Cherry-DOJ, Mary) Modified title on 8/28/2017 (awc). (Entered: 08/25/2017)
2017-09-1544RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Harold Edward Rutila, IV re: 39 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT (Rutila, Harold) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
2017-09-1545Appendix in Support filed by Harold Edward Rutila, IV re 44 Response/Objection to Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Appendix of Exhibits) (Rutila, Harold) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
2017-09-2646Supplemental Document by Harold Edward Rutila, IV as to 44 Response/Objection Notice of Supplemental Authority, order in similar case. . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1 - Order Terminating Defendants' Motion to Dismiss) (Rutila, Harold) (Entered: 09/26/2017)
2017-09-2947REPLY filed by Federal Aviation Administration, United States Department of Transportation re: 39 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT (Cherry-DOJ, Mary) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
2017-10-0448MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Federal Aviation Administration, United States Department of Transportation with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Cherry-DOJ, Mary) (Entered: 10/04/2017)
2017-10-2549RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Harold Edward Rutila, IV re: 48 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Rutila, Harold) (Entered: 10/25/2017)
2017-10-3050STANDING ORDER OF REFERENCE: This case is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Renee H. Toliver for pretrial management. All non-dispositive motions are prospectively referred to the magistrate judge for determination. All case dispositive motions are prospectively referred to the magistrate judge for recommendation. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 10/30/2017) (sss) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
2017-11-0351MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF filed by Federal Aviation Administration, United States Department of Transportation (Cherry-DOJ, Mary) (Entered: 11/03/2017)
2017-11-0352Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Federal Aviation Administration, United States Department of Transportation re 51 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF (Cherry-DOJ, Mary) (Entered: 11/03/2017)
2017-11-0353Appendix in Support filed by Federal Aviation Administration, United States Department of Transportation re 52 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Attachments: # 1 Additional Page(s)) (Cherry-DOJ, Mary) (Entered: 11/03/2017)
2017-11-0654***VACATED per 56 Order*** ELECTRONIC ORDER terminating 48 Motion to Consolidate Cases. The Motion to Consolidate Cases or Transfer is terminated as moot in light of Judge Godbey's October 12, 2017 order in Case No. 16-CV-3433 transferring this case to the docket of Judge Boyle. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 11/6/2017) (chmb) Modified on 3/14/2018 (sss). (Entered: 11/06/2017)
2017-11-2455RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Harold Edward Rutila, IV re: 51 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF (Rutila, Harold) (Entered: 11/24/2017)
2018-03-1456ORDER: The Order terminating as moot Defendants' motion to consolidate, Doc. 54 , is VACATED. Defendants' motion to consolidate, filed in case number 3:16-CV-2911-B-BK, Doc. 48 , is GRANTED. Case number 3:16-CV-2911-B-BK is hereby CONSOLIDATED with case number 3:16-CV-3433-B-BK. All subsequent pleadings shall be filed under case number 3:16-CV-2911-B-BK, the first-filed case, and all pleadings filed in either case since October 12, 2017 (the date of transfer) shall be deemed filed in the consolidated case. Further, for the reasons advanced in Defendants' Motion to Set Aside Default, filed in case number 3:16-CV-3433-B-BK, Doc. 33, that motion is GRANTED. The Clerk's Entry of Default on 11/27/2018, in case number 3:16-CV-3433-B-BK, is hereby set aside. Finally, based on the foregoing, the Defendants' Motion for Leave to Re-file Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, filed in case number 3:16-CV-3433-B-BK, Doc. 34, is TERMINATED AS MOOT. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 3/14/2018) (sss) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
2018-04-1057NOTICE of Change of Address for Pro Se litigant Harold Edward Rutila, IV. New address: 12498 Woodhull Lndg, Fenton, MI 48430. (Rutila, Harold) (Entered: 04/10/2018)
2018-04-1058Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss , Dkt. 51, filed by Harold Edward Rutila, IV (Rutila, Harold) (Entered: 04/10/2018)
2018-07-0259NOTICE of Pending Motion for Leave, Dkt. 58, filed by Harold Edward Rutila, IV (Rutila, Harold) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
2018-12-2860Order Granting Government's Omnibus Motion for Stay of Cases in Light of Lapse of Appropriations (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 12/28/2018) (Attachments: # 1 Government's Omnibus Motion for Stay) (lrl) (Entered: 12/28/2018)
2019-01-2861ORDER GRANTING GOVERNMENT'S OMNIBUS MOTION FOR LIFT OF STAY: Unless otherwise directed by the United States District Judge presiding in a particular case, all deadlines that had not expired on or before December 21, 2018 in a case covered by the stay order are extended for 34 days (i.e., the duration of the lapse in appropriations for the Department of Justice). (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 1/26/2019) (Attachments: # 1 Additional Page(s) Omnibus Motion to Lift Stay) (ctf) (Entered: 01/28/2019)
2019-03-1362ELECTRONIC ORDER: On this day, the Court considered Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss , Doc. 58 . The Motion indicates Defendants do not oppose the relief sought, and no response in opposition was filed. Accordingly, the Motion is GRANTED . Because the amended response was not included with the motion for leave, as required by the Local Rules, Plaintiff shall file his amended response no later than April 3, 2019 . (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 3/13/2019) (Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver) (Entered: 03/13/2019)
2019-03-1363ELECTRONIC ORDER: Defendants are ORDERED to report to the Court by March 27, 2019 , the status of the Freedom of Information Act requests that are the subject of this consolidated case. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 3/13/2019) (Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver) (Entered: 03/13/2019)
2019-03-2664STATUS REPORT filed by Federal Aviation Administration, United States Department of Transportation. (Cherry-DOJ, Mary) (Entered: 03/26/2019)
2019-04-0365NOTICE of Change of Address for Pro Se litigant Harold Edward Rutila, IV. New address: 400 Gettysburg Rd, Apt. 305, Canton, MI 48187. (Rutila, Harold) (Entered: 04/03/2019)
2019-04-0366RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Harold Edward Rutila, IV re: 51 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF (Rutila, Harold) (Entered: 04/03/2019)
2019-04-0367NOTICE of Errata re: 66 Response/Objection filed by Harold Edward Rutila, IV (Rutila, Harold) (Entered: 04/04/2019)
2019-04-0467NOTICE of Errata re: 66 Response/Objection filed by Harold Edward Rutila, IV. (Rutila, Harold) (Entered: 04/04/2019)
2019-04-0468AMENDED DOCUMENT by Harold Edward Rutila, IV. Amendment to 66 Response/Objection. Consistent with 67 Notice of Errata . (Rutila, Harold) (Entered: 04/04/2019)
2019-04-1769REPLY filed by Federal Aviation Administration, United States Department of Transportation re: 51 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF (Cherry-DOJ, Mary) (Entered: 04/17/2019)
2019-04-2470FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE on Motion re: 39 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT ; 51 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF . The motions should be GRANTED. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 4/24/2019) (epm) (Entered: 04/24/2019)
2019-04-2471ELECTRONIC ORDER: Pretrial Deadlines Because the Court concludes that this appeal of agency administrative action is amenable to disposition on the parties' cross motions for summary judgment, Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a motion for summary judgment with competent evidence by June 24, 2019 . Defendants are ORDERED to file a motion for summary judgment with competent evidence within 30 days of Plaintiff's filing , which rebuts Plaintiff's arguments and seeks any affirmative relief to which they contend they are entitled. Plaintiff may file a response no later than 21 days after Defendants' filing . The parties are further directed to engage in mediation by September 13, 2019 , unless either party can demonstrate good cause for dispensing with this requirement. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 4/24/2019) (chmb) (Entered: 04/24/2019)
2019-05-0872RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Harold Edward Rutila, IV re: 70 Findings and Recommendations on Motion re: 39 Motion to Dismiss filed by United States Department of Transportation, Federal Aviation Administration, 51 Motion to Dismiss filed by United States Department of Transportation, Federal Aviati (Rutila, Harold) (Entered: 05/08/2019)
2019-05-1373Order Accepting 70 Findings, Conclusions and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint, Doc. 39 , and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Injunctive Relief, Doc. 51 , are GRANTED. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 5/13/2019) (zkc) (Entered: 05/14/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar