Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleEdward Dean Hohner v. U.S. Department of Justice et al
DistrictCentral District of California
CityWestern Division - Los Angeles
Case Number2:2016cv07967
Date Filed2016-10-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge George H. Wu
PlaintiffEdward Dean Hohner
Case DescriptionEdward Dean Hohner, a state prisoner, submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning the search of an address in Oceanside, CA. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Hohner filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantU.S. Department of Justice U.S. Dept. of Homeland Security
DefendantU.S. Department of Justice U.S. Customs Service
DefendantU.S. Department of Justice U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Opinion/Order [8]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-10-26LODGED COMPLAINT: Complaint sought to be filed by Plaintiff Edward Dean Hohner. (esa) (Entered: 10/26/2016)
2016-10-261NOTICE RE: DISCREPANCIES WITH LODGING OF COMPLAINT mailed to plaintiff Edward Dean Hohner. Upon submission of your complaint it was noted that you did not pay the appropriate filing fee. If you are unable to pay the entire filing fee at this time, you must sign and complete the CV60P form attached. If you do not respond within 30 days of the date of this letter your action will be dismissed. Re Lodged Complaint (Attachments: # 1 cv60p) (esa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/26/2016: # 2 Lodged Complaint) (esa). (Entered: 10/26/2016)
2016-12-012COMPLAINT against defendants U.S. Department of Justice(U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement), U.S. Department of Justice(U.S. Customs Service), U.S. Department of Justice(U.S. Dept. of Homeland Security).Case assigned to Judge Dale S. Fischer for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Frederick F Mumm, filed by Plaintiff Edward Dean Hohner. (esa) (Entered: 12/01/2016)
2016-12-013REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Edward Dean Hohner. (esa) (Entered: 12/01/2016)
2016-12-014NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (esa) (Entered: 12/01/2016)
2016-12-015NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 12/01/2016)
2016-12-096ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm: granting 3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). An initial partial filing fee of $3.41 must be paid within thirty (30) days of the date this order is filed. Failure to remit the initial partial filing fee may result in dismissal of the case. Thereafter, monthly payments shall be forwarded to the Court in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2). (See order for further details) (jsan) (Entered: 12/12/2016)
2017-01-057STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Courts website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judges Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (dp) (Entered: 01/05/2017)
2017-01-268(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 2/9/2017. (pso) (Entered: 01/26/2017)
2017-02-0610PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED filed by Plaintiff Edward Dean Hohner 8 . (pso) (Entered: 02/16/2017)
2017-02-16960 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), 2 as to Defendants U.S. Department of Justice(U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement), U.S. Department of Justice(U.S. Customs Service), U.S. Department of Justice(U.S. Dept. of Homeland Security). (bp) (Entered: 02/16/2017)
2017-02-2811ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:15-cv-02669 GW(PLAx). Case transferred from Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm to Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:16-cv-07967 GW(PLAx). Signed by Judge George H. Wu (rn) (Entered: 02/28/2017)
2017-03-0313PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Edward Dean Hohner, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Customs Service, U.S. Department of Homeland Security and U.S. Immigration & Customs Enforcement. Served by Certified Mail.(bp) . (Entered: 03/09/2017)
2017-03-0314PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Edward Dean Hohner, upon Civil Process Clerk and U.S. Assistant District Attorney. Served by Certified Mail. (bp) (Entered: 03/09/2017)
2017-03-0812Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu by Judge George H. Wu. (mrgo) (Entered: 03/08/2017)
2017-04-2815EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 7/31/2017 re Complaint - (Discovery), 2 filed by Defendants U.S. Department of Justice(U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement), U.S. Department of Justice(U.S. Customs Service), U.S. Department of Justice(U.S. Dept. of Homeland Security). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Extending Time for Defendants to Answer, Plead, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint, # 2 Proof of Service) (Attorney Jason K Axe added to party U.S. Department of Justice(pty:dft), Attorney Jason K Axe added to party U.S. Department of Justice(pty:dft), Attorney Jason K Axe added to party U.S. Department of Justice(pty:dft)) (Axe, Jason) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
2017-05-0216ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER, PLEAD, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Judge George H. Wu: IT IS SO ORDERED that Defendants shall have an extension of time, up to and including July 31, 2017, within which to answer, plead, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (cr) (Entered: 05/02/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff