Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleTHE WOLK LAW FIRM v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA NATIONAL TRANSPORTATION SAFETY BOARD
DistrictEastern District of Pennsylvania
CityPhiladelphia
Case Number2:2016cv05632
Date Filed2016-10-27
Date Closed2019-04-09
JudgeHONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO
PlaintiffTHE WOLK LAW FIRM
also known as ARTHUR ALAN WOLK ASSOCIATES
PlaintiffDON GOLDSTEIN
PlaintiffINGRID GOLDSTEIN INDIVIDUALLY AND AS CO-ADMINISTRATORS OF THE ESTATE OF MARK GOLDSTEIN, DECEASED
Case DescriptionThe Wolk Law Firm, representing Don and Ingrid Goldstein in a suit involving the death of their son in an airplane crash, submitted several FOIA requests to the National Transportation Safety Board for records concerning its investigation of the crash. The NTSB denied their requests and the Wolk Law Firm appealed those denials, which were upheld by the agency. The Wolk Law Firm then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES OF AMERICA NATIONAL TRANSPORTATION SAFETY BOARD
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Opinion/Order [55]
Opinion/Order [56]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-10-271COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA NATIONAL TRANSPORTATION SAFETY BOARD ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 149229.), filed by THE WOLK LAW FIRM, DON GOLDSTEIN, INGRID GOLDSTEIN . (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Case Management Track Form, # 3 Designation Form)(rt) (Entered: 10/28/2016)
2016-10-27Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA NATIONAL TRANSPORTATION SAFETY BOARD. Two Forwarded To: Counsel and One Given to AUSA on October 28, 2016 (rt) (Entered: 10/28/2016)
2016-10-312Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (va, ) (Entered: 11/01/2016)
2016-11-033PRAECIPE for Alias Summonses by DON GOLDSTEIN, INGRID GOLDSTEIN, THE WOLK LAW FIRM. (MISKA, MICHAEL) Modified on 11/4/2016 (md). (Entered: 11/03/2016)
2016-11-153 Alias Summonses Issued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA NATIONAL TRANSPORTATION SAFETY BOARD: 2 given to Counsel's Courier on 11/8/16; and 1 additional summons given to Counsel's Courier on 11/15/16, per Counsel's Request for US Attorney's Office in Washington, DC. (va, ) Modified on 11/17/2016 (md). (Entered: 11/17/2016)
2016-11-164MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA NATIONAL TRANSPORTATION SAFETY BOARD.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(SMITH, STACEY) (Entered: 11/16/2016)
2016-11-215NOTICE: A pretrial conference will be held on December 22, 2016 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 15A before the HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. (nds) (Entered: 11/21/2016)
2016-11-216ORDER THAT A HEARING TO CONSIDER DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS 4 WILL BE HELD ON DECEMBER 22, 2016 AT 2:00 P.M. IN COURTROOM 15A BEFORE THE HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 11/21/2016. 11/21/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nds) (Entered: 11/21/2016)
2016-11-287AFFIDAVIT of Service by Michael S. Miska re: served Civil Action Complaint upon U.S. Atty, Civil-Process Clerk by USPS, Certified Mail on 11/22/16 (MISKA, MICHAEL) (Entered: 11/28/2016)
2016-11-288AFFIDAVIT of Service by Michael S. Miska re: served Civil Action Complaint upon Loretta Lynch, Esq. US Atty General by USPS, Certified Mail on 11/15/16 (MISKA, MICHAEL) (Entered: 11/28/2016)
2016-11-309RESPONSE in Opposition re 4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint w/Memorandum of Law and Certificate of Service filed by DON GOLDSTEIN, INGRID GOLDSTEIN, THE WOLK LAW FIRM. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q)(MISKA, MICHAEL) (Entered: 11/30/2016)
2016-12-1610STATUS REPORT (JOINT) PURSUANT TO RULE 26(f) by DON GOLDSTEIN, INGRID GOLDSTEIN, THE WOLK LAW FIRM. (MISKA, MICHAEL) (Entered: 12/16/2016)
2016-12-2011ORDER THAT A HEARING TO CONSIDER DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS [ECF #4] SCHEDULED ON 12/22/16 AT 2:00 PM IS RESCHEDULED FOR 1/12/17 AT 3:00 PM BEFORE THE HON. EDUARDO C. ROBRENO IN COURTROOM 15A, U.S. COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET ST., PHILA., PA. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 12/20/16. 12/20/16 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc) (Entered: 12/20/2016)
2016-12-2212NOTICE of Appearance by CYNTHIA MARIE DEVERS on behalf of DON GOLDSTEIN, INGRID GOLDSTEIN, THE WOLK LAW FIRM with Certificate of Service(DEVERS, CYNTHIA) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
2016-12-2213MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, filed by DON GOLDSTEIN, INGRID GOLDSTEIN, THE WOLK LAW FIRM.Motion to Amend Complaint w/Memo of Law In Support, Certificate of Service, Proposed Order. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A, Part 2, # 3 Exhibit A, Part 3, # 4 Exhibit A, Part 4, # 5 Exhibit A, Part 5, # 6 Exhibit A, Part 6)(MISKA, MICHAEL) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
2017-01-1314Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. Motion Hearing held on 1/12/17 re 4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA NATIONAL TRANSPORTATION SAFETY BOARD (va, ) (Entered: 01/13/2017)
2017-01-1315ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO AMEND 13 IS GRANTED. DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS 4 IS DENIED AS MOOT. DEFENDANT'S ORAL MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT ONE OF THE AMENDED COMPLAINT IS GRANTED. DEFENDANT SHALL FILE BY FEBRUARY 1, 2017 A MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT TWO OF THE AMENDED COMPLAINT AND/OR A MOTION TO STAY. PLAINTIFFS SHALL FILE A RESPONSE TO ANY MOTION BY FEBRUARY 21, 2017. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 01/13/2017.01/13/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nds) (Entered: 01/13/2017)
2017-01-1716AMENDED COMPLAINT - CIVIL ACTION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA NATIONAL TRANSPORTATION SAFETY BOARD, filed by THE WOLK LAW FIRM, DON GOLDSTEIN, INGRID GOLDSTEIN. Certificate of Service. Exhibits. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2, # 2 Part 3, # 3 Part 4, # 4 Part 5, # 5 Part 6) (va, ) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
2017-01-2717MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA NATIONAL TRANSPORTATION SAFETY BOARD.Certificate of Service.(SMITH, STACEY) (Entered: 01/27/2017)
2017-01-3018ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE AN ANSWER 17 IS HEREBY GRANTED AND DEFENDANTS SHALL HAVE UNTIL FEBRUARY 8, 2017 TO MOVE TO DISMISS/STAY, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 01/30/2017.01/30/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nds) (Entered: 01/30/2017)
2017-02-0819MOTION to Stay filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA NATIONAL TRANSPORTATION SAFETY BOARD.Memorandum, Certificate of Service, Declaration. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit exhibit 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to 13, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 14 to 24)(SMITH, STACEY) (FILED IN ERROR - REFILED BY ATTY AS PAPER NO. 20 ) (va, ). (Entered: 02/08/2017)
2017-02-0820Amended MOTION to Stay re 16 Amended Complaint, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA NATIONAL TRANSPORTATION SAFETY BOARD.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 2 to 13, # 3 Exhibit 14 to 24)(SMITH, STACEY) (Entered: 02/08/2017)
2017-02-2121RESPONSE in Opposition re 20 Amended MOTION to Stay re 16 Amended Complaint, filed by DON GOLDSTEIN, INGRID GOLDSTEIN, THE WOLK LAW FIRM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34, # 35 Exhibit 35, # 36 Exhibit 36, # 37 Exhibit 37, # 38 Exhibit 38, # 39 Exhibit 39, # 40 Exhibit 40)(MISKA, MICHAEL) (Entered: 02/21/2017)
2017-03-0822TRANSCRIPT of HEARING held on 1/12/17, before Judge EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. Court Reporter/Transcriber MARY SCARDUZIO. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 3/29/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/10/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/6/2017. (jaa, ) (Entered: 03/09/2017)
2017-03-0823Notice of Filing of Official Transcript with Certificate of Service re 22 Transcript - PDF, 3/9/17 Entered and Copies Emailed and Mailed.. (jaa, ) (Entered: 03/09/2017)
2017-04-1324ORDER THAT UPON REVIEW OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY 20 THE COURT WILL HOLD A STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON MAY 15, 2017 AT 10:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 15A. FURTHER, BY MAY 5, 2017, DEFENDANT SHALL SHOW CAUSE WHY PLAINTIFFS' FOIA REQUESTS CANNOT BE FULFILLED IN FULL BY THE DATES SOUGHT BY PLAINTIFF, ETC. SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 04/12/2017. 04/13/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nds) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
2017-05-0525RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA NATIONAL TRANSPORTATION SAFETY BOARD. (SMITH, STACEY) (Entered: 05/05/2017)
2017-05-1226REPLY to Response to Motion re 20 Amended MOTION to Stay re 16 Amended Complaint, filed by DON GOLDSTEIN, INGRID GOLDSTEIN, THE WOLK LAW FIRM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 41, # 3 Exhibit 42, # 4 Exhibit 43, # 5 Exhibit 44)(MISKA, MICHAEL) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
2017-05-1527Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. Status Conference held on 5/15/17. Court Reporter: ESR. (va, ) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
2017-05-1828ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR STAY 20 IS DENIED, ETC. A STATUS CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON SEPTEMBER 12, 2017 AT 10:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 15A BEFORE THE HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 05/18/2017. 05/18/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nds) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
2017-05-18***A status conference is set for 9/12/2017 at 10:00 a.m. HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. ***(nds) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
2017-07-0729MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by DON GOLDSTEIN, INGRID GOLDSTEIN, THE WOLK LAW FIRM.Motion, Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Part 1 of 6, # 2 Exhibit A - Part 2 of 6, # 3 Exhibit A - Part 3 of 6, # 4 Exhibit A - Part 4 of 6, # 5 Exhibit A - Part 5 of 6, # 6 Exhibit A - Part 6 of 6, # 7 Exhibit B, # 8 Exhibit C, # 9 Exhibit D, # 10 Exhibit E, # 11 Exhibit F)(MISKA, MICHAEL) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
2017-07-2130RESPONSE in Opposition re 29 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA NATIONAL TRANSPORTATION SAFETY BOARD. (SMITH, STACEY) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
2017-08-1031STATUS REPORT by DON GOLDSTEIN, INGRID GOLDSTEIN, THE WOLK LAW FIRM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Goldstein), # 2 Exhibit B (Becker), # 3 Exhibit C (Williams - Young), # 4 Exhibit D (Malcolm - Basel), # 5 Exhibit E (Lallo), # 6 Exhibit F (Quinn))(DEVERS, CYNTHIA) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
2017-08-2132STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA NATIONAL TRANSPORTATION SAFETY BOARD. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Exhibit A)(SMITH, STACEY) (Entered: 08/21/2017)
2017-08-3033STATUS REPORT Plaintiffs' Supplemental Status Report by DON GOLDSTEIN, INGRID GOLDSTEIN, THE WOLK LAW FIRM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit G)(MISKA, MICHAEL) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
2017-09-1234ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANT SHALL FILE A MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY OCTOBER 27, 2017, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 09/12/2017. 09/12/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nds) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
2017-09-1235Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. Status Conference held on 9/12/17. Court Reporter: ESR. (va, ) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
2017-10-2736MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA NATIONAL TRANSPORTATION SAFETY BOARD.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13)(SMITH, STACEY) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
2017-10-2737TRANSCRIPT of STATUS CONFERENCE held on 9/12/17, before Judge ER. Court Reporter/Transcriber ESR. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. TK Transcribers. Redaction Request due 11/17/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/27/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/25/2018. (va, ) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
2017-10-2738Notice of Filing of Official Transcript with Certificate of Service re 37 Transcript - PDF, 10/30/17 Entered and Copies Emailed. (va, ) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
2017-11-2739RESPONSE in Opposition re 36 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DON GOLDSTEIN, INGRID GOLDSTEIN, THE WOLK LAW FIRM. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C)(MISKA, MICHAEL) (Entered: 11/27/2017)
2017-12-0540NOTICE of Appearance by VERONICA JANE FINKELSTEIN on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA NATIONAL TRANSPORTATION SAFETY BOARD with Certificate of Service(FINKELSTEIN, VERONICA) (Entered: 12/05/2017)
2017-12-0541MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Reply Brief in support of its 36 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA NATIONAL TRANSPORTATION SAFETY BOARD.Certificate of Counsel, Certificate of Service.(FINKELSTEIN, VERONICA) (Entered: 12/05/2017)
2017-12-0542ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME 41 IS GRANTED, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 12/5/2017. 12/5/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nds) (Entered: 12/05/2017)
2017-12-05Set/Reset Deadlines as to 36 MOTION for Summary Judgment . REPLIES DUE BY 1/8/2018. (md) (Entered: 12/06/2017)
2018-01-0843RESPONSE in Support re 36 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA NATIONAL TRANSPORTATION SAFETY BOARD. (SMITH, STACEY) (Entered: 01/08/2018)
2018-02-0944MOTION for Leave to File SurReply ISO Pltfs. Opposition filed by DON GOLDSTEIN, INGRID GOLDSTEIN, THE WOLK LAW FIRM.Pltfs. Motion for Leave to file SurReply. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(MISKA, MICHAEL) (Entered: 02/09/2018)
2018-05-0745***VACATED*** ORDER THAT DEFENDANT SHALL SUBMIT TO THE COURT, FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW, A HARD COPY OF EACH RESPONSIVE DOCUMENT THAT DEFENDANT HAS WITHELD FROM PRODUCTION BY MAY 10, 2018, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 5/3/18. 5/7/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rv) Modified on 5/10/2018 (nds). (Entered: 05/07/2018)
2018-05-1046ORDER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT 29 IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 36 IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUICE. PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR FILE A SUR-REPLY 44 IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. THE PARTIES MAY FILE MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY MAY 30 2018. THE COURT'S ORDER OF MAY 7, 2018 45 IS VACATED, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 05/10/2018. 05/10/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nds) (Entered: 05/10/2018)
2018-05-1747MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Amended Motion for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA NATIONAL TRANSPORTATION SAFETY BOARD.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(SMITH, STACEY) (Entered: 05/17/2018)
2018-05-2348ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME 47 IS GRANTED. THE PARTIES SHALL HAVE UNTIL JUNE 15, 2018 TO FILE MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 05/22/2018. 05/23/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nds) Modified on 5/24/2018 (md). (Entered: 05/23/2018)
2018-06-1849STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA NATIONAL TRANSPORTATION SAFETY BOARD SHALL HAVE UNTIL JUNE 29, 2018 TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 06/18/2018. 06/18/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nds) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
2018-06-2950Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA NATIONAL TRANSPORTATION SAFETY BOARD.Memorandum in Support of Amended Motion, Certificate of Service, Table of Exhibits. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(SMITH, STACEY) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
2018-07-0251Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment (CORRECTED) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA NATIONAL TRANSPORTATION SAFETY BOARD.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Certificate of Service)(SMITH, STACEY) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
2018-07-1352RESPONSE in Opposition re 51 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment (CORRECTED) , 50 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DON GOLDSTEIN, INGRID GOLDSTEIN, THE WOLK LAW FIRM. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D)(MISKA, MICHAEL) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
2018-08-2953NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by MARGARET L. HUTCHINSON on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA NATIONAL TRANSPORTATION SAFETY BOARD(va, ) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
2019-04-0454ORDER THAT A TELEPHONE STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON APRIL 9, 2019 AT 10:00 A.M., ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 04/03/2019. 04/04/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nds) Modified on 4/5/2019 (md). (Entered: 04/04/2019)
2019-04-0955MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 04/09/2019. 04/09/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nds) (Entered: 04/09/2019)
2019-04-0956ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 51 IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFFS' PRAYER FOR RELIEF IN COUNT II OF THE AMENDED COMPLAINT 16 IS GRANTED IN PART, ETC. PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT 16 IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK THIS CASE CLOSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 04/09/2019. 04/09/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nds) (Entered: 04/09/2019)
2019-04-0957JUDGMENT IS HEREBY ENTERED IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANT AND AGAINST PLAINTIFF, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 04/09/2019. 04/09/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nds) (Entered: 04/09/2019)
2019-04-1058Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO Telephone Status Conference held on 4/9/19. (ti, ) (Entered: 04/11/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar