Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMACHADO AMADIS v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv02230
Date Filed2016-11-09
Date Closed2019-02-01
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffJUAN LUCIANO MACHADO AMADIS
Case DescriptionJuan Luciano Machado Amadis submitted a FOIA request to the Drug Enforcement Administration for records concerning himself. The agency responded that it found no records and Amadis filed an administrative appeal. Amadis also submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning any criminal or drug trafficking records concerning himself. The FBI denied the request and Amadis filed an administrative appeal. Amadis submitted a third request to the Department of State for records concerning the revocation of his visa. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from any of the agencies, Amadis filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY
DefendantDRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY
TERMINATED: 01/25/2018
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
TERMINATED: 01/25/2018
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Opinion/Order [45]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-11-091COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4738628) filed by Juan Luciano Machado Amadis. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 11/09/2016)
2016-11-09Case Assigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. (sb) (Entered: 11/09/2016)
2016-11-092SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(sb) (Entered: 11/09/2016)
2016-11-183NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Stotter on behalf of JUAN LUCIANO MACHADO AMADIS (Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 11/18/2016)
2016-11-184NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of All Defendants (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 11/18/2016)
2016-12-195ANSWER to Complaint by DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 12/19/2016)
2016-12-276STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/27/16. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 12/27/2016)
2017-02-097Joint STATUS REPORT by DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 02/09/2017)
2017-02-14MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report 7 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties will file a joint status report on or before 03/23/17 that informs the Court of the status of the parties' dispute and proposes a schedule for further proceedings, if necessary. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 02/14/17. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
2017-03-238Joint STATUS REPORT by DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 03/23/2017)
2017-04-10MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report 8 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties will adhere to the following briefing schedule: (1) defendants will file their motion for summary judgment on or before 05/08/17; (2) plaintiff will file his response to defendants' motion and his own cross-motion for summary judgment on or before 06/07/17; (3) defendants will file their reply in support of their motion for summary judgment and their opposition to plaintiff's cross-motion on or before 07/07/17; (4) plaintiff will file his reply in support of his cross-motion on or before 07/27/17. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 04/10/17. (lcrjl1) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
2017-05-089MOTION for Summary Judgment by DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Declaration of Eric Stein (with exhibits), # 4 Declaration of David Hardy (with exhibits), # 5 Declaration of Katherine Myrick (with exhibits), # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
2017-05-1210NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by C. Peter Sorenson on behalf of JUAN LUCIANO MACHADO AMADIS Substituting for attorney C. Sorenson and Daniel J. Stotter (Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
2017-05-1311NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Brian McClanahan on behalf of JUAN LUCIANO MACHADO AMADIS (McClanahan, Kelly) (Main Document 11 replaced on 5/15/2017) (znmw). (Entered: 05/13/2017)
2017-05-1612Unopposed MOTION to Stay re 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Unopposed MOTION to Modify Briefing Schedule by JUAN LUCIANO MACHADO AMADIS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
2017-07-0713MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by JUAN LUCIANO MACHADO AMADIS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - 1st Am. Compl., # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
2017-07-2114RESPONSE re 13 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
2017-11-03Case directly reassigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. Judge Richard J. Leon is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 11/03/2017)
2018-01-25MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiffs 13 Motion for Leave to Amend, dismissing as moot Defendants 9 Motion for Summary Judgment, and dismissing as moot Plaintiffs 12 Unopposed Motion to Stay re Defendants 9 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk of Court is directed to docket ECF 13-1 as Plaintiffs Amended Complaint. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Amended Complaint by February 26, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 01/25/18. (lctnm1) Modified on 1/26/2018 to change motion number to 12(hmc). (Entered: 01/25/2018)
2018-01-2515FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE filed by JUAN LUCIANO MACHADO AMADIS.(td) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
2018-01-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint due by 2/26/2018. (hmc) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
2018-01-2616NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by April Denise Seabrook on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Johnny Hillary Walker (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
2018-02-2817MOTION for Order Setting a Date to Submit a Proposed Briefing Schedule, and Memorandum in Support Thereof by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 02/28/2018)
2018-03-01NOTICE OF HEARING: The parties shall take notice that a Status Conference is scheduled for 3/8/2018, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (hmc) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
2018-03-01NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING: The parties shall take notice that the Status Conference originally scheduled for 3/8/2018 is now RESCHEDULED to 3/14/2018, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (hmc) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
2018-03-14Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Trevor N. McFadden: Status Conference held on 3/14/2018. Government's 17 Motion for Order Setting a Date to Submit a Proposed Briefing Schedule, GRANTED. The parties shall abide by the following briefing schedule: Dispositive Motion due by April 25, 2018; Cross-Motion, if any, and Opposition to Dispositive Motion due by June 1, 2018; Opposition to Cross-Motion and Reply in support of Dispositive Motion due by June 22, 2018; Reply in support of Cross-Motion due by July 9, 2018. SO ORDERED. (Court Reporter Crystal Pilgrim.) (tg) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
2018-03-14MINUTE ORDER: In light of the Amended Complaint's designation of the Department of Justice and the Department of State as the Defendants in this case, the Clerk of Court is requested to update the case style to reflect that the Drug Enforcement Agency is no longer a party to the case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/14/18. (lctnm1) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
2018-04-2018STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 4/20/18. (lctnm1) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
2018-04-2519Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Seabrook, April) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
2018-04-26MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' 19 Consent Motion for Extension of Time and for good cause shown, Defendants shall now file their dispositive motion by April 27, 2018. All other deadlines previously established by order of the Court or by the rules of procedure remain in place. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 4/26/18. (lctnm1) (Entered: 04/26/2018)
2018-04-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' dispositive motion due by 4/27/2018. (hmc) (Entered: 04/26/2018)
2018-04-2720MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Declaration of Eric Stein (State), # 5 Exhibit to Stein Declaration, # 6 Declaration of Katherine Myrick (DEA), # 7 Exhibit to Myrick Declaration, # 8 Declaration of David Hardy (FBI), # 9 Exhibit to Hardy Declaration, # 10 Declaration of Vanessa Brinkmann (OIP), # 11 Exhibit to Brinkmann Declaration)(Seabrook, April) (Entered: 04/28/2018)
2018-05-1021NOTICE of Supplemental Declaration of Eric F. Stein by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE re 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Declaration - Second Declaration of Eric F. Stein)(Seabrook, April) (Entered: 05/10/2018)
2018-05-3122Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment by JUAN LUCIANO MACHADO AMADIS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 05/31/2018)
2018-06-01MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's 22 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's 20 Motion for Summary Judgment and any Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment shall now be filed by June 15, 2018. Defendant's Reply in support of its Motion for Summary Judgment and Response to any Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment shall now be filed by July 6, 2018. Plaintiff's Reply in support of any Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment shall now be filed by July 23, 2018. The parties are warned that any future motions for extensions of time must comply with the Court's 18 Standing Order, including the requirement that any such motions be filed at least four business days prior to any affected deadline. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/1/18. (lctnm1) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
2018-06-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Cross-Motion due by 6/15/2018. Defendants' reply in support of its Motion for Summary Judgment and response to any Cross-Motion due by 7/6/2018. Plaintiff's reply in support of its Cross-Motion due by 7/23/2018. (hmc) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
2018-06-1523Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment by JUAN LUCIANO MACHADO AMADIS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
2018-06-1824ORDER requiring Plaintiff to show cause at hearing on June 22, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 2 why sanctions should not be imposed and/or the Government's 20 Motion for Summary Judgment be granted as unopposed. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/18/18. (lctnm1) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
2018-06-18Set/Reset Hearings: Show Cause Hearing scheduled for 6/22/2018, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (hmc) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
2018-06-1825Consent MOTION to Continue Reschedule Hearing by JUAN LUCIANO MACHADO AMADIS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McClanahan, Kelly) Modified event on 6/21/2018 (ztd). Modified event on 6/21/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 06/18/2018)
2018-06-19MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's 25 Consent Motion for Scheduling Order. The Show-Cause Hearing scheduled for June 22, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. shall now be held on June 20, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/19/18. (lctnm1) (Entered: 06/19/2018)
2018-06-19Set/Reset Hearings: Show Cause Hearing rescheduled for 6/20/2018, at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2, before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (hmc) (Entered: 06/19/2018)
2018-06-20Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Trevor N. McFadden: Show Cause Hearing held on 6/20/2018. Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter: Patricia Kaneshiro-Miller.) (hmc) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
2018-06-20MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of counsel's representations at the Show Cause Hearing held on June 20, 2018, the Court hereby discharges the 24 Order to Show Cause, and GRANTS the 23 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' 20 Motion for Summary Judgment and any Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment shall now be filed by June 26, 2018. Defendants' Reply in support of its Motion for Summary Judgment and Response to any Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment shall now be filed by August 10, 2018. Further requests for extension of time will be disfavored. SO ORDERED. (lctnm2) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
2018-06-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Cross-Motion due by 6/26/2018. Defendants' reply in support of its Motion for Summary Judgment and Response to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion due by 8/10/2018. (hmc) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
2018-06-22MINUTE ORDER: In light of the new briefing schedule set in the Court's June 20, 2018 Minute Order, Plaintiff's time to reply in support of its Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is extended to August 17, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/22/18. (lctnm1) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
2018-06-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's reply in support of its Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/17/2018. (hmc) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
2018-06-2626Joint MOTION to Stay Case by JUAN LUCIANO MACHADO AMADIS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
2018-06-27MINUTE ORDER granting the parties' 26 Joint Motion to Stay. The case is stayed effective June 26, 2018, and the parties are ordered to file a Joint Status Report by July 13, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/27/18. (lctnm1) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
2018-06-27Case Stayed. (hmc) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
2018-06-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/13/2018. (hmc) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
2018-07-1327Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposal for Further Proceedings by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Seabrook, April) Modified on 7/16/2018 (ztd). Modified on 7/18/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 07/13/2018)
2018-07-1528ERRATA Attaching Corrected Joint Status Report by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE 27 Status Report filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Corrected Joint Status Report and Proposed Order)(Seabrook, April) (Entered: 07/15/2018)
2018-07-16ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 27 Status Report was entered in error and counsel was refiled said pleading as docket entry no. 28 . (ztd) Modified on 7/18/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 07/16/2018)
2018-07-16MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 27 Joint Status Report, the stay of this case is hereby lifted. Plaintiff shall file his Opposition to the Defendants' 20 Motion for Summary Judgment and his Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by July 30, 2018; Defendants shall file their Reply in Support of their own Motion for Summary Judgment and their Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by September 14, 2018, and Plaintiff shall file his Reply in support of his Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by October 5, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/16/18. (lctnm1) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
2018-07-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Cross-Motion due by 7/30/2018. Defendants' reply in support of their Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion due by 9/14/2018. Plaintiff's reply in support its Cross-Motion due by 10/5/2018. (hmc) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
2018-07-3029Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Certain Exhibits Under Seal by JUAN LUCIANO MACHADO AMADIS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 07/30/2018)
2018-07-3130Memorandum in opposition to re 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JUAN LUCIANO MACHADO AMADIS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Machado declaration (redacted), # 2 Exhibit B - Court verdict, # 3 Exhibit C - Perez declaration, # 4 Exhibit D - Visa denials, # 5 Exhibit E - CJIS report, # 6 Exhibit F - OIP notes (redacted), # 7 Exhibit G - NADDIS search (redacted), # 8 Exhibit H - State note, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
2018-07-3131Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by JUAN LUCIANO MACHADO AMADIS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Machado declaration (redacted), # 2 Exhibit B - Court verdict, # 3 Exhibit C - Perez declaration, # 4 Exhibit D - Visa denials, # 5 Exhibit E - CJIS report, # 6 Exhibit F - OIP notes (redacted), # 7 Exhibit G - NADDIS search (redacted), # 8 Exhibit H - State note, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
2018-07-31MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's 29 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Certain Exhibits Under Seal. Plaintiff may file under seal exhibits in support of his Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment that contain personally identifiable information. Any exhibits filed under seal will be deemed properly filed to the extent that redacted copies are also filed on the public docket. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/31/18. (lctnm1) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
2018-07-3132SEALED DOCUMENT filed by JUAN LUCIANO MACHADO AMADIS re 30 Memorandum in Opposition, 31 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Machado declaration (sealed), # 2 Exhibit F - OIP notes (sealed), # 3 Exhibit G - NADDIS search (sealed))(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
2018-07-3133ERRATA Attaching Full Statement of Material Facts by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Full Statement of Material Facts)(Seabrook, April) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
2018-08-0134Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment by JUAN LUCIANO MACHADO AMADIS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
2018-08-02MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's 34 Unopposed Nunc Pro Tunc Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's 30 Memorandum in Opposition to the Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and 31 Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment are deemed timely filed. Plaintiff's counsel has repeatedly noted that his client is not a native English speaker, that his client only communicates with him through a Dominican attorney, and that relevant documents are not in English. These difficulties are challenging, and they may occasionally create an unavoidable need for an extension of time. But these challenges are also foreseeable in light of experience if not in light of the nature of the case. Because Plaintiff's counsel has repeatedly used these circumstances as grounds for untimely motions for extensions of time, any future motion for an extension of time that relies on these or related grounds must be timely filed or must contain an explanation of counsel's good-faith efforts to avoid the eleventh-hour discovery that he cannot meet his deadlines. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/2/18. (lctnm1) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
2018-09-0535Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 31 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
2018-09-06MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' 35 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall now file their Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by October 24, 2018 and Plaintiff shall file any Reply on or before November 14, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 9/6/18. (lctnm1) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
2018-09-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' reply in support of their Motion for Summary Judgment and opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion due by 10/24/2018. Plaintiff's reply in support of its Cross-Motion due by 11/14/2018. (hmc) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
2018-10-1936Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and Opposition Brief and Support Thereof by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
2018-10-19MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' 36 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall now file their Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by October 31, 2018, and Plaintiff shall file any Reply on or before November 21, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/19/18. (lctnm1) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
2018-10-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' Reply in support of their Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross Motion due by 10/31/2018. Plaintiff's Reply due by 11/21/2018. (hmc) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
2018-10-3137Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 31 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
2018-11-02MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' 37 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. It is ORDERED that the Defendants shall file their combined Opposition to Plaintiffs Cross-Motion and Reply in support of their pending dispositive motion on or before November 2, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/2/18. (lctnm1) (Entered: 11/02/2018)
2018-11-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' combined opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion and reply in support of their dispositive motion due by 11/2/2018. (hmc) (Entered: 11/02/2018)
2018-11-0438Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 31 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 11/04/2018)
2018-11-05MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' 38 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. It is ORDERED that Defendants shall file Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion and Reply in support of their Dispositive Motion on or before November 16, 2018. Plaintiffs may reply on or before December 14, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/5/18. (lctnm1) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
2018-11-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' opposition to cross-motion and reply to opposition to dispositive motion due by 11/16/2018; plaintiffs' reply to opposition to cross-motion due by 12/14/2018. (tg) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
2018-11-1639REPLY to opposition to motion re 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration - Third Hardy Declaration, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Seabrook, April) (Entered: 11/16/2018)
2018-11-1640Memorandum in opposition to re 31 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration Third Hardy Declaration, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Seabrook, April) (Entered: 11/16/2018)
2018-11-2141ERRATA attaching Revised Memo of Law and Searchable Exhibits by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE 39 Reply to opposition to Motion, filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, 40 Memorandum in Opposition, filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support - Revised, # 2 Exhibit 6 (text searchable), # 3 Exhibit 7 (text searchable), # 4 Exhibit 8 (text searchable))(Seabrook, April) (Entered: 11/21/2018)
2018-12-1442MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by JUAN LUCIANO MACHADO AMADIS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 12/14/2018)
2018-12-14MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's 42 Motion for Leave to File. It is ORDERED that any sur-reply is due December 14, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 12/14/18. (lctnm1) (Entered: 12/14/2018)
2018-12-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's sur-reply due by 12/14/2018. (tg) (Entered: 12/14/2018)
2018-12-1443REPLY to opposition to motion re 31 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by JUAN LUCIANO MACHADO AMADIS. (McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 12/15/2018)
2018-12-1544SURREPLY to re 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JUAN LUCIANO MACHADO AMADIS. (McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 12/15/2018)
2019-01-3145MEMORANDUM OPINION re 20 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and 31 Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 01/31/2019. (lctnm2) (Entered: 01/31/2019)
2019-01-3146ORDER denying 31 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 20 Motion for Summary Judgment. For the reasons stated in the accompanying 45 Memorandum Opinion, the Defendant's 20 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted and the Plaintiff's 31 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is denied. See attached order for details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 01/31/2019. (lctnm2) (Entered: 01/31/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar