Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWREN v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv02234
Date Filed2016-11-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffDAJUAN LAMARR WREN
Case DescriptionDajuan Lamarr Wrenn, a federal prisoner, submitted a FOIA request to the DEA for records on a DEA agent involved in the investigation of Wren. The agency redacted information under Exemption 7(C) (invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records). Wren filed an administrative appeal to the Office of Information Policy. OIP upheld the agency's denial. Wren then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Exemption 7(C) - Invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantDRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [23]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-11-091COMPLAINT against DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616088627) filed by DAJUAN LAMARR WREN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf) (Entered: 11/15/2016)
2016-11-15SUMMONS (4) Issued as to DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf) (Entered: 11/15/2016)
2016-11-222SUMMONS (4) Issued as to DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (md). (Entered: 11/15/2016)
2016-12-093NOTICE of Appearance by Wyneva Johnson on behalf of All Defendants (Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 12/09/2016)
2016-12-134NOTICE of Appearance by Wyneva Johnson on behalf of All Defendants (Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 12/13/2016)
2016-12-205MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 12/20/2016)
2016-12-20MINUTE ORDER granting defendants' 5 motion for an extension of time. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by February 7, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/20/2016.(lcabj3) (Entered: 12/20/2016)
2017-01-276MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 01/27/2017)
2017-01-277NOTICE of Proposed Order by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 01/27/2017)
2017-01-27MINUTE ORDER granting defendants' 6 motion for an extension of time to answer. Defendants shall file a responsive pleading by March 7, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/27/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 01/27/2017)
2017-02-138RESPONSE re 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by DAJUAN LAMARR WREN. (jf) (Entered: 02/15/2017)
2017-03-079MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
2017-03-07MINUTE ORDER granting 9 defendants' motion for an extension of time to answer. Defendants shall file a responsive pleading by March 9, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 3/7/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
2017-03-0910MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 03/09/2017)
2017-03-10MINUTE ORDER granting defendants' 10 motion for an extension of time to answer. Defendants shall file a responsive pleading by March 15, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 3/10/2017.(lcabj3) (Entered: 03/10/2017)
2017-03-1311First MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
2017-03-14MINUTE ORDER granting defendants' 11 fifth motion for an extension of time to answer. Defendants shall file a responsive pleading by March 21, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 3/14/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 03/14/2017)
2017-03-2112MOTION for Summary Judgment by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A-G, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 03/21/2017)
2017-03-2213ORDER. Plaintiff shall respond to defendants motion for summary judgment on or before April 28, 2017. See Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 3/22/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 03/22/2017)
2017-05-0114RESPONSE re 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DAJUAN LAMARR WREN. (jf) (Entered: 05/02/2017)
2017-05-2615MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
2017-05-30MINUTE ORDER granting defendants' 15 motion for an extension of time. Defendants shall file any reply in support of their motion for summary judgment by June 26, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/30/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
2017-06-0516RESPONSE (OBJECTION) re 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by DAJUAN LAMARR WREN. (jf) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
2017-06-2617MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
2017-06-2618ERRATA Exhibit 3 to 14 RESPONSE re 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DAJUAN LAMARR WREN. (jf) Modified to add text on 6/28/2017 (td). (Entered: 06/27/2017)
2017-06-27MINUTE ORDER granting defendants' 17 motion for an extension of time. Defendants shall file any reply in support of their motion for summary judgment by July 27, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/27/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
2017-06-27MINUTE ORDER. The Court will deem plaintiff's 18 Errata to be Exhibit 3 to 14 Plaintiff's Objection to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/27/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
2017-07-1019RESPONSE re 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by DAJUAN LAMARR WREN. (jf) (Entered: 07/12/2017)
2017-07-2720REPLY to opposition to motion re 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration (Declaration of Diane E. Filler))(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
2017-08-1821SURREPLY to re 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DAJUAN LAMARR WREN. "Leave to file GRANTED" signed by Amy B. Jackson on 08/16/2017 (jf) (Entered: 08/18/2017)
2017-10-1922ORDER. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12 and 58, and for the reasons stated in the accompanying memorandum opinion, it is hereby ORDERED that defendants' 12 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. This is a final appealable order. See Order for details. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/19/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
2017-10-1923MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/19/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff