Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBush v. United States Department of Agriculture Risk Management Agency
DistrictNorthern District of Iowa
CityWestern Division
Case Number5:2016cv04128
Date Filed2016-11-16
Date Closed2017-08-17
JudgeMagistrate Judge CJ Williams
PlaintiffWilliam J Bush
Case DescriptionWilliam Bush submitted a FOIA request to the Agricultural Risk Management Agency for record showing the aggregate yield of corn and soybean crops for several Iowa counties. The agency told Bush that it did not have the data at the level of specificity he had requested. Bush filed an administrative appeal, which was denied by the agency. Bush then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Request - Specificity, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Agriculture Risk Management Agency
DefendantRisk Management Agency USDA/RAM
DefendantUnited States Department of Agriculture
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [25]
Opinion/Order [30]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-11-161COMPLAINT filed against United States Department of Agriculture Risk Management Agency by Plaintiff William J Bush: Scheduling Report ddl 02/27/2017 (Attachment # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Copy w/NEF to filer at counter) (kfs) (Entered: 11/16/2016)
2016-11-16FEE Receipt: $400.00, receipt number IAN550001739 for New Civil Case Filing Fee by William J Bush. NEF to filer at counter. (src) (Entered: 11/16/2016)
2016-11-162Summons Issued as to Defendant United States Department of Agriculture Risk Management Agency. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION****(Attachment # 1 New Civil Case Packet) (Copy w/NEF to filer at counter) (kfs) (Entered: 11/16/2016)
2016-12-053PRO SE AMENDED Complaint against Risk Management Agency and United States Department of Agriculture, filed by William J Bush. Copy with NEF to filer at counter. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix) (src) (Entered: 12/05/2016)
2016-12-054Summons Issued as to Risk Management Agency, United States Department of Agriculture. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** Summons, new case packet and NEF to filer at counter. (Attachments: # 1 New Case Packet) (src) (Entered: 12/05/2016)
2016-12-215ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Risk Management Agency filed by William J Bush. Copy at counter to filer, NEF mailed to filer. (src) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
2016-12-216ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to United States Department of Agriculture filed by William J Bush. Copy to filer at counter, NEF mailed to filer. (src) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
2016-12-217ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Attorney General of the U.S. filed by William J Bush. Copy to filer at counter, NEF mailed to filer. (src) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
2016-12-218ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to U.S. Attorney's Office filed by William J Bush. Copy to filer at counter, NEF mailed to filer. (src) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
2016-12-309MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 3 Amended Complaint, 1 Complaint by Defendants Risk Management Agency, United States Department of Agriculture (Wright, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/30/2016)
2017-01-0310ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead re 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 3 Amended Complaint, 1 Complaint ; answer deadline extended for Risk Management Agency to 2/7/2017; United States Department of Agriculture to 2/7/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge C.J. Williams on 01/03/2017. (skv) Modified on 1/4/2017 - copy mailed to pro se plaintiff (djs). (Entered: 01/03/2017)
2017-02-0711ANSWER to 3 Amended Complaint by Risk Management Agency, United States Department of Agriculture.(Wright, Stephanie) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
2017-02-2212PRO SE MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant United States Department of Agriculture Due to Failure to Respond to 3 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff William J Bush (nef to non-ecf filer @ counter) (des) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
2017-02-2313NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Miranda Hayden on behalf of Risk Management Agency, United States Department of Agriculture. Withdrawal of Stephanie Johnson Wright. (Hayden, Kathryn) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
2017-02-2714ORDER denying 12 Pro Se Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 2/27/2017. Order/NEF mailed to plaintiff. (src) (Entered: 02/27/2017)
2017-03-0315ORDER Setting Hearing: Status Conference regarding scheduling order and discovery plan set for 3/24/2017 at 09:30 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge CJ Williams. See text of Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge CJ Williams on 03/03/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan) (copy w/NEF mailed to Pltf) (jjh) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
2017-03-2416MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge CJ Williams: Status Conference held on 3/24/2017. (Court Reporter FTR Gold) (copy to pro se Pltf) (jjh) Modified on 3/27/2017 (jjh). (Entered: 03/24/2017)
2017-03-2717ORDER: Upon consent of the parties, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge CJ Williams for final disposition: SCHEDULING Order and Discovery Plan: Add Parties ddl 03/31/2017: Amended Pleadings ddl 03/31/2017: Discovery ddl 04/27/2017: Motions ddl 05/08/2017: Trial Ready ddl 10/02/2017. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Magistrate Judge CJ Williams on 03/27/17. (Copy w/NEF mailed to pro se Plaintiff) (kfs) (Entered: 03/27/2017)
2017-03-2818TRIAL Management Order: Witness and exhibit lists exchanged by parties (but not filed) at least 21 days before FPTC. Exhibits marked. Motions in limine 21 days before FPTC. Bench Trial set for 10/2/2017 in SC 1st Fl Ct before Magistrate Judge CJ Williams. Telephonic Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/18/2017 at 3:30 PM before Magistrate Judge CJ Williams. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/11/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge CJ Williams on 3/28/2017. (NEF and order mailed to Plaintiff) (pac) (Entered: 03/28/2017)
2017-05-0419Pro Se MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Plaintiff William J Bush. Responses due by 5/18/2017. NEF mailed to plaintiff. (src) (Entered: 05/04/2017)
2017-05-0820MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Or In The Alternative For Summary Judgment by Defendant United States Department of Agriculture (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Statement of Material Facts, # 3 Appendix) (Hayden, Kathryn) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
2017-05-1821Response to Motion re 19 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Risk Management Agency, United States Department of Agriculture. (Hayden, Kathryn) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
2017-05-2322PRO SE MOTION for Extension of Discovery Deadline, PRO SE MOTION to Compel Limited Discovery Pursuant to Rule 56(d), PRO SE MOTION for Extension of Time to File Resistance to 20 Motion to Dismiss (or in the alternative For Summary Judgment) by Plaintiff William J Bush (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Declaration) (filed as such pursuant to CJW chambers) (nef to non-ecf filer) (des) (Entered: 05/23/2017)
2017-06-0123RESPONSE re 22 MOTION for Extension of Discovery Deadline, MOTION to Compel, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Resistance to 20 Motion to Dismiss by Risk Management Agency, United States Department of Agriculture (Hayden, Kathryn) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
2017-06-0624PRO SE REPLY to 23 Response re 22 PRO SE MOTION for Extension of Discovery Deadline, PRO SE MOTION to Compel, PRO SE MOTION for Extension of Time to File Resistance to 20 Motion to Dismiss filed by William J Bush (nef to non-ecf filer) (des) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
2017-06-0825ORDER: The Plaintiff's 19 Pro Se Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is denied. The Defendant's 20 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Or In The Alternative For Summary Judgment is denied in part. Only Defendant's motion to dismiss is denied. Defendant's motion for summary judgment remains pending. Plaintiff's response to the Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment due by 6/22/2017. The Plaintiff's 22 Pro Se Motion to conduct limited discovery is denied. See text of Order. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge CJ Williams on 06/08/2017. (copy w/NEF mailed to Pltf) (jjh) (Entered: 06/08/2017)
2017-06-2126REPLY to 23 Response to Motion re 20 MOTION For Summary Judgment filed by William J Bush. NEF Mailed to pro se filer. (Attachments: # 1 Response to Statement of Material Facts, # 2 Statement of Additional Facts, # 3 Appendix) (src) Modified text on 7/19/2017 (des) (Entered: 06/21/2017)
2017-06-2827REPLY by United States Department of Agriculture re 26 Reply to Response to 20 Motion (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David P. Zanoni, # 2 Appendix 1) (Hayden, Kathryn) Modified to add link on 6/29/2017 (djs). (Entered: 06/28/2017)
2017-07-0328ORDER Setting Hearing on 20 MOTION For Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 7/20/2017 at 1:00 PM in Ctrm 1 (1st Floor) Sioux City before Chief Magistrate Judge CJ Williams. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge CJ Williams on 7/3/2017. (NEF and order mailed to plaintiff) (pac) Modified text on 7/18/2017 (des) (Entered: 07/03/2017)
2017-07-2029MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge CJ Williams: Motion Hearing held on 7/20/2017 re 20 Motion For Summary Judgment filed by United States Department of Agriculture. Taken under advisement. Order to follow. (Official Court Record: FTR Gold) (copy w/nef to pro se plaintiff) (des) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
2017-08-1730ORDER granting 20 Motion for Summary Judgment by United States Department of Agriculture. Judgment shall enter against the plaintiff. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge CJ Williams on 08/17/2017. (copy w/NEF mailed to Pltf) (jjh) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
2017-08-1731JUDGMENT in favor of Risk Management Agency, United States Department of Agriculture against William J Bush. Signed by Clerk on 08/17/2017. (copy w/NEF mailed to Pltf) (jjh) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff