Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFord v. Ciraolo-Klepper et al
DistrictEastern District of California
CityFresno
Case Number1:2017cv00034
Date Filed2017-01-10
Date Closed2017-05-18
JudgeDistrict Judge Dale A. Drozd
PlaintiffMelba Ford
Case DescriptionMelba Ford submitted filed suit against the Justice Department, the IRS, and other agencies alleging that the IRS routinely falsified individuals' data and conspired to destroy individuals' constitutional rights. This is not a FOIA suit.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantCaroline Ciraolo-Klepper
DefendantDennis Stiffler Revenue Officer
DefendantCommissioner, Internal Revenue Office of Procedure and Administration
DefendantUnited States Attorney General
DefendantUnited States of America
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [11]
Opinion/Order [19]
Opinion/Order [22]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-01-101COMPLAINT against Caroline Ciraolo-Klepper, Commissioner, Internal Revenue Office of Procedure and Administration, Dennis Stiffler, United States Attorney General by Melba Ford. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Jessen, A) (Entered: 01/11/2017)
2017-01-102NOTICE of RELATED CASES by Melba Ford. (Jessen, A) (Entered: 01/11/2017)
2017-01-11RECEIPT number #CAE100034595 $400.00 fbo Melba Ford by Melba Ford on 1/10/2017. (Jessen, A) (Entered: 01/11/2017)
2017-01-123ORDER re Issuance of New Case Documents signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/11/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons, # 2 Waiver of Service, # 3 Consent Form, # 4 Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Jessen, A) (Entered: 01/12/2017)
2017-01-124SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Caroline Ciraolo-Klepper* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Melba Ford* *905 Ross Way* *Hanford, CA 93230*. (Jessen, A) (Entered: 01/12/2017)
2017-01-125SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner, Internal Revenue Office of Procedure and Administration* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Melba Ford* *905 Ross Way* *Hanford, CA 93230*. (Jessen, A) (Entered: 01/12/2017)
2017-01-126SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Dennis Stiffler* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Melba Ford* *905 Ross Way* *Hanford, CA 93230*. (Jessen, A) (Entered: 01/12/2017)
2017-01-127SUMMONS ISSUED as to *United States Attorney General* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Melba Ford* *905 Ross Way* *Hanford, CA 93230*. (Jessen, A) (Entered: 01/12/2017)
2017-01-128CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/13/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order, # 2 Consent Form, # 3 Informational Order) (Jessen, A) (Entered: 01/12/2017)
2017-01-12SERVICE BY MAIL: 1 Complaint, 3 Order, 7 Summons, 8 Civil New Case Documents for DAD, 6 Summons, 5 Summons, 4 Summons served on Melba Ford. (Jessen, A) (Entered: 01/12/2017)
2017-03-099AFFIDAVIT and Evidence of Melba Ford as Proof of Service of Summons in Civil Action by Melba Ford. (Sant Agata, S) (Entered: 03/10/2017)
2017-03-1510NOTICE of RELATED CASE 1:17-cv-00187 by United States of America. Attorney Hauck, Jonathan added. (Hauck, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
2017-03-2011ORDER relating and reassigning cases signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/17/2017. (Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
2017-03-20SERVICE BY MAIL: 11 Order served on Melba Ford. (Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
2017-03-2912MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) Pursuant to the Order Relating and Reassigning Cases, document 11 , the Initial Scheduling Conference currently set for hearing on 4/13/2017 will now be held on 5/31/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. The Initial Scheduling Conference in related case 1:17-CV-187 DAD EPG will also be heard at that same date and time. The Court grants telephonic appearances at the conference, with each party wishing to appear telephonically directed to use the following dial-in number and passcode: 1-888-251-2909; passcode 1024453. Minute Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/29/2017. (Rooney, M) (Entered: 03/29/2017)
2017-03-29SERVICE BY MAIL: 12 Minute Order served on Melba Ford. (Rooney, M) (Entered: 03/29/2017)
2017-03-3113MOTION to DISMISS for LACK of JURISDICTION by United States of America. Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum)(Hauck, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
2017-04-1214OPPOSITION by Melba Ford to 13 MOTION to DISMISS for LACK of JURISDICTION . (Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 04/14/2017)
2017-04-2515REPLY by United States of America re 14 Opposition to Motion, 13 MOTION to DISMISS for LACK of JURISDICTION . (Hauck, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
2017-04-2716MINUTE ORDER: (Text Only) signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/27/2017; The parties are encouraged to appear telephonically for the 13 motion to dismiss on calendar 5/2/2017, and may do so by dialing 877-402-9757 (access code 6966236), at 9:30am. Because the court may be hearing other matters using the same conference line, please wait to state your appearance until your case has been called and appearances are requested. Keep all background noise to a minimum. At least 24 hours prior to the hearing you must email Courtroom Deputy Renee Gaumnitz, at RGaumnitz@caed.uscourts.gov, to advise the court you will be appearing telephonically. (Thorp, J) (Entered: 04/27/2017)
2017-04-27SERVICE BY MAIL: 16 Minute Order, served on Melba Ford. (Thorp, J) (Entered: 04/27/2017)
2017-05-0118Rule 11 Motion to Show Cause re: Sanction of Jonathan M. Hauck or in Alternative MOTION to COMPEL Production of the Substitute Income Tax Returns IRS Claims it Prepared on July 11, 2006 or August 14, 2006, by Melba Ford. (Marrujo, C) (Entered: 05/02/2017)
2017-05-0217MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before District Judge Dale A. Drozd: MOTION HEARING held on 5/2/2017. The court noted that plaintiff phoned the Clerk's Office this morning to advise she has a bad cough and will not be participating in this hearing in person or by phone. The court took defendants' 13 motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction under submission, a written decision will issue. Plaintiff (Pro Se) NOT present. Defendants' Counsel Jonathan Hauck telephonically present. Court Reporter/CD Number: Karen Hooven. (Gaumnitz, R) (Entered: 05/02/2017)
2017-05-02SERVICE BY MAIL: 17 Minutes served on Melba Ford. (Gaumnitz, R) (Entered: 05/02/2017)
2017-05-1819ORDER Granting 13 Motion to Dismiss Based on Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 05/18/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Flores, E) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
2017-05-1820JUDGMENT dated *05/18/2017* in favor of defendant against Plaintiff pursuant to order. (Flores, E) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
2017-05-18SERVICE BY MAIL: 20 Judgment, 19 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, Order on Motion to Compel served on Melba Ford. (Flores, E) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff