Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSLUSS v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00064
Date Filed2017-01-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffMATTHEW DAVID SLUSS
Case DescriptionMatthew Sluss, a federal prisoner, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice's International Prisoner Transfer Unit for records concerning prisoner exchange policies between the U.S. and Canada. The agency acknowledged receipt of his request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Sluss filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Recovery of Costs

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE International Prisoner Transfer Unit
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [59]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-01-111COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE filed by MATTHEW DAVID SLUSS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(zrdj) (Entered: 01/13/2017)
2017-01-112MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MATTHEW DAVID SLUSS (zrdj) (Entered: 01/13/2017)
2017-01-113PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by MATTHEW DAVID SLUSS (zrdj) (Entered: 01/13/2017)
2017-01-114ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $15.72 from Prison Account of MATTHEW DAVID SLUSS and granting 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (see order for full details). Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 1/9/2017. (zrdj) (Entered: 01/13/2017)
2017-01-11Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 12/30/2016. (zrdj) (Entered: 01/13/2017)
2017-01-305SUMMONS (3) Issued as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (md) (Entered: 01/30/2017)
2017-02-226RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/14/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/16/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 2/10/2017, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/10/17. (td) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
2017-03-167MOTION to Stay Proceedings by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John E. Cunningham III)(Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
2017-03-17MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Defendant's Motion to Stay Proceedings. This matter shall be stayed until further order of the court. Defendant shall file a status report on or before May 15, 2017, providing the court with an update regarding the status of searches and production. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 03/17/2017. (lcapm3) (Entered: 03/17/2017)
2017-03-17Case Stayed. Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendant's Status Report due by 5/15/2017. (cdw) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
2017-03-228Cross MOTION to Stay Proceedings by MATTHEW DAVID SLUSS (zrdj) (Entered: 03/24/2017)
2017-03-229Memorandum in opposition to re 7 MOTION to Stay filed by MATTHEW DAVID SLUSS. (See docket entry 8 to view document)(zrdj) (Entered: 03/24/2017)
2017-03-2810ORDER denying 8 Plaintiff's Cross-Motion to Stay Proceedings. Defendant shall file a status report no later than April 14, 2017, addressing Defendant's search efforts. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 03/28/2017. (lcapm3) (Entered: 03/28/2017)
2017-04-1311STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
2017-04-13MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of 11 Defendant's Status Report, Defendant shall file a subsequent status report on or before May 15, 2017, providing the court with an update regarding the status of searches and production. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/13/2017. (Entered: 04/13/2017)
2017-04-13Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendant's Status Report due by 5/15/2017. (cdw) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
2017-05-1512STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
2017-05-15MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of 12 Defendant's Status Report, Defendant is hereby directed to file a subsequent status report on or before June 2, 2017, providing the court with an update regarding the status of searches and production. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 05/15/2017. (lcapm3) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
2017-05-15Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 6/2/2017. (zcdw) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
2017-05-3013NOTICE by MATTHEW DAVID SLUSS "LET THIS BE FILED" by Judge Amit P. Mehta (zrdj) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
2017-06-0114PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE and Status Report by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
2017-06-0115ORDER. Upon consideration of 14 Defendant's Status Report and Request for Briefing Schedule, the court orders the following with respect to further proceedings in this matter: within 10 days of production of all non-exempt records, Defendant's counsel shall endeavor to communicate with Plaintiff by phone to determine if Plaintiff intends to challenge the scope of the search or any withholdings, and Defendant shall notify the court of Plaintiff's position as soon as practicable thereafter. If Plaintiff intends to challenge Defendant's response to his FOIA request in any respect, the briefing schedule shall be as follows: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed on or before July 7, 2017; Plaintiff's Opposition shall be filed on or before August 7, 2017; and Defendant's Reply shall be filed on or before August 28, 2017. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/01/2017. (lcapm3) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
2017-06-1316Letter from Matthew Sluss to Scott Sroka "LET THIS BE FILED" by Judge Amit P. Mehta (zrdj) (Entered: 06/14/2017)
2017-06-3017MOTION to Stay re 15 Order by MATTHEW DAVID SLUSS (zrdj) (Entered: 07/03/2017)
2017-07-0618MOTION to Stay re 17 MOTION to Stay re 15 Order,,, by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
2017-07-0619RESPONSE re 17 MOTION to Stay re 15 Order filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (See Docket Entry 18 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
2017-07-1020LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- Letter from Plaintiff This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Do No File per 5.1(a)" Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/10/2017. (jf) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
2017-07-10MINUTE ORDER granting 17 and 18 the parties' motions to stay proceedings. These proceedings shall be stayed until August 7, 2017. No later than that date, Defendant shall submit a status report indicating whether there remain unresolved issues concerning Defendant's withholdings and, if so, proposing a revised summary judgment briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/10/2017. (lcapm3) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
2017-07-10Case Stayed. Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendant's Status Report due by 8/7/2017. (cdw) (Entered: 07/11/2017)
2017-08-0721STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
2017-08-08MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of 21 Defendant's Status Report, these proceedings shall be stayed until September 7, 2017. No later than that date, Defendant shall submit a status report indicating whether there remain unresolved issues concerning Defendant's withholdings and, if so, proposing a revised summary judgment briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/08/2017. (lcapm3) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
2017-08-08Case Stayed. Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendant's Status Report due by 9/7/2017. (cdw) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
2017-09-0722STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 09/07/2017)
2017-09-07MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of 22 Defendant's Status Report, these proceedings shall be stayed until October 6, 2017. No later than that date, Defendant shall submit a status report indicating whether there remain unresolved issues concerning Defendant's withholdings and, if so, proposing a revised summary judgment briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/07/2017. (lcapm3) (Entered: 09/07/2017)
2017-09-07Case Stayed. Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 10/6/2017. (zcdw) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
2017-10-0623STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
2017-10-06MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of 23 Defendant's Status Report, Defendant shall submit a subsequent status report on or before November 6, 2017, indicating whether there remain unresolved issues concerning Defendant's withholdings and, if so, proposing a revised summary judgment briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/06/2017. (lcapm3) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
2017-10-06Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendant's Status Report due by 11/6/2017. (zcdw) (Entered: 10/07/2017)
2017-10-0824Letter from Plaintiff. "Let this be filed" signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/08/2017 (jf) (Entered: 10/11/2017)
2017-11-0625STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
2017-11-07MINUTE ORDER. Defendant shall file a status report no later than November 22, 2017, which updates the court as to whether the parties have resolved remaining issues and, if not, proposes a briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/07/2017. (lcapm3) (Entered: 11/07/2017)
2017-11-07Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendant's Status Report due by 11/22/2017. (zcdw) (Entered: 11/09/2017)
2017-11-2226STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 11/22/2017)
2017-11-27MINUTE ORDER. In light of Defendant's 26 Status Report, Defendant shall submit a subsequent Status Report on or before December 6, 2017, that reports that the parties have resolved any remaining issues or, if necessary, proposes a briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/27/2017. (lcapm3) (Entered: 11/27/2017)
2017-11-27Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendant's Status Report due by 12/6/2017. (zcdw) (Entered: 11/28/2017)
2017-12-0627STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 12/06/2017)
2017-12-08MINUTE ORDER. In light of Defendant's 27 Status Report, Defendant shall submit a subsequent Status Report on or before January 5, 2018, that reports that the parties have resolved the remaining issue or, if necessary, proposes a briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/08/2017. (lcapm3) (Entered: 12/08/2017)
2018-01-0528STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
2018-01-08MINUTE ORDER. In light of Defendant's 28 Status Report, Defendant shall submit a subsequent Status Report on or before February 5, 2018, that updates the court on whether the parties have successfully resolved all outstanding disputes and, if not, proposes a briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 01/08/2018. (lcapm3) (Entered: 01/08/2018)
2018-02-0529STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 02/05/2018)
2018-02-08MINUTE ORDER. Defendant shall submit a subsequent Status Report on or before March 5, 2018, that reports that the parties have resolved the remaining issue or, if necessary, proposes a briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 02/08/2018. (lcapm3) (Entered: 02/08/2018)
2018-02-08Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendant's Status Report due by 3/5/2018. (zcdw) (Entered: 02/12/2018)
2018-03-0530STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
2018-03-06MINUTE ORDER. Defendant shall submit a subsequent Status Report on or before March 20, 2018, that reports that the parties have resolved the remaining issue or, if necessary, proposes a briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 03/06/2018. (lcapm3) (Entered: 03/06/2018)
2018-03-06Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report or Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 3/20/2018. (zcdw) (Entered: 03/06/2018)
2018-03-1431MOTION for Briefing Schedule for Summary Judgment by MATTHEW DAVID SLUSS (td) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-03-2032STATUS REPORT and Request for Briefing Schedule by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
2018-03-2033ORDER setting the following schedule for further proceedings in this matter: (1) Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed on or before April 13, 2018; (3) Plaintiffs Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendants Motion shall be filed on or before May 14, 2018; (4) Defendants Reply and Opposition to Plaintiffs Cross-Motion shall be filed on or before May 28, 2018; and (5) Plaintiffs Reply shall be filed on or before June 11, 2018. Plaintiff's 31 Motion for Briefing Schedule is denied as moot. See the attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 03/20/2018. (lcapm3) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
2018-04-1334MOTION for Summary Judgment and Supporting Memorandum by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Exhibit Vaughn Index, # 3 Declaration of John E. Cunningham III (Second), # 4 Exhibit 1-8 to Second Cunningham Declaration, # 5 Declaration of Michael G. Seidel, # 6 Exhibit to Seidel Declaration, # 7 Declaration of Linda M. Bowe, # 8 Exhibit to Bowe Declaration, # 9 Declaration of John F. Boseker, # 10 Exhibit A to Boseker Declaration, # 11 Exhibit B to Boseker Declaration)(Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
2018-04-2535Emergency MOTION to Seal re 34 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Supporting Memorandum by MATTHEW DAVID SLUSS (jf). (Entered: 04/27/2018)
2018-04-27MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's 35 Emergency Motion to Seal. The clerk of court shall seal the papers filed in ECF No. 34 in their entirety. Within 7 days, government counsel shall meet and confer with Plaintiff about any redactions needed to protect Plaintiff's privacy consistent with Local Civil Rule 5.4(f). Government counsel shall file an appropriately redacted version of its 34 Motion for Summary Judgment, including exhibits, no later than May 11, 2018. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/27/2018. (lcapm1) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
2018-05-1136MOTION for Summary Judgment and Supporting Memorandum by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Exhibit Vaughn Index, # 3 Declaration of John E. Cunningham III (Second), # 4 Exhibit 1-8 to Second Cunningham Declaration, # 5 Declaration of Michael G. Seidel, # 6 Exhibit to Seidel Declaration, # 7 Declaration of Linda M. Bowe, # 8 Exhibit to Bowe Declaration, # 9 Declaration of John F. Boseker, # 10 Exhibit A to Boseker Declaration, # 11 Exhibit B to Boseker Declaration)(Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
2018-05-1137MOTION for Summary Judgment by MATTHEW DAVID SLUSS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits)(jf) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
2018-05-2238MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Cross-Motion by MATTHEW DAVID SLUSS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment) (tth) . (Entered: 05/25/2018)
2018-05-2939MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 37 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 38 MOTION for Leave to File by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 05/29/2018)
2018-05-29MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 39 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's Reply and Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion shall now be filed on or before June 19, 2018, and Plaintiff's Reply shall be filed on or before July 3, 2018. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 05/29/2018. (lcapm3) (Entered: 05/29/2018)
2018-05-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Reply and Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion due by 6/19/2018. Plaintiff's Reply due by 7/3/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
2018-06-1940MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 37 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 38 MOTION for Leave to File by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 06/19/2018)
2018-06-20MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 40 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's Reply and Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion shall be filed on or before July 3, 2018; and Plaintiffs Reply shall be filed on or before July 10, 2018. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/20/2018. (lcapm3) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
2018-06-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Reply and Opposition due by 7/3/2018. Plaintiff's Reply due by 7/10/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
2018-07-0341MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 37 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 38 MOTION for Leave to File by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 07/03/2018)
2018-07-05MINUTE ORDER granting 41 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's Reply and Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion shall be filed on or before July 10, 2018. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/05/2018. (lcapm3) (Entered: 07/05/2018)
2018-07-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Reply and Opposition due by 7/10/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 07/05/2018)
2018-07-0542MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to 37 MOTION for Summary Judgment by MATTHEW DAVID SLUSS (jf) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
2018-07-1043Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 37 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 38 MOTION for Leave to File by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
2018-07-10MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 43 Motion for Extension of Time and denying as moot Plaintiff's 42 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's Reply and Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion shall be filed on or before August 9, 2018; and Plaintiff's Reply shall be filed on or before August 23, 2018. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/10/2018. (lcapm3) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
2018-07-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Reply and Opposition due by 8/9/2018. Plaintiff's Reply due by 8/23/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
2018-08-0944MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 37 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 38 MOTION for Leave to File by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
2018-08-10MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 44 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's Reply and Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion shall be filed on or before September 7, 2018; and Plaintiff's Reply shall be filed on or before September 21, 2018. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/10/2018. (lcapm3) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
2018-08-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Reply and Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion due by 9/7/2018. Plaintiff's Reply due by 9/21/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
2018-09-0745MOTION to Withdraw 36 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Supporting Memorandum by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
2018-09-0746MOTION for Briefing Schedule for Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
2018-09-10MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 45 Motion to Withdraw its 36 Motion for Summary Judgment and granting Defendant's 46 Motion for Briefing Schedule. Plaintiff's 37 and 38 Motions are hereby denied without prejudice as moot. The following schedule shall govern further proceedings in this matter: (1) Defendant's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed on or before October 8, 2018; (2) Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition shall be filed on or before November 8, 2018; (3) Defendant's Reply and Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion shall be filed on or before November 26, 2018; and (5) Plaintiff's Reply shall be filed on or before December 10, 2018. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/10/2018. (lcapm3) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
2018-09-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/8/2018. Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition due by 11/8/2018. Defendant's Reply and Opposition due by 11/26/2018. Plaintiff's Reply due by 12/10/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
2018-09-1747MOTION to Strike 45 Motion to Withdraw, 46 Motion for Briefing Schedule by MATTHEW DAVID SLUSS (jf) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
2018-09-1748Memorandum in opposition to re 46 MOTION for Briefing Schedule for Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment , 45 MOTION to Withdraw 36 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Supporting Memorandum filed by MATTHEW DAVID SLUSS. (jf) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
2018-09-20MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff's 47 Motion to Strike is denied as moot in light of the court's September 10, 2018, Minute Order granting Defendant's 45 Motion to Withdraw and setting a summary judgment briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/20/2018. (lcapm3) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
2018-10-0949MOTION for Summary Judgment and Supporting Memorandum by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration of John E. Cunningham III (Third), # 3 Exhibit 1-8 to Third Cunningham Declaration, # 4 Declaration of Michael G. Seidel, # 5 Exhibit to Seidel Declaration, # 6 Declaration of Linda M. Bowe, # 7 Exhibit to Bowe Declaration, # 8 Declaration of John F. Boseker, # 9 Exhibit A to Boseker Declaration, # 10 Exhibit B to Boseker Declaration)(Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
2018-10-1050ORDER advising Plaintiff to respond by November 26, 2018, to Defendant Department of Justice's 49 Motion for Summary Judgment or risk dismissal of the case. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/10/2018. (lcapm3) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
2018-10-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 11/26/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 10/11/2018)
2018-11-0551MOTION for Summary Judgment by MATTHEW DAVID SLUSS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(jf) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
2018-11-2152MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 51 MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 11/21/2018)
2018-11-21MINUTE ORDER granting 52 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Reply in Further Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. The Defendant's Opposition and Reply shall be due on or before December 10, 2018. Plaintiff's Reply to its Motion for Summary Judgment shall be due on or before December 27, 2018. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/21/2018. (lcapm3) (Entered: 11/21/2018)
2018-11-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Opposition and Reply due by 12/10/2018. Plaintiff's Reply due by 12/27/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 11/26/2018)
2018-12-1053MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 51 MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-10MINUTE ORDER granting 53 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition and Reply to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. The Opposition and Reply shall be due on or before December 17, 2018. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/10/2018. (lcapm3) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Opposition and Reply due by 12/17/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
2018-12-1754MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 51 MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
2018-12-18MINUTE ORDER granting 54 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Reply in Further Support of its Motion. The Opposition and Reply shall be due on or before December 21, 2018. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/18/2018. (lcapm3) (Entered: 12/18/2018)
2018-12-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Opposition and Reply due by 12/21/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 12/20/2018)
2018-12-2155Memorandum in opposition to re 51 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Response to Plaintiff's Fact Statement)(Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
2018-12-2156REPLY to opposition to motion re 49 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Supporting Memorandum filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Response to Plaintiff's Fact Statement)(Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
2019-01-0257MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 51 MOTION for Summary Judgment by MATTHEW DAVID SLUSS (ztd) (Entered: 01/10/2019)
2019-01-11MINUTE ORDER granting 57 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. The Reply shall be due on or before January 18, 2019. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 01/11/2019. (lcapm3) (Entered: 01/11/2019)
2019-01-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Reply due by 1/18/2019. (zjd) (Entered: 01/15/2019)
2019-01-1558REPLY re 51 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by MATTHEW DAVID SLUSS. (jf) (Entered: 01/18/2019)
2019-06-1459MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 49 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, and granting in part and denying in part 51 Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. See attached Memorandum Opinion and Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/14/2019. (lcapm3) (Entered: 06/14/2019)
2019-06-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Status Report due by 6/27/2019. (zjd) (Entered: 06/17/2019)
2019-06-2760STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 06/27/2019)
2019-06-28MINUTE ORDER. Defendant shall file an additional Joint Status Report or renew its motion for summary judgment by July 31, 2019. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/28/2019. (lcapm3) (Entered: 06/28/2019)
2019-06-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Additional Joint Status Report due by 7/31/2019. Renewed Summary Judgment Motion due by 7/31/2019. (ldc) (Entered: 06/28/2019)
2019-07-0161MOTION for Interim Cost Other Than Attorney Fees by MATTHEW DAVID SLUSS (jf) (Entered: 07/03/2019)
2019-07-1762MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 61 MOTION for Interim Costs Other Than Attorney Fees by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 07/17/2019)
2019-07-19MINUTE ORDER granting 62 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Interim Costs Other Than Attorney's Fees shall be filed on or before August 14, 2019. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/19/2019. (lcapm3) (Entered: 07/19/2019)
2019-07-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's opposition to plaintiff's motion for interim costs other than attorney's fees due by 8/14/2019. (tg) (Entered: 07/19/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar