Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00135
Date Filed2017-01-20
Date Closed2017-03-09
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON
Case DescriptionCitizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington submitted a FOIA request to the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration for records concerning any questionnaires submitted by the Trump transition team. CREW also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and granted CREW a fee waiver. After hearing nothing further from the agency, CREW filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-01-201COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4812807) filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Rappaport, Adam) (Entered: 01/20/2017)
2017-01-20Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (jd) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
2017-01-23SUMMONS Not Issued as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE (INCORRECT SUMMONSES SUBMITTED AT THE TIME COMPLAINT WAS FILED). (jd) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
2017-01-242NOTICE OF CORRECTED SUMMONSES by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(Rappaport, Adam) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
2017-01-253SUMMONS Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf) (Entered: 01/25/2017)
2017-01-304RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE served on 1/30/2017, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/30/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/1/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/30/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Rappaport, Adam) (Entered: 01/30/2017)
2017-02-225NOTICE of Appearance by Anne L. Weismann on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
2017-03-016ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE.(Roth, Dena) (Entered: 03/01/2017)
2017-03-017ORDER: Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before March 15, 2017. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 03/01/2017. (lcapm3) (Entered: 03/01/2017)
2017-03-01Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 3/15/2017. (cdw) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
2017-03-088STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 03/08/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff